Johnson v. United States
Plaintiff: Javon E. Johnson
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 1:2014cv10461
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Kankakee
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/24/2018: For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants the defendants' motion for summary judgment [dkt. no. 189]. The trial date of January 14, 2019 and the final pretrial conference date of January 10, 2019 are vacated. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Mailed notice.(pjg, )
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/27/2016: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court overrules defendants' exhaustion defense with regard to Count 2, Johnson's claim of denial of medical care. The case is set for a status hearing on January 5, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. in order to set a schedule for the remainder of discovery and pretrial proceedings. (mk)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/20/2016: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and ORder, the Court grants summary judgment in favor of defendants on count three but otherwise den ies defendants' motion for summary judgment [dkt. no. 38]. The Court will conduct a Pavey hearing to determine whether prison officials prevented Johnson from exhausting administrative remedies on count two. The Court also dismisses Johnson� 39;s FTCA claims based on failure to protect against retaliation by Bureau of Prisons personnel and non-medical personnel's negligent failure to respond to his medical needs, but otherwise denies the government's motion to dismiss [dkt. no. 42]. Johnson may proceed on his FTCA claim based on his allegations that the government breached its alleged duty to protect him against known risks of harm. If Johnson wishes to proceed on his FTCA claim sounding in professional negligence, he mu st submit a certificate of merit as required under Illinois law by no later than Monday, August 22, 2016. If a qualified person is unwilling or unable to provide a certificate of merit without an in-person evaluation, Johnson must provide documentation to the Court by no later than Wednesday, July 13, 2016. The case remains set for a status hearing on June 21, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. as previously ordered. (mk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javon E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?