Matthews v. Debus et al
Plaintiff: |
Euron Matthews |
Defendant: |
Jake Debus, Michael Janovyak, Jason Prokop, Dave Adams, Michael F. O'Leary, Brian Fink, Paul Kaupas and Will County |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv06003 |
Filed: |
August 4, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Will |
Presiding Judge: |
Matthew F. Kennelly |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 6, 2020 |
Filing
218
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/6/2020: For the reasons in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies Matthews's motion for a new trial [dkt. no. 201]. The Court also declines to award costs to defendants [dkt. no. 207]. The Court grants Matthews's motion to recover costs [dkt. no. 212] and awards his counsel $26,307.17. (mk)
|
February 22, 2020 |
Filing
186
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/22/2020: The Court rules on the parties' motions in limine as set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order. (mk)
|
February 17, 2020 |
Filing
180
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/17/2020: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants plaintiff's motion to reconsider [dkt. no. 144] and vacates its ord er of March 19, 2018 to the extent it granted summary judgment in favor of defendants Debus, Janovyak, and Prokop on plaintiff's excessive force claim regarding the incident at the nurse's office on August 4, 2013. That claim will proceed to trial along with plaintiff's remaining claims. (mk)
|
March 19, 2018 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/19/2018. For the reasons stated, the Court grants defendants' motion for summary judgment in part and denies it in part [dkt. no. 70] and terminates Matthews' "motion against summary judgment" [dkt. no. 84]. Defendants Adams, Beckman, and Hannon are entitled to summary judgment; defendants Debus, Janovyak, and Prokop are not. The case is set for a status hearing on April 3, 2018 at 8:45 a.m. Defendants' attorney is directed to make arrangements for plaintiff to participate by telephone. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?