United States of America v. Hosseini

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Amir Hosseini
Case Number: 1:2013cv02472
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Remedies on motion attacking sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order: Defendant Hosseini's Rule 60(b)(3) motion 52 is denied. For further details see Memorandum Order. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/11/2016:Mailed notice(clw, )
April 19, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: From Hosseini's submission it appears that three questions need to be asked of the government at the outset -- questions that might possibly lead to a quick decision or, on the other hand, might call for further pro ceedings: 1. Was an incorrect version of the indictment, without the redactions based on this Court's rulings, actually delivered to the jury? On that score, a copy of the indictment as transmitted to the jurors for use during their deliberation s should be delivered to this Court's chambers. 2. If the answer to the first question is "Yes," what is the explanation for how that occurred? 3. What jury instructions were given by this Court dealing with the elements of proof that had to be provided by the government as to all of the counts that were submitted to the jury for rendition of a verdict? If there is any question as to the precise scope of that inquiry, a complete set of the jury instructions should also be delivere d to this Court's chambers.Those questions must be answered, and the documents referred to in those questions must be delivered to this Court's chambers, on or before May 9, 2016. This Court will then determine what further proceedings are required to address Hosseini's contentions. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/19/2016:Mailed notice(clw, )
June 11, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order and Attachment: It is unclear just what action defendant Hosseini now seeks from this Court on his repetition of some of his earlier-voiced contentions, no relief on this Court's part is called for. Accordingly defendant Hosseini's current submission -- treated as a motion -- is denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/11/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
March 31, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order: Defendant Hosseini's motion for relief from judgment pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b)(1) 49 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/31/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
April 21, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/21/2014. Mailed notice(cdh, )
June 25, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/25/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
April 30, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/30/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hosseini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA
Represented By: Yasmin Noelle Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Hosseini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?