Straw v. Kloecker et al
Plaintiff: |
Andrew U D Straw |
Defendant: |
John F Kloecker and Locke Lord LLP |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01420 |
Filed: |
February 27, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Cook |
Presiding Judge: |
Milton I. Shadur |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1964 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 20, 2017 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, copies of Dkt. No. 42 and of this memorandum order are transmitted to the Executive Committee so that it may determine what action is appropriate. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/20/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
|
October 5, 2017 |
Filing
41
Supplement to October 4, 2017 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Immediately before the Conclusion section of this Court's October 4 Memorandum Opinion and Order (the "Opinion"), this Court addressed the "Affidavit To Support Recusal U nder 28 U.S.C. §144" filed on September 28 by pro se plaintiff Andrew Straw ("Straw"). Although for convenience the discussion in the Opinion at its pages 6 and 7 employed a shorthand reference to that filing as the "Recusal Motion," this Court's review of the case docket has revealed that the Clerk's Office did not treat that filing as a pending motion (see Dkt. No. 39). Nonetheless it is exceedingly plain that the assertions made by Straw in that filing are, as the Opinion concluded at page 7, "totally irrational." Accordingly, to complete the record, this supplement to the Opinion confirms that this Court has rejected the proposed recusal. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/5/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
|
October 4, 2017 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum opinion and order, plaintiff's verified motion to vacate 37 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/4/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
|
September 20, 2017 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, plaintiff's motion for permission to amend and to request the case be reopened 32 is denied. This action remains dismissed. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/20/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
|
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, plaintiff's verified motion to reconsider order denying motion to strike 30 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/4/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
|
September 8, 2016 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM Order: Plaintiff Shaw's motion to strike 28 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/8/2016:Mailed notice(clw, )
|
March 26, 2014 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/26/2014. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
|
March 5, 2014 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/5/2014. (ao,)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?