Cochran v. Illinois State Toll Highway Authority et al
Plaintiff: |
Jeffrey D Cochran |
Defendant: |
Illinois State Toll Highway Authority, Paula Wolff, James J Banks, Terrence D'Arcy, Mark W. Peterson, Jeffrey Redick, James Sweeney, Earl Dotson, Tom Weisner and David Gonzalez |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv09145 |
Filed: |
November 13, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside the State of IL |
Presiding Judge: |
Manish S. Shah |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/15/2015: The motion to dismiss 37 is granted. Cochran's state-law claims are dismissed without prejudice. His federal claims are dismissed with prejudice. Enter judgment in favor of defendants, and terminate civil case. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
|
March 27, 2015 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 3/27/2015: Defendants' motions to dismiss 21 and 22 are granted. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice to amend by April 17, 2015. If no amendment is filed by April 17, 2015, the dismissal will convert to one with prejudice. Status hearing remains set for 4/10/15 at 9:30 a.m. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Cochran v. Illinois State Toll Highway Authority et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D Cochran |
Represented By: |
George W. Cochran, III |
Represented By: |
Thomas Cusack Cronin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Illinois State Toll Highway Authority |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Paula Wolff |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: James J Banks |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Terrence D'Arcy |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Mark W. Peterson |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jeffrey Redick |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: James Sweeney |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Earl Dotson |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Tom Weisner |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: David Gonzalez |
Represented By: |
Jennifer E. Bugaj |
Represented By: |
Max E. Dehn |
Represented By: |
Alexander E. Goetsch |
Represented By: |
Ronald D. Holman, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?