Cohn v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melissa L Cohn and Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc.
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc. and Victor Ciardelli, III
Case Number: 1:2014cv09369
Filed: November 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On 12/18/2017, the Court dismissed this case without prejudice and with leave to reinstate by 8/15/2018. No party having sought reinstatement, the case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (gel, ) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct clerical error (gel, ).
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon Defendant's representation, this case (including Defendant's counterclaim) is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The status hearing previously set for 12/20/17 is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Absent reinstatement by 8/15/18, the dismissal will become one with prejudice without further order. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court's 12/11/17 Order inadvertently dismissed this entire case, when, in fact, the stipulation #100 addressed Plaintiff's claim only. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Defendant's counterclaim, however, remains pending at this time, and the language in the Court's order terminating this case is stricken. The status hearing previously set for 12/20/17 stands. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the stipulation to dismiss #100 , this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. All pending deadlines and hearings are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Wallach, William)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: At the parties' request, the status hearing previously set for 12/6/17 is stricken and reset for 12/20/17 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: At the parties' request, the motion hearing previously set for 11/29/17 is stricken and reset for 12/6/17 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 2303. If the parties file a stipulation of dismissal prior to 12/6/17, the Court will strike that date as well. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral agreed motion to reset Defendant's motion for sanctions and modification of the discovery deadline is granted. Defendant's motion for sanctions and modification of the discovery deadline #87 previously set for 11/15/17 is reset for 11/29/2017 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. in support of its renewed motion for sanctions and modification of the discovery deadline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Rosenman, Andrew)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM by Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. in Opposition to motion for sanctions #87 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa Cohn, #2 Exhibit A to Certification of Melissa Cohn)(Wallach, William)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties agreed motion proposing stipulated briefing schedule #91 is moot in light of the Court's order of 9/29/17. See #92 . The 10/5/17 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The discovery cutoff is stayed pending resolution of the motion for sanctions. The Court will set a new discovery deadline in a future order. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S. Rosenman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #91 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/5/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rosenman, Andrew)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for sanctions and modification of the discovery deadline #87 is entered and continued to 11/15/17 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion by 10/13/17, and Defendant may file a reply by 10/20/17. The 10/3/17 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The status hearing previously set for 11/1/17 is also stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. PROPOSING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON GUARANTEED RATE, INC.S RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND MODIFICATION OF THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE (Dkt. No. 87) (Agreed) (Rosenman, Andrew)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 EXHIBIT by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Corrected Exhibit C Declaration of Andrew S. Rosenman) regarding memorandum in support of motion #88 (Rosenman, Andrew)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S. Rosenman for presentment of motion for sanctions #87 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/3/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rosenman, Andrew)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. in support of motion for sanctions #87 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rosenman, Andrew)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. for sanctions and modification of the discovery deadline (RENEWED) (Rosenman, Andrew)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Counter Claimants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Rumsin Audisho Khoshaba (Khoshaba, Rumsin)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:The parties' agreed motion to extend discovery deadline and dispositive motion briefing schedule #83 is granted in part. The deadline for fact and expert discovery is extended to 10/31/17. The dispositive motion schedule is vacated, and the case is set for a status hearing on 11/1/17 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. The parties should be prepared at that time to set a revised dispositive motion schedule and a trial date. The 7/11/17 Notice of Motion date and 8/2/17 status hearing dates are stricken, as is the 11/29/17 motion hearing date. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S. Rosenman for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #83 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/11/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rosenman, Andrew)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery (Agreed Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline and Briefing Schedule on Dispositive Motions) (Rosenman, Andrew)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY by Plaintiff Melissa L Cohn, Counter Defendant Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. to answer to amended complaint,, counterclaim, #77 to counterclaim (Wallach, William)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AGREED AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/20/2017. Mailed notice(gel, )
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's unopposed motion for entry of a protective order #78 is granted. Enter Agreed Amended Confidentiality Order. The 4/25/2017 motion hearing is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The status hearing set for 8/2/2017 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725 stands. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S. Rosenman for presentment of motion for order #78 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/25/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rosenman, Andrew)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. for order Agreed Motion for Entry of Amended Confidentiality Order. (Rosenman, Andrew) (Docket Text Modified on 4/20/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ANSWER to amended complaint (Guareenteed Rate, Inc's Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Melissa L. Cohn and Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc's Third Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM filed by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. against Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. . by Guaranteed Rate, Inc.(Rosenman, Andrew)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 THIRD AMENDED complaint by Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. against All Defendants and Jury Demand (Wallach, William)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 1/18/2017. Oral motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted. Fact and Expert discovery shall be completed on or before 7/31/2017. Status hearing set for 8/2/2017 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Parties should be prepared to set a trial date at the next hearing. Any dispositive motion shall be filed on or before 8/31/2017; response shall be filed on or before 9/21/2017; reply shall be filed on or before 9/28/2017. Motion hearing set for 11/29/2017 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held. Attorney William Wallach appeared by phone. Status hearing set for 1/18/17 at 9:45 a.m. Attorney Wallach is granted leave to appear by phone at the next hearing. In the interim, the parties shall resolve any electronic discovery issues prior to the next court appearance. The Court will set a hard fact discovery close date, a dispositive motion schedule and a trial date at the next status hearing. Mailed notice (ep, )
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral agreed motion to reset motion hearing is granted. Motion hearing previously set for 12/12/2016 is reset for 12/20/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/8/2016. Mailed notice(gel, )
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant's motion to compel discovery, for spoliation sanctions, and to extend the discovery deadline #63 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion hearing previously set for 12/12/2016 to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the motion hearing previously set for 12/13/2016 is reset for 12/12/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to motion to compel #63 (Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery, For Spoliation Sanctions and to Extend the Discovery Deadline) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15, #2 Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19, #6 Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit 21)(Rosenman, Andrew)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE by Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to compel discovery, for spoliation sanctions and to extend the discovery deadline #63 (Attachments: #1 Declaration COHN CERTIFICATION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND OTHER RELIEF, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS TO COHN CERTIFICATION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND OTHER RELIEF)(Wallach, William)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral agreed motion to reset motion hearing is granted. Motion hearing previously set for 12/8/2016 is reset for 12/13/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The motion hearing set for 11/3/2016 is stricken and reset for 12/8/2016 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' response to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, For Spoliation Sanctions and to Extend The Discovery Deadline #63 shall be filed on or before 11/15/2016. Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's reply in support of its Motion to Compel Discovery, For Spoliation Sanctions and to Extend The Discovery Deadline shall be filed on or before 11/22/2016. The status hearing previously set for 11/15/2016 is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S. Rosenman for presentment of motion to compel #63 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/3/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Rosenman, Andrew)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. in support of motion to compel #63 discovery, for spoliation sanctions and to extend the discovery deadline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Rosenman, Andrew)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to compel discovery, for spoliation sanctions and to extend the discovery deadline (Rosenman, Andrew)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties' joint motion for extension of discovery deadline #60 is granted, and fact discovery is extended to 11/11/16. The 8/25/16 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Additionally, the status hearing previously scheduled for 9/13/16 is stricken and reset to 11/15/16 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S. Rosenman for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #60 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/25/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Rosenman, Andrew)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery (Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline) (Rosenman, Andrew)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/28/2016. Mailed notice(gel, )
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties' joint motion for entry of an agreed confidentiality order #56 is granted. Enter Agreed Confidentiality Order. The 6/30/16 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S. Rosenman for presentment of motion for order #56 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/30/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Rosenman, Andrew)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. for order of Agreed Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order)(Rosenman, Andrew)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Victor Ciardelli, III, Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Andrew S. Rosenman (Rosenman, Andrew)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for withdrawal and substitution of counsel #52 is granted. Motion hearing date of 6/21/2016 is stricken. Status hearing date of 9/13/2016 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725, to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S. Rosenman for presentment of motion to withdraw, motion to substitute attorney #52 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/21/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Rosenman, Andrew)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to withdraw Louis S. Chronowski, Jr Of Dykema Gossett PLLC, MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to substitute attorney Andrew S. Rosenman of Mayer Brown (Rosenman, Andrew)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JURY Demand (Chronowski, Louis)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to counterclaim by Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. (Wallach, William)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 2/18/2016. Fact discovery shall be completed on or before 9/13/2016. Status hearing set for 9/13/2016 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. against Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. . by Guaranteed Rate, Inc.(Chronowski, Louis)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 1/14/2016 and continued to 2/18/2016 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Defendant's answer or counterclaim shall be filed on or before 2/4/2016. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/13/2016. Mailed notice(gel, )
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. As explained in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendants motion to dismiss #33 is granted with prejudice as to Count III. This matter remains set for a status hearing on 1/14/16 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. At that time, the parties shall come prepared to discuss case management dates and the possibility of settlement. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the 12/1/15 status hearing is stricken and reset to 1/14/16 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY by Defendants Victor Ciardelli, III, Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to motion to strike, motion for relief #33 (Shatat, Anwar)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM by Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. in Opposition to motion to strike, motion for relief #33 (Supplemental) (Wallach, William)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:Motion hearing previously set in error for 12/18/2015 is reset for 12/1/2015 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 10/29/2015. Defendant's motion to strike amended complaint #33 is denied with respect to failure to request leave to amend. Plaintiff's second amended complaint #32 is allowed to stand subject to pending litigation. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file second amended complaint #38 is moot. Defendant's motion to strike amended complaint #33 is briefed as follows: Additional response brief shall be filed on or before 11/9/2015; additional reply shall be filed on or before 11/23/2015. Motion hearing set for 12/18/2015 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Motion by William D Wallach for presentment of motion for leave to file #38 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/29/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Wallach, William)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiffs Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wallach, William)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM by Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. in Opposition to motion to strike, motion for relief #33 (Wallach, William)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Briefing on defendants' motion to strike and dismiss plaintiff's second amended complaint #33 is set as follows: plaintiff is to file a response by 10/22/15. The 10/13/15 Notice of Motion date is stricken; the parties need not appear. The 10/13/15 status hearing is stricken and reset to 10/29/15 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Victor Ciardelli, III, Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Anwar T. Shatat (Shatat, Anwar)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Louis S. Chronowski, Jr for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief #33 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/13/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Chronowski, Louis)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION by Defendants Victor Ciardelli, III, Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to strike amended complaint #32 Defendants' Motion to Strike and Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Chronowski, Louis)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Melissa L Cohn, Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc. against Victor Ciardelli, III, Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-N)(Wallach, William)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/10/2015. Mailed notice(gel, )
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendants' motion to dismiss #20 is granted in part and denied in part as explained in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order. For purposes of docket clarity, Defendants' former motion to dismiss #10 is denied as moot. Plaintiff must file her amended complaint, if any, on or before 9/25/15. This matter remains set for a status hearing on 10/13/15 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725 #29 . Mailed notice (gel, )
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 6/30/2015 and continued to 10/13/2015 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed on or before 8/1/2015. Parties should be prepared to set additional case management dates including fact discovery deadline at the next status hearing. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:On the Court's own motion, the 5/13/15 status hearing is stricken and reset to 6/30/15 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE by Louis S. Chronowski, Jr of Change of Address (Chronowski, Louis)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Victor Ciardelli, III, Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Louis S. Chronowski, Jr (Chronowski, Louis)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY by Defendants Victor Ciardelli, III, Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #20 (Cunningham, Richard)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Melissa L Cohn in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #20 (Wallach, William)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Defendants' telephonic motion for leave to file a reply is granted, and the defendants may file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss #20 on or before 4/24/15. In accordance with the Court's Order of 3/26/15 #22 , the next status hearing in this matter is on 5/13/15 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff is directed to file a response to defendants' motion to dismiss #20 by 4/17/15. The 4/2/15 Notice of Motion date is stricken; the parties need not appear. Additionally, the 3/30/15 status hearing date is stricken and reset to 5/13/15 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Richard James Cunningham for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #20 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/2/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Cunningham, Richard)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Cunningham, Richard)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 First AMENDED complaint by Melissa L Cohn against Victor Ciardelli, III, Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M, #2 Exhibit N)(Wallach, William)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint #16 is granted. Plaintiff is directed to file her first amended complaint as a separate docket entry by the close of business on 3/5/15. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise plead by 3/26/15. The 3/12/15 Notice of Motion date is stricken; the parties need not appear. The 3/18/15 status hearing date is also stricken and reset to 3/30/15 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 2201. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by William D Wallach for presentment of motion for leave to file, #16 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/10/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Wallach, William)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Melissa L Cohn for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-M to Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit N to Proposed Amended Complaint)(Wallach, William)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Melissa L Cohn in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 (Wallach, William)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATUS Report JOINT Reassignment Status Report by Melissa L Cohn (Wallach, William)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion and Status Hearing was held on 2/3/2015. The parties are to identify the discovery items necessary to ascertain the amount of a proposed demand by Plaintiff in the Joint Status Report that is due 2/11/2015. The following briefing schedule is set for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #10 : Plaintiff has until 3/3/2015 to file its response in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant has until 3/17/2015 to file its reply (if any). Status Hearing is set for 3/18/2015 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been reassigned to form the initial calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Plaintiff is directed either to file an amended complaint or file a response to the defendant's motion to dismiss #10 by 2/23/15; Defendant to file a reply (if any) by 3/9/15. The 2/3/15 Notice of Motion date is stricken, but the parties shall appear for a status hearing on 2/3/15 at 9:45 a.m. in courtroom 2201, to advise the Court of the status of any settlement efforts to date. By 2/11/15, counsel for the parties shall confer and then prepare and file a joint Reassignment Status Report, not to exceed five pages. A template of the Reassignment Status Report is available on Judge Blakey's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Richard James Cunningham for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/3/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Cunningham, Richard)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint)(Cunningham, Richard)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on December 30, 2014, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 306 cases be reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on January 15, 2015. Case reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/15/15. Mailed notices. (jp, )
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION of Attorney Christopher S. Mayer for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 on behalf of Plaintiff Melissa L. Cohn is granted.MOTION of Attorney William Wallach for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 on behalf of Plaintiff Melissa L. Cohn is granted. Mailed notice (tbk, )
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10149750. (Wallach, William)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10149700. (Mayer, Christopher)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Victor Ciardelli, III, Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Richard James Cunningham (Cunningham, Richard)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (sg, )
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Melissa L Cohn by Jessica Lynn Heckinger (Heckinger, Jessica)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Melissa L Cohn by Michael Scott Elvin (Elvin, Michael)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Elvin, Michael)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Melissa L Cohn; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10087813. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M)(Elvin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohn v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa L Cohn
Represented By: Christopher S. Mayer
Represented By: Michael Scott Elvin
Represented By: William D Wallach
Represented By: Jessica Heckinger Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manhattan Mortgage Company, Inc.
Represented By: William D Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Rosenman
Represented By: Louis S. Chronowski, Jr.
Represented By: Richard James Cunningham
Represented By: Anwar T. Shatat
Represented By: Rumsin Audisho Khoshaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Ciardelli, III
Represented By: Andrew S. Rosenman
Represented By: Louis S. Chronowski, Jr.
Represented By: Richard James Cunningham
Represented By: Anwar T. Shatat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?