City of Chicago v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al.
Plaintiff: City of Chicago
Defendant: SpecGX, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Endo Health Solutions, DEPOMED, INC., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. and Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Petitioner: AbbVie Inc.
Respondent: Linda Singer, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Illinois Department of Public Health - NonParty Subpoena Recipient
Intervenor: USA Today, Los Angeles Times and Chicago Tribune Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Cook County Illinois Medical Examiner
Case Number: 1:2014cv04361
Filed: June 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: Jeffrey Cole
2 Judge: Beth W Jantz
3 Judge: Young B Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 ORDER Dismissing With Prejudice Claims Against Teva And Allegan Defendants Pursuant To Settlement Agreements. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/22/2023. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing held. Plaintiff is directed to submit an updated proposed order regarding the Defendants discussed on the record. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1309 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Zac Ciullo (Ciullo, Zac)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 STATUS Report by City of Chicago (Elgersma, Kara)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing set for 9/14/23 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 9/11/23. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: All matters relating to the referral being completed, the referral is closed and Magistrate Judge Beth W. Jantz is no longer on the case. JSR due date of 9/25/2023 is stricken. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Pursuant to Teva and Allergan Settlement Agreements (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Elgersma, Kara)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed the most recent joint status report submitted by Plaintiff and the Teva and Allergan Defendants #1303 . Given that the nationwide settlement process is still ongoing and is anticipated to result in dismissal of these Defendants from this lawsuit once completed, but that the Court expects this process might be lengthy, another joint status report regarding the status of settlement is due by 9/25/23. Mailed notice. (as, )
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by City of Chicago Presented before Magistrate Judge (Elgersma, Kara)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' Motion to withdraw as counsel #1301 is granted. Attorney Steven A. Block is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Allergan Finance, LLC and Allergan plc. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 MOTION by Attorney Steven A. Block to withdraw as attorney for ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Block, Steven)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1300 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed the joint status report submitted by Plaintiff and the Teva and Allergan Defendants #1299 . An updated joint status report is due by 6/5/23.Mailed notice. (as, )
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by City of Chicago (Elgersma, Kara)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 STIPULATION and Order Dismissing With Prejudice Claims Pursuant to National Settlement Agreement. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/2/2023. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion to withdraw #1282 is granted. Attorney Joshua M. Fliegel is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Plaintiff's motion to withdraw as attorney #1292 is granted. Attorney Thomas P. McNulty is given leave to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff. Motion for leave to withdraw as counsel of record #1295 is granted. Attorney Andrew Kopon, Jr is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Non-Party Witness Frank Lidd. The parties' Joint motion to enter proposed order dismissing with prejudice claims pursuant to national settlement agreement #1295 is granted. Enter Stipulation and Order. Motion hearing date of 3/7/23 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 NOTICE of Motion by Brittany Lynne Weiss for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1295 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/7/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Weiss, Brittany)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1295 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Enter Proposed Order Dismissing with Prejudice Claims Pursuant to National Settlement Agreement (Joint) (Weiss, Brittany)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed the joint status report submitted by Plaintiff and the Teva and Allergan Defendants #1293 . An updated joint status report is due by 3/6/23. Mailed notice. (as, )
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 STATUS Report (Joint) by City of Chicago (Elgersma, Kara)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 MOTION by Attorney Andrew Kopon, Jr. to withdraw as attorney for Frank Lidd. (Kopon, Andrew)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1290 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed the joint status report submitted by Plaintiff and the Teva and Actavis Defendants #1289 . An updated joint status report is due by 1/5/23. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 STATUS Report Join Status Report by City of Chicago (Elgersma, Kara)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 MOTION by Attorney Thomas P. McNulty to withdraw as attorney for City of Chicago. No party information provided (Kane, Stephen)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Status hearing held on 9/28/2022 between Plaintiff and Teva and Actavis Defendants. Counsel jointly requested this status hearing to update the court on recent developments. For the reasons stated on the record, parties jointly make an oral motion to stay the impending expert discovery deadlines. The oral motion is granted and expert deadlines as between Plaintiff and these families of Defendants are stayed. A joint status report is due on 11/1/22. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Stephen J Kane (Kane, Stephen)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Christina E. Sharkey (Sharkey, Christina)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1284 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: This Court has received a joint email from the parties requesting a telephonic status hearing. Accordingly, telephonic status is set for 9/28/2022 at 9:15 a.m. To join the status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Minute entry dated 9/8/22 #1281 is amended as follows: MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #1266 is granted. Attorney Adam S. Tolin is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Defendants' notice of withdrawal #1271 is granted. Attorney Howard Kaplan is given leave to withdraw as counsel for the Allergan Defendants. Plaintiff's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel #1280 is granted. Attorney Molly Condon Wells is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 MOTION by Attorney Joshua M. Fliegel to withdraw as attorney for Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Fliegel, Joshua)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1281 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #1266 is granted. Attorney Adam S. Tolin is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Defendants' notice of withdrawal #1271 is granted. Attorney Jeffrey A. Kaplan is given leave to withdraw as counsel for the Allergan Defendants. Plaintiff's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel #1280 is granted. Attorney Molly Condon Wells is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff.Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1280 MOTION by Attorney Molly Condon Wells to withdraw as attorney for City of Chicago. No party information provided (Wells, Molly)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Van Gelder, Amy)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time relating to expert discovery schedule #1277 is granted. This is the final extension that the Court will grant of the expert discovery schedule. Plaintiff's expert reports due by 10/28/22. Defendants' expert reports due by 12/21/22. Close of expert discovery on 3/31/23, with the City to use its best efforts to schedule the depositions of its experts within the first six weeks of the 12/21/22-3/31/23 period. The joint status reports previously due by 9/15/22 and 11/1/22 are now due by 11/15/22 and 1/5/23, respectively. All other dates for JSRs or status hearings are stricken. In their joint status reports, the parties should identify the experts that have been disclosed, the general topics on which the experts opine, and the status of each expert's deposition, including any confirmed deposition dates. In addition to the foregoing, the parties may raise in the JSRs any issues they wish to bring to the Court's attention and/or whether a telephonic status at any point would be helpful to the parties. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for extension of time Relating to Expert Discovery Schedule (UNOPPOSED) (Elgersma, Kara)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 NOTICE by Kenneth A. Wexler of Change of Address (Wexler, Kenneth)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 7/19/2022. Mailed notice. (as, )
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Joint Motion to Conclude Special Master Proceedings #1273 is granted. Motion #1119 is withdrawn. Enter Order. Mailed notice. (as, )
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.to Conclude Special Master Proceedings (Joint) (Van Gelder, Amy)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Motion hearing held on 6/15/22. For the reasons discussed on the record, plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of the expert discovery schedule #1269 is granted. Plaintiff's expert reports due by 8/29/22. Defendants' expert reports due by 10/21/22. Close of expert discovery on 1/31/23, with the City to use its best efforts to schedule the depositions of its experts within the first six weeks of the 10/21/22-1/31/23 period. The status hearing set for 7/14/22 is reset for a joint status report only, due by 9/15/22, and the status hearing set for 9/1/22 is reset to a joint status report only, due by 11/1/22. All other JSR due dates are stricken. In their joint status reports, the parties should identify the experts that have been disclosed, the general topics on which the experts opine, and the status of each expert's deposition, including any confirmed deposition dates. In addition to the foregoing, the parties may raise in the JSRs any issues they wish to bring to the Court's attention and/or whether a telephonic status at any point would be helpful to the parties. Emailed notice (yt)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 MOTION by Attorney Howard Kaplan to withdraw as attorney for ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Ventura, Catie)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Motion hearing as to Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Schedule #1269 is set for 6/15/2022 at 09:30 a.m. Central. To join the motion hearing by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (as, )
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for extension of time Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Schedule (Elgersma, Kara)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1268 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Rebecca Cauley Fitzpatrick (Fitzpatrick, Rebecca)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1267 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: On request of Endo and the City, the Court's 5/16/22 scheduling order #1264 is amended as follows: to the extent the parties are unable to resolve issues related to Endo's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, by 6/10/22, the parties shall submit an agreed briefing schedule to the Court that includes an opening brief by the City and a response brief by Endo. If the parties are able to resolve their issues, they should so inform the Court by that date. All other dates in the scheduling order to remain in effect. Mailed notice. (as, )
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19487376. (Tolin, Adam)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' Unopposed motion for leave to file additional appearance #1262 is granted. Attorney Adam S. Tolin is given leave to file an appearance and motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. Motion hearing date of 5/20/22 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1264 AGREED Scheduling Order Applicable To The City And Endo. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 5/16/2022. Mailed notice. (as, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1263 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Amy Lynn Van Gelder for presentment of motion for leave to file #1262 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/20/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Van Gelder, Amy)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1262 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file Additional Appearance (Unopposed) (Van Gelder, Amy)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The status hearing set for 5/12/2022 at 2:00 p.m. CT is stricken. The parties shall submit to the the Court an agreed scheduling order instead. Any further hearings with be decided at that time. Mailed notice. (as, )
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed Endo and the City's latest status report #1259 . The Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Endo is to take place on 5/4/22 and may not be moved without leave of the Court. A status hearing as between the City and Endo is set for 5/12/22 at 2:00 p.m. CT. At the hearing, the parties should be prepared to discuss their plans for Phase II of the proceedings currently before the Special Master, which they should continue to discuss amongst themselves in advance of the hearing. To join the hearing, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Counsel for parties other than the City and Endo may joinbut need not jointhe 5/12/22 status hearing. Mailed notice. (as, )
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 STATUS Report Concerning Special Master Proceedings (Joint) by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Van Gelder, Amy)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1258 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed Endo and the City's joint status report regarding the Special Master proceedings #1257 . A further joint status report is due by 4/28/22 addressing the status of the issues before the Special Master. The JSR should: (1) confirm that depositions of Endo and its witnesses have been completed, or identify the depositions that have been taken and those that are still outstanding; (2) provide an update on the parties' proposals for how the next phase of the Special Master proceedings should be conducted; (3) address any further productions by Endo. Mailed notice. (as, )
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 STATUS Report Concerning Special Master Proceedings (Joint) by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Van Gelder, Amy)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Frank Lidd by Andrew Kopon, Jr (Kopon, Andrew)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Frank Lidd by Joseph David Cohen Notice of Appearance for Non-Party Witness, Frank Lidd (Cohen, Joseph)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1254 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion to appear pro hac vice #1248 is granted. Attorney Joseph D. Cohen is given leave to appear on behalf of Non Party Witness Frank Lidd. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jessica Davidson Miller (Miller, Jessica)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defedants' Motion to appear pro hac vice #1243 is granted. Attorney Jessica Davidson Miller is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing With Prejudice Claims Purusant to National Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Elgersma, Kara)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed Endo and the City's joint status report regarding the Special Master proceedings #1249 . A further joint status report is due by 3/31/22 addressing the status of the issues before the Special Master, including (1) depositions of Endo and its witnesses, (2) further productions by Endo, and (3) the parties' proposals for how the next phase of the Special Master proceedings should be conducted. Mailed notice. (as, )
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 STATUS Report Concerning Special Master Proceedings (Joint) by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Van Gelder, Amy)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19208378. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for non-party witness, Frank Lidd (Cohen, Joseph)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1247 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: In light of the Court's extension of the expert discovery schedule, the status hearing set for 4/28/22 is reset for 7/14/22 at 2:00 p.m., with a joint status report due by 7/11/22. The status hearing set for 6/8/22 is reset for 9/1/22 at 10:15 a.m., with a joint status report due by 8/29/22. In their joint status reports, the parties should identify the experts that have been disclosed, the general topics on which the experts opine, and the status of each expert's deposition, including any confirmed deposition dates. In addition to the foregoing, the parties may raise in the JSRs any issues they wish to bring to the Court's attention. The 3/3/22 deadline for the City and Endo's joint status report regarding the Special Master proceedings stands. Mailed notice. (as, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Minute entry #1245 is amended as follows: City of Chicago's Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Schedule #1244 is granted. Plaintiff's expert reports due by 6/30/2022. Defendants' expert reports due by 8/22/2022. Close of expert discovery on 10/31/2022, with the City to use its best efforts to schedule the depositions of its experts within the first six weeks of the August 22 October 31 period. Mailed notice. (as, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: City of Chicago's Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Schedule #1244 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for order to Extend Expert Discovery Schedule (UNOPPOSED) (Elgersma, Kara)
February 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19175240. (Miller, Jessica)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed the City and Endo's latest joint status report #1241 . A further joint status report is due by 3/3/22 addressing the status of the issues before the Special Master, including depositions of Endo and its witnesses and further productions by Endo. The expert discovery schedule entered by the Court at #1189 stands and applies to all parties. Mailed notice. (as, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1241 STATUS Report - Joint Status Report by City of Chicago (Scullion, Jennifer)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' Motion to withdraw as attorney #1231 is granted. Attorneys Timothy William Knapp and Karl Stampfl are given leave to withdraw as counsel for the Allergen Defendants. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Illinois Department Of Public Health's Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Produce E.M.S. Data #1237 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Endo and the City's agreed motion for an extension of time to file a joint status report #1236 is granted. Endo and the City are to file a joint status report addressing the issues identified in the Court's January 10, 2022 order by 2/3/22. Mailed notice. (as, )
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1237 MOTION by Respondent Illinois Department of Public Health - NonParty Subpoena Recipient for extension of time to produce E.M.S. data (UNOPPOSED) (Kanter, Jason)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Entry of Agreed Order for Extension of Time to File Status Report (Joint) (Van Gelder, Amy)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Illinois Department of Public Health - NonParty Subpoena Recipient by Jason Aaron Kanter (Kanter, Jason)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 AGREED STIPULATION Regarding Qualified Protective Order For Protected Health Information For Productions By Cigna Healthcare, Inc. And Express Scripts, Inc. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 1/27/2022. Mailed notice. (as, )
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The parties' AGREED STIPULATION Regarding Qualified Protective Order For Protected Health Information For Productions By Cigna Healthcare, Inc. And Express Scripts, Inc. #1232 is granted. Enter Protective Order. Mailed notice. (as, )
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for order Unopposed Motion to Enter Agreed Order (Fliegel, Joshua)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 MOTION by Attorney Karl Stampfl and Timothy Knapp to withdraw as attorney for ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Welch, Donna)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: In light of the City's and Endo's helpful JSR #1229 , the status hearing previously set for 1/12/22 at 1:15 Central is stricken, and the parties are directed to use that time to continue meeting and conferring on the various issues identified in their JSR, in advance of submitting letter briefing to (Special Master) Judge Francis by 1/18/22 on any outstanding disputes. Another JSR is due by 2/1/22 addressing the status of any still outstanding discovery disputes, as well as the parties' updated timeframe for completion of their discovery and/or the Special Master's resolution of their outstanding disputes. Mailed notice. (as, )
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 STATUS Report (Joint) by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Van Gelder, Amy)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' Motion to appear pro hac vice #1218 is granted. Attorney Emily Baxter is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1227 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The status hearing previously set for 4/28/22 at 10:15 am is rescheduled to 1:30 pm that same day. Time change only. To join the next status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Mailed notice (cn).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1226 ORDER before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Telephonic status hearing held on 12/17/21 and continued to 4/28/22 at 10:15 a.m. CT. A Joint Status Report is due by 4/21/22. An additional status conference is set regarding the Endo Special Master proceedings for 1/12/22 at 1:15 p.m. CT. Endo and the City are directed to submit a Joint Status Report regarding the Special Master proceedings by 4 p.m. CT on 1/10/22. Fact discovery is now closed, with the exception of what is listed in the attached document or discussed during the hearing. Additional deadlines and discussion are attached. To join the next status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Mailed notice(ber, ) Modified on 12/22/2021 (ber, ).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Status hearing held on 12/17/21. Detailed order to follow. Mailed notice (ber, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1224 ORDER Restricting Efforts To Identify Information signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 12/17/2021. Motion for order #1222 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 Proposed Order Restricting Efforts to Identify Information by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Fliegel, Joshua)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for order Unopposed Motion to Enter Agreed Order (Fliegel, Joshua)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1221 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Block, Steven)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1220 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Janssen's motion to modify the deposition date of its 30(b)(6) deponent on topic 11 #1219 is granted. The parties are directed to identify a new confirmed date for Janssen's designee as to topic 11 in the next JSR. Mailed notice. (as, )
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.to Modify the Deposition Date of Janssen's 30(B)(6) Deponent on Topic 11 (Unopposed) (Lifland, Charles)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18936966. (Baxter, Emily)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1217 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion To Modify The Deposition Date Of Non-Party Witness Robyn Kohn #1215 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Defendant's Unopposed Motion To Modify The Deposition Date Of Deponent Dr. Lawrence Robbins #1214 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago to Modify the Deposition Date of Non-Party Witness Robyn Kohn (Unopposed) (Elgersma, Kara)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. To Modify The Deposition Date of Deponent Dr. Lawrence Robbins (Unopposed) (Diamantatos, Tinos)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion To Modify The Deposition Date Of Non-Party Witness Dr. Steven Stanos #1212 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 MOTION by Plaintiff City of ChicagoUnopposed Motion to Modify The Deposition Date of Non-Party Witness Dr. Steven Stanos (Elgersma, Kara)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 11/29/2021: Telephonic status hearing held on 11/29/21 and continued to 12/17/21 at 10:00 a.m. CT. A Joint Status Report is due by 12/13/21. Additional deadlines and discussion are in accompanying order. To join the 12/17/21 status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceutical Inc.'s motion for withdrawal of counsel #1196 is granted. Attorneys Cameron Davis; Joshua M. Davis; Hannah Elizabeth Henkel; Samuel Nelson Lonergan; Caitlin Martini Mika; Sean O. Morris; Wilson D. Mudge; Steven G. Reade; Samantha Lynn Rodriguez; Jonathan L. Stern; Angela R. Vicari; John D Cella and Douglas Curtis are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceutical Inc. Defendants' motions to appear pro hac vice #1204 and #1209 are granted. Attorneys Ross Galin and Wallace Allan are given leave to file appearances on behalf of Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1209 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18904479. (Allan, Tad)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 ORDER Regarding Production by Non-Party Prime Therapeutics LLC. Nothing herein shall be construed as a limitation on the City's ability to object to the relevance or admissibility of any material produced pursuant to this Order. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 11/23/2021. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Richard Todd Bernardo (Bernardo, Richard)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Status hearing held on 11/22/Status hearing held on 11/22/21 on Endo's motion to enforce its subpoena to the Illinois Department of Public Health. IDPH agrees that: (1) it will produce the requested death certificate data by the 12/16/21 fact discovery deadline; (2) it has met and conferred with Endo with respect to the requested NSSP data and will produce NSSP data by 12/31/21; (3) it has met and conferred with Endo with respect to EMS data and will produce EMS data by 1/31/22; and (4) it will produce SUDORS data for the years 2017-2020 by the 12/16/21 fact discovery deadline. Given the length of time that Endo's subpoena to IDPH has been outstanding, and the impending close of fact discovery, the Court is disinclined to provide extensions on the foregoing dates. IDPH reports that it does not believe that it will require an additional protective order(s) to produce the foregoing data; to the extent IDPH does seek such an order, it should do so by 12/16/21. Because the parties have agreed on the scope and schedule of IDPH's productions, the Court denies Endo's motion to enforce its subpoena #1177 as moot. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Daniels, Justine)
November 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18895988. (Galin, Ross)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw #1185 is granted. Attorney Elie Zenner is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Defendants' motion to appear pro hac vice #1192 is granted. Attorney Richard T. Bernardo is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1202 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Unopposed Motion To Modify The Deposition Date Of Deponent Dr. Judith Paice #1200 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 11/17/2021 relating to the Deposition of IQVIA. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.to Modify the Deposition Date of Deponent Dr. Judith Paice (Unopposed) (Diamantatos, Tinos)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1199 STIPULATION Relating to the Deposition of IQVIA (Elgersma, Kara)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 11/16/2021: Defendants' motion to compel Rule 30(b)(6) testimony from the City #1149 is granted in part and denied in part, as explained in the accompanying order. The ordered Rule 30(b)(6) deposition(s) of the City are to be completed by the fact discovery close of 12/16/21. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Natalie A Bennett (Bennett, Natalie)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 MOTION by Attorney Jonathan L. Stern, Joshua M. Davis, Sean O. Morris, Steven G. Reade, Samuel N. Lonergan, Angela R. Vicari, John D. Cella, Wilson D. Mudge, Douglas F. Curtis, Caitlin Martini Mika, Cameron Davis, Hannah E. Henkel and Samantha L. Rodriguez to withdraw as attorney for Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Curtis, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Illinois Department of Public Health - NonParty Subpoena Recipient by Jessica L. Watkins (Watkins, Jessica)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: At Defendant Endo's request and by agreement of the parties, the telephone status set on 11/23/2021 at 9:30 a.m. is cancelled and reset to 11/22/2021 at 11:30 a.m. Call in information to remain. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1193 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed the Illinois Department of Public Health's response to defendant Endo's motion to enforce its subpoena #1191 . A status hearing with respect to Endo's motion to enforce is set for 11/23/21 at 9:30 a.m. To join the status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Counsel for Endo and IDPH must call in for the hearing; counsel for other parties need not appear but are welcome to do so if they wish, as is the public. IDPH is to produce the requested death certificate data by the 12/16/21 fact discovery deadline. The parties are directed to meet and confer by 11/19/21 with respect to (1) Endo's definition of "opioid use disorder" with respect to the NSSP database; (2) the scope of Endo's request for EMS data and the timeframe for production of EMS data; and (3) IDPH's capacity to produce documents from the SUDORS database. Prior to the meet and confer, IDPH is directed to learn from Northwestern whether it is able to export the requested data from the SUDORS database and, if so, an estimate for how long it will take to do so (possibly subject to a court order for expedited production given how long this subpoena has been pending with IDPH). The Court will order IDPH to produce data from the identified databases, as Endo and IDPH have essentially agreed, but Endo and IDPH at their meet and confer should discuss the scope and timeframe of IDPH's productions. Endo is given leave to negotiate for production due dates from IDPH beyond the close of fact discovery, in its discretion. The motion to compel is taken under advisement, pending the parties' meet and confer and the forthcoming status hearing. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18865975. (Bernardo, Richard)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 RESPONSE by Illinois Department of Public Health - NonParty Subpoena Recipientin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to supplement Endo's Supplement in Support of its Motion to Compel #1187 , MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to compel Motion to Compel Production of Documents From The Illinois Department of Public Health #1177 (Bhave, Sunil)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Illinois Department of Public Health - NonParty Subpoena Recipient by Sunil Shashikant Bhave (Bhave, Sunil)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint and agreed submission on the expert discovery schedule #1188 . Based on the parties' agreement, the Court enters the following expert discovery schedule: Plaintiff's expert reports due by 4/12/2022. Defendants' expert reports due by 6/3/2022. Close of expert discovery on 8/12/2022, with the City to use its best efforts to schedule the depositions of its experts within the first six weeks of the June 3 - August 12 period. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1188 Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Expert Discovery Schedule by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Fliegel, Joshua)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to supplement Endo's Supplement in Support of its Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Fliegel, Joshua)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Aggie Byul Lee (Lee, Aggie)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 MOTION by Attorney Elie Zenner to withdraw as attorney for City of Chicago. No party information provided (McNulty, Thomas)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has reviewed Endo's motion to enforce its subpoena to the Illinois Department of Public Health #1177 . While the motion identifies four databases that Endo believes contain relevant information, the motion fails to identify with specificity the information that Endo seeks to compel IDPH to produce from the databases. Endo is directed to file, by 11/5/21, a supplement to its motion identifying with specificity (1) the particular information or data fields that it is seeking from each of the identified databases; and (2) specifically which of its document request(s) serve as the basis for its motion. Endo's supplement should also confirm that it has emailed a copy of this order to counsel for IDPH, as to put IDPH on notice of the following: IDPH's response due date is now 11/11/21, failure to respond timely to the motion may be construed as a lack of opposition, and no extensions on this briefing schedule will be entertained in light of the length of time that this subpoena has been pending as well as the fast approaching fact discovery close. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Unopposed Motion To Modify The Deposition Date Of Deponent Dr. Shailesh Gandhi #1182 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to Modify The Deposition Date of Deponent Dr. Shailesh Gandhi (Unopposed) (Diamantatos, Tinos)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 NOTICE by City of Chicago Notice of Firm Name Change (Boley, Justin)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 NOTICE by City of Chicago Notice of Firm Name Change (Turke, Bethany)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 NOTICE by City of Chicago Notice of Firm Name Change (Wexler, Kenneth)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 NOTICE by City of Chicago Notice of Firm Name Change (Elgersma, Kara)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to compel Motion to Compel Production of Documents From The Illinois Department of Public Health (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Fliegel, Joshua)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Joshua Michael Fliegel Appearance of Ruth E. Hartman (Fliegel, Joshua)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: The parties' motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #1123 , #1128 , #1146 and #1169 are granted. Attorneys Andrew Arnold, Ruth Hartman, Martine Wilson and Aggie Lee are given leave to file appearances. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 11/1/2021: Telephonic status hearing held on 10/29/21 and continued to 11/29/21 at 10:00 a.m. CT. A Joint Status Report is due by 11/22/21. Additional deadlines and discussion are in accompanying order. To join the 11/29/21 status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Mailed notice. (as, )
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 AGREED ORDER REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF CLAIMS DATA BY UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 10/28/2021. Motion for order #1172 is granted; Defendants' representation that neither the third party (United Healthcare) nor the City oppose this motion. Mailed notice. (as, )
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for order Unopposed Motion to Enter Agreed Order (Fliegel, Joshua)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint status report #1170 . Defendants' motion to compel Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of the City of Chicago #1149 is under advisement and the Court will not require oral argument on the motion. The Court will address the remaining issues raised in the joint status report at the 10/29/21 status hearing. Mailed notice. (as, )
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 STATUS Report (Joint) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18787321. (Lee, Aggie)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Court has appointed Hon. James "Jay" C. Francis IV (ret.) as Special Master until further order of the Court #1167 . The parties are directed to promptly work with Judge Francis to set an expedited schedule that allows sufficient time to complete all necessary tasks, while recognizing that the parties, the Special Master, and the Court all share an interest in resolving the matters referred to the Special Master as promptly as is reasonably feasible. To that end, the parties shall jointly reach out to Judge Francis's assistant by 10/22/21 to arrange immediate next steps. Contact information for Judge Francis' assistant can be obtained from this Court's courtroom deputy. Mailed notice. (as, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 10/19/2021. Mailed notice. (as, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Amy Lynn Van Gelder (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to file an additional appearance #1154 is granted. Attorney Amy L. Van Gelder is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. Motion hearing date of 10/22/21 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 OBJECTIONS by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to order, #1152 Submission of Endo Defendants Regarding Proposed Order Appointing Special Master (King, Christopher)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 RESPONSE by City of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to compel 30(b)(6) Deposition of the City of Chicago #1149 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Testimony)(Ackerman, David)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Qualley King for presentment of motion for leave to file #1154 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/22/2021 at 09:30 AM. (King, Christopher)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jonathan Michael Redgrave (Redgrave, Jonathan)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Janssen Defendants' motion to modify Dr. Sekhadia's deposition date #1159 is granted. The rescheduled deposition date shall be included in the parties' 10/22/21 joint status report. Mailed notice. (as, )
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Modify the Deposition Date of Deponent Dr. Mehul Sekhadia (Daniels, Justine)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: As Judge Francis' affidavit has now been filed #1152 , any objections to or comments on the proposed order of appointment #1157 shall be filed by 10/15/21. Mailed notice. (as, )
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 AFFIDAVIT of James C. Francis IV. (gcy, )
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiff's agreed motion to modify two deposition dates #1155 is granted. The parties are directed to include the rescheduled deposition dates in their 10/22/21 joint status report, and barring any further settlement developments, they must be completed by the current fact discovery close date in December. Mailed notice. (as, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago TO MODIFY THE DEPOSITION DATES OF TWO DEPONENTS (Ackerman, David)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file Endo's Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Additional Appearance (King, Christopher)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Nicholas Bernard Snavely (Snavely, Nicholas)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 10/5/2021: The accompanying draft proposed order of appointment attached as Exhibit A replaces the one previously docketed at dkt. #1143 . Any objections to or comments on the proposed order of appointment shall be filed within three business days of the filing of Judge Francis' affidavit. Mailed notice. (as, )
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Jennifer Scullion (Scullion, Jennifer)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 MEMORANDUM by ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to compel #1149 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - City's Objections, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defs.' Letter, June 8, 2021, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defs.' Email July 7 2021, #5 Exhibit 5 - City Letter, July 13, 2021, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defs.' Letter, Aug. 11, 2021, #7 Exhibit 7 - City Letter, Aug. 27, 2021, #8 Exhibit 8 - City Letter, Sept. 20, 2021, #9 Exhibit 9 - Defs.' Email Sept. 24 2021, #10 Exhibit 10 - Defs.' Email Sept. 30, 2021, #11 Exhibit 11 - Liebman Dep. Excerpts)(Block, Steven)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to compel 30(b)(6) Deposition of the City of Chicago (Block, Steven)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Allergan Defendants' motion for leave to file an oversized brief of 20 pages #1147 is granted. Plaintiff's response may also be up to 20 pages. No reply unless ordered by the Court. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file excess pages to Defendants' Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition of the City of Chicago (Block, Steven)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18713836. (Block, Steven)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiff's agreed motion to modify three deposition dates #1144 is granted. The parties are directed to include the rescheduled deposition dates in their 10/22/21 joint status report. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 MOTION by Plaintiff City of ChicagoModify Deposition Dates of Three Deponents (Ackerman, David)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 9/23/2021: The Court has reviewed the City of Chicago and the Endo Defendants' Joint ReportConcerning Special Master Candidates #1142 and is considering the appointment of Hon. James "Jay" C. Francis IV (ret.) as Special Master pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53, to address and resolve issues and disputes that may arise related to the investigation of the Endo Defendants' compliance with discovery obligations, including but not limited to the Endo Defendants' investigation, identification, preservation, processing, search, review, and production of discovery (whether hard copy or electronically stored information), to make findings concerning the same, and to recommend any remedial or curative relief that may be necessary, reasonable, and proportional under the circumstances #1133 . This appointment is pending Judge Francis preparing and having filed on CM/ECF an affidavit pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53(b)(3)(A), disclosing whether there is any ground for disqualification under 28 U.S.C. 455. A draft proposed order of appointment is attached as Exhibit A to this Order. Any objections to or comments on the proposed order of appointment shall be filed within three business days of the filing of Judge Francis' affidavit. See accompanying order. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 STATUS Report Joint Report Concerning Special Master Candidates by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Maltese Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Stack Resume, #3 Exhibit C - Grossman Bio, #4 Exhibit D - Francis Bio, #5 Exhibit E - Laporte Bio, #6 Exhibit F - Letter)(King, Christopher)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 9/17/2021: For the reasons discussed in the accompanying order, Plaintiff's Supplement to the Joint Status Report #1076 is construed as a motion to allocate deposition time to the Allergan corporate family, which this Court denies. In its discretion, however, the Court provides Plaintiff an additional four hours of deposition time allocated to the Teva corporate family. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' ACCESS TO PRESCRIPTION MONITORING DATA. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 9/17/2021. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 9/15/2021: Telephonic status hearing held on 9/15/21, and continued to 10/29/21 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the oral record, the fact discovery deadline is extended to 12/16/21. A Joint Status Report is due by 10/22/21. Additional deadlines and discussion are in the accompanying order. To join the 10/29/21 status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Cook County Illinois Medical Examiner by Hellin Jang Assistant State's Attorney (Jang, Hellin)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 STATUS Report / JOINT STATUS REPORT by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Curtis, Douglas) Modified on 9/16/2021 (as, ).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Janssen Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to extend the deadline for its Rule 30(b)(6) depositions #1134 is granted. Leave is granted to 10/15/21. Mailed notice (sxw)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/8/21 before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Order Number: 41607. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2021. (Mullen, Patrick)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time (Janssen Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Extend the Discovery Deadline for 30(b)(6) Deposition) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Daniels, Justine)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 9/8/2021: For the reasons stated on the record, the Endo Defendants' motion to appoint a special master #1103 is granted in part and denied in part, and the City's motion to compel #1119 is granted in part, and denied without prejudice in part. Additional deadlines and discussion in accompanying order. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Christina Chung (Chung, Christina)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Confirm Janssen 30(B)(6) Deposition Dates to September 8, 2021 #1129 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 RESPONSE by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago to compel #1119 Endo's Response To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2018.06.13 email from the MDL Special Master (Cohen) to MDL Coordinating Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - 2018.10.11 email from Josh Davis (APKS) to J. Scullion et al., #3 Exhibit C - 2018.10.22 email from Josh Davis (APKS) to J. Scullion et al., #4 Exhibit D - City of Chicago's March 29, 2013 Investigative Subpoena)(King, Christopher)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for extension of time to confirm Janssen depositions (Ackerman, David)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18631133. (Ruth, Hartman)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 RESPONSE by City of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to appoint special commissioner Motion For Appointment Of Special Master #1103 (Elgersma, Kara)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Motion hearing set for 09/08/2021 is reset to 09/08/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Time change only. Call-in information to remain. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 SUPPLEMENT to motion to appoint special commissioner, #1103 Supplemental Submission of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Endo Health Solutions Inc. Regarding Proposed Special Master Process (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plavix Special Master Order)(King, Christopher)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 Supplemental Submission by City of Chicago on Endo Discovery Issues (Elgersma, Kara)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18612899. (Arnold, Andrew)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff City of Chicago to Declaration of Jennifer Scullion and Declaration of Linda Singer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K to Jennifer Scullion Declaration, #2 Exhibit N to Jennifer Scullion Declaration, #3 Exhibit O to Jennifer Scullion Declaration, #4 Exhibit P to Jennifer Scullion Declaration, #5 Exhibit F to Declaration of Linda Singer)(Elgersma, Kara)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file exhibits under seal #1117 is granted. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 DECLARATION of Jennifer Scullion regarding motion to compel #1119 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to L. Singer Declaration, #2 Exhibit to L. Singer Declaration, #3 Exhibit to L. Singer Declaration, #4 Exhibit to L. Singer Declaration, #5 Exhibit to L. Singer Declaration, #6 Exhibit to L. Singer Declaration, #7 Declaration of J. Scullion, #8 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #9 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #10 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #11 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #12 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #13 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #14 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #15 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #16 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #17 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #18 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #19 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #20 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #21 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #22 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #23 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #24 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #25 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #26 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #27 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration, #28 Exhibit to J. Scullion Declaration)(Elgersma, Kara)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago to compel (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix)(Elgersma, Kara)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Tera Nichole Coleman (Coleman, Tera)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for leave to file Exhibit/s Under Seal (UNOPPOSED) (Elgersma, Kara)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations #1114 is GRANTED. The City's brief in support of its motion to compel may be up to twenty-five (25) pages; Endo's response to the City's motion also may be up to twenty-five (25) pages; no reply unless requested by the Court. As a reminder, the motion to compel must be specific as what particular discovery requests are being compelled (as opposed to general groups or categories of discovery) and attach copies of the relevant discovery requests and responses to date. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Rule 72 Objection To Protective Order Against Cross-Notice of Trial Preservation Deposition #934 is granted without objection. The Motion to Seal the Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial of Defendants Allergan PLC and Allergan Finance, LLC To Plaintiff's Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants, Allergan PLC, Actavis, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #1031 is GRANTED without objection. The Motion by Attorney Joanna G. Persio to withdraw as attorney for Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is granted #1051 , without objection. The motions for leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #1079 #1084 #1090 #1095 and #1099 are granted, without objection. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for leave to file excess pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations (Elgersma, Kara)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/16/21 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Order Number: 40159. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2021. (Mullen, Patrick)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/12/21 before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Order Number: 40735. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2021. (Mullen, Patrick)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/28/21 before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Order Number: 41305. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2021. (Mullen, Patrick)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03/05/21 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2021. (Mullen, Patrick)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/17/21 before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Order Number: 41427. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2021. (Mullen, Patrick)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/20/21 before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Order Number: 41453. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2021. (Mullen, Patrick)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Telephonic motion hearing on Endo's motion for appointment of special master #1103 is set for 9/8/21 at 10:00 a.m. All parties and the public are free to join the call, but only counsel for the City and Endo are required to participate. To join the hearing by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. The City's response remains due by 9/1/21, and should include addressing Endo's proposed order as well as the feasibility of Plaintiffs in other lawsuits voluntarily participating, as Endo has proposed. Endo is also directed to file a supplement by 8/27/21 identifying any other special master processes in which such a framework involving Plaintiffs from other lawsuits was instituted by any Court. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 8/23/2021: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/20/21, and continued to 9/15/21 at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Status Report is due by 9/10/21. Additional deadlines and discussion in the accompanying order. To join the status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Endo's motion for appointment of special master #1103 is taken under advisement, with the briefing schedule having previously been set. [See dkt 1102]. In accordance with General Order 21-0027, the notice of presentment date #1104 is stricken. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 Defendant Endo's Notice of Motion re Motion for Appointment of Special Master NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Qualley King for presentment of motion to appoint special commissioner, #1103 before Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 8/26/2021 at 10:00 AM. (King, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to appoint special commissioner Motion For Appointment Of Special Master (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Appointing Special Master, #2 Exhibit B - 2021.08.11 Email from J. Scullion to C. King re Endo Sanctions)(King, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 8/19/2021: Telephonic status hearing regarding only the discovery issues Plaintiff has raised with the Endo Defendants held on 8/17/21. A telephonic status hearing with all parties remains set for 10:00 a.m., on 8/20/21. To join the hearing by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to the hearing as well. See accompanying order. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by City of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Ackerman, David)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Telephonic status set for 08/20/2021 is reset to 08/20/2021 at 10:00 AM. Time change only. Call in information to remain. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18558366. (Ehsan, Houman)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 RESPONSE by Plaintiff City of Chicago to status report #1096 Plaintiff The City of Chicago's Response to the Allergan and Teva Defendants' Opposition to the City's Supplement to the Joint Status Report (DKT 1097) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Elgersma, Kara)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 Allergan Defendants' and the Teva Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplement to the Joint Status Report by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 STATUS Report / Interim Joint Status Report by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Daniels, Justine)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18534397. (Breen, Meghan)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Nigel Paul Halliday (Halliday, Nigel)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 PROTECTIVE Order signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 8/3/2021: For the reasons set out in the accompanying order, the Janssen Defendants' motion for a protective order #982 is granted in part and denied in part, the Endo Defendants' motion for a protective order #984 is granted in part and denied in part, and the Endo Defendants' motion for leave to file exhibits under seal #1046 is granted. The parties are directed to meet and confer about a proposed schedule and other logistics regarding Endo's and Janssen's Rule 30(b)(6) depositions and associated tasks, considering the parties' prior agreements and the rulings set out herein. A report on the parties' proposed schedule shall be included in the next Joint Status Report due by 8/16/21. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Adam Ross Zurbriggen (Zurbriggen, Adam)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by David R Tawil (Tawil, David)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18524678. (Kaplan, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 7/29/2021: Telephonic status hearing held on 7/28/21, and continued to 9:30 a.m., on 8/20/21. A JSR is due by the close of business on 8/16/21. A telephonic status hearing related only to the discovery issues Plaintiff has raised with the Endo Defendants is set for 2:00 p.m., on 8/17/21. To join the hearings by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to these hearings as well. Additional deadlines and discussion are in the text of the order below. Please see the order below for further discussion and deadlines. Mailed notice. (as, )
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Mimi Yun-Choo Liu (Liu, Mimi)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Michael J. Pendell (Pendell, Michael)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Frederick Curtis Baker (Baker, Frederick)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 NOTICE by City of Chicago of Non-Party Subpoena to Steven Simon, M.D. (Madden, Brian)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18505637. (Metcalf, Janine)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Amy M. Vanni / Appearance of Amy M. Vanni on Behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Teresa Hayes (Vanni, Amy)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Brian J. Madden (Madden, Brian)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 WITHDRAWING Melissa DeGaetano Bertke as counsel for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and substituting Darren Andrew Crook as counsel of record (Crook, Darren)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 ATTORNEY Appearance for Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice of Appearance of Darren Crook (Crook, Darren) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 7/29/2021 (bg, ).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18504970. (Magee, Michael)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motions for pro hac vice #1008 , #1049 , #1053 , #1058 , #1060 , #1065 , #1066 are granted. Attorneys Melissa Coates, Katherine Vaky, Jennifer Wollenberg, Alyssa O'Donnell, Amy Vanni, Darren Crook, and Tera Coleman are given leave to file appearances on behalf of Defendants. Plaintiff's motions for pro hac vice #1040 , #1048 , #1067 , #1068 , #1069 and #1071 are granted. Attorneys Mimi Liu, Frederick Baker, Adam Zubriggen, Nigel Halliday, David Tawil and Brian Madden are given leave to file appearances on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiff's supplement to the joint status report #1076 is taken under advisement. No written response is necessary in advance of the 7/28/21 status conference. Mailed notice. (as, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 STATUS Report Supplement by City of Chicago (Ackerman, David)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Endo Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to file an amended status report #1073 is granted. The notice of presentment #1074 is stricken in accordance with the Court's Tenth Amended General Order 20-0012. Mailed notice. (as, )
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas Curtis for presentment of motion for leave to file, #1073 before Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 7/28/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Curtis, Douglas)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file / Endo's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Status Report Regarding Search for and Production of Call Data (Originally Filed July 1, 2021, ECF #1064) (Curtis, Douglas)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 STATUS Report / JOINT STATUS REPORT by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Curtis, Douglas)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18480024. (Madden, Brian)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/21/21 before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Order Number: 41125. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov.
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18459533. (Tawil, David)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18459330. (Halliday, Nigel)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18459130. (Zurbriggen, Adam)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18458075. (Coleman, Tera)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18416414. (Darren, Crook)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 STATUS Report / Endo Defendants' Status Report Regarding Search for and Production of Call Data by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Curtis, Douglas)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 Notice of Deposition Schedule Pursuant to 6/22/21 Order by City of Chicago (Elgersma, Kara)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 WITHDRAWING Justin R. Donoho as counsel for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and substituting Joshua Michael Fliegel as counsel of record (Fliegel, Joshua)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Joshua Michael Fliegel (Fliegel, Joshua)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18387019. (Vanni, Amy)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 NOTICE by Tinos Diamantatos of Change of Address (Diamantatos, Tinos)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18382090. (O'Donnell, Alyssa)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 6/22/2021: Telephonic status hearing held on 6/21/21, and continued to 9:30 a.m., on 7/28/21. Additionaldeadlines and discussion are in the text of the order below. To join the status conference byphone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media willbe able to call in to listen to this hearing as well. Persons granted remote access to proceedingsare reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting ofcourt proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal ofcourt issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to futurehearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice.(as, )
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: In light of the Court closure on 6/18/2021 recognizing the Juneteenth National Holiday, the telephone status set on 6/18/2021 is cancelled and reset to 6/21/2021 at 11:00 a.m. To join the status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing as well. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice (sxw, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 STATUS Report /Joint by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Daniels, Justine)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff City of Chicago to motion for protective order, #984 , motion for protective order #982 Plaintiff''s Surreply in Opposition to the Janssen Defendants' and Endo Defendants' Motions for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Elgersma, Kara)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18323320. (Wollenberg, Jennifer)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for a brief extension of time #1050 is granted. Plaintiff's combined surreply to the protective order motions is due by the close of business 6/7/21. Mailed notice. (pk, )
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 MOTION by Attorney Joanna G. Persio to withdraw as attorney for Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Persio, Joanna)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for extension of time to File Surreplies to Motions for Protective Order (Agreed) (Elgersma, Kara)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18318165. (Vaky, Katherine)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18316034. (Baker, Frederick)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Steven Andrew Block (Block, Steven)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file Exhibits Under Seal (Curtis, Douglas)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. / Sealed Exhibits B, C, D and E regarding reply #1044 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Curtis, Douglas)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 REPLY by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to motion for protective order, #984 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit F)(Curtis, Douglas)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 DECLARATION of Justine Daniels regarding motion for protective order #982 (Supplemental Declaration of Justine Daniels) (Daniels, Justine)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 REPLY by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for protective order #982 (Lucas, Amy)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 ORDER signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 05/12/2021: Telephonic status hearing held on 5/12/21, and continued to 6/18/21 at 9:30 a.m. Fact discovery close is scheduled for 9/30/21. Additional deadlines and discussion are in the text of the order below. To join the status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing as well. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (rbf, )
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18239013. (Liu, Mimi)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Christopher Qualley King (King, Christopher)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to file additional appearance #1034 is granted. Attorney Christopher Q. King is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. Motion hearing date of 5/12/21 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Samantha Lynn Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Samantha)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Cameron Davis (Davis, Cameron)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas Curtis for presentment of motion for leave to file #1034 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/12/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Curtis, Douglas)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file / UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL APPEARANCE (Curtis, Douglas)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on December 29, 2020 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Order Number: 39877. Court Reporter Contact Information: Annette Montalvo, annette.montalvo@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2021. (Montalvo, Annette)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 ENTERED IN ERROR. (Montalvo, Annette) Modified on 5/6/2021 (sm, ).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to seal ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL OF DEFENDANTS ALLERGAN PLC AND ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Welch, Donna)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses (Plaintiff's Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint) by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Welch, Donna)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand / AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL OF ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. AND ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT #715 by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Curtis, Douglas)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint) by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(Diamantatos, Tinos)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.(Diamantatos, Tinos)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint #715 ) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Lifland, Charles)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 STIPULATION regarding amended complaint, #715 (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Allergan Defendants' Deadline to File Answer to Fifth Amended Complaint) (Welch, Donna)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Hannah Elizabeth Henkel (Henkel, Hannah)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 STIPULATION Regarding Janssen 30(b)(6) Topic 5 (Elgersma, Kara)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jantz for all further proceedings #1021 . The telephonic status conference previously scheduled for 06/08/2021 is stricken, and rescheduled for 05/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. No status report need be filed, as the parties filed a Joint Status Report on 04/19/2021 #1020 . The parties are directed, however, to continue to meet and confer in advance of the 05/12/2021 status hearing on outstanding issues identified in the Joint Status Report. While the parties are certainly free to subsequently document items in writing via emails or letters, the Court expects that most meet and confers should be conducted via phone or video. To join the telephonic status conference on 05/12/2021 by phone, counsel shall dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing as well. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (rbf, )
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Beth W. Jantz for all further proceedings. Honorable Jeffrey Cole no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/20/2021. (bg, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by City of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Suggestion of Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Suggestion of Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Tennessee Decision)(Ackerman, David)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 JOINT Stipulation And Order Regarding Defendants Deadline To File Answers To Fifth Amended Complaint. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/14/2021. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Judge Alonso has referred the case here for discovery supervision #1015 . The parties are to submit a Joint status report by 4/19/21. Telephone Status Conference is set for 6/8/21 at 9:30am to discuss the progress of discovery. Counsel should call (888) 684-8852, access code 5618926.#. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (yt)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 STIPULATION regarding amended complaint, #715 (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendants' Deadline to File Answers to Fifth Amended Complaint) (Corrected Version of Dkt. No. 1016) (Daniels, Justine)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 STIPULATION regarding amended complaint, #715 (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendants' Deadline to File Answers to Fifth Amended Complaint) (Daniels, Justine)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/8/2021. (bg, )
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Zach L. Dekel (Dekel, Zach)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Tyler Christian Bittner (Bittner, Tyler)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Nessa Forman (Forman, Nessa)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Alex Ricardo Duran (Duran, Alex)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of Plaintiff's notice, (R. 1006), the court recuses itself from this matter. The court has considered the factors Defendants identified in their response to the notice, (R. 1007), but in the end, the court finds that going forward its impartiality may reasonably be questioned by Plaintiff and the public (because of the newly arisen conflict of interest described in the notice), and by Defendants (based on a possible perception that the court will overcompensate to appear to be unbiased against Plaintiff). The court must also avoid even the appearance of impropriety. The court trusts that the parties will be able to quickly educate the next assigned magistrate judge on where the case has been, where it currently stands, and where it must go. Mailed notice (ma,)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Wilson D. Mudge (Mudge, Wilson)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18098857. (Coates, Melissa)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 RESPONSE by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to other #1005 (Curtis, Douglas)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the notice filed by Plaintiff, (R. 1005), this court is inclined to remove itself from presiding over this matter because its impartiality may be questioned. Defendants have until April 6, 2021, to file an opposition to this court's recusal if they wish. If Defendants do not file an opposition, the court will remove itself from this matter and notify the Executive Committee of the recusal on April 7, 2021. The committee will then reassign the case to a different magistrate judge. Mailed notice (ma,)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 Notice of Facts Relating to Recusal by City of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Elgersma, Kara)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 SEALED RESPONSE by City of Chicago to MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for protective order #982 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David I. Ackerman)(Ackerman, David)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a response under seal #1001 is granted. Plaintiff is granted leave to file its unredacted version of the response to Janssen Defendants' motion for protective order, (R. 982), under seal by today. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 MEMORANDUM by City of Chicago in Opposition to motion for protective order #982 (Redacted) (Ackerman, David)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago to seal document Opposition to Janssen Defendants Motion for Protective Order (Ackerman, David)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 SEALED RESPONSE by City of Chicago to MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for protective order / DEFENDANTS ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING PLAINTIFF'S FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) D #984 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Scullion Regarding Opposition to Endo's Motion for a Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Elgersma, Kara)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 999 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendants' joint motion to dismiss #769 , Teva's motion to dismiss #764 , and the Actavis Generic Entities' motion to dismiss #766 are denied. The Mallinckrodt entities' motion to dismiss #777 is denied, without prejudice to renewal following the resolution of bankruptcy proceedings. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file opposition briefing under seal #817 is granted, as plaintiff has filed public versions of these documents with reasonably limited redactions. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a response to defendants' notice of supplemental authority #900 is granted. Defendants' motion for leave to file notice of supplemental authority #925 is granted. The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice [ #951 , #958 , #960 , #961 , #966 , #971 , #972 , #973 , #974 , #975 , #977 , #978 , #996 , #998 ] are granted. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/31/2021. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 998 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18074786. (Mudge, Wilson)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 997 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's and Endo Defendants' joint motion for extension of time #995 is granted. Plaintiff has until May 14, 2021, to complete the deposition of Lynn Quaranta. This is a firm deadline. If Endo Defendants are unable to produce to Plaintiff the remaining information pertaining to Quaranta's interactions with healthcare providers from their databases within 14 calendar days prior to her deposition, Plaintiff may depose Quaranta again at a later time based on any supplemental information Endo Defendants produce. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 996 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18070491. (Rovenger, Joshua)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 995 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time / JOINT MOTION REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF FORMER ENDO EMPLOYEE LYNN QUARANTA (Curtis, Douglas)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 994 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Teva Defendants' motion for protective order #980 is granted. On January 22, 2021, Plaintiff served a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice on Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ("Teva USA") and Cephalon Inc. ("Cephalon") and a non-party corporate entity, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. The deposition notice includes 38 definitions and 20 topics, among other things. (R. 981-1.) The notice does not name the Actavis and Watson entities, which are named defendants in this lawsuit. On March 19, 2021, Teva USA and Cephalon moved to strike Topic No. 17 and to limit the definition of "You" and "Your" to mean only Teva USA and Cephalon, which are the only Defendants named in the notice. Plaintiff had until March 29, 2021, to file a response to the motion, (R. 968; R. 988), but it did not file one opposing the motion. Based on the court's review of the motion and the attached Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice, Topic. No. 17 is stricken because neither Teva USA nor Cephalon was a party to the agreements referred to in Topic No. 17, (R. 981 at 5), and the topic itself is not relevant to the claims or defenses in this case. Also, the definition of "You" and "Your," (R. 981-1 at 10), must be limited to the defendants named in the notice of deposition. Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6), "a party may name as the deponent a public or private corporation[.]" Here, the deposition notice only names two defendant corporations, Teva USA and Cephalon. (R. 981-1 at 1.) As such, only Teva USA and Cephalon are required to respond to the notice with their designees. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 993 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time #990 and motion for leave to file a response under seal #991 are granted. Plaintiff now has until March 31, 2021, to file its response to Janssen Defendants' motion for protective order, (R. 982). Plaintiff is also granted leave to file its unredacted version of the response to Endo Defendants' motion for protective order, (R. 984), under seal. Plaintiff is ordered to file the unredacted version by today. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 992 RESPONSE by City of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for protective order / DEFENDANTS ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING PLAINTIFF'S FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) D #984 REDACTED (Elgersma, Kara)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 991 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago to seal Opposition to Endo's Motion for a Protective Order (Elgersma, Kara)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 990 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for extension of time to file response/reply in Opposition to Janssen Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order (Elgersma, Kara)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 989 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Molly Lorraine Condon (Condon, Molly)
March 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 988 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendants' motions for protective order [ #980 , #982 , #984 ] are entered and continued. Plaintiff is reminded that it has until March 29, 2021, to file a response to the motions, (R. 968). Plaintiff may file a separate response to each motion or file a consolidated response (leave is granted to exceed 15 pages) opposing all three motions. There is no need for a table of contents. Endo Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal #987 is granted. Endo is granted leave to file Exhibits D-G under seal. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 987 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file Exhibits Under Seal (Curtis, Douglas)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 986 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. / Sealed Exhibits D, E, F and G regarding memorandum in support of motion #985 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Curtis, Douglas)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 985 MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion for protective order, #984 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Curtis, Douglas)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 984 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for protective order / DEFENDANTS ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING PLAINTIFF'S FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(c) (Curtis, Douglas)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 983 DECLARATION of Justine Daniels regarding motion for protective order #982 (Daniels, Justine)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 982 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for protective order (Lucas, Amy)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 981 MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in support of motion for protective order #980 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 980 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for protective order (Diamantatos, Tinos)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 979 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Erica M Kubly (Kubly, Erica)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 978 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18027707. (Dearman, Mark)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 977 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18027397. (Bogle, Brandon)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 976 STATUS Report / JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF FORMER ENDO EMPLOYEE LYNN QUARANTA by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Curtis, Douglas)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 975 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18007652. (Duran, Alex)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 974 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18007585. (Forman, Nessa)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 973 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18007514. (Bittner, Tyler)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 972 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18007427. (Zachary, Dekel)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 971 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17997842. (Rice, Justin)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 970 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties' joint motion for leave to cancel a deposition #969 is granted. The March 9, 2021 deposition of Lynn Quaranta is cancelled. The moving parties are to file a joint status report by March 15, 2021, updating the court on when Plaintiff is able to depose Quaranta. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 969 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago-Joint Emergency Motion for Leave to Adjust the March 9, 2021 Deposition Date (Scullion, Jennifer)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 968 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone and continued to April 13, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. by phone. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Defendants have until March 12, 2021, to notice the deposition of Alderman Ed Burke and until March 19, 2021, to file a motion for protective order limiting the scope of Plaintiff's Rule 30b(6) deposition. If a motion is timely filed, Plaintiff has until March 29, 2021, to file a response to the motion. Defendants' request to depose Plaintiff's expert, Dr. Jeffrey B. Liebman, during the expert discovery stage is denied. However, Defendants now have until April 9, 2021, to depose him. At the next status hearing, the parties will be expected to report on the following issues: (1) whether Cook County fully responded to Defendants' subpoena for documents; (2) whether Alderman Burke's deposition has been scheduled; and (3) whether Defendants still have the written discovery issues identified on December 7, 2020, (see R. 887 at 47-63), in light of Dr. Liebman's deposition. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 967 STATUS Report (Joint) by ALLERGAN PLC, Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Welch, Donna)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 966 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17983965. (Davis, Cameron)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 965 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Based on an emailed update from the parties, they are to complete the following depositions on the following agreed upon 2021 dates: (1) Grace Cielak (March 10); (2) Anthony Riccio (March 25); and (3) Dr. Allison Arwady (June 2). Parties have not yet made contact with either Dr. Hugh Russell or Noel Sanchez, who are both former city employees. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
February 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 964 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Endo Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to modify deposition schedule #963 is granted. Parties are to complete the depositions of Lynn Quaranta on March 9, 2021, and William Kellens on March 12, 2021. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 963 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc./ UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO MOVE DEPOSITION DATES (Curtis, Douglas)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 962 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Elie Thomas Zenner (Zenner, Elie)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 961 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17965317. (Vicari, Angela)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 960 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17964773. (Pendell, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 959 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Teva Defendants' ("Teva") motion to quash the notice of Andrew Boyer's deposition #946 is granted. Teva asserts that Plaintiff does not have good cause to depose Boyer a second time. The court agrees. Plaintiff responds to the motion that: (1) one day of deposition was not enough to fully explore all topics with Boyer given his long tenure with various Defendants named in this litigation; (2) since the first deposition Purdue Defendants have declared bankruptcy and Boyer's testimony is now necessary to understand Purdue-related documents and the nature of Purdue- Allergan relationship; and (3) the deposition of Boyer would reduce the overall discovery burden on Defendants. These reasons do not amount to good cause here. As to the first reason, Plaintiff argues that it must be granted more than one day to depose Boyer because "he wore many hats at Watson, Actavis and Allergan," (R. 956 at 1), and "has an 18-year record of relevant activities" at these entities, (id. at 3). As such, Plaintiff asserts that one day of deposition simply is not enough time to cover all bases. (Id. at 6.) And yet, Plaintiff does not explain in its response why it failed to use all seven hours of deposition time during the first deposition, even after Teva points to this fact numerous times in its motion. There is also no evidence in the record to demonstrate that the MDL plaintiffs sought more time to complete Boyer's deposition. As to the second reason, Purdue Defendants' bankruptcy does not change the fact that Plaintiff knew of Boyer's involvement with the distribution agreement entered into between Watson and Purdue before the first deposition more than two years ago. If Plaintiff wishes to further investigate Purdue Defendants' relationship with Watson or Allergan, it is entitled to do so through other means, but not by deposing someone who has already appeared for his deposition once. There is no indication in the record that Boyer is the only individual who can speak on this topic. As to the third reason, Plaintiff may decide not to call several other witnesses if it is able to depose Boyer, thereby reducing the number of depositions the parties need to take and defend. That may or may not be the case as the parties proceed with depositions. But it is certain that Boyer is a third-party witness in this matter and does not wish to appear for a second deposition. Without good cause, the court will not force Boyer to appear for a second deposition. For these reasons, Boyer is not required to appear for his deposition on March 9, 2021. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 958 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17951369. (Jacobs, Evan)
February 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 957 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to modify deposition schedule #955 is granted. Parties are to complete the depositions of Rito Ochoa on March 4, 2021, and Jeffry Griesser on March 12, 2021. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 956 MEMORANDUM by City of Chicago in Opposition to motion to quash #946 the Deposition of Andrew Boyer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Elgersma, Kara)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 955 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for Leave to Modify Deposition Schedule for Two Deponents (Unopposed) (Elgersma, Kara)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 954 STIPULATION AND ORDER Establishing Remote Deposition Protocol Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 2/17/2021. (ma,)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 953 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties' joint request to enter their agreed upon remote deposition protocol, (R. 950), is granted. Enter Stipulation and Order Establishing Remote Deposition Protocol. In the event any subsequent orders of this court conflicts with the provisions in this protocol, the parties are to follow the orders of the court. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 952 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Telephonic status hearing held and continued to March 5, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. (CST). Parties are to use the same call-in information. First, Plaintiff is ordered to provide the last-known contact information for Dr. Hugh Russell (and for other identified deponents who are no longer Plaintiff's employees) to Defendants by February 19, 2021. Second, as for deponents Grace Cielak, Anthony Riccio, and Noel Sanchez, the court orders the specific attorneys deposing them and defending them to confer by conference calls with them---together or separately---by February 26, 2021, to confirm their deposition dates. If their attempts to schedule depositions prove unsuccessful, those who participated in the calls, including Cielak, Riccio, and Sanchez, are to email the court by March 1, 2021. Third, the parties are to schedule the deposition of Dr. Allison Arwady (to be completed by June 2, 2021) by February 26, 2021. Fourth, Defendants are to depose Plaintiff's damage expert by April 2, 2021. Fifth, Defendants are to file their motion to enforce their subpoena served on Cook County by March 2, 2021, and present the same on March 5, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. (CST). The motion hearing will take place before the status hearing by phone. Defendants are to provide the call-in information for the motion hearing in the notice of motion that must be filed with the motion to enforce. Defendants are not required to file the motion to enforce if they are able to confer with an attorney assigned to handle the subpoena on behalf of Cook County and agree to a plan to address the subpoenaed records before March 2, 2021. Sixth, the parties are to confer on the disputes they have over Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition topics as soon as possible and be prepared to update the court on their efforts at the next status hearing. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 951 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17931721. (Rafferty, Troy)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 950 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ESTABLISHING REMOTE DEPOSITION PROTOCOL (Lucas, Amy)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 949 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the joint status report, (R. 948), the parties are to complete the following depositions on the following agreed upon 2021 dates: (1) Mary Sheridan (March 5); (2) Matthew Cline (March 26); and (3) Elizabeth Salisbury-Afshar (March 31). Parties are not to change this schedule without leave of court, and the court will not grant one unless the deponent has good cause. However, the parties may swap the dates for the identified deponents without leave of court. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 948 STATUS Report / JOINT STATUS REPORT by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mika, Caitlin)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 947 MEMORANDUM by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. in support of motion to quash #946 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 946 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to quash Notice for The Deposition of Andrew Boyer (Diamantatos, Tinos)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by John D Cella (Cella, John)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 944 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.motions to withdraw as attorney #799 , #800 , #801 , #804 are granted. Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC's motion to withdraw as attorney #848 is granted. Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s motion to withdraw as attorney #868 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to appear pro hac vice #923 is granted. Plaintiff's motions to withdraw appearance #935 , #936 are granted. Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s motion for admission pro hac vice #941 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to appear pro hac vice #943 is granted. Motion hearing date of 2/12/21 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 943 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17920858. (Brandon, Henry)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 942 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the joint status report, (R. 940), the parties are to complete the following depositions on the following agreed upon 2021 dates: (1) Andy Boyer (March 9); (2) William Kellens (March 10); and (3) Steve Cohen (March 11). Parties are not to change this schedule without leave of court, and the court will not grant one unless the deponent has good cause. However, the parties may swap the dates for the identified deponents without leave of court. As for the nine individuals Defendants identified, (R. 940 at 2), the parties are to confirm their deposition dates by February 15, 2021. These nine depositions are to be completed by no later than April 2, 2021. At the February 16, 2021 status hearing the parties are to update the court on the following topics along with other issues the parties may wish to raise with the court: (1) the deposition dates for the nine individuals Defendants identified; (2) Defendants' requests for documents from the Chicago- Cook Task Force on Heroin; and (3) Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition topics. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 941 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17910544. of John D. Cella on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Cella, John)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 940 STATUS Report (Joint) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Diamantatos, Tinos)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Catie Ventura (Ventura, Catie)
February 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 938 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties' joint request for an extension of time emailed to the court on February 5, 2021, is granted. Teva Defendants now have until February 15, 2021, to file their motion to quash Andy Boyer's deposition notice and Plaintiff now has until February 19, 2021, to file a response. The February 8, 2021 deadline for filing a joint status report, (R. 933), to stand. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 937 NOTICE of Motion by Fiona A Burke for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #935 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/12/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Burke, Fiona)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 936 MOTION by Attorney Umar Sattar to withdraw as attorney for City of Chicago. No party information provided (Wexler, Kenneth)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 935 MOTION by Attorney Sarah Wilbanks to withdraw as attorney for City of Chicago. No party information provided (Burke, Fiona)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 934 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago to withdraw objection to order on trial preservation deposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Elgersma, Kara)
January 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 933 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the joint status report, (R. 932), the parties are to complete the following depositions on the following agreed upon 2021 dates: (1) Michael Hemenway (February 22); (2) Rito Ochoa (February 25); (3) Jeffry Griesser (February 26); (4) Lynn Quaranta (March 2); (5) Gregory Garner (March 2); (6) Robert Roche (March 4); and (7) Janice Holcomb (March 5). Parties are not to change this schedule without leave of court, and the court will not grant one unless the deponent has good cause. However, the parties may swap the dates for the identified deponents without leave of court. As for William Kellens and Andy Boyer, the court orders the specific attorneys deposing them and defending them to have telephone conference calls with Kellens and Boyer (together or separately) by February 3, 2021, to confirm their deposition dates. If their attempt to schedule proves unsuccessful, those who participated in the calls, including Kellens and Boyer, are to email the court on February 4, 2021. As for Steven Cohen, Teva Defendants have until February 4, 2021, to confirm his deposition date. If the parties are unable to do so, Teva Defendants are ordered to turn over Cohen's last known personal and business contact information (mailing addresses, phone numbers, and email addresses) to Plaintiff so that a subpoena can be served for his deposition. Teva Defendants have until February 8, 2021, to file their motion to quash Boyer's deposition notice (must include a highlighted deposition transcript (in PDF) from Boyer's previous deposition and a copy of the deposition notice showing the party or parties serving the notice as exhibits). If a motion is filed, Plaintiff has until February 12, 2021, to file a response. The court will cancel Boyer's scheduled deposition if the court grants the motion to quash. Parties are ordered to file a joint status report by February 8, 2021, updating the court on the deposition dates for Kellens, Boyer, and Cohen and the initial list of witnesses Defendants wish to depose. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 932 STATUS Report (Joint) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Lucas, Amy)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 931 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: By agreement of the parties, the status hearing scheduled for February 16, 2021, will start at 3:30 p.m. by phone. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Mailed notice (ma,)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 930 RESPONSE by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to objections #919 Manufacturer Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Rule 72 Objection To Protective Order Against Cross-Notice Of Trial Preservation Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Welch, Donna)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 929 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The status hearing scheduled for February 16, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. is rescheduled for 2:00 p.m. (CST). If this new start time poses a scheduling conflict for those attorneys who must appear for the hearing, the parties may alert the court by email by noon on January 29, 2021. Mailed notice (ma,)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 928 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for leave to file notice of supplemental authority #925 is taken under advisement. Motion hearing date of 1/26/21 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 927 RESPONSE by Plaintiff City of Chicago to Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Joint Partial Motion to Dismiss (Elgersma, Kara)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 926 NOTICE of Motion by Amy R Lucas for presentment of motion for leave to file, #925 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/26/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Lucas, Amy)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 925 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Lucas, Amy)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 924 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on January 12, 2021, before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Order Number: 39937. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/11/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2021. (Lacien, Laura)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 923 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17843204. (Fiore, Mark)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 922 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone and continued to February 16, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. by phone. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Parties are to file a status report by January 29, 2021, confirming the deposition dates for those individuals Plaintiff has already identified to be deposed. This initial group of Rule 30(a)(1) depositions are to be completed by March 12, 2021. If a deposition date cannot be confirmed, the parties are to explain the reason for this failure and the deponent's identity. Plaintiff also has until January 29, 2021, to serve its Rule 30(b)(6) deposition topics. Defendants then have until February 12, 2021, to respond to Plaintiff and identify the topics that require a meet-and-confer. Mailed notice (ma,)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 921 ORDER: Defendants have filed an objection to Magistrate Judge Kim's July 1, 2020 Order granting Plaintiff City of Chicago's motion for a protective order concerning production of certain medical and pharmaceutical claims data. For the reasons that follow, the Court overrules Defendants' objection #834 . Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/19/2021. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 920 STATUS Report (Joint) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 919 OBJECTIONS to Protective Order Against Cross-Notice of Trial Preservation Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Sixth Circuit Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - San Francisco Order)(Ackerman, David)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 918 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to serve expert report on damages #917 is granted. Plaintiff now has until February 12, 2021, to do so. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 917 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for extension of time to file Expert Report on Damages (Elgersma, Kara)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 916 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendants' motion for protective order #912 is granted only to the extent that Plaintiff's cross notice for the deposition of Dr. David Kessler in MDL 2804 is stricken. Mailed notice (ma,)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 915 NOTICE by City of Chicago of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order (Ackerman, David)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 914 MEMORANDUM by City of Chicago in Opposition to motion for protective order, #912 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judge Polster's Order, #2 Exhibit B - PEC Motion, #3 Exhibit C - PEC Reply Brief)(Ackerman, David)
January 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 913 MEMORANDUM in Support of Manufacturer Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order in Response to Plaintiff's Cross Notice of Deposition of Dr. David Kessler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL PEC Motion, #2 Exhibit K. Stampfl Email, #3 Exhibit MDL Manufacturer Defs Opposition, #4 Exhibit MDL PEC Reply, #5 Exhibit Biden Closes In, #6 Exhibit In Re Abilify, #7 Exhibit Hr'g Tr. Except)(Welch, Donna)
January 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 912 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for protective order in response to Plaintiff's Cross Notice of Deposition of Dr. David Kessler (Welch, Donna)
January 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 911 NOTICE by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Manufacturer Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order in Response to Plaintiff's Cross Notice of Deposition of Dr. David Kessler (Welch, Donna)
January 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 910 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A status hearing is scheduled for January 12, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. (CST). Parties are to use the same call-in information. The purpose of the status hearing is to discuss the January 13, 2021 deposition of Dr. David Kessler in connection with MDL 2804 pending in the Northern District of Ohio. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 909 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Teva Defendants' motion for extension of time #908 is granted. Teva Defendants now have until February 8, 2021, to produce Robert Roche's custodial file to Plaintiff. Mailed notice (ma,)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 908 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. for extension of time For the Teva Defendants' Production of Robert Roche's Custodial File (Agreed) (Diamantatos, Tinos)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 907 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: This order addresses Plaintiff's objections to Defendants' Requests for Production Nos. 11 and 14. The objections are sustained without prejudice to Defendants. Request No. 11 seeks all documents pertaining to public health problems associated with the use of controlled substances. (R. 887 at 187.) Request No. 14 seeks all documents "relating to unintentional medication or drug overdose deaths in Chicago." (Id. at 193.) Plaintiff objects that the scope of these requests are overly broad and that Defendants seek information not relevant to the case. According to Plaintiff, its theory on damages is that it is entitled to recover all costs associated with city services rendered to address opioid related problems. Plaintiff explains that these opioid related problems include problems caused not only by abuse of prescription opioids, but also by abuse of heroin, Fentanyl, and other illegal opioids. Plaintiff further explains that the abuse of prescription opioids led many to abuse heroin and Fentanyl. Defendants counter that because Plaintiff is seeking costs related to the abuse of all forms of opioids, they are entitled to discover information tending to rebut the nexus or the extent of such nexus between prescription and illegal opioids. Defendants also assert that they are entitled to information on costs incurred related to non-opioid abuse in order to effectively test Plaintiff's damages calculation. Having reviewed the submissions (including Tables 1 and 2, (R. 906-1 at 2-4)) and having considered the parties' comments during the December 29, 2020 status hearing, the court is of the opinion that discovery on damages cannot be meaningful at this time because Plaintiff has not yet produced a comprehensive calculation on damages. Plaintiff's answer to Interrogatory No. 13 merely identifies the category of costs it seeks as damages in this case. Tables 1 and 2 reflect specific amounts to be recovered, but these amounts are too general in nature to give any guidance on the actual costs to be recovered. For example, many of the line items are costs incurred for addressing general "substance abuse." Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(iii), Plaintiff is obligated to disclose to Defendants its "computation of each category of damages claimed[.]" However, as far as the court is aware, Plaintiff has not done so in its Rule 26(a)(1) disclosure or in response to Interrogatory No. 13, even though the primary information Plaintiff's experts will be relying on, according to Plaintiff, consists of publicly available information and information Plaintiff itself has disclosed to Defendants. If an exact computation of damages must be performed by an expert, the court sees no reason why Plaintiff should not be required to have its experts perform such calculation now. In fact, nothing prevented Plaintiff from having its experts perform this required calculation at any point during the last six years. Plaintiff argues that it should not be required to serve expert reports before the close of fact discovery. The court disagrees. Under the circumstances of this case, fact discovery on damages cannot be meaningful without Plaintiff's damages calculation---what it seeks to recover and for what time period. As such, Plaintiff is ordered to serve Rule 26(a)(2) reports on damages to Defendants by January 29, 2021. The report must include the amounts to be claimed at trial, the underlying methodology and calculation for the amounts to be claimed, and the underlying data used to perform such calculation. This information will be useful when identifying the reasonable scope of fact discovery on damages to which Defendants are entitled. Plaintiff will be permitted to amend its experts' reports based on new information, but amendments would of course open the door to additional discovery for Defendants. This order should help the parties to either resolve the issues detailed on pages 48 through 63 in the joint status report, (R. 887), or to table them until the service of the expert reports on damages. Defendants are additionally encouraged to schedule a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition to inquire about the information reflected in Tables 1 and 2 as soon as possible. Written discovery is now closed, except for supplementing earlier discovery responses as required under Rule 26(e) and by this court and serving requests to admit and subpoenas for records. If the parties wish to serve supplemental written discovery requests, they must seek leave of court by filing a motion and attaching the proposed set of supplemental requests as an exhibit to the motion. Parties are directed to discuss each side's list of deponents prior to the next status hearing so that the court may set a deadline for completing their depositions. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 906 NOTICE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. re status report #887 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit To Supplemental Interrogatory Responses #902 )(Diamantatos, Tinos)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 905 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone and continued to January 19, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. by phone. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Defendants are ordered to file the tables referred to in Plaintiff's supplemental answer to Interrogatory No. 13, (see R. 902 at 5-6), by close of business tomorrow. If for some reason these tables include confidential information, Defendants are granted leave to file them under seal. The court will issue a follow-up order addressing Requests to Produce Nos. 11 and 14 once it reviews the tables. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 904 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17782333. (Cartmell, Thomas)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 903 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A status hearing is scheduled for December 29, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. by phone. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode s 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 902 EXHIBIT by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. / Exhibit 17 to Joint Status Report regarding status report #887 , text entry,, #891 (Mika, Caitlin)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 901 STATUS Report Per Docket No. 889 by City of Chicago (Elgersma, Kara)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 900 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for leave to file A Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemenal Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Elgersma, Kara)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 899 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In the joint status report, (R. 887), Defendants refer to Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Defendants' Interrogatory No. 13. (Id. at 34.) However, the court is unable to locate this interrogatory answer in the attachments to the status report. Defendants are ordered to file a copy of Plaintiff's answer to Interrogatory No. 13 (just the relevant pages) as Exhibit 17 or point the court to the relevant exhibit number (this identification may be accomplished by emailing the court) by noon on December 21, 2020. By this same deadline, Plaintiff is ordered to agree or disagree by way of a status report that the documents produced, (see R. 887 at 36), are not specifically related only to prescription opioids. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 898 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: On December 7, 2020, the parties filed a joint status report, (R. 887), and identified various issues they have with each other's discovery responses. This order resolves Plaintiff's issues with Teva Defendants' ("Teva") discovery responses. Plaintiff asserts that Teva's discovery responses are inadequate because Teva refuses to: (1) disclose Robert Roche's custodial file; (2) update its responses to Requests for Production Nos. 1, 6, and 8 with documents generated after early 2019; and (3) produce certain witnesses for their depositions. As for Roche's custodial file, the court agrees with Plaintiff that this file must be searched and responsive documents disclosed. While Teva argues that Plaintiff's request is untimely, Teva fails to identify any applicable order showing that Plaintiff's request for Roche's custodial file came after a set deadline. As such, the timeliness objection is overruled. As for the requested update, Plaintiff fails to respond to Teva's relevance and temporal scope argument and does not explain why the data generated after early 2019 is important to this case. Instead, Plaintiff merely points to 75 pages of its Fifth Amended Complaint, (R. 887 at 29), without any more specificity. As such, Teva's objections are sustained. As for the depositions, the court agrees with Plaintiff. Teva is correct that this court is supervising discovery in phases, but the court has not barred the parties from moving forward with depositions. If Plaintiff wishes to depose witnesses without first completing written discovery, then Plaintiff has the right to do so. Also, Teva's objection to producing Arvind Narayana and Paula Williams because their "knowledge is national in scope" is overruled. As long as these witnesses have information relevant to the claims and defenses in this case, they may be deposed. Teva is ordered to produce the subject custodial file by January 8, 2021. Teva is also ordered to disclose Narayana's last known contact information (including phone numbers and mailing and email addresses) to Plaintiff by December 23, 2020. All depositions must be conducted by phone or by video unless everyone who needs to appear for the deposition agrees to do so in person. If exhibits must be used during the phone/video depositions, the exhibits should be emailed to the opposing side within two business days prior to the depositions. Otherwise, the time spent sending exhibits (if the video platform does not allow for sharing documents) to the opposing counsel and the deponent during the deposition must be counted toward the allotted time limit. If the parties require an in-person deposition and there is no agreement, they must file a motion and explain the need for an in-person deposition. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 897 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lucas, Amy)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 896 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: On December 7, 2020, the parties filed a joint status report, (R. 887), and identified various issues they have with each other's written discovery responses. More specifically, Plaintiff asserts that document productions from Janssen Defendants ("Janssen") and Teva Defendants are inadequate. Defendants in turn argue that Plaintiff's responses to their joint requests for production of documents are inadequate. This order resolves Plaintiff's issues with Janssen's discovery responses. Plaintiff asserts that Janssen failed to produce any documents belonging to custodians Carla Cartwright and Bruce Colligen and provided inadequate responses to its Third Set of Requests for Production ("RFP") Nos. 5, 7, 8, and 10. As to Cartwright and Colligen, the court agrees with Janssen that the search of their accounts is not necessary. The court appreciates the reason Plaintiff is seeking to have their accounts searched (Janssen named these two individuals in response to Third Set of Interrogatory No. 4), but Cartwright's and Colligen's deposition testimony shows that they are far removed from the claims and defenses in this case. As such, the effort to search through their accounts is not worth Janssen's trouble. This also means that Janssen may not use Cartwright or Colligen as witnesses in this case. As for RFP No. 5, the court finds Janssen's response to be inadequate. The court finds that Janssen's desire to cabin its response to only those opioids that are at issue in this case, but the remaining objections are overruled. If Janssen did not market to formularies, then the proper response is "none." If it did, then the proper response must include the marketing materials directed at those formularies. If Janssen has already produced the responsive documents, then it must identify those documents by their Bates stamp numbers. Whatever the case may be, Janssen has until December 28, 2020, to supplement its response. As for RFP Nos. 7 & 8, the court agrees with Janssen that it should not be forced to provide responsive documents pertaining to tramadol medications. While there is a reasonable basis to assert that Schedule II opioids have caused Plaintiff to incur costs, the court has not been made aware of a similar basis on which to assert that Schedule IV opioids have done the same. (If Plaintiff wishes to explain its reasonable basis for seeking this information, it may move the court for reconsideration with additional information by December 28, 2020.) As for RFP No. 10, Janssen's scope objection is sustained. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 895 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for leave to file notice of supplemental authority #893 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 894 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #881 and #890 are granted. Attorneys Patrick Jensen and Mark Crawford are given leave to file their appearances on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 893 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Supplemental Authority, #2 Exhibit 1)(Lucas, Amy)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 892 NOTICE by City of Chicago re status report #887 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 4 to Joint Status Report)(Ackerman, David)
December 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 891 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In the joint status report, (R. 887), Plaintiff cites to Exhibit No. 4 as Janssen Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's requests for production of documents, (id at 9). However, Exhibit No. 4, (R. 887 at 101-24), is Teva Defendants' July 30, 2020 responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Production. (The court appreciates the PDF bookmarks.) Plaintiff is ordered to file a copy of Janssen Defendants' responses to the court or identify the correct exhibit number (this identification may be accomplished by emailing the court) by noon tomorrow. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 890 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17727625. (Crawford, Mark)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 889 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Third-Party Subpoena Respondent AbbVie Inc.'s motion to quash subpoena for records #872 is granted. In its motion to quash, AbbVie asserts three objections: (1) the subpoena fails to seek relevant information; (2) the subpoena imposes undue burden on AbbVie; and (3) the subpoena amounts to an attempt to circumvent discovery limits the parties negotiated. The court sustains the relevance and undue burden objections because Plaintiff's subpoena fails to seek any information relevant to the subject claims and defenses and any information Plaintiff could not have sought from the actual litigants in this case. The court overrules the third objection as it is not for AbbVie to raise. Rule 45(d)(1) demands that "[a] party or attorney responsible for issuing and serving a subpoena must take reasonable steps to avoid imposing undue burden or expense on a person subject to the subpoena." Plaintiff has failed to meet this obligation. Plaintiff opposes the motion to quash and explains that the subpoena "is directed at discovery regarding two issues: evidence concerning disputes between Allergan and Teva about which of them is liable to Plaintiff, and evidence concerning whether this Court may exercise personal jurisdiction over Allergan." (R. 884, Pl.'s Resp. at 2.) This response alone is sufficient for the court to grant the motion. In this explanation, Plaintiff essentially concedes that AbbVie has nothing to do with the information Plaintiff seeks in the subpoena. Plaintiff does not even attempt to explain why it is unable to seek the information it seeks from either Allergan or Teva. Plaintiff then goes on to explain that the subpoena seeks "other relevant data to ensure that Allergan can withstand a potential judgment in this action." (Id. at 4.) Again, Plaintiff's assertion itself shows that the subpoena seeks information not relevant to the claims and defenses in this case. AbbVie has nothing to do with this case. Accordingly, the motion to quash is granted. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 888 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The status hearing scheduled for December 14, 2020, is cancelled. The court will review the 63-page status report and issue a follow-up order rescheduling the status hearing if necessary. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 887 STATUS Report / JOINT STATUS REPORT by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mika, Caitlin)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 886 REPLY by Movant AbbVie Inc. in Support of Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoena (Cole, Jeremy)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Zachary Ryan Lazar (Lazar, Zachary)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 884 RESPONSE by City of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Movant AbbVie Inc. to quash Third-Party Subpoena #872 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Elgersma, Kara)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 883 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: This order covers Janssen Defendants' ("Janssen") issues with Plaintiff's answers to Janssen Interrogatory ("INT") Nos. 4, 7, 8, 17, 23, and 24, and Teva Defendants' ("Teva") issues with Plaintiff's answer to Teva INT No. 16. (See R. 857 at 37-40, 43, 44.) As for Janssen INT Nos. 4, 7, and 8, Plaintiff's relevance objection is sustained. Plaintiff is barred from using or calling any medical professional, whose identity is responsive to INT Nos. 4 and 8 but not disclosed, and any prescription-level information responsive to INT Nos. 7 and 8 in support of its claims in this case. As for Janssen INT Nos. 17, 23, and 24, and Teva INT No. 16, Plaintiff's objections are overruled. (See R. 879; R. 880.) As for Janssen INT No. 23, it is not at all clear that the documents Plaintiff references in its answer, (R. 858-11 at 10), respond to subparts (i) through (v). If Plaintiff does not have an answer or does not know, it must answer "None" or "Undetermined at this time." Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to supplement its answers to Janssen INT Nos. 17, 23, and 24 and Teva INT No. 16 by December 7, 2020. Mailed notice (ma,)
November 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 882 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: This order covers Endo Defendants' ("Endo") issues with Plaintiff's answers to First Set Interrogatory ("INT") No. 4, Second Set INT Nos. 3, 5, 6, 11, and 14, and Third Set INT Nos. 2 and 3. (R. 857 at 27-35.) As for No. 4, the court finds Plaintiff's answer to be adequate in that it has identified the responsive healthcare providers Plaintiff is aware of. Furthermore, Plaintiff's relevance objection is proper. But, as noted in this court's earlier order, (see R. 880), Plaintiff will be barred from using or calling any medical professional it fails to identify in response to No. 4. As for No. 3 (Second Set), Plaintiff's relevance objection is sustained. Plaintiff does not allege that its employees and agents received or that they were deceived by Endo's false information. But this also means that Plaintiff is barred from offering any information responsive to this interrogatory as evidence in this case, unless Plaintiff timely discloses such information to Endo. As for Nos. 5 and 11 (Second Set) and No. 2(v) (Third Set), Plaintiff's objections are overruled. Endo is entitled to know whether Plaintiff has any specific information about any of Endo's medications causing specific damages or harm. If Plaintiff does not, it may answer that it does not have such information at this time and that it plans to present aggregate proof, instead of specific prescription-level information, to show liability and damages. As for No. 6 (Second Set), Plaintiff's objections are overruled. (See id.) As for No. 14 (Second Set), Plaintiff's objections are overruled. Plaintiff either has its damages calculations or it does not. If it does, Plaintiff should disclose such information (such disclosure is already required under Rule 26(a)(1)) and update the information as needed. If not, Plaintiff may state, "None at this time." As for No. 3 (Third Set), Plaintiff's objections are overruled. Endo is entitled to investigate the types of information and evidence Plaintiff has to support its case-in-chief, including the types of evidence it does not possess. That said, Plaintiff can only produce information it has. If Plaintiff does not have an answer to this interrogatory, it must state, "None at this time." Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to supplement its answers to Second Set INT Nos. 5, 6, 11, and 14, and Third Set INT Nos. 2(v) and 3 by December 7, 2020. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
November 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 881 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17671037. (Jensen, Patrick)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 880 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: This order covers Allergan Defendants' ("Allergan") issues with Plaintiff's answers to Interrogatory ("INT") Nos. 6, 8-10, 19, 21, and 25. (See R. 857 at 19-26.) As for INT Nos. 6, 21, and 25, the court agrees with Allergan that these "call for bedrock information" about the misrepresentations Plaintiff accuses Allergan of making. Litigants are never required to produce information they do not have, but having sued Allergan, Plaintiff must be in possession of the information underlying its accusations. Also, a description of the documents identified in answer to No. 6 is not responsive to all of Allergan's questions. Even if Plaintiff has to update its discovery responses, as required under Rule 26(e), Allergan needs an answer to these interrogatories in order to engage in discovery more effectively. Plaintiff is advised and warned that if it fails to update its answers in a timely manner, it may be barred from offering certain evidence in this case. As for Nos. 8-10, Plaintiff's relevance objection is sustained in that Plaintiff is not required to prove reliance or actual deception. Having said that, if Plaintiff does not identify the healthcare providers sought in these interrogatories, it may not use or call them as witnesses in this case. As for No. 19, Plaintiff's objections are overruled. First, Allergan has the right to know the identity of those individuals who Plaintiff "alleges" to have become addicted or to have been harmed because of Allergan Defendants' conduct. According to the Fifth Amended Complaint, Plaintiff has information about individuals who have been harmed because of Defendants' practices. (See R. 727 at 311.) Second, the scope of the interrogatory is not overly broad because Defendants are merely seeking the identities of those individuals Plaintiff alleges became addicted or were harmed, not all Chicagoans who have been harmed. Third, individual privacy interests can be protected adequately by anonymizing the personal identifying information. Fourth, the court finds that the answer to this interrogatory may be extremely helpful to the issue of damages under Count Four and to shed light on the extent of potential anecdotal evidence Plaintiff may offer against Allergan in this case. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to supplement its answers to Nos. 6, 19, 21, and 25 by December 7, 2020. Mailed notice (ma,)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 879 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: This order covers Defendants' issues with Plaintiff's answers to Defendants' Joint Interrogatory ("INT") Nos. 1, 5, and 15. (See R. 857 at 8-18.) As for No. 1, the court sustains Plaintiff's relevance objection. As for No. 5, the court overrules Plaintiff's objections. In response to INT No. 4, Plaintiff identified 23 prescribers and 3 pharmacies (together, "HCPs") it believes to have "engaged in excessive prescribing, suspicious prescribing, excessive dispensing, diversionary conduct, or other unlawful or improper conduct[.]" (R. 858-15 at 17.) In No. 5, Defendants seek to gain more detailed information about these HCPs in order to defend against Plaintiff's claims that Defendants allowed "pill mills" to flourish in Chicago. In order to do so, Defendants have the right to examine why the HCPs identified are considered "pill mills" and how Defendants could have intervened to stop the HCPs' abusive practices. As for No. 15, Plaintiff's objections are overruled. First, Defendants have the right to know the identity of those individuals who Plaintiff "alleges" to have become addicted or harmed because of Defendants' conduct. According to the Fifth Amended Complaint, Plaintiff has information about individuals who have been harmed because of Defendants' practices. (See R. 727 at 311.) Second, the scope of the interrogatory is not overly broad because Defendants are merely seeking the identities of those individuals Plaintiff alleges became addicted or were harmed, not all Chicagoans who have been harmed. Third, individual privacy interests can be protected adequately by anonymizing the information responsive to subpart (i). Fourth, the court finds that the answer to this interrogatory may be extremely helpful to the issue of damages under Count Four and to shed light on the extent of potential anecdotal evidence Plaintiff may offer in this case. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to supplement its answers to Nos. 5 and 15 by December 7, 2020. If Plaintiff does not have an answer for No. 15, it must state, "None." Mailed notice (ma,)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 878 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: On October 16, 2020, the parties filed a joint status report, (R. 857), and identified various issues they had with a number of interrogatory answers. More specifically, Plaintiff and Defendants assert that the following interrogatory answers are inadequate: (1) Defendant Endo's answers to Interrogatory ("INT") Nos. 18 and 20 and Teva's answer to INT No. 20; (2) Plaintiff's answers to Joint INT Nos. 1, 5, and 15; (3) Plaintiff's answers to Allergan INT Nos. 6, 8-10, 19, 21, and 25; (4) Plaintiff's answers to Endo's First Set INT No. 4, Second Set INT Nos. 3, 5, 6, 11, and 14, and Third Set INT Nos. 2 and 3; (5) Plaintiff's answers to Janssen INT Nos. 4, 7, 8, 17, 23, and 24; and (6) Plaintiff's answer to Teva INT No. 16. This order addresses the interrogatory answers Plaintiff finds deficient. As for Endo's answer to INT No. 18, the court sustains Endo's scope objection and finds that limiting its answer to include only those vendors who were primarily involved in the promotion and marketing of opioid medication was proper. However, Endo's answer does not respond to the subparts ("each project or undertaking on which each vendor worked; the remuneration provided; the reason each was selected; and the reasons for termination of their retention, if applicable," (R. 858-2 at 22)). The court does not agree with Endo that the burden of identifying the responsive information to these subparts from the documents produced is the same for Plaintiff as it is for Endo. Endo must also identify the time frame it is using for purposes of answering this interrogatory. As for Endo's answer to INT No. 20, the court agrees with Endo that the SAP data post-dating November 2018 is not relevant to the investigation of the SOM process Endo used during the time period that is the subject of Plaintiff's complaint. However, Endo must amend its answer and note whether it has changed its SOM system since November 2018, and if it has, it must describe the nature of those changes. As for Teva's answer to INT No. 20, the court finds it to be incomplete in that Teva has detailed its processes to address suspicious orders, but it is not clear whether the documents it references (see R. 858-7 at 23) reflect the suspicious order data Plaintiff seeks and the actions Teva took in response to its investigations. If the referenced documents reflect this information, then Teva does not need to update its answer. However, if the referenced documents do not reflect such information, Teva must supplement its answer to this interrogatory. Accordingly, the court orders Endo and Teva to comply with the following by December 7, 2020: (1) Endo to supplement its answers to Nos. 18 and 20; and (2) Teva to supplement its answer to No. 20. Mailed notice (ma,)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 877 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Agreed motion for extension of time filed by Plaintiff and Janssen Defendants #876 is granted. Plaintiff is ordered to produce additional documents from certain police custodians' electronically stored information by December 11, 2020. By this same deadline, Janssen Defendants are ordered to produce custodial files for Greg Aronin, Tricia Kinley, and Dennis Majeskie. Mailed notice (ma,)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 876 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time to Complete Production of Certain Documents (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth Baglin, #2 Declaration of Esteban Rodriquez)(Lucas, Amy)
November 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 875 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Subpoena Respondent AbbVie, Inc.'s motion to quash subpoena #871 is entered and continued. Plaintiff is ordered to respond to the motion by November 30, 2020. Respondent then has until December 7, 2020, to file a reply. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 874 NOTICE by AbbVie Inc. of Filing Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoena (Cole, Jeremy)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 873 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc. in support of motion to quash #872 Third-Party Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cole, Jeremy)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 872 MOTION by Movant AbbVie Inc. to quash Third-Party Subpoena (Cole, Jeremy)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant AbbVie Inc. by Jeremy P. Cole (Cole, Jeremy)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Melissa DeGaetano Bertke (Bertke, Melissa)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 869 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Dean N Kawamoto (Kawamoto, Dean)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 868 MOTION by Attorney EMILY NEWHOUSE DILLINGHAM to withdraw as attorney for Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Curtis, Douglas)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Douglas Curtis (Curtis, Douglas)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Caitlin Martini Mika (Mika, Caitlin)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Rebecca J. Hillyer (Hillyer, Rebecca)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 864 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Eric W. Sitarchuk (Sitarchuk, Eric)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Justine Marise Daniels (Daniels, Justine)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 862 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Defendants' motions to appear pro hac vice #803 #836 #843 #844 are granted. Attorneys Samuel Lonergan, Justine Daniels, Mark Gaioni, and Melissa Bertke are given leave to file their appearances on behalf of Defendants. Plaintiff's motions to appear pro hac vice #807 #813 #814 #815 #816 are granted. Attorneys Dean Kawamoto, David Buchanan, Parvin Aminolroaya, Jennifer Scullion and Caleb Seeley are given leave to file their appearances on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 861 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motions to appear pro hac vice #786 #788 are granted. Attorneys Rebecca Hillyer and Eric Sitarchuk are given leave to file their appearances on behalf of Defendants. Plaintiff's motions to appear pro hac vice #791 #792 #793 #794 #795 #797 #798 are granted. Attorneys Thomas Egler, Aelish Baig, Matthew Malamed, Dorothy Antullis, Carissa Dolan, Jeffrey Gaddy and Peter Mougey are given leave to file their appearances on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 860 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Actavis Defendants' unopposed motion to file certain exhibits under seal #856 is granted. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 859 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for clarification #855 is granted to the extent that the parties are to comply with Rule 34 by November 12, 2020. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 858 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit B-1, #8 Exhibit B-2, #9 Exhibit C-1, #10 Exhibit C-2, #11 Exhibit C-3, #12 Exhibit D-1, #13 Exhibit D-2, #14 Exhibit D-3, #15 Exhibit E-1)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 857 STATUS Report Joint by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit B-1, #9 Exhibit B-2, #10 Exhibit C-1, #11 Exhibit C-2, #12 Exhibit C-3, #13 Exhibit D-1, #14 Exhibit D-2, #15 Exhibit D-3, #16 Exhibit E-1, #17 Exhibit E-2)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 856 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. for leave to file Certain Exhibits to Joint Status Report Under Seal (Diamantatos, Tinos)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 855 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago to clarify October 11, 2020 Minute Order (Elgersma, Kara)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER Regarding Protective Order and ESI Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/13/2020. (ma,)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 853 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Mallinckrodt LLC and SpecGx LLC and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (O'connor, Andrew)
October 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 852 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: As for the stipulation on protective order and ESI order, (R. 850), the parties are to email a Word version of a draft order to proposed_order_kim@ilnd.uscourts.gov by October 13, 2020, for the court's consideration. As for the stipulation regarding the deadline for producing responsive documents, (R. 851), the court will adopt the new deadline as its own, but in the future, the parties will need to file a motion and explain the good cause for needing an extension. Parties are to adhere to the following amended schedule for production of documents: (1) respond to all outstanding requests to produce by November 12, 2020; (2) confer about issues each side has with the opposing side's document production by November 30, 2020; and (3) file a joint status report by December 7, 2020, identifying the document production issues remaining after the court ordered meet and confer, along with the relevant discovery requests and responses as exhibits thereto and the names of those attorneys who will be addressing the court during the next status hearing. The status hearing scheduled for November 10, 2020, is rescheduled for December 14, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. (C.S.T.) by phone. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
October 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 851 STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding Deadline to Produce Responsive Documents (O'connor, Andrew)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 850 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Protective and ESI Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Elgersma, Kara)
October 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 849 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In the status report filed on September 24, 2020, (R. 845), the parties reported that they were conferring on various interrogatory answers to resolve their disputes. Parties are to complete their meet and confer on these interrogatory answers by October 9, 2020. If disputes still remain, the parties are to file a joint status report by October 16, 2020, identifying their unresolved disputes and attach the relevant discovery requests and responses as exhibits thereto. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 848 MOTION by Attorney Sarah M. Kimmer to withdraw as attorney for Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC. No party information provided (Kimmer, Sarah)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 847 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC by Nicholas Martin Berg (Berg, Nicholas)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 846 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The status hearing scheduled for September 29, 2020, is rescheduled for November 10, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. (C.S.T.) by phone. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Having reviewed the status report filed on September 24, 2020, (R. 845), there is no need for a hearing tomorrow. Parties are to adhere to the following schedule: (1) file either an unopposed motion or a contested motion by October 8, 2020, to replace an order entered in this case with an order entered in the MDL, (see R. 845 at 2); (2) respond to all outstanding requests to produce by October 13, 2020; (3) serve first set of requests to admit by October 20, 2020; (4) confer about issues each side has with the opposing side's document production by October 27, 2020; (5) file a joint status report by November 3, 2020, identifying the document production issues remaining after the court ordered meet and confer, along with the relevant discovery requests and responses as exhibits thereto and the names of those attorneys who will be addressing the court during the November status hearing; and (6) respond to the first set of requests to admit by December 1, 2020. Parties are to be prepared to discuss the document production issues outstanding at the next status hearing. The court declines to schedule a fact discovery deadline because it will not make this case proceed any faster. The court also declines to schedule a deadline for "the City's substantial completion of its document production" because each side has until October 13, 2020, to produce all responsive documents. Mailed notice (ma,)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 845 STATUS Report (Joint) by City of Chicago (Elgersma, Kara)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 844 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17473074. (Bertke, Melissa)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 843 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17471208. (Gaiono, Mark)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 842 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: At the request of Plaintiff, the status hearing scheduled for September 28, 2020, is rescheduled for September 29, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. (CST) by phone. Mailed notice (ma,)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 9/10/2020. (ma,)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 840 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendants' motion to compel #787 is granted in part and denied in part. Enter Order. A status hearing is scheduled for September 28, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. (CST) by phone. The conference call number for the status hearing is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Parties are to file a joint status report including the following information by September 24, 2020: (1) update on written discovery; (2) issues the parties wish to discuss during the status hearing; and (3) the names of those attorneys who will be addressing the court during the status hearing. Mailed notice (ma,)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 839 REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. In Support of Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order (Stampfl, Karl)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Evan M. Janush (Janush, Evan)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 837 Opposition to Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order by City of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Singer, Linda)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 836 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17249023. (Daniels, Justine)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 835 REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to motion to compel, #787 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Custodians, #2 Exhibit Search Terms, #3 Exhibit July 2020 Email Exchange, #4 Exhibit June 25, 2020 K. Stampfl Email)(Stampfl, Karl)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 834 OBJECTIONS by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to order on motion for protective order, text entry #823 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order re Discovery Ruling #5, #2 Exhibit 9/13/2017 E. Smith Letter, #3 Exhibit 5/8/2017 Hearing Transcript, #4 Exhibit 8/21/2017 Hearing Transcript, #5 Exhibit Report & Recommendation #1, #6 Exhibit 4/29/2019 Order re Report & Recommendation #1 & #2, #7 Exhibit Report & Recommendation #12, #8 Exhibit 11/21/2018 Order)(Stampfl, Karl)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 833 Notice of Objection by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Stampfl, Karl)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 832 RESPONSE by City of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Orth #787 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Elgersma, Kara)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk3, Docket)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 830 REPLY by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss #769 (Lifland, Charles)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 829 REPLY by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #764 (Diamantatos, Tinos)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 828 REPLY by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #766 Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 827 AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC in Support of MOTION by Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction / Mallinckrodt plc's Motion to Dismiss the Fifth Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #777 Affidavit of John Einwalter in Support of Mallinckrodt plc's Motion to DIsmiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (O'connor, Andrew)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 826 DECLARATION of Sarah M. Kimmer regarding motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #777 Declaration of Sarah M. Kimmer in Support of Mallinckrodt plc's Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'connor, Andrew)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 825 REPLY by Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #777 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction on Behalf of Defendant Mallinckrodt plc (O'connor, Andrew)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 824 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 7/1/2020. (ma,)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 823 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for protective order #721 is granted. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Mailed notice (ma,)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 822 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by ALLERGAN PLC (Stampfl, Karl)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 821 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City of Chicago Omnibus Opposition to Rule 12(b)(6) Motions to Dismiss (Singer, Linda)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 820 RESPONSE by City of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint) #764 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Plaintiff's Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint) #766 , MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss #769 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (MDL Orders), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Orders))(Singer, Linda)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 819 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City of Chicago Provisionally Sealed Opposition to Mallinckrodt's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43)(Singer, Linda)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 818 RESPONSE by City of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction / Mallinckrodt plc's Motion to Dismiss the Fifth Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #777 REDACTED VERSION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43)(Singer, Linda)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 817 MOTION by Plaintiff City of Chicago for leave to file Oppositions to Motions to Dismiss Under Seal (Elgersma, Kara)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 816 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17130739. (Seeley, Caleb)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 815 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17130727. (Scullion, Jennifer)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 814 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17130633. (Aminolroaya, Parvin)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 813 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17130555. (Buchanan, David)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 812 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/12/2020 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Order Number: 38622. Court Reporter Contact Information: Amy Spee, amyofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.

< Redaction Request due 7/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2020. (Spee, Amy)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 811 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: On June 18, 2020, this court advised the parties by email of its family connection to AbbVie, Inc., which is now affiliated with Defendant Allergan Limited, (R. 810), and invited the parties to raise any issues they may have with this court continuing to preside over this matter. Both sides responded to the court by email that there are no issues or objections. Mailed notice (ma,)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 810 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 3.2 NOTIFICATION OF AFFILIATES by ALLERGAN PLC (Welch, Donna)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 809 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 3.2 NOTIFICATION OF AFFILIATES by Actavis, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Welch, Donna)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 808 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: This court's order, (R. 802), is amended to the extent that Defendants have until July 17, 2020, to file a reply in support of their motion to compel. Mailed notice (ma,)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 807 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17108567. (Kawamoto, Dean)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Lynn Lincoln Sarko (Sarko, Lynn)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Derek W Loeser (Loeser, Derek)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 804 MOTION by Attorney J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. to withdraw as attorney for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. No party information provided (Cooney, J.)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 803 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17105431. (Lonergan, Samuel)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 802 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing and status hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for protective order #721 is taken under advisement. As for written discovery, the court orders as follows: (1) Defendants' motion to compel additional custodians, search terms, and non-custodial sources #787 is entered and continued; (2) the parties have until June 26, 2020, to confer on Defendants' motion to compel; (3) if the parties are able to resolve the motion to compel, they are to file a joint status report advising the court by June 29, 2020; (4) if the parties are unable to resolve the motion to compel, Plaintiff has until July 10, 2020, to file a response, and Defendants have until July 7, 2020, to file a reply thereto; (5) Plaintiff and Defendant Mellinckrodt are to serve their initial sets of interrogatories and requests to produce (as agreed) by June 30, 2020; (6) the parties are to serve their supplemental sets of interrogatories (Plaintiff is allotted five Corporate Group specific interrogatories and Defendants are allotted 15 global interrogatories and each Defendant Corporate Group is allotted five specific interrogatories) and requests to produce (as agreed) by June 30, 2020; and (7) all parties are to respond to interrogatories and update their prior interrogatory answers (as needed under Rule 26(e)) by July 31, 2020. As discussed, Defendants are entitled to 350 hours of depositions in this case. Once the motion to compel, (R. 787), is resolved either by agreement or by the court, the court will issue a follow-up order setting deadlines for responding to requests to produce and for serving and responding to requests to admit (30 for Plaintiff and 30 for each Defendant Corporate Group), and scheduling the court's next status hearing. Mailed notice (ma,)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 801 MOTION by Attorney Megan R. Braden to withdraw as attorney for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. No party information provided (Braden, Megan)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 800 MOTION by Attorney Jane E. Dudzinski to withdraw as attorney for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. No party information provided (Dudzinski, Jane)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 799 MOTION by Attorney Jeremy A. Menkowitz to withdraw as attorney for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. No party information provided (Diamantatos, Tinos)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 798 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17100144. (Mougey, Peter)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 797 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17100102. (Gaddy, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 796 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The call-in number for tomorrow's motion hearing is (571) 353-2300, the meeting ID is 799469540. Counsel of record who may need to address the court during the hearing will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Individuals granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Mailed notice (ma,)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 795 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17099943. (Dolan, Carissa)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 794 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17099929. (Antullis, Dorothy)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 793 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17099917. (Melamed, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 792 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17099911. (Baig, Aelish)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 791 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17099866. (Egler, Thomas)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 790 NOTICE by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis, Inc. re Opposition to Motion, #751 Exhibits 1-6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Stampfl, Karl)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 789 MEMORANDUM by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. in support of motion to compel, #787 Further Custodians, Search Terms, and Non-Custodial Sources (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Stampfl, Karl)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 788 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17097350. (Sitarchuk, Eric)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 787 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to compel Further Custodians, Search Terms and Non-custodial Sources (Stampfl, Karl)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 786 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17092948. (Hillyer, Rebecca)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 785 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 6/10/20 is stricken. The Court will rule electronically on the motion to dismiss. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 784 STATUS Report (Joint) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Lucas, Amy)
May 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 783 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendants' unopposed motion for a hearing #760 is granted. The motion hearing will take place on June 12, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. The court will also address other discovery issues after the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for protective order. The conference call number for the hearing is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. This hearing will be on the record. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 781 DECLARATION of Stephanie D. Miller regarding motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #777 (O'connor, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 780 DECLARATION of Alasdair John Fenlon regarding motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #777 (O'connor, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 779 DECLARATION of Sarah M. Kimmer regarding motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #777 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(O'connor, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 778 MEMORANDUM by Mallinckrodt PLC in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #777 (O'connor, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 777 MOTION by Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction / Mallinckrodt plc's Motion to Dismiss the Fifth Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (O'connor, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ANSWER to amended complaint (Answer to Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint #715 by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Lifland, Charles)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ANSWER to amended complaint / ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL OF ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. AND ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Dillingham, Emily)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 774 Partial ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC(Kimmer, Sarah)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 773 DECLARATION of Sarah M. Kimmer regarding motion to dismiss #769 (Lifland, Charles)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 772 Partial ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses (Plaintiff's Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint) by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Welch, Donna)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 771 DECLARATION of Charles C. Lifland regarding motion to dismiss #769 (Lifland, Charles)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 770 MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #769 (Lifland, Charles)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 769 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss (Lifland, Charles)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 768 ANSWER to amended complaint (Plaintiff's Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint) by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(Diamantatos, Tinos)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 767 MEMORANDUM by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #766 (Diamantatos, Tinos)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 766 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Plaintiff's Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint) (Diamantatos, Tinos)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 765 MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #764 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 764 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint) (Diamantatos, Tinos)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 763 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: City's motion for leave to file exhibit A to motion for leave to amend under seal #672 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 762 RESPONSE by Plaintiff City of Chicago to motion for hearing, #760 , order on motion for hearing,, text entry, #761 (Singer, Linda)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 761 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendants' motion for a telephonic hearing on Plaintiff's motion for protective order #760 is entered and continued. The court will consider this motion when evaluating Plaintiff's motion. Mailed notice (ma,)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 760 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for hearing re memorandum in support of motion,, #723 for Protective Order Concerning Production of Medical and Pharmaceutical Claims Data (Stampfl, Karl)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Emily Newhouse Dillingham (Dillingham, Emily)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 758 STIPULATION Regarding Motion to Dismiss Schedule (Elgersma, Kara)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 757 REPLY by City of Chicago to response in opposition to motion, #751 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Transcript Excerpt))(Singer, Linda)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Justin Robert Donoho (Donoho, Justin)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 755 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Pursuant to the Third Amended General Order dated 4/24/20, status hearing previously set for 5/12/20 is stricken and reset to 6/10/20 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Carole Schwartz Rendon and Justin R. Donoho (Rendon, Carole)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 752 STATUS Report (Joint) by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Lucas, Amy)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 751 RESPONSE by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for protective order Concerning Production of Medical and Pharmaceutical Claims Data #721 (Stampfl, Karl)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis, Inc. by Timothy William Knapp Corrected (Knapp, Timothy)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis, Inc. by Jennifer G. Levy Corrected (Levy, Jennifer)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis, Inc. by Martin L. Roth Corrected (Roth, Martin)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis, Inc. by Donna M. Welch Corrected (Welch, Donna)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis, Inc. by Karl Stampfl as attorney for Allergan plc (f/k/a Actavis plc); Actavis, Inc. n/k/a Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Stampfl, Karl)
April 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 745 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The court's order of March 18, 2020, is amended as follows: (1) Defendants are now ordered to file a joint response to Plaintiff's motion for protective order by April 17, 2020; (2) Plaintiff is ordered to file a single reply to the responses by May 8, 2020; and (3) the parties are to file a joint status report by April 17, 2020, regarding written discovery. Unless this court changes this schedule in response to a motion for extension of time, it will stand notwithstanding any other general orders. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 743 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The court's order of February 27, 2020, is amended as follows: (1) Defendants are now ordered to file a joint response to Plaintiff's motion for protective order by April 3, 2020; (2) Plaintiff is ordered to file a single reply to the responses by April 17, 2020; and (3) the parties are to file a joint status report by April 3, 2020, regarding written discovery. Mailed notice (ags)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 741 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's motion for leave to withdraw apperances #738 is granted. Attorney Jennifer S Pantina is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC. Motion hearing date of 3/19/20 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 740 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on March 11, 2020 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Motion Hearing. Order Number: 38263. Court Reporter Contact Information: Annette Montalvo, annette.montalvo@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2020. (Montalvo, Annette)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer S Pantina for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #738 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/19/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Pantina, Jennifer)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 738 MOTION by Attorney Jennifer Pantina to withdraw as attorney for Mallinckrodt LLC. No party information provided (Pantina, Jennifer)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER Granting the Parties' Joint Motion For Extension Of Time For Defendants' Answer Or Other Response To The Fifth Amended Complaint. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/11/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (lf, ).
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 736 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Minute entry dated 3/11/20 #735 is amended as follows: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a pretrial scheduling order #728 is denied. Magistrate Judge Kim has authority to set a briefing schedule on summary judgment. Defendants' motion for enlargement of page limits for Defendants' motion to dismiss briefing in response to the fifth amended complaint #731 is granted in part. Defendants' memoranda of law shall be limited to 75 pages. Plaintiff's response shall be 75 pages. Defendants' replies shall be 45 pages. Joint motion for extension of time for Defendants' answer or other response to the fifth amended complaint #733 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/12/20 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a brief joint status report by 5/7/20.Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 735 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a pretrial scheduling order #728 is denied. Magistrate Judge Kim has authority to set a briefing schedule on summary judgment. Defendants' motion for enlargement of page limits for Defendants' motion to dismiss briefing in response to the fifth amended complaint #73 is granted in part. Defendants' memoranda of law shall be limited to 75 pages. Plaintiff's response shall be 75 pages. Defendants' replies shall be 45 pages. Status hearing set for 5/12/20 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a brief joint status report by 5/7/20. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 734 NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Mary Kimmer for presentment of extension of time,, #733 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/11/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Kimmer, Sarah)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time for Defendants' Answer or Otherwise Response to the Fifth Amended Complaint (Joint) (Kimmer, Sarah)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 732 NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Mary Kimmer for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,, #731 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/11/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Kimmer, Sarah)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 731 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file excess pages for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Briefing in Response to the Fifth Amended Complaint (Kimmer, Sarah)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Sabrina Heron Strong (Strong, Sabrina)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 729 NOTICE of Motion by Kara Anne Elgersma for presentment of motion for order #728 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/11/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Elgersma, Kara)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 728 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for order Motion for Entry of a Pretrial Scheduling Order (Elgersma, Kara)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 727 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Unredacted Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Singer, Linda)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 726 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone. First, Plaintiff's motion for protective order #721 is entered and continued. Because this is a discovery motion, Plaintiff is not required to appear before the assigned District Judge on March 3, 2020, to present it. Defendants are ordered to file a joint response to the motion by March 19, 2020. If necessary, each Defendant may file a separate supplemental response by the same deadline. Plaintiff is ordered to file a single reply to the responses by April 2, 2020. Second, the parties are ordered to confer about written discovery by March 13, 2020. Parties should focus their discussions on written discovery still outstanding and written discovery each side needs to serve based on the Fifth Amended Complaint. Third, the parties are to file a joint status report by March 19, 2020, with an agreed written discovery plan. If the parties are unable to agree to a plan, they are to include competing plans. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by David I. Ackerman (Ackerman, David)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 724 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for protective order #721 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/3/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 723 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in support of motion for protective order #721 Concerning Production of Medical and Pharmaceutical Claims Data (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Dkt (588-2), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Dkt (1047) Order Regarding Discovery Ruling #5, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Email from Elizabeth Smith, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Letter from Elizabeth Smith, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Letter from Michael S. Bailey, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Discovery Ruling No. 5, #7 Exhibit 7 Letter from Donna M. Welch)(Singer, Linda)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 722 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to seal an unredacted version of its Fifth Amended Complaint #719 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 721 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for protective order Concerning Production of Medical and Pharmaceutical Claims Data (Singer, Linda)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Amy R Lucas (Lucas, Amy)
February 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 719 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to seal document Unredacted Fifth Amended Complaint (Singer, Linda)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 718 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: At the parties' request, the status hearing scheduled for February 26, 2020, is rescheduled for February 27, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. (C.S.T.) by phone. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 717 NOTICE by City Of Chicago re amended complaint, #715 Notice of Filing Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Fifth Amended Complaint)(Singer, Linda)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 716 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A status hearing is scheduled for February 26, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. (CST) by phone. The conference call number for the status hearing is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 715 Redacted Fifth AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, SpecGX, LLC (Singer, Linda)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 714 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's motion for leave to withdraw appearances #705 is granted. Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson is given leave to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff City of Chicago. Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #707 and #708 are granted. Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.'s motion for leave to file sur-reply responding to Plaintiff's reply #709 is granted. Defendant Mallinckrodt's LLC's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #711 and #712 are granted. Motion hearing date of 2/18/20 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the City's motion for leave to leave to file its Fifth Amended Complaint #670 is granted in part and denied in part. The City has 21 days to file its Fifth Amended Complaint in accord with the Court's Order. Motion and status hearing date of 2/18/20 is stricken. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/18/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 712 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16716622. (Davison, William)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 711 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16716453. (Pantina, Jennifer)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 710 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for leave to file, #709 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/18/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 709 MOTION by Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. for leave to file Sur-Reply Responding to Plaintiff's Reply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Sur-Reply in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Fifth Amended Complaint)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 708 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16702830. (Strong, Sabrina)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 707 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16697435. (Lucas, Amy)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 706 NOTICE of Motion by David I. Ackerman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #705 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/18/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Ackerman, David)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 705 MOTION by Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago. No party information provided (Ackerman, David)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 2/4/2020 (pk, ).
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 704 REPLY by City Of Chicago to response in opposition to motion, #700 by Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. (Singer, Linda)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 703 REPLY by City Of Chicago to response in opposition to motion,, #699 (Singer, Linda)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 702 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the pending Plaintiff's motion for leave to file its fifth amended complaint, which is contested, this court's status hearing set for January 31, 2020, is cancelled. The court will monitor the docket and issue a follow-up order when appropriate. Mailed notice (ma,)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 701 STATUS Report by City Of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Elgersma, Kara)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 700 RESPONSE by Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to amend/correct City of Chicago's Fourth Amended Complaint #670 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 699 RESPONSE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to amend/correct City of Chicago's Fourth Amended Complaint #670 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Knapp emails with Ackerman)(Welch, Donna)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 698 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/14/20 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Order Number: 37441. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2020. (Mullen, Patrick)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 697 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #695 is granted. Attorney Andrew O'Connor is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendant. Notices mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 696 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held and continued to January 31, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019. Parties reported that Defendants are to advise the court by January 28, 2020, whether they oppose the City's motion to file a fifth amended complaint. By this same deadline, the parties are ordered to file a status report summarizing the discovery that took place in the Northern District of Illinois and the discovery orders this court issued. (Parties may include this summary in Defendants' status report on the amended complaint if they wish.) Mailed notice (ma,)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 695 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16610465. (O'connor, Andrew)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC by Sarah Mary Kimmer (Kimmer, Sarah)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 693 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for leave to withdraw appearances #680 is granted. Attorneys Thomas A. Doyle, Bryan D. Pasciak, and Adam Prom are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff City of Chicago. Defendants' motion for withdrawal as counsel #685 is granted. Attorneys Scott D. Stein and Michael P. Doss are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc., and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Motion hearing dates of 1/15/20 and 1/16/20 are stricken. Notices mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Sarah Elizabeth Wilbanks (Wilbanks, Sarah)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 691 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A status hearing is scheduled for January 14, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019. Out-of-state attorneys of record may appear for the hearing by phone. The conference call number for the status hearing is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Wendy West Feinstein (Feinstein, Wendy)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 689 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision; settlement conference. (lf, )Notice mailed by judge's staff.
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 686 NOTICE of Motion by Scott David Stein for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #685 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/16/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Stein, Scott)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 685 MOTION by Attorney Scott D. Stein and Michael P. Doss to withdraw as attorney for Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Stein, Scott)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Tariq M. Naeem (Naeem, Tariq)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Brittany Lynne Weiss (Weiss, Brittany)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jennifer Lynn Steinmetz (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 688 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #679 is granted. Attorney Wendy West Feinstein is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, and Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 687 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. City of Chicago's motion for leave to file an amended complaint #670 is taken under advisement. Defendants response to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint shall be filed by 1/28/20. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed by 2/11/20. Defendants shall answer Plaintiff's complaint by 2/11/20. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for discovery supervision, with authority to set and extend deadlines, and a settlement conference. The parties are directed to meet and confer and regarding discovery and file a joint status report by 1/28/20. Status hearing set for 2/18/20 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 681 NOTICE of Motion by Bethany R. Turke for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #680 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Turke, Bethany)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 680 MOTION by Attorney Thomas A. Doyle, Bryan D. Pasciak, Adam Prom to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago. No party information provided (Turke, Bethany)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 679 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16587557. (Feinstein, Wendy)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Umar Sattar (Sattar, Umar)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sherry Ann Knutson (Knutson, Sherry)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 676 RECEIVED from Northern District of Ohio; Case Number 1:17-OP-45169 documents numbered 3055, consisting of: a certified copy of MDL Remand Order and a copy of the Northern District of Ohio's docket sheet. (kp, )
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 675 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file #672 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/7/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 674 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Exhibit 3 regarding MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to Amend Under Seal #672 (Singer, Linda)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 673 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Exhibit 1 regarding MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to Amend Under Seal #672 (Singer, Linda)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 672 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to Amend Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Fifth Amended Complaint)(Singer, Linda)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 671 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion to amend/correct #670 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/7/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 670 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to amend/correct City of Chicago's Fourth Amended Complaint (Singer, Linda)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 669 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/2/17 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2018. (Labella, Nancy)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 668 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/23/17 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2018. (Labella, Nancy)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 667 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/21/17 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2018. (Labella, Nancy)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 666 NOTICE of Correction for unnumbered entry file date 12/21/2017. (jjr, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Northern District of Ohioas case 1:17-op-45169, filed 12/22/2017. (jjr, )
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio as case 1:17-op-45169, filed 12/21/2017. (ags, )
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 665 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #664 , #662 , #663 sent to Attorney Jason L Drori returned as: Other mail system problem. Mailed to attorney Jason L Drori a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, )
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 664 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio the electronic record. (jjr, )
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 663 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 662 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of Ohio. (jjr, )
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2804 Conditional Transfer Order filed 12/20/2017. (jjr, )
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Minute entry dated 11/16/17 #659 is amended as follows: Status hearing held and continued to 1/9/18 at 9:00 a.m. Remainder of order to stand. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 660 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the stay granted by the assigned District Judge, the parties are no longer required to file a joint status report by December 1, 2017, or appear for a status hearing on December 5, 2017. The court will monitor the docket and issue a follow-up order when appropriate. Mailed notice (Kim, Young)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 1/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion to stay pending decision by JPML on a motion to transfer #639 is granted. Defendants' pending motions to dismiss #492 , #494 , #501 , #508 , #513 , and #639 are moot. Parties shall file a joint status report before the next status hearing. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 658 REPLY by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to motion to stay, #639 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 1)(Stoll, R.)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 657 RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multi #639 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Singer, Linda)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Jane E. Dudzinski (Dudzinski, Jane)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Megan Rose Braden (Braden, Megan)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Jeremy A. Menkowitz (Menkowitz, Jeremy)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Brian M. Ercole (Ercole, Brian)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 652 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, and Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc's applications to appear pro hac vice #650 and #651 are granted. Attorneys Jeremy A. Menkowitz and Brian M. Ercole are given leave to file appearance forms on behalf of Defendants. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 651 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13756711. (Ercole, Brian)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13756621. (Menkowitz, Jeremy)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Steven A. Reed (Reed, Steven)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr (Cooney, J.)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 646 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion to stay pending decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a motion to transfer #639 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 11/10/17. Defendants' reply in support shall be filed by 11/14/17. Defendants Acquired Actavis Entities' motion for substitution of counsel #643 is granted. Motion hearing date of 11/7/17 is stricken. Status hearing set for 11/16/17 at 9:00 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 645 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion to compel [ #623 #624 ] is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted to the extent that Janssen Defendants ("Janssen") are to add six of the ten custodians sought in Plaintiff's motion to Janssen's ESI search. There is ample information to establish that the accounts of these six custodians should be searched for the reasons argued by Plaintiff, but Janssen never explained to Plaintiff in detail why a search of their accounts would yield mostly duplicate documents and why Janssen is unable to de-dupe the search result to identify only unique documents. The motion is denied to the extent that Janssen is not required to search the accounts of the four support individuals with initials HM, CI, JH, and LB identified on page 4 of the motion. Although Plaintiff is correct that Janssen did not specify the exact burden it must bear to search these accounts, the information it has provided about them is sufficient for the court to find that spending resources looking into their electronic drawers is not sensible. Mailed notice (ma,)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 644 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #643 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 643 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to substitute attorney For Substitution of Counsel (Diamantatos, Tinos)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 642 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #635 is granted. Appearance is not necessary on November 2, 2017, to present this motion. Mailed notice (ma,)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 641 NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of motion to stay, #639 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/2/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 640 MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. in support of motion to stay, #639 Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Stoll, R.)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 639 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer (Stoll, R.)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 638 REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion to compel #624 (Ackerman, David)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 637 SEALED REPLY by City Of Chicago to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago #623 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Ackerman, David)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 636 NOTICE of Motion by David I. Ackerman for presentment of motion for leave to file #635 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 11/2/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Ackerman, David)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 635 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Reply Memorandum Under Seal (Ackerman, David)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 634 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants ALLERGAN PLC and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc's motion to withdraw as counsel #627 is granted. Attorney Jason R. Parish is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 633 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion and status hearing held by phone. Janssen Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal #629 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to compel [ #623 , #624 ] is entered and continued. Plaintiff has until October 30, 2017, to file its reply in support of its motion. The court will rule electronically. Parties are ordered to complete their discussions on ESI search terms by November 3, 2017. If there are any remaining issues, parties are to file a joint motion for a ruling on ESI search terms by November 13, 2017, with each side identifying the search terms they wish to use. Parties are ordered to also file a joint status report by December 1, 2017, identifying any other discovery disputes and including a chart showing the status of Plaintiff's subpoenas for records. A status hearing is scheduled for December 5, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. by phone. Mailed notice (ma,)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 632 RESPONSE by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago #623 , MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Include Relevant Custodians in its ESI Searches #624 (REDACTED) (Lifland, Charles)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 631 SEALED RESPONSE by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago #623 , MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Include Relevant Custodians in its ESI Searches #624 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lifland, Charles)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 630 NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of motion to seal #629 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/26/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Lifland, Charles)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 629 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Compel Under Seal. (Lifland, Charles) (Docket Text Modified on 10/24/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 628 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a motion to compel under seal #621 is granted. Plaintiff has already filed the unredacted version of the motion as document No. 623 under seal and the redacted public version of the motion without exhibits as document No. 624. Mailed notice (ma,)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 627 MOTION by Attorney Jason R. Parish to withdraw as attorney for ALLERGAN PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Levy, Jennifer)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 626 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #623 , #621 , #624 , #622 , #625 sent to Attorney Jason R. Parish returned as: Unknown Address Error. The Clerk telephoned Jason R. Parish, no contact made. Mailed to attorney Jason R. Parish a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 625 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of Sealed motion #623 , motion to compel #624 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/23/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Singer, Linda)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 624 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Include Relevant Custodians in its ESI Searches (Singer, Linda)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 623 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Singer, Linda)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 622 NOTICE of Motion by David I. Ackerman for presentment of motion to seal #621 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/23/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Ackerman, David)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 621 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for Leave to File the Motion to Compel Under Seal. (Ackerman, David) (Docket Text Modified on 10/18/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 620 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice #619 is granted. Attorney David I. Ackerman is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 619 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13642637. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ackerman, David)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 618 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Depomed, Inc.'s motion to withdraw as local counsel #616 is granted. Attorneys Mariah E Moran and David J. Stetler are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant. Motion hearing date of 10/3/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 617 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #616 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/3/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 616 MOTION by Attorney David J. Stetler and Mariah E. Moran to withdraw as attorney for DEPOMED, INC.. No party information provided (Moran, Mariah)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Kara Anne Elgersma (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Elgersma, Kara)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 614 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and Purdue Frederick Company's applications to appear pro hac vice #611 and #612 are granted. Attorneys Hayden A. Coleman and Sheila L Birnbaum are given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of those Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 612 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13595263. (Sheila, Birnbaum)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 611 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13595171. (Coleman, Hayden)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #612 , #610 , #611 sent to Attorney Mark S Cheffo returned as:Unknown Address Error.Mailed to attorney Mark S Cheffo a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 610 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Allergan PLC, Actavis PLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s application to appear pro hac vice #609 is granted. Attorney Jason R. Parish is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 609 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13580014. (Parish, Jason)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 608 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and Purdue Frederick Company's application to appear pro hac vice #607 is granted. Attorney Mark S. Cheffo is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of those Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jennifer G. Levy Corrected (Levy, Jennifer)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jennifer G. Levy (Levy, Jennifer)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 607 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark S. Cheffo Filing fee $ 50, Receipt Number: 4624188437. (eaa, )
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 604 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendants' joint motion to compel #588 is granted. The motion is granted to the extent that Plaintiff will be required to respond to Defendants interrogatories and production requests seeking identification of the following after the close of party written discovery and third-party (except health care providers and patients) written discovery: (1) the prescription claims submitted to and paid for by Plaintiff that it asserts were medically unnecessary and to whom they were written; (2) the physicians or health care providers who wrote the prescriptions Plaintiff alleges to have been medically unnecessary; and (3) Plaintiff's basis for identifying the prescription claims to be "medically unnecessary." The court will set the response deadline at the next status hearing, if possible. Mailed notice (ma,)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion to compel #586 is granted. The motion is granted only to the extent that for the opioid products at issue in this litigation that the FDA approved or Defendants acquired prior to January 1, 2004, the time period for responding to Plaintiffs discovery requests for marketing plan documents, communications related to marketing plans, sales training materials, and marketing materials shall start on January 1, 2004. Defendants must also provide their products' launch plans and communications relating to the launch plans. For the opioid products that the FDA approved or Defendants acquired after January 1, 2004, the time period for responding to Plaintiffs discovery requests for marketing plan documents, communications related to marketing plans, sales training materials, and marketing materials shall start one year prior to the product's approval or acquisition date. Defendants (including Endo to the extent that it has agreed to produce documents), shall have until October 23, 2017, to comply with this order. A status hearing is scheduled for October 23, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. by phone for an update on written discovery. The conference call number for the status hearing is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 602 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice #601 is granted. Attorney Jennifer Levy is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 601 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13485100. (Levy, Jennifer) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's office on 8/16/2017.
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Timothy William Knapp (Knapp, Timothy)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Martin Louis Roth (Roth, Martin)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Donna M. Welch (Welch, Donna)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 597 REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to motion to compel,, #588 in Support of Their Joint Motion to Compel Phased Identification of the Medically Unnecessary Claims at Issue (Attachments: #1 Index of Supplemental Exhibits, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Stoll, R.)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 596 REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion to compel #586 re. temporal scope of discovery (Nelson, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Bryan D Pasciak (Pasciak, Bryan)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 594 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties' agreed motion for an extension of time to file reply briefs #592 is granted. Appearance is not required on August 10, 2017, to present this motion. Parties now have until August 9, 2017, to file their reply in support of their motion to compel. Mailed notice (ma,)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 593 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #592 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 8/10/2017 at 12:00 PM. (Singer, Linda)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 592 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time to file response/reply (Singer, Linda)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 591 RESPONSE by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel - Temporal Scope of Discovery #586 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Declaration of Robert S. Hoff, #9 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 1, #10 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 2, #11 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 3, #12 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 4, #13 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 5, #14 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 6, #15 Declaration of Matthew Day)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion to compel,, #588 and The City of Chicago's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Phased Identification of the Medically Unnecessary Claims at Issue (ECF 588) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Motion in Janssen Litigation), #2 Exhibit B (Order in Eli Lilly Litigation), #3 Exhibit C (Order in janssen Litigation))(Doyle, Thomas)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 589 STATEMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicagoin Support of MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel - Temporal Scope of Discovery #586 -- Amendment to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Temporal Scope of Discovery) (ECF 586) (Doyle, Thomas)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 588 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to compel Phased Identification of the Medically Unnecessary Claims at Issue (Joint) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Appendix 1)(Stoll, R.)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 587 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Charles Nelson for presentment of motion to compel #586 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 8/21/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Nelson, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel - Temporal Scope of Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Nelson, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 585 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #583 is granted. Appearance is not necessary on July 17, 2017, to present this motion. The court adopts the parties' amended agreed briefing schedule for motions to compel written discovery as follows: (1) motions to compel are now due by July 19, 2017; (2) responses to the motions are now due by August 2, 2017; and (3) replies thereto are now due by August 7, 2017. The August 21, 2017 hearing date to stand. Mailed notice (ma,)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 584 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Charles Nelson for presentment of extension of time #583 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 7/17/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Nelson, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 583 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time for briefing the motions to compel written discovery (Nelson, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s motion to withdraw appearance of counsel #580 is granted. Attorney Melissa A Ku is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. Motion hearing date of 7/13/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 581 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua M. Davis for presentment of motion to withdraw #580 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/13/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Joshua)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 580 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to withdraw appearance of Melissa Ku (Davis, Joshua)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 579 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw the appearance of Michael J. Dolesh as one of its counsel #577 is granted. Attorney Michael J. Dolesh is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 7/11/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 578 NOTICE of Motion by Fiona A Burke for presentment of motion to withdraw #577 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/11/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Burke, Fiona)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to withdraw the appearance of Michael J. Dolesh as one of its counsel (Burke, Fiona)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Ana M. Francisco (Francisco, Ana)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 575 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice #574 is granted. Attorney Ana M. Francisco is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 574 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13286827. (Francisco, Ana)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Today's status hearing is cancelled. The court adopts the parties' agreed briefing schedule for motions to compel written discovery as follows: (1) motions to compel are due by July 12, 2017; (2) responses to the motions are due by July 26, 2017; and (3) replies thereto are due by July 31, 2017. A hearing on the motions will take place on August 21, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019, if the court does not rule on the motions electronically before then. Mailed notice (ma,)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sean O. Morris (Morris, Sean)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 571 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s application to appear pro hac vice #570 is granted. Attorney Sean O. Morris is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 570 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13236917. (Morris, Sean)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Endo Health Solutions's motion to withdraw as attorney #567 is granted. Attorney Peter Vincent Baugher is given leave to withdrawn as counsel for Defendant. Motion hearing date of 6/7/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 568 NOTICE of Motion by Peter Vincent Baugher for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #567 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Baugher, Peter)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 567 MOTION by Attorney Peter V. Baugher to withdraw as attorney for Endo Health Solutions. No party information provided (Baugher, Peter)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 566 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/8/17 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2017. (Labella, Nancy)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 565 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/27/17 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2017. (Labella, Nancy)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 564 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held. Parties have until June 7, 2017, to meet and confer to resolve their written discovery issues. A follow-up status hearing is scheduled for June 16, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. by phone to discuss whether any written discovery issues remain unresolved. If so, the court will issue a briefing schedule for cross-motions to compel. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jonathan L. Stern (Stern, Jonathan)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 562 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/5/2017. (ma,)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 561 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The court treats the parties' stipulation order, (R. 556), as a joint request to have a stipulated order regarding discovery of ESI entered and grants the same. Enter Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Mailed notice (ma,)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 560 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s application to appear pro hac vice #559 is granted. Attorney Jonathan L. Stern is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 559 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13139563. (Stern, Jonathan)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 STATUS Report Discovery Issues by City Of Chicago (Singer, Linda)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 557 STATUS Report (Defendants' Joint Supplemental) by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Wolf, Gretchen)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 556 STIPULATION Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (Nelson, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by David Barry Goroff (Goroff, David)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Thomas Arthur Doyle (Doyle, Thomas)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 553 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: At the parties' request, the April 24, 2017 status hearing is rescheduled for May 8, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Parties are ordered to file any supplements, jointly or separately, to the April 14, 2017 joint status report by May 3, 2017, identifying their outstanding discovery disputes, if any. Also, at the request of the parties, they are permitted to serve requests for production and interrogatories up to the numerical limitations specified in the December 19, 2016 order through and including May 3, 2017. Parties may seek leave of court to serve supplemental discovery requests at a later time for good cause. Mailed notice (ma,)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 552 STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 551 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice #550 is granted. Attorney Robert S Hoff is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 550 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13046452. (Hoff, Robert)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 549 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice #548 is granted. Attorney Elizabeth Smith is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 548 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13037542. (, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 547 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice #545 is granted. Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 546 PAYMENT by City Of Chicago of Pro Hac Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13032284. (Nelson, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 545 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $50, receipt number 0752-13032263. (Nelson, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/4/2017 (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office)(pk, ).
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 3/3/2017. (ma,)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 543 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties in this case are ordered to amend and supplement their Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by March 17, 2017. Enter Order. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 27, 2017