Medical Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Medical Mutual of Ohio
Defendant: AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Products, Inc., SOLVAY AMERICA, INC., SOLVAY NORTH AMERICA, LLC, Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc, SOLVAY PHARMACEUTICALS, SARL, SOLVAY, S.A., Auxilium Pharmaceuticals Inc., Eli Lilly & Company, Lilly USA, Inc., ACRUX, Actavis PLC, Actavis, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Anda, Inc. and Lilly USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv08857
Filed: November 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 465 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/14/2019: For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants defendants' motion for summary judgment [413, 427]. All other pending motions are terminated as moot, except for the motion to withdraw the appearance of attorney Redi Kasollja, which is granted 463 . The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 135 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on MMO's Motion for Leave to Amend the Third Amended Complaint in Med. Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie Inc., No. 14 C 8857), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/11/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies in part and grants in part MMO's motion for leave to amend [dkt. no. 389]. MMO is given leave to delete its allegations regarding the drug Testopel. MMO' ;s motion is otherwise denied. The case is set for a case management conference, to be conducted by telephone, on September 13, 2018 at 11:15 a.m. Chicago time. Defense counsel are to set up a call-in number and are to advise all counsel and the Court by the close of business on September 12, 2018. Counsel should be prepared to discuss all remaining discovery and pretrial deadlines as well as the trial date. (mk)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 130 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on MMO's Motion for Class Certification, MMO's Daubert Motions, and Defendants' Daubert Motions in Med. Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie Inc., No. 14 C 8857), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/26/2018. (mk)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 104 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on defendants' motion for order that plaintiff may not claw back documents in Med. Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie Inc., No. 14 C 8857), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/14/2018. (mk)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/2/2016: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court dismisses Medical Mutual's claims in its third amended complaint against Ac tavis and GSK under 18 U.S.C. § 1962(c) (counts four, nine, fourteen, and nineteen), as well as the negligent misrepresentation claims asserted against Actavis and GSK in count twenty-six. The Court otherwise denies defendants' motion to d ismiss. Defendants' motion for reconsideration has been taken into account in the Court's ruling and is therefore terminated as moot. Defendants are directed to answer the remaining claims by no later than August 31, 2016. The parties are directed to discuss and attempt to agree upon a discovery schedule and are to be prepared to discuss this at the upcoming August case management conference. (mk)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order (Corrected): The Court directs the Clerk to strike docket entry 138. The Court is issuing a corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order to correct scrivener's errors on pages 17, 21, 26, 28, 40, 41, 44, and 50 of docket entry 138. In particular, the material deleted from page 50 does not and did not represent the views of the Court. For the reasons discussed in the accompanying corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants defendants' motion to dis miss in part and denies it in part. The Court dismisses all claims against Solvay S.A. and Solvay America, Inc. for lack of personal jurisdiction. As for the remaining defendants, the Court declines to dismiss plaintiff's claims under 18 U.S.C. § 1962(d) (counts twenty-one through twenty-five) and its claims for negligent misrepresentation. The Court dismisses the remaining claims against all remaining defendants except for Oscient, Besins Inc., and Besins Healthcare, S.A., which have not filed motions to dismiss. Because these defects are the type that may be cured by amendment, the dismissal of these claims is with leave to amend, on or before March 3, 2016. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/5/2016: Mailed notice (am)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/3/2016. For the reasons discussed in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants defendants' motion to dismiss in part and denies it in part. The Court dismisses all claims against Solvay S.A. and Solvay America, Inc. for lack of personal jurisdiction. As for the remaining defendants, the Court declines to dismiss plaintiff's claims under 18 U.S.C. § 1962(d) (counts twenty-one throug h twenty-five) and its claims for negligent misrepresentation. The Court dismisses the remaining claims against all remaining defendants except for Oscient, Besins Inc., and Besins Healthcare, S.A., which have not filed motions to dismiss. Because these defects are the type that may be cured by amendment, the dismissal of these claims is with leave to amend, on or before March 3, 2016. (mk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medical Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLVAY AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLVAY NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLVAY PHARMACEUTICALS, SARL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLVAY, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auxilium Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilly USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACRUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilly USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Mutual of Ohio
Represented By: John Randolph Davis
Represented By: Luke Hasskamp
Represented By: Thomas J. Poulin
Represented By: W. Scott Simmer
Represented By: Conlee Schell Whiteley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?