Cooke v. Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Norma L Cooke
Defendant: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv00817
Filed: January 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION by Plaintiff Norma L Cooke for judgment to be set out in separate document (Pollack, Steven)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 11/19/2018:(rao, )
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 3/20/2017. Mailed notice (mc, )
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 3/15/2016. Mailed notice. (kp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooke v. Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma L Cooke
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?