Stanek v. Saint Charles Community Unit School District # 303

Defendant: Saint Charles Community Unit School District # 303
Plaintiff: Matthew Stanek
Case Number: 1:2013cv03106
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/26/2015. Mailed notice. (kp, )
March 27, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 3/27/2014. Mailed notice(mgh, )
August 27, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/27/2013: Defendants' Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement 7 is granted. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their Complaint in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rules 8, 10 and 11 within thirty days of this Order. See statement. Mailed notice (mgh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanek v. Saint Charles Community Unit School District # 303
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Charles Community Unit School District # 303
Represented By: Lori Geist Martin
Represented By: Robert Edmund Swain
Represented By: Michelle Amanda Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Stanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?