Zehrer v. Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terrence Zehrer
Defendant: Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. and Harbor International Fund
Case Number: 1:2014cv00789
Filed: February 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 3/13/2018: For the reasons stated in the Opinion and Order, motion of defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. for summary judgment against plaintiffs Terrence Zehrer and Ruth Tumpowsky [16 2] is granted. Judgment entered in favor of defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. and against plaintiffs Terrence Zehrer and Ruth Tumpowsky. Defendant's motion to bar expert testimony of Dr. Richard W. Kopcke 230 and defendant's motion to bar expert testimony of Kent E. Barrett 232 are moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(mad, )
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Production of Documents [Dkt. 131] is granted in part, and denied in part. Plaintiffs are ordered to produce the narrowed discovery sought following the parties' meet and confer conference namely, Plaintiffs must produce documents relating to ownership in bond mutual funds or international mutual funds in the past five years. [For further details see order] - Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 1/13/2016. Mailed notice (np, )
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order, Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/18/2014. (ea, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zehrer v. Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Zehrer
Represented By: Edward B Gerard
Represented By: Amelia Susan Newton
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Justin D. Rieger
Represented By: Norman Rifkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Bennett
Represented By: Aruna Bagyam Subramanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor International Fund
Represented By: David E. Bennett
Represented By: Aruna Bagyam Subramanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?