Moore-Fotso v. Board of Education, City of Chicago
Plaintiff: Dorothy A. Moore-Fotso
Defendant: Board of Education, City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2012cv10419
Filed: December 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 5/8/2017. Mailed notice(cdh, )
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 9/29/2016. Mailed notice(cdh, )
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/3/2013: For the reasons stated below, the Court denies Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 5 and gives Plaintiff 30 days from the date of this order to pay the $350 filing fee. If Plaintiff does not comply withthis order within that time frame, her case will be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 6 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/3/2013: Mailed notice(tlm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore-Fotso v. Board of Education, City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy A. Moore-Fotso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education, City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?