Greene v. Karpeles et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Gregory Greene alleged that Defendants MtGox Inc., Mt. Gox KK, Tibanne KK and Mark Karpeles committed fraud and breached its contracts by making false representations regarding the utility, privacy, security and availability of bitcoins stored with Mt. Gox, freezing its users' assets without notice and then shutting down its website.

Plaintiff: Gregory Pearce, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto and Gregory Greene
Defendant: Gonzague Gay-Bouchery, MT. Gox North America, Inc., Mark Karpeles, MtGox Inc., Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Tibanne KK, Jed Mccaleb, Mt.Gox KK and John Doe Defendants
Claimant: Inaam Khoury
Case Number: 1:2014cv01437
Filed: February 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 499 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 10/14/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Hearing held on Defendant's motion for certificate of appealability #491 . The parties shall file a status report on before 10/7/2020 confirming that the expert discovery depositions have been concluded, and it not, when the parties anticipate they will conclude. Attorneys/Parties should appear at the 9/17/2020 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 498 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 8/6/2020 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 497 MEMORANDUM by Mark Karpeles in support of motion for certificate of appealability #491 (Brennan, Bevin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 496 RESPONSE by Gregory Greenein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles for certificate of appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #491 (Thomassen, Benjamin)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk3, Docket)
June 23, 2020 Filing 494 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for certificate of appealability #491 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by 7/15/2020; Defendant shall reply by 7/27/2020. Telephonic hearing on motion for certificate of appealability set for 6/25/2020 #492 is stricken and re-set for 8/6/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The telephonic status hearing set for 6/25/2020 #484 is stricken and re-set for 8/6/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The call-in number is 877-336-1828 and the access code is 4082461. Counsel of record will receive an email prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 493 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Telephonic hearing scheduled for 6/25/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 877-336-1828 and the access code is 4082461. Counsel of record will receive an email prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 492 NOTICE of Motion by Bevin Megan Brennan for presentment of motion for certificate of appealability #491 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/25/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Brennan, Bevin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 491 MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles for certificate of appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brennan, Bevin)
June 16, 2020 Filing 490 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/16/2020.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 489 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant's motion for summary judgment #452 and motion to strike Goforth expert disclosure #457 are denied. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 488 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: By agreement #487 , the schedule is amended as follows. Plaintiff's expert shall be deposed by 7/8/2020. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 8/21/2020. Defendant's expert(s) shall be deposed by 10/2/2020. Plaintiff's class certification motion shall be filed by 10/30/2020; Defendant's response due by 12/2/2020; reply due by 12/16/2020. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 487 STATUS Report (Joint) by Mark Karpeles (Brennan, Bevin)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 485 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The parties have sought guidance from Chambers regarding the class certification briefing schedule and the remaining expert disclosure/deposition schedule. The class certification briefing schedule #451 is vacated. In the court's view, the best approach is to ask the parties for an expert and class certification schedule that works best for them in light of the COVID-19 situation. The parties shall file a joint status report by 5/27/2020 setting for a jointly proposed schedule or, if they disagree, competing proposals. For purposes of this exercise, the parties should expect that Defendant's summary judgment motion #452 will be denied and that Defendant's motion to strike #457 will be denied without prejudice.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 484 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of Third Amended General Order 20-0012, the 5/19/2020 status hearing #479 is stricken and re-set to 6/25/2020 at 9:15 a.m. In the meantime, if any party wishes to present a procedural matter to the court, the party should send an email to the Courtroom Deputy (Jackie_Deanes@ilnd.uscourts.gov) and the proposed order email box (Proposed_Order_Feinerman@ilnd.uscourts.gov), with a copy to all counsel and pro se parties, and the court will respond as soon as practicable. If any party wishes to extend, shorten, or revoke in a particular case an extension granted by Paragraph 2 of the Third Amended General Order or any prior iteration of General Order 20-0012, the party should file a motion on the case docket pursuant to Paragraph 2.c of the Third Amended General Order, and shall indicate therein whether the motion is agreed or opposed. If any party believes that a telephonic hearing is necessary before 6/1/2020, the party should file a motion under Paragraph 3 of the Third Amended General Order. Parties may file non-emergency motions on the case docket as they see fit. Emergency relief in any case, or emergency relief from the Third Amended General Order, should be sought in the manner set forth in Paragraphs 7-8 of the Third Amended General Order.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 481 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Notwithstanding Amended General Order 20-0012, and absent further order of court, the deadlines set forth in the 12/18/2020 order #451 shall stand.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 479 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Oral argument held on Defendant's summary judgment motion #452 and motion to strike #457 . The Court will rule by mail on pending motions. Status hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The deadline for Defendant to depose Plaintiff's disclosed expert Carol R. Goforth will be re-set at a later date.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 478 REPLY by Defendant Mark Karpeles in Support of His Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 and His Motion to Strike Expert Disclosure of and Preclude Expert Testimony From Carol R. Goforth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brennan, Bevin)
March 16, 2020 Filing 477 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file combined reply memorandum #474 is granted. Motion hearing set for 3/18/2020 #475 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 476 RESPONSE by Defendant Mark Karpeles to Plaintiff's Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Additional Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Brennan, Bevin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 475 NOTICE of Motion by Bevin Megan Brennan for presentment of motion for leave to file, #474 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/18/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Brennan, Bevin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 474 MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles for leave to file his Combined Reply Memorandum in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment and his Motion to Strike Expert Disclosure in Excess of Page Limit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brennan, Bevin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 473 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Given the COVID-19 situation, counsel and pro se parties are strongly encouraged to appear telephonically at hearings scheduled for the week of 3/16/2020. The Toll Free call-in number is 877-336-1828, and the Access Code is 4082461. Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 472 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. The deposition of Expert Carol R. Goforth is need not proceed until further order of court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 471 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file excess pages #468 is granted. Motion hearing set for 2/24/2020 #469 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 470 RESPONSE by Gregory Greenein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles to strike Expert Disclosure of and Preclude Expert Testimony From Carol R. Goforth #457 (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 469 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #468 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/24/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 468 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Greene for leave to file excess pages instanter regarding Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (dkt 465) (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 467 DECLARATION of Benjamin S. Thomassen regarding Rule 56 statement #466 , response in opposition to motion #465 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Karpeles Dep, #2 Exhibit B - Nilsson Article, #3 Exhibit C - Mizuho Interrog Resps, #4 Exhibit D - Greene Interrog Resps, #5 Exhibit E - Greene Dep, #6 Exhibit F - Greene Decl, #7 Exhibit G - Karpeles Forum Post, #8 Exhibit H - Greene Apr 6, 2013 Email, #9 Exhibit I - Karpeles Interrog Resps, #10 Exhibit J - MtGox TOU, #11 Exhibit K - Karpeles Email to McCaleb, #12 Exhibit L - Karpeles-McCaleb Comm'ns, #13 Exhibit M - Karpeles Resps to RTAs, #14 Exhibit N - McCaleb Decl, #15 Exhibit O - Goforth Decl, #16 Exhibit P - MtGox Purchase Agreement, #17 Exhibit Q - MtGox News Article, #18 Exhibit R - Seizure Receipt, #19 Exhibit S - Seizure Receipt, #20 Exhibit T - Article re Karpeles Trial, #21 Exhibit U - MtGox Crisis Strategy Draft, #22 Exhibit V - MtGox Jan 2012 Rpt, #23 Exhibit W - MtGox Aug 2012 Rpt, #24 Exhibit Y - Coinlab Announcement, #25 Exhibit Z - Coinlab License Agreement, #26 Exhibit AA - Coinlab Compl, #27 Exhibit AB - Tibanne Answer / Counterclaim, #28 Exhibit AC - Willy Rpt, #29 Exhibit AD - Article re Karpeles Trial, #30 Exhibit AE - Greene Suppl Interrog Resps, #31 Exhibit AF - Stmt re MtGox Withdrawals)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 466 RULE 56 LR56.1(b)(3) Statement by Gregory Greene regarding motion for summary judgment #452 Plaintiff's L.R. 56.1(b)(3) Statement (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 465 RESPONSE by Gregory Greenein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles for summary judgment #452 (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 464 STIPULATION of Dismissal regarding Greene's individual claims for conversion (without prejudice) and negligence (with prejudice) (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 6, 2020 Filing 463 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 2/19/2020 #451 is stricken and re-set for 2/25/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment #452 and Defendant's motion to strike expert disclosure #457 by 2/18/2020; replies due by 3/13/2020. The deadline for Defendant to depose Plaintiff's disclosed expert Carol R. Goforth will be re-set at the 2/25/2020 status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 462 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held and continued to 3/16/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Defendant's motion for summary judgment #452 and Defendant's motion to strike expert disclosure #457 are entered and continued. Responses due by 2/10/2020; replies due by 3/9/2020. The deadline for Defendant to depose Plaintiff's disclosed expert Carol R. Goforth will be re-set at the 2/19/2020 status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 461 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Defendant's motion to strike #457 and motion for summary judgment #452 set for 1/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m. is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 460 MEMORANDUM by Mark Karpeles in support of motion for summary judgment #452 (Brennan, Bevin)
January 8, 2020 Filing 459 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant's motion for leave to file his memorandum of law in support of his motion for summary judgment #455 is granted. Defendant Karpeles shall file his memorandum as a separate docket entry. Motion hearing set for 1/13/2020 #456 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 458 NOTICE of Motion by Bevin Megan Brennan for presentment of motion to strike #457 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/13/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Brennan, Bevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 457 MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles to strike Expert Disclosure of and Preclude Expert Testimony From Carol R. Goforth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brennan, Bevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 456 NOTICE of Motion by Bevin Megan Brennan for presentment of motion for leave to file #455 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/13/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Brennan, Bevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 455 MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles for leave to file His Memorandum of Law in Support of His Motion For Summary Judgment in Excess of Page Limit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brennan, Bevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 454 RULE 56.1(a)(3) Statement by Mark Karpeles regarding motion for summary judgment #452 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Brennan, Bevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 453 NOTICE of Motion by Bevin Megan Brennan for presentment of motion for summary judgment #452 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/13/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Brennan, Bevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 452 MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles for summary judgment (Brennan, Bevin)
December 18, 2019 Filing 451 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By agreement #450 , the expert disclosure and deposition schedule #432 shall stand. Also by agreement #450 , Plaintiff shall file his class certification motion by 6/5/2020; Defendant Karpeles shall respond by 7/3/2020; and Plaintiff shall reply by 7/17/2020. The status hearing set for 12/19/2019 #449 is stricken and re-set for 2/19/2020 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 450 STATUS Report by Gregory Greene (Thomassen, Benjamin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 449 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/19/2019 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a status report by 12/16/2019 regarding (1) Defendant's request of the Japanese prosecutor and (2) whether the expert disclosure/deposition schedule should be amended.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 448 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 11/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. #432 is re-set for 9:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/8/2019: The 10/30/2019 order #446 is supplemented to require Defendant Karpeles to make a good faith effort to secure permission of the Japanese public prosecutor to disclose to Plaintiff Greene the documents and other materials that Karpeles received from the prosecutor. Karpeles is directed to include a copy of this order along with his request to the public prosecutor. The court notes that any documents and other materials produced by Karpeles would be subject to a protective order, which would protect the privacy of any non-party named therein, and respectfully requests that the Japanese public prosecutor grant the permission sought by Karpeles.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 446 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons and to the extent stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents responsive to Plaintiff's first set of requests for documents #437 granted in part and denied in part. By noon Toyko time on 11/4/2019, Defendant Karpeles shall produce to Plaintiff all documents (paper or electronic) responsive to Plaintiff's document requests that he received from the Japanese bankruptcy trustees. A further order will address the documents Plaintiff received from the Japanese public prosecutor.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 445 SUR-REPLY by Defendant Mark Karpeles to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brennan, Bevin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 444 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held and continued to 10/30/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Defendant's surreply in opposition to Plaintiff's motion to compel #437 shall be filed by 3:00 p.m. on 10/29/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 443 DECLARATION of Benjamin S. Thomassen regarding reply #442 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - mark@tibanne.com emails)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 442 REPLY by Plaintiff Gregory Greene to motion to compel #437 , Response, #441 (Thomassen, Benjamin)
October 8, 2019 Filing 441 RESPONSE by Defendant Mark Karpeles to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Brennan, Bevin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 440 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion to compel #437 is entered and continued. Defendant shall respond to the motion by 10/8/2019; Plaintiff shall reply by 10/15/2019. The motion hearing on the motion to compel set for 9/25/2019 #439 is stricken and re-set to 10/23/2019 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (jlj, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 439 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion to compel #437 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/25/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 438 DECLARATION of Benjamin S. Thomassen regarding motion to compel #437 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew Wilson, #2 Exhibit B - Greene's Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Greene's Document Requests, #4 Exhibit D - Karpeles's Written Responses to Greene's Document Requests, #5 Exhibit E - Meet and Confer Email, #6 Exhibit F - Meet and Confer Email, #7 Exhibit G - Meet and Confer Email, #8 Exhibit H - Meet and Confer Email, #9 Exhibit I - Meet and Confer Email, #10 Exhibit J - Meet and Confer Email)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 437 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Greene to compel Defendant Karpeles's production of documents (Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/17/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 435 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Unopposed motion for order certifying deposition of Mark Karpeles in Tokyo Japan and appointing participants #433 is granted. Enter order. Motion hearing set for 9/19/2019 #434 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 434 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #433 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 433 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Greene to Certify Deposition of Mark Karpeles in Tokyo Japan and Appoint Participants [Unopposed Motion] (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 432 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to complete discovery #430 is granted. The fact discovery deadline is extended to 12/12/2019. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 12/26/2019. Plaintiff's expert(s) shall be deposed by 2/11/2020. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 3/27/2020. Defendant's expert(s) shall be deposed by 5/8/2020. The status hearing set for 9/9/2019 #429 is stricken and re-set for 11/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The motion hearing set for 9/4/2019 #431 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 431 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #430 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/4/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 430 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Greene for extension of time to complete discovery JOINT MOTION (Thomassen, Benjamin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 429 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Given the resolution #428 of Plaintiffs' motion for voluntary dismissal #414 , the status hearing set for 8/1/2019 #426 is stricken and re-set for 9/9/2019 at 9:15 a.m. If any party would like a status hearing before that date, that party should contact the Courtroom Deputy.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 428 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice #414 is granted. The claims of Plaintiff Motto are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Anthony Motto as a party plaintiff.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 427 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report) by Anthony Motto (Thomassen, Benjamin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 426 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 8/1/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Plaintiff Motto shall file a status report regarding Defendant Karpeles's offer by 7/25/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 425 STATUS Report Regarding His Response to Plaintiff Anthony Motto's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Mark Karpeles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brennan, Bevin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 424 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion and status hearing set for 7/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. #422 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 423 PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/18/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 422 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. Motion for a protective order #419 is granted. Enter order. The 6/20/2019 motion hearing #420 is stricken. Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss without prejudice #414 is entered and continued to 7/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 421 REPLY by Anthony Motto to MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony MottoTo Voluntarily Dismiss Individual Claims Without Prejudice #414 (Thomassen, Benjamin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 420 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for protective order #419 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 419 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Anthony Motto for protective order (Joint Motion) (Thomassen, Benjamin)
June 11, 2019 Filing 418 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the Plaintiff's request, the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice set for 6/13/2019 #416 is stricken and re-set for 6/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 417 RESPONSE by Defendant Mark Karpeles to Plaintiff Anthony Motto's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Brennan, Bevin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 416 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice #414 set for 6/6/2019 #415 is stricken and re-set for 6/13/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant shall file response in opposition by 6/10/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 415 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #414 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 414 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony MottoTo Voluntarily Dismiss Individual Claims Without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin S. Thomassen)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
May 1, 2019 Filing 413 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties reported on the progress of discovery.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 412 Defendant Mark Karpeles ANSWER to amended complaint (and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint) by Mark Karpeles(Brennan, Bevin)
March 13, 2019 Filing 411 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The 3/12/2019 order #409 is amended to provide that Defendant shall answer the operative complaint by 4/2/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 410 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/12/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 409 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant's motion to dismiss #390 is denied. Defendant shall answer the operative complaint by 3/26/2019. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 408 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to stay the case based on impending mootness, or in the alternative to strike class allegations #404 is granted in part and denied without prejudice in part. The deadline to serve responses to any already-served written discovery requests is extended to 5/15/2019; the motion otherwise is denied. The status hearing set for 4/29/2019 #403 is stricken and re-set for 5/1/2019 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 407 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing set for 2/28/2019 at 9:00 a.m. #406 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 406 NOTICE of Motion by Bevin Megan Brennan for presentment of motion to stay #404 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/28/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Brennan, Bevin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 405 MEMORANDUM by Mark Karpeles in support of motion to stay #404 the Case Based on Impending Mootness, or in the Alternative to Strike Class Allegations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - January 2019 Rehabilitation Plan Update, #2 Exhibit B - Introduction of insolvency in Japan, #3 Exhibit C - Restructuring and insolvency in Japan overview, #4 Exhibit D - Mt.Gox Leaked Info Purportedly Shows $318 Million Cryptocurrency Sell-Offs on BitPoint, #5 Exhibit E - Mt Gox CEO Mark Karpeles Claims Innocence as Trial Nears End - CoinDesk, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs' Requests for Production, #7 Exhibit October 2017 Mt.Gox Legal, #8 Exhibit H - 11 29 2017 annoucement, #9 Exhibit I - 06 22 2018 annoucement, #10 Exhibit J - About us Mt.Gox Creditors, #11 Exhibit K - About Us Nishimura & Asahi, #12 Exhibit L - Mt.Gox Legal A cooperative of Mt Gox Bitcoin creditors)(Brennan, Bevin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 404 MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles to stay the Case Based on Impending Mootness, or in the Alternative to Strike Class Allegations (Brennan, Bevin)
February 4, 2019 Filing 403 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 2/28/2019. Initial written discovery requests shall be served by 3/21/2019. Fact discovery shall close 9/30/2019. Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 10/14/2019; Plaintiffs' expert(s) shall be deposed by 11/30/2019; Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 1/14/2020; Defendant's expert(s) shall be deposed by 2/25/2020. The status hearing set for 2/14/2019 #401 s stricken and re-set for 4/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 402 STATUS Report (Joint) by Gregory Greene, Anthony Motto (Thomassen, Benjamin)
January 11, 2019 Filing 401 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The parties shall proceed on the assumption that Defendant Karpeles's motion to dismiss #390 will be denied. By 2/1/2019, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth a joint proposal (or, in the event of disagreement, competing proposals) for a discovery and dispositive motion schedule.The status hearing set for 1/15/2019 #400 is stricken and re-set for 2/14/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 400 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/15/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Oral argument held on Defendant Karpeles's motion to dismiss. The motion is taken under advisement.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 399 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Greene by Daniel Joshua Schneider (Schneider, Daniel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 398 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request, status hearing set for 11/14/2018 #397 is stricken and re-set for 11/20/2018 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 397 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 9:00 a.m. #396 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 396 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 11/9/2018 #395 is stricken and re-set for 11/14/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 395 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 11/8/2018 #391 is stricken and re-set for 11/9/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (cc, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 394 REPLY by Defendant Mark Karpeles Memorandum in Support of His Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brennan, Bevin)
October 16, 2018 Filing 393 MEMORANDUM by Gregory Greene, Anthony Motto in Opposition to motion to dismiss #390 (Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 392 MEMORANDUM motion to dismiss #390 by Mark Karpeles in support of the Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mark Karpeles)(Brennan, Bevin)
August 28, 2018 Filing 391 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 11/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant Karpeles's brief in support of his motion to dismiss #390 shall be filed by 9/25/2018. Plaintiffs' response due by 10/16/2018; reply due by 10/30/2018.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 390 MOTION by Defendant Mark Karpeles, Cross Defendant Mark Karpeles to dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Entry of Default Against Him (Brennan, Bevin)
August 24, 2018 Filing 389 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Mark Karpeles, Defendant Mark Karpeles by Matthew J. Schmidt (Schmidt, Matthew)
August 24, 2018 Filing 388 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Mark Karpeles, Defendant Mark Karpeles by Bevin Megan Brennan (Brennan, Bevin)
August 13, 2018 Filing 387 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Because Defendant Karpeles has appeared #51 #52 #53 , the stipulation of dismissal #385 is deemed to be a Civil Rule 41(a)(2) motion to voluntarily dismiss and, as so deemed, is granted. All claims against Defendant Mizuho Bank are dismissed without prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs. The court is directed to terminate Mizuho Bank, Ltd. as a party defendant, and to make Mark Karpeles the lead defendant in the case caption. If Defendant Karpeles wishes to oppose the request for entry of default #386 he must file an opposition by 8/24/2018 or appear (either personally or through counsel) at the 8/28/2018 hearing #384 . Plaintiffs shall email a copy of their notice of entry of default and a copy of this order to Defendant Karpeles's last known email address.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 386 REQUEST For Default as to Defendant Mark Karpeles (Thomassen, Benjamin)
August 10, 2018 Filing 385 STIPULATION of Dismissal regarding claims against Mizuho Bank, Ltd. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
August 8, 2018 Filing 384 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 8/28/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 383 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 8/8/2018 at 9:15 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's request to amend to add a new named plaintiff for the Deposit Subclass #380 is denied.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 12, 2018 Filing 382 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/17/2018 at 9:00 a.m. #377 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 381 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to file #378 is granted. The time for the parties to file their joint status report is extended to 7/13/2018. Motion hearing set for 7/11/2018 #379 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 9, 2018 Filing 380 STATUS Report by Gregory Greene, Anthony Motto (Thomassen, Benjamin)
July 6, 2018 Filing 379 NOTICE of Motion by Jerome Steven Fortinsky for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #378 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
July 6, 2018 Filing 378 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for extension of time to file Joint Status Report (Unopposed) (Fortinsky, Jerome)
June 26, 2018 Filing 377 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time #375 is granted. The time for the parties to file their joint status report is extended to 7/9/2018. Motion hearing set for 6/28/2018 #376 is stricken. Status hearing set for 6/28/2018 #372 is stricken and re-set for 7/17/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 25, 2018 Filing 376 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of extension of time #375 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/28/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
June 25, 2018 Filing 375 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Motto for extension of time to file Joint Status Report (Unopposed) (Thomassen, Benjamin)
June 7, 2018 Filing 374 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/7/2018.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
June 7, 2018 Filing 373 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiffs' motion for class certification #294 is denied as to Plaintiff Motto's effort to serve as class representative of the Deposit Subclass; given the dismissal of their individual claims #311 , the motion is denied as moot as to Plaintiff Lack's and Plaintiff Pearce's efforts to serve as class representatives of, respectively, the Deposit and Withdrawal Subclasses. Defendant Mizuho Bank's motion to exclude Henderson as an expert #320 is denied as moot. By 6/25/2018, the parties shall file a status report presenting their joint or competing perspectives on what remains to be done in this case.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 372 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 5/23/2018 #371 is stricken and re-set for 6/28/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The class certification motion #294 remains under submission.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 25, 2018 Filing 371 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties, status hearing set for 5/16/2018 #369 is stricken and re-set for 5/23/2018 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER Denying Transfer from the MDL Panel regarding MDL No. 2829. Mailed notice.(ek, )
April 3, 2018 Filing 369 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 5/16/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Oral arguments held on Plaintiffs' motion to certify class #294 .Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 29, 2018 Filing 368 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 4/3/2018 at 9:30 a.m. #320 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 28, 2018 Filing 367 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. / Declaration of Jerome S. Fortinsky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 28, 2018 Filing 366 SEALED REPLY by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd.to Exclude the Report and Testimony of M. Todd Henderson (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) #320 (Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 27, 2018 Filing 365 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to seal document #363 is granted. Defendant Mizuho Bank may file under seal the designated materials, so long as it publicly files redacted versions of those materials. Motion hearing set for 4/3/2018 #364 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 26, 2018 Filing 364 NOTICE of Motion by Jerome Steven Fortinsky for presentment of motion to seal document #363 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/3/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 26, 2018 Filing 363 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to seal document declaration, #362 , reply to response to motion, #361 (Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 26, 2018 Filing 362 DECLARATION of Jerome S. Fortinsky regarding reply to response to motion, #361 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 26, 2018 Filing 361 REPLY by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd.to Exclude the Report and Testimony of M. Todd Henderson (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) #320 , response in opposition to motion, #342 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) (Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 26, 2018 Filing 360 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion by Anthony Motto for leave to seal documents #356 is granted. Motion for leave to file excess pages #357 is granted. Plaintiffs may file under seal the designated materials, so long as they publicly file redacted versions of those materials. Motion hearings set for 3/27/2018 #358 and #359 are stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 22, 2018 Filing 359 NOTICE of Motion by John Aaron Lawson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #357 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Lawson, John)
March 22, 2018 Filing 358 NOTICE of Motion by John Aaron Lawson for presentment of motion to seal document #356 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Lawson, John)
March 22, 2018 Filing 357 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Motto for leave to file excess pages (Lawson, John)
March 22, 2018 Filing 356 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Motto to seal document reply, #355 (Lawson, John)
March 22, 2018 Filing 355 SEALED REPLY by Anthony Motto to reply to response to motion,,, #354 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Lawson, John)
March 22, 2018 Filing 354 REPLY by Anthony Motto to MOTION by Plaintiffs Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce to certify class #294 , memorandum in opposition to motion #326 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 45 (Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 46 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 47 (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 48 (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 49 (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 50 (Motto Deposition Transcript), #7 Exhibit 51 (Lack Deposition Transcript), #8 Exhibit 52 (Pearce Deposition Transcript), #9 Exhibit 53 (Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 54 (Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 55 (Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 56 (Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 57 (Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 58 (Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 59 (Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 60 (Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 61 (Under Seal))(Lawson, John)
March 14, 2018 Filing 353 NOTICE by John Aaron Lawson of Change of Address (Lawson, John)
March 14, 2018 Filing 352 NOTICE by Ari Jonathan Scharg of Change of Address (Scharg, Ari)
March 14, 2018 Filing 351 NOTICE by Benjamin Scott Thomassen of Change of Address (Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 13, 2018 Filing 350 NOTICE by Jay Edelson of Change of Address (Edelson, Jay)
March 13, 2018 Filing 349 NOTICE by Christopher Lillard Dore of Change of Address (Dore, Christopher)
March 5, 2018 Filing 348 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion to file memorandum of law in opposition to motion to exclude expert testimony and certain accompanying exhibits under seal #346 is granted. Plaintiffs may file under seal the designated materials, so long as they publicly file redacted versions of those materials. Motion hearing set for 3/8/2018 #347 is stricken. The Clerk is directed to terminate Joseph Lack and Gregory Pearce as party plaintiffs.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 2, 2018 Filing 347 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion to seal document #346 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/8/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 2, 2018 Filing 346 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Motto to seal document sealed document, #345 , sealed document #344 (Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 2, 2018 Filing 345 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anthony Motto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Expert report of Todd Henderson (filed provisionally under seal), #2 Exhibit Exhibit C - Excerpts from the deposition transcript of Todd Henderson (filed provisionally under seal), #3 Exhibit Exhibit D - Expert report of Mark T. Williams (filed provisionally under seal))(Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 2, 2018 Filing 344 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anthony Motto (Opposition To Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd.'s Motion To Exclude The Report And Testimony Of M. Todd Henderson - Filed Provisionally Under Seal) (Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 2, 2018 Filing 343 DECLARATION of Benjamin S. Thomassen regarding response in opposition to motion, #342 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert report of Todd Henderson (filed provisionally under seal), #2 Exhibit B - Oct. 13 2017 Letter to Resetaris, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from the deposition transcript of Todd Henderson (filed provisionally under seal), #4 Exhibit D - Expert report of Mark T. Williams (filed provisionally under seal), #5 Exhibit E - Expert report of Andrew J. Rasmussen)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 2, 2018 Filing 342 RESPONSE by Anthony Mottoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd.to Exclude the Report and Testimony of M. Todd Henderson (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) #320 (Redacted Version - Motion to Seal Unredacted Version Pending) (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 13, 2018 Filing 341 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing held. By agreement, Plaintiff's motion to extend expert deposition deadline and deadline to file reply in support of motion for class certification #334 is denied as moot. Strombom will be deposed on 3/2/2018, and Plaintiffs have until 3/22/2018 to file their reply in support of their motion for class certification #294 . Defendant Mizuho's motion to exclude the report and testimony of M. Todd Henderson #320 is entered and continued. Plaintiffs' response due by 3/2/2018; reply due by 3/26/2018. The 3/8/2018 status hearing #313 is stricken and reset for 4/3/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, )
February 8, 2018 Filing 340 DECLARATION of Jerome S. Fortinsky regarding declaration,,,,,,,,,, #327 (Redacted Exhibits to Replace Slip Sheets) (Dkt. 327) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 (Redacted Version To Replace Slip Sheet) (Dkt. 327-10), #2 Exhibit 23 (Redacted Version To Replace Slip Sheet) (Dkt. 327-23), #3 Exhibit 36 (Redacted Version To Replace Slip Sheet) (Dkt. 327-36))(Frye, Jason)
February 7, 2018 Filing 339 DECLARATION of Jerome S. Fortinsky regarding memorandum in opposition to motion #326 (Unredacted Version of Exhibits) (Dkt. 327) (Filed Under Seal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-8) (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 9 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-9) (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 10 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-10) (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 13 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-13) (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 14 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-14) (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 15 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-15) (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 16 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-16) (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 17 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-17) (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 18 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-18) (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 19 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-19) (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 20 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-20) (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 21 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-21) (Filed Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 22 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-22) (Filed Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 23 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-23) (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 24 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-24) (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 25 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-25) (Filed Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 26 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-26) (Filed Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 27 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-27) (Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 32 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-32) (Filed Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 33 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-33) (Filed Under Seal), #21 Exhibit 34 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-34) (Filed Under Seal), #22 Exhibit 35 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-35) (Filed Under Seal), #23 Exhibit 36 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-36) (Filed Under Seal), #24 Exhibit 37 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-37) (Filed Under Seal), #25 Exhibit 40 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 327-40) (Filed Under Seal))(Frye, Jason)
February 7, 2018 Filing 338 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. Memorandum In Opposition To Motion To Certify Class (Unredacted Version) (Dkt. 326) (Filed Under Seal) (Frye, Jason)
February 7, 2018 Filing 337 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of M. Todd Henderson (Unredated Version) (Dkt. 321) (Filed Under Seal) (Frye, Jason)
February 6, 2018 Filing 336 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #334 , #335 sent to Attorney Ethan Jacobs returned as: unknown address error. The Clerk telephoned Ethan Jacobs, no contact made. Mailed to attorney Ethan Jacobs a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
February 6, 2018 Filing 335 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of extension of time #334 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 6, 2018 Filing 334 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Motto for extension of time to complete expert depositions and file reply in support of motion for class certification (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 4, 2018 Filing 331 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions to seal document #324 and #328 are granted. Defendant Mizuho Bank may file under seal the designated materials, so long as it publicly files redacted versions of those materials. Motion hearings set for 2/6/2018 #325 and #329 are stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 2, 2018 Filing 333 PLAINTIFF Anthony Motto's Memorandum in support of motion for consolidation and transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (Exhibits) (pk, )
February 2, 2018 Filing 332 MOTION of Plaintiff Anthony Motto for Consolidation and Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (pk, )
February 2, 2018 Filing 330 NOTICE by Anthony Motto of Motion for Consolidation and Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 (JPML) (Attachments: #1 JPML Section 1407 Motion)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 1, 2018 Filing 329 NOTICE of Motion by Jerome Steven Fortinsky for presentment of motion to seal document #328 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/6/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 1, 2018 Filing 328 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to seal document memorandum in opposition to motion #326 , declaration,,,,,,,,,, #327 (Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 1, 2018 Filing 327 DECLARATION of Jerome S. Fortinsky regarding memorandum in opposition to motion #326 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #9 Exhibit 9 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #10 Exhibit 10 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #14 Exhibit 14 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #15 Exhibit 15 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #16 Exhibit 16 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #17 Exhibit 17 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #18 Exhibit 18 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #19 Exhibit 19 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #20 Exhibit 20 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #21 Exhibit 21 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #22 Exhibit 22 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #23 Exhibit 23 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #24 Exhibit 24 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #25 Exhibit 25 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #26 Exhibit 26 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #27 Exhibit 27 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #33 Exhibit 33 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #34 Exhibit 34 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #35 Exhibit 35 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #36 Exhibit 36 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #37 Exhibit 37 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending), #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending))(Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 1, 2018 Filing 326 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in Opposition to motion to certify class #294 (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) (Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 1, 2018 Filing 325 NOTICE of Motion by Jerome Steven Fortinsky for presentment of motion to seal document, #324 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/6/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 1, 2018 Filing 324 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to seal document declaration, #322 , MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd.to Exclude the Report and Testimony of M. Todd Henderson (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) #320 , memorandum in support of motion #321 (Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 1, 2018 Filing 323 NOTICE of Motion by Jerome Steven Fortinsky for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #320 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 1, 2018 Filing 322 DECLARATION of Jerome S. Fortinsky regarding motion for miscellaneous relief #320 to Exclude the Report and Testimony of M. Todd Henderson (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 1, 2018 Filing 321 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #320 to Exclude the Report and Testimony of M. Todd Henderson (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) (Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 1, 2018 Filing 320 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd.to Exclude the Report and Testimony of M. Todd Henderson (Redacted Version) (Motion to File Unredacted Version Under Seal Pending) (Fortinsky, Jerome)
January 24, 2018 Filing 319 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file excess pages #317 is granted. Defendant Mizuho Bank may file an oversized brief in response to Plaintiff's class certification motion #294 . Motion hearing set for 1/29/2018 #318 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 23, 2018 Filing 318 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #317 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/29/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
January 23, 2018 Filing 317 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for leave to file excess pages (Frye, Jason)
January 17, 2018 Filing 316 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend expert deposition deadline #314 is granted. The time to depose expert witness Hirotada Inoshita is extended to 2/6/2018. Motion hearing set for 1/22/2018 #315 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 16, 2018 Filing 315 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of extension of time #314 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/22/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
January 16, 2018 Filing 314 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Motto for extension of time to complete expert depositions (Thomassen, Benjamin)
December 12, 2017 Filing 313 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 3/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The parties reported on the progress of discovery.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 11, 2017 Filing 312 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/11/2017.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
December 11, 2017 Filing 311 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant Mizuho Bank's reconsideration motion #282 is granted. The claims of Plaintiffs Joseph Lack and Gregory Pearce against Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. are dismissed for want of personal jurisdiction. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 15, 2017 Filing 310 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #308 is granted. Attorney Nina Eisenberg terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs. Motion hearing set for 11/20/2017 #309 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 14, 2017 Filing 309 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #308 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/20/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
November 14, 2017 Filing 308 MOTION by Attorney Nina Eisenberg to withdraw as attorney for Gregory Greene. No party information provided (Thomassen, Benjamin)
October 31, 2017 Filing 307 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce to supplement #305 (Lawson, John)
October 26, 2017 Filing 306 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the Defendant, Attorney Daniel Joseph Saval is terminated as counsel for Defendant Mt. Gox KK.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 24, 2017 Filing 305 SUPPLEMENT to memorandum in support of motion #283 for Partial Reconsideration of Mizuho Bank, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in Light of New and Controlling Supreme Court Precedent (Frye, Jason)
October 17, 2017 Filing 304 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing held and continued to 12/12/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (lcw, )
October 16, 2017 Filing 303 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing on Plaintiff's motion to certify class #294 set for 10/18/2017 #299 is stricken and re-set to 10/17/2017 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (lcw, )
October 16, 2017 Filing 302 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: The Clerk is directed to terminate docket #296 as a motion because the filing is a memorandum, not a motion. Plaintiff's motion to seal document #297 and motion for leave to file excess pages #298 are granted. Motion hearing dates set for 10/18/2017 #300 and #301 are stricken. Mailed notice (lcw, )
October 13, 2017 Filing 301 NOTICE of Motion by Jay Edelson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #298 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/18/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Edelson, Jay)
October 13, 2017 Filing 300 NOTICE of Motion by Jay Edelson for presentment of motion to seal document #297 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/18/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Edelson, Jay)
October 13, 2017 Filing 299 NOTICE of Motion by Jay Edelson for presentment of motion to certify class #294 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/18/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Edelson, Jay)
October 13, 2017 Filing 298 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce for leave to file excess pages in support of class certification (Edelson, Jay)
October 13, 2017 Filing 297 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce to seal document SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce to certify class #296 (Edelson, Jay)
October 13, 2017 Filing 296 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce to certify class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Edelson, Jay)
October 13, 2017 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM by Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce in support of motion to certify class #294 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit)(Edelson, Jay)
October 13, 2017 Filing 294 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce to certify class Responses due by 12/1/2017 (Edelson, Jay)
October 4, 2017 Filing 293 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #292 sent to Attorney Daniel Joseph Saval returned as: Unknown address error. The Clerk telephoned Daniel Joseph Saval, no contact made. Mailed to attorney Daniel Joseph Saval a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
October 4, 2017 Filing 292 REPLY by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to memorandum in opposition to motion #291 (Frye, Jason)
September 20, 2017 Filing 291 MEMORANDUM by Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce in Opposition to motion for reconsideration #282 (Lawson, John)
September 14, 2017 Filing 290 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Order entered 9/13/2017 #288 is amended. The time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant Mizuho's motion for partial reconsideration is extended to 9/20/2017; reply due by 10/4/2017. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 14, 2017 Filing 289 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties, status hearing set for 10/13/2017 #288 is stricken and re-set for 10/17/2017 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 13, 2017 Filing 288 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend briefing schedule on Mizuho Bank's motion for partial reconsideration #286 is granted. The time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant Mizuho's motion for partial reconsideration is extended to 9/27/2017; reply due by 10/4/2017. Status hearing set for 10/2/2017 #285 is stricken and re-set for 10/13/2017 at 10:30 a.m. Motion hearing set for 9/18/2017 #287 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 12, 2017 Filing 287 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for reconsideration #282 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/18/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 12, 2017 Filing 286 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for reconsideration #282 [Unopposed Motion] (Thomassen, Benjamin)
August 16, 2017 Filing 285 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 10/2/2017 at 9:15 a.m. The 8/29/2017 motion hearing #284 is stricken. Motion hearing held. Defendant's Mizuho Bank's motion for partial reconsideration on personal jurisdiction #282 is entered and continued. Plaintiff's response due by 9/13/2017; reply due by 9/27/2017. The schedule is amended as follows. Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 10/2/2017. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 11/16/2017. Expert depositions shall be completed by 1/16/2018.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 15, 2017 Filing 284 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion for reconsideration #282 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/29/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
August 15, 2017 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in support of motion for reconsideration #282 (Frye, Jason)
August 15, 2017 Filing 282 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order #200 (Frye, Jason)
August 2, 2017 Filing 281 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce by Eve -Lynn J. Rapp (Rapp, Eve -Lynn)
July 25, 2017 Filing 280 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 8/16/2017 at 9:15 a.m. The parties reported on the progress of discovery. At the next status hearing, the court will address whether a brief extension of the schedule is warranted. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant Mizuho's motion for sanctions #268 #272 is denied. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 20, 2017 Filing 279 REPLY by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to response in opposition to motion, #276 (REDACTED VERSION) (Frye, Jason)
July 18, 2017 Filing 278 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties, hearing on Defendant Mizuho Bank's motions for sanctions #268 #272 set for 7/20/2017 #271 #275 is stricken and re-set for 7/25/2017 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 17, 2017 Filing 277 DECLARATION of Jay Edelson regarding response in opposition to motion, #276 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Response to Mizuho R. 11 Motion, #2 Exhibit B - Mizuho Draft Memo. in Support of R. 11 Motion, #3 Exhibit C - Oct. 18, 2016 Email from Mark Karpeles, #4 Exhibit D - Mar. 11, 2015 Email to J. Resetarits, #5 Exhibit E - Mar. 24, 2015 Email to J. Resetarits)(Edelson, Jay)
July 17, 2017 Filing 276 RESPONSE by Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearcein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for sanctions REDACTED DEFENDANT MIZUHO BANK, LTD.S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 11 #268 (Edelson, Jay)
July 7, 2017 Filing 275 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Stuart Quinn for presentment of Sealed motion #272 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/20/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Quinn, Jonathan)
July 7, 2017 Filing 274 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. DEFENDANT MIZUHO BANK, LTD.S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 11 (Quinn, Jonathan)
July 7, 2017 Filing 273 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GRUNFELD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Quinn, Jonathan)
July 7, 2017 Filing 272 SEALED MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. Motion For Sanctions Under Rule 11 (Quinn, Jonathan)
July 7, 2017 Filing 271 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Stuart Quinn for presentment of motion for sanctions #268 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/20/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Quinn, Jonathan)
July 7, 2017 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in support of motion for sanctions #268 REDACTED DEFENDANT MIZUHO BANK, LTD.S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 11 (Quinn, Jonathan)
July 7, 2017 Filing 269 DECLARATION of DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GRUNFELD regarding motion for sanctions #268 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Quinn, Jonathan)
July 7, 2017 Filing 268 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for sanctions REDACTED DEFENDANT MIZUHO BANK, LTD.S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 11 (Quinn, Jonathan)
May 23, 2017 Filing 267 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/25/2017 at 9:15 a.m. The parties reported on the progress of discovery. Plaintiffs shall produce their privilege log by 6/20/2017.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 266 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce by Nina Eisenberg (Eisenberg, Nina)
May 10, 2017 Filing 265 CERTIFICATE of Service of Mizuhos Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint and Crossclaims Against Mark Karpeles (Frye, Jason)
May 9, 2017 Filing 264 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to approve alternative service on Defendant Mark Karpeles #260 is granted. Pursuant to Civil Rule 4(f)(3), Defendant Mizuho Bank may serve its cross-claims on Defendant Mark Karpeles via his personal email address (magicaltux@gmail.com), and also via certified mail and email on his former counsel, Richard Douglass, Novack and Macey, LLP, 100 North Riverside Plaza, Suite 1500, Chicago, IL 60606. Attorney Douglass is directed to forward the physical and electronic copies of the cross-claims to Karpeles at his last known physical and email addresses. Motion hearing set for 5/11/2017 #261 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2017: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (jlj, ). (jlj, ).
May 2, 2017 Filing 263 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #260 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/11/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
May 2, 2017 Filing 262 DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Resetarits regarding memorandum in support of motion #261 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Frye, Jason)
May 2, 2017 Filing 261 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd.(a Japanese financial institution) in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #260 (Frye, Jason)
May 2, 2017 Filing 260 MOTION by Cross Claimant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to Approve Alternative Service on Defendant Mark Karpeles (Frye, Jason)
April 10, 2017 Filing 259 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to have information redacted from the docket #256 is granted. The Clerk is directed to place Dkt. 90 under seal. Claimant Khoury is directed to file a redacted version of his claim. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 7, 2017 Filing 258 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #254 is granted. Attorneys David Bradford and Paul B. Rietema are terminated as counsel for Defendant Jed McCaleb. The Clerk shall enter a pro se appearance for Defendant McCaleb, 601 S. Van Ness #2, San Francisco, California, 94110. Motion hearing set for 4/10/2017 #255 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 4, 2017 Filing 257 PERSONAL Identifiers in Paper Filings re SEALED MOTION by Claimant Inaam Khoury #256 (nsf, )
April 4, 2017 Filing 256 SEALED MOTION by Claimant Inaam Khoury to have some information redacted from the public record. (Exhibits) (nsf, )
April 4, 2017 Filing 255 NOTICE of Motion by Paul Benjamin Rietema for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #254 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/10/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Rietema, Paul)
April 4, 2017 Filing 254 MOTION by Attorney DAVID J. BRADFORD and PAUL B. RIETEMA to withdraw as attorney for Jed Mccaleb. New address information: Jed Mccaleb 601 S. Van Ness #2, San Francisco, California, 94110 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rietema, Paul)
March 24, 2017 Filing 253 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #251 is granted. Attorney Alicia Hwang is terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs. Motion hearing set for 3/28/2017 #252 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 23, 2017 Filing 252 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #251 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/28/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 23, 2017 Filing 251 MOTION by Attorney Alicia Hwang to withdraw as attorney for Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce. No party information provided (Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 22, 2017 Filing 249 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #247 is denied without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.17. Motion hearing set for 3/27/2017 #248 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 21, 2017 Filing 250 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #248 , #247 , #246 sent to Attorney Alicia Elaine Hwang returned as: Unknown Address. Mailed to attorney Alicia Elaine Hwang a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
March 21, 2017 Filing 248 NOTICE of Motion by Paul Benjamin Rietema for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #247 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/27/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Rietema, Paul)
March 21, 2017 Filing 247 MOTION by Attorney David J. Bradford and Paul B. Rietema to withdraw as attorney for Jed Mccaleb. No party information provided (Rietema, Paul)
March 21, 2017 Filing 246 ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd.(a Japanese financial institution) against Mark Karpeles . by Mizuho Bank, Ltd.(a Japanese financial institution)(Frye, Jason)
March 7, 2017 Filing 245 Fourth AMENDED complaint by Joseph Lack, Gregory Greene, Anthony Motto, Gregory Pearce against Mark Karpeles, Mizuho Bank, Ltd. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 6, 2017 Filing 244 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant Mizuho has informed Chambers that it does not oppose Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend third amended class action complaint #242 which is granted. Plaintiffs shall file their fourth amended complaint as a separate docket entry. Motion hearing set for 3/9/2017 #243 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 24, 2017 Filing 243 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion to amend/correct,, motion for relief, #242 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/9/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 24, 2017 Filing 242 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto to amend/correct amended complaint #205 [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Third Amended Complaint] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
February 24, 2017 Filing 241 NOTICE by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. re amended answer to complaint, crossclaim #240 pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) (Frye, Jason)
February 24, 2017 Filing 240 AMENDED Answer by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Third amended complaint #205 , CROSSCLAIM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. against Mark Karpeles . (Frye, Jason)
February 16, 2017 Filing 239 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing held on 2/16/2017. The parties reported on the progress of discovery. Status hearing set for 5/23/2017 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice lcw, )
November 16, 2016 Filing 238 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 2/16/2017 at 9:15 a.m. The parties reported on the progress of discovery.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 15, 2016 Filing 237 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 11/16/2016 at 9:00 a.m. #231 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 30, 2016 Filing 236 ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. against Mark Karpeles . by Mizuho Bank, Ltd.(Frye, Jason)
September 21, 2016 Filing 235 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' renewed motion to approve alternative service on Defendant Mark Karpeles #232 is granted. Defendant Mark Karpeles has been properly served.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 15, 2016 Filing 234 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Plaintiffs' renewed motion to approve alternative service on Defendant Karpeles #232 set for 9/21/2016 at 9:00 a.m. #233 is re-set for 9:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 13, 2016 Filing 233 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #232 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/21/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
September 13, 2016 Filing 232 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto Renewed Motion to Approve Alternative Service on Defendant Mark Karpeles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Benjamin S. Thomassen)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
August 30, 2016 Filing 231 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 11/16/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Fact discovery shall be completed by 8/31/2017. Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 9/15/2017. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures and rebuttal expert reports shall be served by 11/1/2017. Expert depositions shall be completed by 12/15/2017. Plaintiff's motion for class certification shall be filed by 12/15/2017; Defendant's response due by 2/1/2018; reply due by 3/1/2018. Motions to amend the pleadings or add new parties shall be filed by 2/24/2017. Because their original motion #54 was terminated for reasons not apparent on the record, and because there may be additional facts that bear on the motion, Plaintiffs have until 9/13/2016 to file a renewed motion to approve service on Defendant Karpeles by alternative means. See 1/12/2015 Order #129 . The time for Defendant Mizuho to answer the surviving portions of the operative complaint is extended to 9/30/2016. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 26, 2016 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/26/2016.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
August 26, 2016 Filing 229 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant Mizuho's motion to dismiss #172 is granted in part and denied in part. Count IV (tortious interference with contract) is dismissed as to Plaintiff Greene, and Count VII (accounting) is dismissed as to all Plaintiffs; the motion otherwise is denied. Defendant Mizuho shall answer the surviving portions of the operative complaint #205 by 9/16/2016.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 23, 2016 Filing 228 STATUS Report [Joint Status Report] by Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto (Thomassen, Benjamin)
July 21, 2016 Filing 227 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 8/30/2016 at 9:15 a.m. The parties shall submit a joint status report with report with a proposed schedule by 8/23/2016.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 24, 2016 Filing 226 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 6/29/2016 #225 is stricken and re-set for 7/21/2016 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 15, 2016 Filing 225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Due to the court's trial schedule, status hearing set for 6/16/2016 #223 is stricken and re-set for 6/29/2016 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 10, 2016 Filing 224 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto to memorandum in support of motion #220 (Lawson, John)
June 2, 2016 Filing 223 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time #221 is granted. The time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant Mizuho's supplemental brief #220 is extended to 6/10/2016. Motion hearing set for 6/7/2016 #222 is stricken. Status hearing set for 6/7/2016 #212 is stricken and re-set for 6/16/2016 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 1, 2016 Filing 222 NOTICE of Motion by John Aaron Lawson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief, #221 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/7/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Lawson, John)
June 1, 2016 Filing 221 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto for extension of time to file response/reply as to order on motion for leave to file,, terminate hearings, #219 (Lawson, John)
May 25, 2016 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #172 or Alternatively for Forum Non Conveniens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Frye, Jason)
May 25, 2016 Filing 219 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant's motion for leave to file supplemental brief instanter #217 is granted. Defendant Mizuho shall file is supplemental memorandum as a separate docket entry. Motion hearing set for 5/31/2016 #218 is stricken. If Plaintiffs wish to respond to the supplemental memorandum, they should do so by 6/2/2016.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 24, 2016 Filing 218 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion for leave to file, #217 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/31/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
May 24, 2016 Filing 217 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for leave to file Supplemental Memorandum Of Law Instanter In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss The Second Amended Class Action Complaint For Failure To State A Claim Or Alternatively For Forum Non Conveniens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frye, Jason)
May 5, 2016 Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #214 is granted. Attorney Alexander T.H. Nguyen terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs. Motion hearing set for 5/10/2016 #215 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 4, 2016 Filing 215 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #214 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
May 4, 2016 Filing 214 MOTION by Attorney Alexander T.H. Nguyen to withdraw as attorney for Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack, Anthony Motto. No party information provided (Thomassen, Benjamin)
April 27, 2016 Filing 213 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #212 sent to Attorney Alexander T.H. Nguyen returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Alexander T.H. Nguyen a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
April 27, 2016 Filing 212 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant Mizuho's motion for certification for interlocutory appeal #208 is denied. Status hearing set for 6/7/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (meg, )
April 22, 2016 Filing 211 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing set for 4/27/2016 at 9:00 a.m. #209 is re-set for 10:30 a.m. Status hearing set for 4/27/2016 at 10:15 a.m. #204 is re-set for 10:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. The court will have questions regarding the pending motion to dismiss #172 .Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 21, 2016 Filing 210 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in support of motion for certificate of appealability #208 for interlocutory appeal (Frye, Jason)
April 21, 2016 Filing 209 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion for certificate of appealability #208 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/27/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
April 21, 2016 Filing 208 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for certificate of appealability for interlocutory appeal (Frye, Jason)
April 20, 2016 Filing 207 REPLY by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to memorandum in support of motion #183 , response in opposition to motion #197 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #172 (Frye, Jason)
April 5, 2016 Filing 206 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Because putative class counsel filed a third amended complaint #205 that names as a putative class representative an Illinois resident who is alleged to be a member of the Deposit Subclass, this case will not be transferred to the Central District of California.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 4, 2016 Filing 205 THIRD AMENDED complaint by Joseph Lack, Gregory Greene, Anthony Motto against Mark Karpeles, Mizuho Bank, Ltd. (Hwang, Alicia)
April 4, 2016 Filing 204 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 4/27/2016 at 9:30 a.m. #203 is re-set for 10:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 29, 2016 Filing 203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Unopposed motion for enlargement of time to reply to Plaintiffs' opposition #201 is granted. The time for Defendant Mizuho to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss #172 is extended to 4/20/2016. Motion hearing set for 4/4/2016 #202 is stricken. Status hearing set for 4/13/2016 #193 is stricken and re-set for 4/27/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Given the parties' agreement regarding discovery at this point #194 , Defendant Mizuho's motion to stay discovery #174 is denied as moot.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 28, 2016 Filing 202 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #201 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/4/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
March 28, 2016 Filing 201 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for extension of time to file response/reply as to response in opposition to motion #197 of Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Frye, Jason)
March 14, 2016 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/14/2016.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
March 14, 2016 Filing 199 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant Mizuho's motion to dismiss for want of personal jurisdiction #148 is denied, on the condition that putative class counsel file by 4/4/2016 a third amended complaint naming as a putative class representative an Illinois resident who is a member of the Deposit Subclass. If counsel fails to do so, this case will be transferred to the Central District of California. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 12, 2016 Filing 198 NOTICE by Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack re response in opposition to motion #197 CORRECTED Exhibit A - Hwang Declaration (Hwang, Alicia)
March 11, 2016 Filing 197 RESPONSE by Gregory Greene, Joseph Lackin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMor Alternatively on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds #172 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Hwang Declaration)(Hwang, Alicia)
March 10, 2016 Filing 196 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Joint motion for extension of time #194 is granted. The time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) motion #172 is extended to 3/11/2016; reply due by 4/8/2016.Plaintiffs' motion to compel #180 is withdrawn without prejudice to renewal. Motion hearing set for 3/15/2016 #195 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 9, 2016 Filing 195 NOTICE of Motion by Alicia Elaine Hwang for presentment of extension of time #194 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/15/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Hwang, Alicia)
March 9, 2016 Filing 194 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for extension of time and to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel [Joint] (Hwang, Alicia)
February 18, 2016 Filing 193 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Joint motion to extend deadlines #191 is granted. The schedule is amended as follows. Plaintiffs shall file their supplemental memorandum in support of their motion to compel #180 by 3/9/2016. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss #172 by 3/9/2016. Defendant Mizuho shall reply in support of its motion to dismiss by 4/4/2016. Status hearing set for 3/3/2016 #185 is stricken and re-set for 4/13/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing set for 2/23/2016 #192 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 17, 2016 Filing 192 NOTICE of Motion by Ari Jonathan Scharg for presentment of extension of time #191 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/23/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Scharg, Ari)
February 17, 2016 Filing 191 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for extension of time Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines (Scharg, Ari)
February 15, 2016 Filing 190 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack by John Aaron Lawson (Lawson, John)
February 12, 2016 Filing 189 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #148 addressing recent additional authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frye, Jason)
February 12, 2016 Filing 188 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant Mizuho Bank Ltd.'s motion for leave to file supplemental brief instanter to address recent additional authority in support of its motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction #186 is granted. Defendant Mizuho shall file its supplemental brief as a separate docket entry. Motion hearing set for 2/17/2016 #187 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 11, 2016 Filing 187 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion for leave to file, #186 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/17/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
February 11, 2016 Filing 186 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for leave to file supplemental brief instanter to address recent additional authority in support of its motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Frye, Jason)
February 9, 2016 Filing 185 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 3/3/2016 at 9:15 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendant Mizuho's motion to dismiss #172 and Plaintiffs' motion to compel #180 are entered and continued. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant Mizhuo's motion to stay discovery #174 is granted in part and entered and continued in part; discovery is stayed through 3/3/2016. Defendant Mizuho's agreed motion for leave to file oversize brief and to enter proposed briefing schedule #176 is granted. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss #172 by 2/19/2016; reply due by 3/14/2016. Plaintiffs shall file their supplemental memorandum in support of the motion to compel #180 or response to the motion to stay #174 by 2/17/2016.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 29, 2016 Filing 184 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Due to the court's trial schedule, hearings set for 2/2/2016 #171 , #173 , #175 , #177 , and #180 are stricken and re-set for 2/9/2016 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 29, 2016 Filing 183 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #172 or Alternatively on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Frye, Jason)
January 29, 2016 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in support of motion to stay #174 discovery (Frye, Jason)
January 27, 2016 Filing 181 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander T.H. Nguyen for presentment of motion to compel #180 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/2/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Nguyen, Alexander)
January 27, 2016 Filing 180 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Greene to compel Defendant Mizuho Bank Ltd. to Respond to Discovery (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alexander T.H. Nguyen with Exhibits)(Nguyen, Alexander)
January 26, 2016 Filing 179 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #174 , #178 , #176 , #173 , #177 , #172 , #175 sent to Attorney Michael Eurich meurich@chuhak.com returned as: Unknown Address Error. The Clerk mailed to attorney Michael Eurich Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (mr, )
January 26, 2016 Filing 178 PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/26/2016.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
January 26, 2016 Filing 177 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion for leave to file #176 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/2/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
January 26, 2016 Filing 176 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for leave to file oversize brief and to enter proposed briefing schedule (Frye, Jason)
January 26, 2016 Filing 175 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion to stay #174 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/2/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
January 26, 2016 Filing 174 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to stay discovery (Frye, Jason)
January 26, 2016 Filing 173 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #172 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/2/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
January 26, 2016 Filing 172 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMor Alternatively on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds (Frye, Jason)
January 11, 2016 Filing 171 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties, status hearing set for 1/21/2016 #170 is stricken and re-set for 2/2/2016 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 11, 2015 Filing 170 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 12/15/2015 #166 is stricken and re-set to 1/21/2016 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 169 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant Mizuho Bank Ltd.'s motion to clarify 11/16/2015 minute order #167 is denied as to clarification and denied without prejudice as to a stay of discovery. The 11/16/2015 order #166 is sufficiently clear that no clarification is necessary. As to the requested stay of discovery, the strong presumption, absent agreement of the parties or the presence of particular claims (e.g., those governed by 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3)(B)), is that discovery is not stayed during the pendency of a Rule 12(b)(6) motion. Defendant Mizuho's motion does not attempt to explain how the presumption has been rebutted under the facts and circumstances of this particular case. Defendant Mizuho may renew its motion to stay at any time; if it does so, it should consider simultaneously filing its Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss, so the court could make an informed (though necessarily tentative) judgment as to the likelihood of the motion's being granted. Motion hearing set for 12/7/2015 #168 is stricken.Mailed notice (jlj, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 168 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion to clarify #167 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/7/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
December 1, 2015 Filing 167 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to clarify November 16, 2015 Minute Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frye, Jason)
November 16, 2015 Filing 166 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 11/18/2015 #165 is stricken and re-set for 12/15/2015 at 9:30 a.m. The parties should operate on the assumption that the motion to dismiss #148 will be denied. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 12/18/2015. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 15, 2015 Filing 165 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 10/19/2015 #163 is stricken and re-set for 11/18/2015 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 164 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Application to appear pro hac vice #162 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 12, 2015 Filing 163 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 9/16/2015 #159 is stricken and re-set for 10/19/2015 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 11, 2015 Filing 162 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11075181. on behalf of Gregory Greene and Joseph Lack (Nguyen, Alexander) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 9/11/2015, notated amended filing) (sxn, ).
September 11, 2015 Filing 161 PAYMENT by Gregory Greene of Pro Hac Fee $ 50. (Nguyen, Alexander)
September 11, 2015 Filing 160 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50. on behalf of Gregory Greene and Joseph Lack (Nguyen, Alexander)
August 4, 2015 Filing 159 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request, status hearing set for 9/15/2015 #158 is stricken and re-set for 9/16/2015 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 3, 2015 Filing 158 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 9/15/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Oral argument held on Defendant Mizuho's motion to dismiss #148 .Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 29, 2015 Filing 157 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: At the 8/3/2015 hearing #156 , the court may have a limited number of questions regarding Defendant Mizuho Bank's pending motion to dismiss #148 . Out-of-town counsel is welcome to participate by telephone so long as advance arrangements are made with the Courtroom Deputy.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 15, 2015 Filing 156 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties', status hearing set for 7/22/2015 #147 is stricken and re-set for 8/3/2015 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 1, 2015 Filing 155 REPLY by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to memorandum in support of motion, #149 , response in opposition to motion, #151 , notice of motion #153 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #148 Reply Memorandum of Law of Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Quinn, Jonathan)
June 18, 2015 Filing 154 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant Mizuho Bank's motion for extension of time to reply to Plaintiffs' opposition #152 is granted. The time for Defendant Mizuho Bank to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss is extended to 7/1/2015. Motion hearing set for 6/24/2015 #153 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 18, 2015 Filing 153 NOTICE of Motion by Jason A. Frye for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #152 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/24/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Frye, Jason)
June 18, 2015 Filing 152 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. for extension of time to file response/reply as to response in opposition to motion, #151 (Frye, Jason)
June 11, 2015 Filing 151 RESPONSE by Gregory Greene, Joseph Lackin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #148 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Scharg, Ari)
May 19, 2015 Filing 150 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. by Jason A. Frye (Frye, Jason)
May 14, 2015 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #148 Memorandum of Law of Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Yasuo Imaizumi)(Quinn, Jonathan)
May 14, 2015 Filing 148 MOTION by Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Quinn, Jonathan)
April 17, 2015 Filing 146 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Joseph Lack, Gregory Greene against Mark Karpeles, Mizuho Bank, Ltd. (Scharg, Ari)
April 16, 2015 Filing 147 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/22/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs motion for leave to amend the pleadings #143 is granted. Plaintiffs shall file the second amended complaint as a separate docket entry. Plaintiffs' claims against MtGox Inc., Mt.Gox KK, Tibanne KK, Mt. Gox North America, Inc., Gonzague Gay-Bouchery, Jed McCaleb, and John Doe Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate those parties as party defendants. Defendants Mizuho Bank and Mark Karpeles shall answer or otherwise plead to the second amended complaint by 5/14/2015. If either defendant files a motion to dismiss, Plaintiff's response is due by 6/11/2015, and Defendant's reply is due by 6/25/2015.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 15, 2015 Filing 145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status and motion hearings scheduled for 4/16/2015 at 9:00 a.m. #142 #144 are re-set for 4/16/2015 at 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 9, 2015 Filing 144 NOTICE of Motion by Ari Jonathan Scharg for presentment of motion for leave to file #143 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/16/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Scharg, Ari)
April 9, 2015 Filing 143 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Scharg, Ari)
April 3, 2015 Filing 142 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #140 is granted. The time for Plaintiffs to file a second amended complaint is extended to 4/9/2015. The 4/6/2015 motion hearing #141 is stricken. The 4/6/2015 status hearing #139 is stricken and re-set for 4/16/2015 at 9:00 a.m. If any party would like an earlier status hearing, that party should contact the Courtroom Deputy. Mailed notice (lcw, )
March 25, 2015 Filing 141 NOTICE of Motion by Alicia Elaine Hwang for presentment of extension of time #140 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/6/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Hwang, Alicia)
March 25, 2015 Filing 140 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for extension of time to File Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint (Hwang, Alicia)
March 13, 2015 Filing 139 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #137 is granted. By agreement of the parties, the time for Plaintiffs to move for leave to file a second amended complaint is extended to 3/26/2015. The 3/18/2015 motion hearing #138 is stricken. The 3/18/2015 status hearing #136 is stricken and re-set for 4/6/2015 at 9:00 a.m. If any party would like an earlier status hearing, that party should contact the Courtroom Deputy. Mailed notice (lcw, )
March 12, 2015 Filing 138 NOTICE of Motion by Alicia Elaine Hwang for presentment of extension of time #137 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/18/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Hwang, Alicia)
March 12, 2015 Filing 137 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for extension of time for Plaintiffs to File Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint (Hwang, Alicia)
February 20, 2015 Filing 136 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Minute entry #135 is amended to reflect: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #133 is granted. By agreement of the parties, the time for Plaintiffs to move for leave to file a second amended complaint is extended to 3/12/2015. The 2/23/2015 motion hearing #134 is stricken. The 2/26/2015 status hearing #132 is stricken and re-set for 3/18/2015 at 9:00 a.m. If any party would like an earlier status hearing, that party should contact the Courtroom Deputy. Mailed notice (lcw, )
February 20, 2015 Filing 135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #133 is granted. By agreement of the parties, the time for Plaintiffs to move for leave to file a second amended complaint is extended to 3/12/2015. The 2/23/2015 motion hearing #134 is stricken. The 2/26/2015 status hearing #132 is stricken and re-set for 3/16/2015 at 9:00 a.m. If any party would like an earlier status hearing, that party should contact the Courtroom Deputy. Mailed notice (lcw, )
February 19, 2015 Filing 134 NOTICE of Motion by Alicia Elaine Hwang for presentment of extension of time #133 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/23/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Hwang, Alicia)
February 19, 2015 Filing 133 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for extension of time for Plaintiffs to File Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint (Hwang, Alicia)
February 6, 2015 Filing 132 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: By agreement of the parties #130 , the time for Plaintiffs to move for leave to file a second amended complaint is extended to 2/19/2015. Any such motion shall be noticed for 2/26/2015. The 2/12/2015 status hearing #129 is stricken and re-set for 2/26/2015 at 9:00 a.m. For future reference, if the parties would like to amend the schedule, they should file and notice a motion (agreed or not) to amend the schedule rather than filing a stipulation. Mailed notice (lcw, )
February 6, 2015 Filing 131 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: The court received from bankruptcy counsel for Tibanne KK the attached order of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (lcw, )
February 4, 2015 Filing 130 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines [JOINT] (Hwang, Alicia)
January 12, 2015 Filing 129 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Order entered 1/8/2015 #128 is amended. Status hearing held and continued to 2/12/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #56 is withdrawn. For the reasons and with the qualifications stated on the record, counsel's motion to withdraw #121 is granted. Attorneys Eric Macey, Amanda Wolfman, and Richard Douglass are terminated as counsel for Defendants Tibanne KK and Mark Karpeles, effective 1/16/2015. Plaintiffs' motion to approve service #54 is entered and continued; for the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs shall serve the necessary papers on counsel for Defendants Tibanne KK and Mark Karpeles before 1/16/2015, with the understanding that if the motion to approve service #54 ultimately is denied, such service will be ineffective. For the reasons stated on the record, the class settlement and certification orders #94 #96 are vacated. The stay order #95 is vacated, except for the claims against the defendants now in bankruptcy proceedings. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file second amended complaint shall be filed by 2/5/2015 and noticed for 2/12/2015 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 8, 2015 Filing 128 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing held. Motion to approve service #54 is entered and continued. Motion for preliminary injunction #56 is withdrawn. Motion to withdraw as counsel #121 is granted. The withdrawal will be effective on 1/16/15. Plaintiff should serve any documentation on current counsel. Orders #94 and #96 granting class settlement are vacated. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file second amended complaint is due by 2/5/15 and to be noticed for 2/12/15 at 9:30 a.m. (lcw, )
January 6, 2015 Filing 127 NOTICE by Mark Karpeles, Tibanne KK Notice of Filing (Wolfman, Amanda)
January 5, 2015 Filing 126 STATUS Report [JOINT] by Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack (Scharg, Ari)
December 22, 2014 Filing 125 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Movants shall inform their clients that if they wish to oppose the motion to withdraw, they must file an opposition or appear (telephonically or in person) at the 1/8/2015 at 10:30 a.m. motion hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 22, 2014 Filing 124 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for defendants Mark Karpeles and Tibanne KK scheduled for 12/30/2014 #122 is stricken and re-set for 1/8/2015 at 10:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 19, 2014 Filing 123 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack by Ari Jonathan Scharg (Scharg, Ari)
December 19, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE of Motion by Amanda M.H. Wolfman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #121 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/30/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Wolfman, Amanda)
December 19, 2014 Filing 121 MOTION by counsel for Defendants Mark Karpeles, Tibanne KK to withdraw as attorney (Wolfman, Amanda)
December 10, 2014 Filing 120 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/8/2015 at 10:30 a.m. The parties reported that the premise underlying the proposed settlement has not panned out and that the litigation will have to proceed. The parties shall file a joint status report by 1/5/2015. If Defendants Karpeles or Tibanne KK would like to oppose their counsel's forthcoming motion for leave to withdraw, they must inform counsel and the court of such and also must either file a written opposition or appear in court (in person or telephonically) on the date the motion to withdraw is presented. Counsel for Karpeles and Tibanne KK shall send his clients a copy of this order and shall discuss with his clients whether they oppose the motion to withdraw.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 9, 2014 Filing 119 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the status hearing on 12/10/2014, the court will address the status of the preliminary injunction motion #56 .Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 9, 2014 Filing 118 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 12/10/2014 at 9:00 a.m. #113 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 2, 2014 Filing 117 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Application to appear pro hac vice #116 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 5, 2014 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10030828. (Jacobs, Ethan)
November 4, 2014 Filing 115 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:If any party believes that an earlier status hearing is warranted in light of the decision in the CoinLab case #114 or for any other reason, that party should contact the Courtroom Deputy. Otherwise, the 12/10/2014 status hearing #113 shall stand. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 29, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE by Mark Karpeles, Tibanne KK (Notice of Filing) (Wolfman, Amanda)
October 2, 2014 Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/10/2014 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 23, 2014 Filing 112 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion to certify class #2 is denied without prejudice as moot in light of the 5/9/2014 order #96 certifying a settlement class. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 21, 2014 Filing 111 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 10/2/2014 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 21, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE by Amanda M.H. Wolfman of Change of Address or Name (Wolfman, Amanda)
August 5, 2014 Filing 109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:If any party desires court action on the issue set forth in Plaintiff's 8/4/2014 status report #108 , that party should file a motion. Otherwise, the court will assume that no court action is desired or necessary. That said, the court expects that defendants in this case who also are defendants in related litigation, including No. 2:13-cv-777-MJP (W.D. Wash.), will inform the courts in the related litigation of any potentially relevant orders, including any TRO, entered in this case. Likewise, the court expects to be informed of any potentially relevant orders entered in the other litigation.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 4, 2014 Filing 108 STATUS Report Regarding Sale of.com Domain Names by Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Woodrow, Steven)
July 8, 2014 Filing 107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 8/21/2014 at 9:15 a.m. In light of the suggestion of bankruptcy #106 , this case is stayed as to Mt. Gox Co., Ltd., a/k/a MtGox KK, until further order of court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 7, 2014 Filing 106 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Notice of Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Recognizing Foreign Main Proceeding, #2 Exhibit B - Joint Proposed Stipulation and Order, #3 Exhibit C - Joint Proposed Stipulation and Order)(Tanenbaum, Brian)
July 1, 2014 Filing 105 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mt.Gox KK by Brian Ira Tanenbaum (Tanenbaum, Brian)
July 1, 2014 Filing 104 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mt.Gox KK by Brian Ira Tanenbaum (Tanenbaum, Brian)
June 9, 2014 Filing 103 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $50.00, receipt no. 0752-9554400, (Tanenbaum, Brian)
June 9, 2014 Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to substitute counsel #99 is granted. Attorneys Gamlen, Mitchell, and Murphy are terminated as counsel for Defendant Mt. Gox KK. Attorneys Molton and Tannenbaum may enter their appearance for Defendant Mt. Gox KK. Motion hearing scheduled for 7/1/2014 #98 is stricken. Application to appear pro hac vice #101 is granted. Attorney Daniel Joseph Saval added as counsel for Mt.Gox KK. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 6, 2014 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9554560. (Tanenbaum, Brian)
June 6, 2014 Filing 100 PAYMENT by Mt.Gox KK of Pro Hac Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9554400. (Tanenbaum, Brian)
June 6, 2014 Filing 99 MOTION by Defendant Mt.Gox KK to substitute attorney (Tanenbaum, Brian)
June 6, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE of Motion by Brian Ira Tanenbaum for presentment of before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/1/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Tanenbaum, Brian)
May 29, 2014 Filing 97 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing scheduled for 6/2/2014 #47 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 9, 2014 Filing 96 Preliminary Order approving class action settlement, certifying settlement class, approving procedure and form of notice, and scheduling final approval hearing Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/9/2014.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting stipulated motion to stay proceedings Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/9/2014.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
May 8, 2014 Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, stipulated motion to stay proceedings #88 , as amended in open court, is granted. Proceedings are stayed as to the claims against Defendants Karpeles, Tibanne KK and Mizuho Bank, Ltd. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary settlement approval #79 is granted. Enter order. The 5/13/2014 status hearing #86 is stricken and re-set for 7/8/2014 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 8, 2014 Filing 93 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Greene by Shannon Marie McNulty (McNulty, Shannon)
May 8, 2014 Filing 92 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Greene by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
May 7, 2014 Filing 91 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on stipulated motion to stay proceedings #88 and plaintiffs' motion for preliminary settlement approval #79 set for 5/8/2014 at 9:00 a.m. is re-set for 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 5, 2014 Filing 90 CLAIM by Inaam Khoury (mr, )
May 5, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion to stay #88 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/8/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
May 5, 2014 Filing 88 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack to stay STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (Thomassen, Benjamin)
May 5, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for settlement, #79 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/8/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
May 1, 2014 Filing 86 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file instanter an oversized motion #81 is granted. Plaintiffs motion for class certification and preliminary approval of a class settlement #79 is entered and continued. If Defendants Tibanne KK and Karpeles wish to oppose that motion, they should respond by 5/12/2014 at 5:00 p.m. Status hearing continued to 5/13/2014 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (meg, )
April 30, 2014 Filing 85 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Greene by Scott Bennett Kitei (Kitei, Scott)
April 30, 2014 Filing 84 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion Hearing regarding motion for settlement, #79 , motion for leave to file excess pages #81 set for 5/1/2014 at 9:00 a.m. is stricken and reset to 5/1/2014 at 10:00 a.m. (TIME CHANGE ONLY.) Mailed notice (meg, )
April 29, 2014 Filing 83 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant Gay-Bouchery's motion for an extension #75 is granted. The time for Defendant Gay-Bouchery to file his motion to dismiss and to respond to Plaintiff's motion for alternative service #54 is extended to 5/14/2014. The 4/30/2014 motion hearing #76 is stricken. Defendant Karpeles and Tibanne's motion for an extension #77 is granted. The time for Defendants Karpeles and Tibanne to file their motion to dismiss and to respond to Plaintiff's motion for alternative service #54 is extended to 5/12/2014. The 5/1/2014 motion hearing #78 is stricken. Mailed notice (meg, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #81 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/1/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
April 28, 2014 Filing 81 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for leave to file excess pages PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE INSTANTER AN OVERSIZED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL (Thomassen, Benjamin)
April 28, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for settlement, #79 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/1/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
April 28, 2014 Filing 79 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for settlement PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jay Edelson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Settlement Agreement)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
April 28, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Motion by Eric Neal Macey for presentment of extension of time, #77 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/1/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Macey, Eric)
April 28, 2014 Filing 77 MOTION by Defendants Mark Karpeles, Tibanne KK for extension of time Defendants Mark Karpeles' And Tibanne KK'S Agreed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Their Motion To Dismiss And Their Response To Plaintiff's Motion To Approve Service By Alternative Means (Macey, Eric)
April 25, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Fumagalli for presentment of extension of time #75 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/30/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Fumagalli, Daniel)
April 25, 2014 Filing 75 MOTION by Defendant Gonzague Gay-Bouchery for extension of time to file motion (Fumagalli, Daniel)
April 25, 2014 Filing 74 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: In Court hearing set for 5/1/2014 at 9:30 a.m. [ 63] is re-set for 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj)
April 22, 2014 Filing 73 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to quash #67 is withdrawn. Motion hearing scheduled for 4/23/2014 #68 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 21, 2014 Filing 72 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gonzague Gay-Bouchery by Michael Allen Eurich (Eurich, Michael)
April 21, 2014 Filing 70 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #65 is granted. The time for Defendant McCaleb to answer or otherwise plead to the amended complaint #37 is extended to 5/14/2014. Motion hearing scheduled for 4/21/2014 #66 is stricken.Mailed/Telephoned notice. (jlj, )
April 18, 2014 MOTION by Defendant Gonzague Gay-Bouchery for extension of time to answer requests (Omitted relief from Motion #67 ) (mr, )
April 18, 2014 Filing 69 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jed Mccaleb by Paul Benjamin Rietema (Rietema, Paul)
April 18, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Fumagalli for presentment of motion to quash #67 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/23/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Fumagalli, Daniel)
April 18, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION by Defendant Gonzague Gay-Bouchery to quash requests to admit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fumagalli, Daniel)
April 14, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #65 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Bradford, David)
April 14, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION by Defendant Jed Mccaleb for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (UNOPPOSED) (Bradford, David)
April 14, 2014 Filing 64 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jed Mccaleb by David J. Bradford (Bradford, David)
April 14, 2014 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. The 5/1/2014 status hearing #59 shall stand. Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion to approve service by alternative means #54 is entered and continued. Defendants Karpeles and Tibanne shall respond by 4/28/2014; Plaintiffs' reply due by 5/12/2014. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file instanter an oversized motion for preliminary injunction #60 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #56 is entered and continued until 5/1/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant Gay-Bouchery shall file a motion to dismiss by 4/28/2014; Plaintiffs' response due by 5/12/2014; reply due by 5/27/2014. Defendants noted the parties' two disputes regarding the terms of the interim preliminary injunction order.Mailed notice. (jlj)
April 14, 2014 Filing 62 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gonzague Gay-Bouchery by Daniel Joseph Fumagalli (Fumagalli, Daniel)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER entering Intermim Preliminary Injunction and setting hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/8/2014.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
April 8, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Lezell Woodrow for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #60 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/14/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Woodrow, Steven)
April 8, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for leave to file excess pages Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Instanter an Oversized Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Woodrow, Steven)
April 8, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Lezell Woodrow for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #56 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/14/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Woodrow, Steven)
April 8, 2014 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Steven Woodrow regarding motion for preliminary injunction #56 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Woodrow, Steven)
April 8, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for preliminary injunction (Woodrow, Steven)
April 8, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Lezell Woodrow for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #54 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/14/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Woodrow, Steven)
April 7, 2014 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 5/1/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion to extend temporary restraining order #49 is granted. Preliminary injunction order shall follow. Defendant Karpeles's and Tibanne KK's Rule 12(b)(2), (4), (5) motion shall be filed by 4/28/2014; response due by 5/12/2014; reply due by 5/27/2014.Mailed notice. (jlj)
April 7, 2014 Filing 54 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lackto Approve Service by Alternative Means Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and 4(h)(2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Woodrow, Steven)
April 4, 2014 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark Karpeles, Tibanne KK by Amanda Marie Hinkley (Hinkley, Amanda)
April 4, 2014 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark Karpeles, Tibanne KK by Eric Neal Macey (Macey, Eric)
April 4, 2014 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark Karpeles, Tibanne KK by Richard George Douglass (Douglass, Richard)
April 2, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Scott Thomassen for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #49 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Thomassen, Benjamin)
April 2, 2014 Filing 49 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gregory Greene, Joseph Lack for temporary restraining order Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. No. 33) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 31, 2014 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Mark Karpeles. (jp, )
March 28, 2014 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Mark Karpeles. (jp, )
March 27, 2014 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. by Mizuho Bank, Ltd. (Quinn, Jonathan)
March 27, 2014 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 4/7/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant Mizuho Bank shall answer or otherwise plead to the amended complaint by 5/23/2014. The parties who/that have appeared shall file an initial status report by 5/28/2014. In court status hearing scheduled for 6/2/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jlj)
March 27, 2014 Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. by Jeffrey Resetarits (Resetarits, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2014 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. by John A. Nathanson (Nathanson, John)
March 27, 2014 Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. by Jerome Steven Fortinsky (Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 27, 2014 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Applications to appear pro hac vice #39 , #40 and #41 are granted. Attorneys Jerome S. Fortinsky, John A. Nathanson and Jeffrey J. Resetarits added as counsel for Mizuho Bank, Ltd.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 25, 2014 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd. by Jonathan Stuart Quinn (Quinn, Jonathan)
March 25, 2014 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9324969. (Resetarits, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9324948. (Nathanson, John)
March 25, 2014 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9324929. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
March 20, 2014 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 3/27/2014 at 9:45 a.m. Oral motion to modify the temporary restraining order is granted. For the reasons stated on the record, the temporary restraining order #33 is extended until 4/8/2014 at 11:30 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, non-parties with the express written consent of Plaintiff's counsel are relieved from compliance with the temporary restraining order with respect to transactions of less than one bitcoin.Mailed notice. (jlj)
March 19, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jed Mccaleb (pg, )
March 18, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Gonzague Gay-Bouchery, Mt.Gox KK, Tibanne KK (jp, )
March 17, 2014 Filing 37 Corrected First AMENDED complaint by Joseph Lack, Gregory Greene against All Defendants (Woodrow, Steven)
March 17, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants MT. Gox North America, Inc., Jed Mccaleb, Mizuho Bank, Ltd. (jp, )
March 14, 2014 Filing 36 First AMENDED complaint by Gregory Greene against All Defendants (Woodrow, Steven)
March 13, 2014 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Greene by Benjamin Scott Thomassen (Thomassen, Benjamin)
March 13, 2014 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The expedited discovery permitted by the TRO shall include interrogatories and requests to admit. Mailed notice. (jlj)
March 12, 2014 BOND in the amount of $ $5,000.00 posted by Gregory Greene (jn, )
March 12, 2014 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Greene as to Mark Karpeles on 3/4/2014, answer due 3/25/2014; MtGox Inc. on 3/4/2014, answer due 3/25/2014. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 11, 2014 Filing 33 Enter Temporary Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/11/2014.Mailed notice.(jlj)
March 11, 2014 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #8 is granted in part and denied in part. As noted at the hearing, Plaintiff shall provide a draft TRO to the court's proposed order email box. The TRO shall expire on 3/25/2014 at 11:30 a.m. Status hearing set for 3/20/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall post bond in the amount of $5,000.00 to the Clerk of the Court by noon on 3/13/2014. Pursuant to the bankruptcy stay, this case is stayed as to Defendant Mt. Gox KK. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 11, 2014 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Applications to appear pro hac vice #23 and #25 are granted.Mailed notice. (jlj)
March 10, 2014 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Service by Steven Lezell Woodrow on behalf of Gregory Greene regarding declaration #21 , declaration #16 , declaration #17 , declaration #18 , declaration #19 , declaration #15 , declaration #20 (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Service by Steven Lezell Woodrow on behalf of Gregory Greene regarding declaration, #14 (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Steven L. Woodrow regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 in support of motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Dennis Ou regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 in support of motion. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9276544. (Mitchell, John)
March 10, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE by Mt.Gox KK of Order Entered on 3-10-14 by the US Bankruptcy Ct. for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-10-14 Order of US Bankruptcy Ct)(Murphy, John)
March 10, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9276404. (Gamlen, Tod)
March 10, 2014 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mt.Gox KK by John Michael Murphy (Murphy, John)
March 10, 2014 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Michael Yablon regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 in support of motion. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Jonathan Carmel regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 in support of motion. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Eric P. Amstutz regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 in support of motion. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Andrew Van Almen regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 in support of motion. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Joseph Lack regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 in support of motion. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Jeffrey C. Parker regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 in support of motion. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Dario Di Pardo regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 in support of motion. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 10, 2014 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Steven L. Woodrow regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 with respect to Notice of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order under Rule 65(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Woodrow, Steven)
March 5, 2014 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Greene by Jay Edelson (Edelson, Jay)
March 5, 2014 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion for leave to file over sized brief in support of plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #6 is granted. Motion hearing scheduled for 3/11/2014 #7 is stricken. Plaintiff's motion for class certification #2 is entered and continued. Hearing on motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #8 scheduled for 3/11/2014 at 9:00 a.m. #9 is re-set for 10:00 a.m. With respect to the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #8 , Plaintiff shall be prepared to address whether sufficient notice has been provided to Defendants and, if not, whether the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) are met.Mailed notice. (jlj)
March 4, 2014 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Steven L. Woodrow regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Woodrow, Steven)
March 4, 2014 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Gregory Greene regarding motion for temporary restraining order #8 (Woodrow, Steven)
March 4, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Lezell Woodrow for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #8 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/11/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Greene for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Woodrow, Steven)
March 4, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Lezell Woodrow for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #6 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/11/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Woodrow, Steven)
March 4, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Greene for leave to file excess pages in support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Woodrow, Steven)
March 4, 2014 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Greene by Alicia Elaine Hwang (Hwang, Alicia)
March 4, 2014 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Greene by Steven Lezell Woodrow (Woodrow, Steven)
February 28, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Mark Karpeles, Mt.Gox KK, MtGox Inc., Tibanne KK (pg, )
February 28, 2014 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (jn, )
February 27, 2014 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Greene by Christopher Lillard Dore (Dore, Christopher)
February 27, 2014 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Greene to certify class (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christopher L. Dore)(Dore, Christopher)
February 27, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gregory Greene; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9243978. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dore, Christopher)
February 27, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gregory Greene; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9243978. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dore, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Karpeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Pearce
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Represented By: Eve -Lynn J. Rapp
Represented By: Nina Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lack
Represented By: Alexander T.H. Nguyen
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Represented By: Steven Lezell Woodrow
Represented By: John Aaron Lawson
Represented By: Eve -Lynn J. Rapp
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Alicia Elaine Hwang
Represented By: Nina Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Motto
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Represented By: Eve -Lynn J. Rapp
Represented By: Alicia Elaine Hwang
Represented By: Nina Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Greene
Represented By: Alexander T.H. Nguyen
Represented By: Shannon Marie McNulty
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Represented By: Steven Lezell Woodrow
Represented By: John Aaron Lawson
Represented By: Eve -Lynn J. Rapp
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Alicia Elaine Hwang
Represented By: Nina Eisenberg
Represented By: Christopher Lillard Dore
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Scott Bennett Kitei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzague Gay-Bouchery
Represented By: Michael Allen Eurich
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Fumagalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT. Gox North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Karpeles
Represented By: Matthew J. Schmidt
Represented By: Richard George Douglass
Represented By: Bevin Megan Brennan
Represented By: Amanda M.H. Wolfman
Represented By: Eric Neal Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MtGox Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Bank, Ltd.
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey Resetarits
Represented By: John A. Nathanson
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Jason A. Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tibanne KK
Represented By: Richard George Douglass
Represented By: Amanda M.H. Wolfman
Represented By: Eric Neal Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed Mccaleb
Represented By: Ethan Jacobs
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Represented By: David J. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt.Gox KK
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Saval
Represented By: Brian Ira Tanenbaum
Represented By: John Michael Murphy
Represented By: Tod L. Gamlen
Represented By: David J. Molton
Represented By: John Eugene Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Inaam Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?