Flora v. Cook County Jail et al
Plaintiff: |
Donnell Flora |
Defendant: |
Thomas Dart and Cook County |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv01127 |
Filed: |
February 3, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Cook |
Presiding Judge: |
Matthew F. Kennelly |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 9, 2018 |
Filing
221
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/9/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants plaintiff's petition for attorney's fees and expenses and awards plaintiff attorney's fees of $170,312.44 and expenses of $6,451.31. (mk)
|
September 19, 2017 |
Filing
174
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/19/2017: As described in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court cannot at this point make any definitive rulings regarding the recoverability of emotiona l distress damages in this case or regarding whether the issue of the threshold for recoverability of such damages under the PLRA is an issue for the Court or for the jury. As discussed in the opinion, the parties are directed to submit supplemental memoranda on the latter point by 9/27/2017. The ruling set for 9/21/2017 at 9:30 AM is converted to a status hearing on that same date at 8:30 AM, in chambers (Room 2188). (mk)
|
May 17, 2017 |
Filing
149
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/17/2017: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants plaintiff's partial motion for summary judgment in part and denies it in part [dkt. no. 120]. Flora is entitled to summary judgment on the issue of liability on his claim concerning the Cook County Jail's inaccessible toilets and showers but not on his claim regarding conditions at the Leighton Courthouse. The case is set for a status hearing on May 24, 2017 at 9;30 a.m. for the purpose of setting a date for trial on all remaining claims and issues. (mk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?