Joseph et al v. Carnes et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Joseph, Isamu Fairbanks, Ian Doughty and Martin Craig
Defendant: Lisa Carnes, Gregory Pease, Rick Jacobs and Chris Hamilton
Case Number: 1:2013cv02279
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2518 Interception of Wire/Oral/Electronic Communication
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Plaintiffs Andrew Joseph, Isamu Fairbanks, Ian Doughty, and Martin Craig filed suit against Defendants Lisa Carnes, Gregory Pease, Rick Jacobs, and Chris Hamilton on March 26, 2013, alleging two counts: a civil cause o f action under the Stored Communications Act (the SCA), 18 U.S.C. § 2701; and civil conspiracy. The parties stipulated to dismissal of Count II, the civil conspiracy count, with prejudice. Defendants have now moved for summary judgment on Count I. For the reasons set forth below, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 109 is denied. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 6/4/2015. Mailed notice. (jl)
April 30, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/30/2015. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 19, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/19/2013. Mailed notice (tg, )
May 14, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 5/14/2013.(jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph et al v. Carnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Joseph
Represented By: Dean A. Dickie
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Koppenhoefer
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isamu Fairbanks
Represented By: Dean A. Dickie
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Koppenhoefer
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Doughty
Represented By: Dean A. Dickie
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Koppenhoefer
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Craig
Represented By: Dean A. Dickie
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Koppenhoefer
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Carnes
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Represented By: Sarah J. Isaacson
Represented By: Jamie Lynn North
Represented By: Peter Ordower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Pease
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Represented By: Sarah J. Isaacson
Represented By: Jamie Lynn North
Represented By: Peter Ordower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Jacobs
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Represented By: Sarah J. Isaacson
Represented By: Jamie Lynn North
Represented By: Peter Ordower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hamilton
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Represented By: Sarah J. Isaacson
Represented By: Jamie Lynn North
Represented By: Peter Ordower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?