Bank of America, N.A., v. Veluchamy

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A., and Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Veluchamy, Sonia Veluchamy, Arjun Parthasarathy, Oakbrook Financial, Inc., Rajiv Parthasarathy, Anu Veluchamy, Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy, Veluchamy 2009 Dynasty Trust and Arun Veluchamy
Respondent: Veluchamy Family Foundation
Case Number: 1:2015cv02075
Filed: March 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 220 SUR-REPLY by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to response in opposition to motion #199 , sur-reply #207 , motion for leave to file #208 , motion for miscellaneous relief #192 , order on motion for leave to file,,,,, #217 , reply #200 (Bernstein, Louis)
February 14, 2019 Filing 219 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. to sur-reply, #213 (Roin, Howard)
February 14, 2019 Filing 218 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for leave to file response #214 is granted. Mailed notice (ewf, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, February 15, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 215 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for leave to file #214 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
February 13, 2019 Filing 214 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. for leave to file Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief (Attachments: #1 Supplement - Estate's Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief)(Roin, Howard)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER: Defendants' motion for leave to file supplement to reply and sur-reply #208 is granted. Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal #210 is granted. The parties need not appear on February 15, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 2/12/2019. Mailed notice. (pk, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 213 SUR-REPLY by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to response in opposition to motion #199 , sur-reply #207 , reply, #212 , motion for leave to file #210 , motion for miscellaneous relief #192 , reply #200 (Bernstein, Louis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 212 SEALED REPLY by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to response in opposition to motion #199 , sur-reply #207 , MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for leave to file Under Seal #210 , MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu VeluchamyPurge Civil Contempt #192 , reply #200 (Bernstein, Louis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 211 NOTICE of Motion by Louis David Bernstein for presentment of motion for leave to file #210 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Bernstein, Louis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 210 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for leave to file Under Seal (Bernstein, Louis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 209 NOTICE of Motion by Louis David Bernstein for presentment of motion for leave to file #208 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Bernstein, Louis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 208 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for leave to file (Attachments: #1 Supplement and Sur-Surreply)(Bernstein, Louis)
January 31, 2019 Filing 207 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. (Estate's Sur-reply In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Purge Contempt) (Roin, Howard)
January 31, 2019 Filing 206 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for leave to file sur-reply #203 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, February 1, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 205 RESPONSE by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamyin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. for leave to file Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Purge Contempt #203 (Bernstein, Louis)
January 30, 2019 Filing 204 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for leave to file #203 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
January 30, 2019 Filing 203 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. for leave to file Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Purge Contempt (Attachments: #1 Estate's Sur-reply in Opposition)(Roin, Howard)
January 28, 2019 Filing 202 Report on Status by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy (Bernstein, Louis)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER: Defendant's reply in support of their motion to purge civil contempt briefly discusses Mr. Veluchamy's health, and mentions that Mr. Veluchamy has missed a scheduled MRI as the result of his remedial incarceration. Dkt. #200 , p. 2. Defendants' counsel shall promptly submit a supplement to Defendants' reply, providing further details regarding the issue of Mr. Veluchamy's health. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/18/2019. Mailed notice. (pk, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 200 REPLY by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy (Bernstein, Louis)
January 11, 2019 Filing 199 RESPONSE by Bank of America, N.A.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu VeluchamyPurge Civil Contempt #192 (Odorizzi, Michele)
January 11, 2019 Filing 198 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. by Michele Louise Odorizzi (Odorizzi, Michele)
January 4, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE of Correction regarding docket entry #194 (pk, )
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER: With respect to Defendants' January 2, 2019 Motion to Purge Civil Contempt, Plaintiff shall file its written response on or before January 11, 2019, and Defendants shall file their reply on or before January 16, 2019. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/3/2019. Mailed notice. (pk, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: The notice of motion hearing set for January 4, 2019 is stricken. The court will issue an order. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 4, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 194 Estate's Request for Briefing Schedule on Veluchamys' Motion to Purge their Contempt (Dkt No.192) by Bank of America, N.A. (Roin, Howard) Modified on 1/4/2019 (pk, ).
January 2, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE of Motion by Louis David Bernstein for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #192 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Bernstein, Louis)
January 2, 2019 Filing 192 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu VeluchamyPurge Civil Contempt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D - G, #4 Exhibit H - J, #5 Exhibit K)(Bernstein, Louis)
December 27, 2018 Filing 191 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 12/27/2018 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #167 ; Appellate case no. : 18-2930 : Upon consideration of the MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, filed on December 26, 2018, by counsel for the appellants, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (pk, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 190 MANDATE of USCA dated 12/27/2018 regarding notice of appeal #167 ;USCA No.18-2930 ; No record to be returned. (pk, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER: Defendants' Motion Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 60(b) and 62.1 #184 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/11/2018. Mailed notice. (pk, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 188 REPLY by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 for an indicative ruling on their request for rule 60(B) relief to permit remand pursuant to Fed.R. App. P. 12.1 and circuit rule 57 (Trail, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11-16-2018 before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Order Number: 32865. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/transcript-order-form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 12/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019. (Warren, Pamela)
November 30, 2018 Filing 186 RESPONSE by Bank of America, N.A. to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for hearing DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(B) FOR A HEARING TO OBTAIN RELIEF FROM THE COURTS ORDER OF CIVIL CONTEMPT, AND MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P #184 (Roin, Howard)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER: With respect to Defendants' November 21, 2018 Motion Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 60(b) and 62.1 #184 , Plaintiff shall file its written response on or before November 30, 2018 and Defendants shall file their reply on or before December 3, 2018. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 11/27/2018. Mailed notice. (pk, )
November 21, 2018 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 for an indicative ruling on their request for rule 60(B) relief to permit remand pursuant to Fed.R. App. P. 12.1 and circuit rule 57. (Omitted relief from motion for #184 . (pk, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 184 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for hearing DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(B) FOR A HEARING TO OBTAIN RELIEF FROM THE COURTS ORDER OF CIVIL CONTEMPT, AND MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 62.1 FOR AN INDICATIVE RULING ON THEIR REQUEST FOR RULE 60(B) RELIEF TO PERMIT REMAND PURSUANT TO FED. R. APP. P. 12.1 AND CIRCUIT RULE 57 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of November 16, 2018 Hearing)(Durkin, Thomas)
November 16, 2018 Filing 183 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Status hearing held on 11/16/2018. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 182 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy by James David Trail (Trail, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 181 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy by Louis David Bernstein (Bernstein, Louis)
November 15, 2018 Filing 180 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for leave to file additional appearances instanter #178 is granted. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE of Motion by Louis David Bernstein for presentment of motion for leave to file #178 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 11/16/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Bernstein, Louis)
November 13, 2018 Filing 178 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for leave to file Additional Appearances Instanter (Bernstein, Louis)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER: Counsel for both parties shall appear for status on November 16, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 11/6/2018. Mailed notice. (pk, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 176 MAIL RETURNED, for document #151 sent to Frank M Dickerson, III returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (jk, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09-05-2018 before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/transcript-order-form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 10/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2018. (Warren, Pamela)
September 19, 2018 Filing 174 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: The Clerk of Court shall prepare and issue a writ of body attachment pursuant the court order #160 entered on August 30, 2018. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 173 MAIL RETURNED, for document #152 sent to Logan Ann Steiner returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (jk, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 172 COPY of order dated 9/6/2018 from the USCA 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #167 ; Appellate case no. : 18-2930: IT IS ORDERED that the emergency motion for stay of contempt order and its order of indefinite incarceration pending appeal is DENIED. The appellants shall report to the United States Marshal by 12:00 p.m. on September 6, 2018, as ordered by the district court. (lf, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 170 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #167 . Notified counsel (lf, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #167 (lf, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 171 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion hearing held on 9/5/2018 regarding motion to stay #161 . Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER: Defendants' Emergency Rule 62 Motion to Stay the Order Requiring Indefinite Incarceration Pending Appeal #161 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 9/5/2018. Mailed notice (rp, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 167 NOTICE of appeal by Pethinaidu Veluchamy regarding orders #160 , #145 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-14909930. Receipt number: n (Durkin, Thomas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 166 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Parameswari Veluchamy by Thomas Anthony Durkin (Durkin, Thomas)
September 4, 2018 Filing 165 RESPONSE by Bank of America, N.A.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Pethinaidu Veluchamy to stay Defendants' Emergency Rule 62 Motion to Stay the Order Requiring Indefinite Incarceration Pending Appeal #161 (Roin, Howard)
September 4, 2018 Filing 164 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion hearing on Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay is reset for 9/5/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's may file a response. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 163 Notice of Emergency Motion NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Anthony Durkin for presentment of motion to stay #161 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/5/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Durkin, Thomas)
September 4, 2018 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM motion to stay #161 by Pethinaidu Veluchamy Defendants' Memorandum in Support of their Emergency Rule 62 Motion to Stay the Order Requiring Indefinite Incarceration Pending Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 24, 2018 Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - August 29, 2018 Transcript)(Durkin, Thomas)
September 4, 2018 Filing 161 MOTION by Defendant Pethinaidu Veluchamy to stay Defendants' Emergency Rule 62 Motion to Stay the Order Requiring Indefinite Incarceration Pending Appeal (Durkin, Thomas)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion of August 29,2018, in which it again moved for the remedial incarceration of Pethinaidu Veluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy is granted. The Court hereby orders that Pethinaidu Veluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy shall report to the United States Marshals Service for the Northern District of Illinois by September 6, 2018, at 12 p.m., for an indefinite period of remedial incarceration; Pethinaidu Veluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy shall remain incarcerated until they turn over to Plaintiff: $5,900.934.88 and twenty-four pieces of certain jewelry, as ordered in Paragraphs 4 and 9 of the August 27,2015 Judgement, Case No. 15- cv-2075, or make a good faith effort to do so. A body attachment shall issue for Pethinaidu Veluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy upon their failure to report to the United States Marshals Service by September 6, 2018, at 12 p.m. At the time of Pethinaidu Veluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy's remedial incarceration, the per diem monetary civil contempt sanctions imposed by the Court's July 30, 2018 Order shall cease to accrue. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/30/2018. Mailed notice (lf, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08-29-2018 before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Order Number: 31999. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/transcript-order-form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 9/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2018. (Warren, Pamela)
August 30, 2018 Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08-24-2018 before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Order Number: 32005. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/transcript-order-form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 9/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2018. (Warren, Pamela)
August 30, 2018 Filing 157 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to withdraw as attorney #155 is granted. Attorneys Logan Ann Steiner; Rue Koester Toland; Frank M Dickerson, III and Beverley Janis Klein are granted leave to withdraw. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, August 30,2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #155 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/31/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
August 29, 2018 Filing 155 MOTION by Attorney Frank M. Dickerson, III, Logan Ann Steiner, Rue Koester Toland, and Beverley Klein to withdraw as attorney for Bank of America, N.A.. No party information provided (Roin, Howard)
August 29, 2018 Filing 154 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Status hearing held on 8/29/2018.Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 153 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pethinaidu Veluchamy by Thomas Anthony Durkin (Durkin, Thomas)
August 23, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #149 , #146 , #147 , #150 , #148 sent to Attorney Logan Ann Steiner returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Logan Ann Steiner a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 151 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #149 , #146 , #147 , #150 , #148 sent to Attorney Frank M Dickerson, Iii returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Frank M Dickerson a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, ) Modified on 8/24/2018 (jk, ).
August 23, 2018 Filing 150 RESPONSE by Bank of America, N.A.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for reconsideration regarding motion to stay, #129 , order on motion for miscellaneous relief, #145 Emergency #147 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roin, Howard)
August 23, 2018 Filing 149 Emergency NOTICE of Motion by Derek D. Samz for presentment of motion for reconsideration #147 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/24/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Samz, Derek)
August 23, 2018 Filing 148 MEMORANDUM by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy in support of motion for reconsideration #147 Emergency (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Samz, Derek)
August 23, 2018 Filing 147 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for reconsideration regarding motion to stay, #129 , order on motion for miscellaneous relief, #145 Emergency (Samz, Derek)
August 23, 2018 Filing 146 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Status hearing is set for 8/29/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Pethinaidu Veluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy in Civil Contempt #118 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 7/30/2018. Mailed notice. (bg, )
March 1, 2018 Filing 144 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for leave to file sur-reply #142 is granted. Additional submission by defendants is due 3/14/2018. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, March 2, 2018. Mailed notice (ewf, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 143 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for leave to file #142 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/2/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
February 23, 2018 Filing 142 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. for leave to file sur-reply addressing LaSalle Bank Lake View v. Seguban (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Estate's Sur-Reply Addressing LaSalle Bank Lake View v. Seguban)(Roin, Howard)
February 21, 2018 Filing 141 REPLY by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to stay regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.to Hold Pethinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy in Civil Contempt #118 #129 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Filing)(Brustein, Abraham)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of an Order Staying Civil Contempt Proceedings #137 is granted. Defendants shall file a reply on or before February 21, 2018. Defendants shall advise the Court of how Judge Rovner's opinion in LaSalle Bank Lake View v. Seguban is applicable here. Seguban, 54 F.3d 387 (7th Cir. 1995). Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 2/8/2018. Mailed notice. (bg, )
February 8, 2018 Filing 139 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: The notice of motion hearing set for 2/9/2018 is stricken. The court will issue an order. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, February 9, 2018. Mailed notice (ewf, )
February 6, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE of Motion by Abraham Brustein for presentment of motion for leave to file #137 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/9/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Brustein, Abraham)
February 6, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of an Order Staying Civil Contempt Proceedings (Brustein, Abraham)
February 5, 2018 Filing 136 CERTIFIED COPY OF OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 9/20/2017; Decided 1/23/2018 in USCA case no. 15-2902, 15-2908, 15-3815, & 16-3496 (mc, )
February 5, 2018 Filing 135 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT dated 1/12/2018 regarding amended notice of appeal #107 , notice of appeal #70 , notice of appeal #32 ; USCA No. 15-2902, 15-2908,15-3815 and 16-3496 : The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (mc, )
February 5, 2018 Filing 134 MANDATE of USCA dated 1/12/2018 regarding amended notice of appeal #107 , notice of appeal #70 , notice of appeal #32 ; USCA No.15-2902,15-2908,15-3815 and 16-3496 ; No record to be returned. (mc, )
January 31, 2018 Filing 133 RESPONSE by Bank of America, N.A.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to stay regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.to Hold Pethinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy in Civil Contempt #118 #129 (Roin, Howard)
January 17, 2018 Filing 132 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Estate's Agreed Request to Allow the Estate to Respond to Defendants' Stay Motion on or Before January 31, 2018 #131 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 19, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 12, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. Estate's Agreed Request to Allow the Estate to Respond to Defendants' Stay Motion On or Before January 31, 2018 (Roin, Howard)
January 10, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Motion by Abraham Brustein for presentment of motion to stay, #129 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/19/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Brustein, Abraham)
January 10, 2018 Filing 129 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to stay regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.to Hold Pethinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy in Civil Contempt #118 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Brustein, Abraham)
January 10, 2018 Filing 128 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. by Sara Norval (Norval, Sara)
December 18, 2017 Filing 127 MAIL RETURNED, for document #122 , #124 , #121 , #123 sent to Joshua M. Grenard returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (mc, )
December 7, 2017 Filing 126 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Entered on November 30, 2017 #122 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 8, 2017. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 4, 2017 Filing 125 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. to motion to amend/correct #122 (Estate's Response to Veluchamys' Motion to Change Briefing Schedule on Civil Contempt Motion) (Roin, Howard)
November 30, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #122 , #121 , #123 sent to Attorney Joshua M. Grenard returned as: Unknown Address Error. The Clerk telephoned Joshua M. Grenard, no contact made. Mailed to attorney Joshua M. Grenard a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
November 30, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE of Motion by Abraham Brustein for presentment of motion to amend/correct #122 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/8/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Brustein, Abraham)
November 30, 2017 Filing 122 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to amend/correct terminate hearings,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, #121 (Brustein, Abraham)
November 30, 2017 Filing 121 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Response to Motion to Hold Perthinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy in Civil Contempt #118 is due on or before 12/22/2017. Reply is due on or before1/12/2018. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 1, 2017. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 27, 2017 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM by Bank of America, N.A. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #118 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(Roin, Howard)
November 27, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #118 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/1/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
November 27, 2017 Filing 118 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.to Hold Pethinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy in Civil Contempt (Roin, Howard)
August 7, 2017 Filing 117 USCA RECEIVED on 8/7/2017 the long record regarding amended notice of appeal #107 , notice of appeal #70 , notice of appeal #32 (ek, )
August 7, 2017 Filing 116 CERTIFIED and transmitted to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #107 , #70 , #32 (USCA no. 15-2902, 15-3815, 16-3496) (ek, )
August 7, 2017 Filing 115 NOTICE to Transmit Record on Appeal regarding amended notice of appeal #107 ; USCA Case No. 15-2902, 15-2908, 15-3815, 16-3496. (jh, )
November 3, 2016 Filing 114 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. by Frank M Dickerson, Iii (Dickerson, Frank)
October 6, 2016 Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Unopposed Motion to Designate Docket Items to be Transmitted with the Record on Appeal #111 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, October 7, 2016. Mailed notice (ewf, )
October 4, 2016 Filing 112 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #111 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 10/7/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
October 4, 2016 Filing 111 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. To Designate Docket Items to be Transmitted from the District Court to the Court of Appeals with the Record on Appeal (Estate Representative's Unopposed Motion to Designate Docket Items to be Transmitted from the District Court to the Court of Appeals with the Record on Appeal) (Roin, Howard)
September 26, 2016 Filing 110 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding amended notice of appeal #107 ; USCA Case No. 16-3496. (eg,)
September 22, 2016 Filing 109 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on amended notice of appeal #107 . Notified counsel (ek, )
September 22, 2016 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding amended notice of appeal #107 (ek, )
September 22, 2016 Filing 107 AMENDED notice of appeal by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy regarding orders #58 , #26 , #104 , #106 , #57 , #27 , #31 ; Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-12392063. (Brustein, Abraham)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: Pethinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy's Motion to Reconsider Denial of its Previously Filed Motion Pursuant to Rule 60(a), (b), to Modify Paragraph 9 of the Judgment Entered on August 31, 2015 #64 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/29/2016. Mailed notice. (bg, )
August 26, 2016 Filing 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Status hearing held on 8/26/2016. Status hearing is continued to 11/4/2016 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: Defendant's Motion of Pethinaidu Veluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy to Supplement Record #67 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 7/27/2016. Mailed notice. (eg,)
July 15, 2016 Filing 103 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to Reassign #100 is granted. Motion hearing held on 7/15/2016. A status hearing (for all cases) is set for 8/26/2016 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 14, 2016 Filing 102 RESPONSE by Anu Veluchamy, Arun Veluchamyin Support of MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. Estate Representative's Local Rule 40.4 Motion to Reassign #100 (Weissberg, Ariel)
July 12, 2016 Filing 101 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #100 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/15/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
July 12, 2016 Filing 100 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. Estate Representative's Local Rule 40.4 Motion to Reassign (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C)(Roin, Howard)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting the Estate Representative's Motion to Extend Citations to Discover Assets Served on Judgment Debtors Pethinaidu Veluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 6/16/2016. Mailed notice(mr, )
June 16, 2016 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: The Estate Representative's Motion to Extend Citations to Discover Assets Served on Judgment Debtors Pethinaidu Veluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy #94 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, June 17, 2016. Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 15, 2016 Filing 97 APPENDIX memorandum in support of motion, #95 Table of Contents (Corrected) (Roin, Howard)
June 15, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE of Motion by Beverley Janis Klein for presentment of extension of time #94 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/17/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Klein, Beverley)
June 15, 2016 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM by Bank of America, N.A. in support of extension of time #94 (Citations to Discover Assets Served on Judgment Debtors Pethinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy) (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents, #2 Appendix 1-12, #3 Appendix 13-23)(Roin, Howard)
June 15, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. for extension of time (Citations to Discover Assets Served on Judgment Debtors Pethinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy) (Roin, Howard)
January 27, 2016 Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation to Discover Assets and Citation Notice to Fifth Third Bank served on Lori King, Legal Department on January 15, 2016 (Klein, Beverley)
January 26, 2016 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation to Discover Assets and Citation Notice to TCF National Bank served on Nadya Soto, Assistant Vice President on January 15, 2016 (Klein, Beverley)
January 14, 2016 Filing 91 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Fifth Third Bank and TCF National Bank. (sxw, )
January 11, 2016 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation to Discover Assets and Citation Notice served on TD Ameritrade on January 5, 2016 (Klein, Beverley)
January 7, 2016 Filing 89 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time #75 is granted. Motion for extension of time #81 is granted. Motion for leave to file #85 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 8, 2016. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 7, 2016 Filing 88 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation to Discover Assets and Citation Notice served on BMO Harris Bank on January 6, 2016 (Klein, Beverley)
January 6, 2016 Filing 87 REPLY by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to motion to supplement #67 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Brustein, Abraham)
January 6, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for leave to file, #85 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/8/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
January 6, 2016 Filing 85 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. for leave to file Surreply (Estate Representative's Motion for Leave to File Surreply and Surreply to The Veluchamys' Motion to Reconsider Denial of Their Previously Filed Motion to Reconsider #83 ) (Roin, Howard)
January 4, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy re reply #83 (Brustein, Abraham)
January 4, 2016 Filing 83 REPLY by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to motion for reconsideration, motion for relief, #64 (Brustein, Abraham)
December 31, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE of Motion by Abraham Brustein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #81 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/8/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Brustein, Abraham)
December 31, 2015 Filing 81 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to supplement #67 (Brustein, Abraham)
December 30, 2015 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation Notice Re: MB Financial Bank, Individually and as Successor to Cole Taylor Bank served on Andrew Idowu on 12/28/2015 (Klein, Beverley)
December 28, 2015 Filing 79 DOCKETING Statement by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy regarding notice of appeal #70 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Brustein, Abraham)
December 28, 2015 Filing 78 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to MB Financial Bank (Third Party). (lk, )
December 28, 2015 Filing 77 RESPONSE by Bank of America, N.A. to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for reconsideration regarding order on motion to amend/correct,,, #58 #64 (Estate Representative's Response to the Veluchamys' Motion to Reconsider Denial of Their Previously Filed Motion to Reconsider) (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Roin, Howard)
December 23, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE of Motion by Abraham Brustein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #75 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/8/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Brustein, Abraham)
December 23, 2015 Filing 75 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to supplement #67 (Brustein, Abraham)
December 22, 2015 Filing 74 RESPONSE by Bank of America, N.A.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to supplement Record #67 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents, #2 Appendix 1-12, #3 Notice of Filing, #4 Certificate of Service)(Grenard, Joshua)
December 21, 2015 Filing 73 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #70 ; USCA Case No. 15-3815. (lk, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 72 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #70 . Notified counsel, (ea, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #70 (ea, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 70 NOTICE of appeal by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy regarding orders #58 , #26 , #57 , #27 , #31 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-11417691. (Brustein, Abraham)
December 17, 2015 Filing 69 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Pethinaidu Vluchamy and Parameswari Veluchamy are given seven days to file a reply to any response to their motion to supplement record. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 18, 2015. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 14, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE of Motion by Abraham Brustein for presentment of motion to supplement #67 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/18/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Brustein, Abraham)
December 14, 2015 Filing 67 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to supplement Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brustein, Abraham)
December 10, 2015 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Response to Motion to Reconsider #64 is due on or before 12/28/2015. Reply is due on or before 1/4/2016. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 11, 2015.Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 7, 2015 Filing 65 NOTICE of Motion by Abraham Brustein for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief, #64 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/11/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Brustein, Abraham)
December 7, 2015 Filing 64 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for reconsideration regarding order on motion to amend/correct,,, #58 (Brustein, Abraham)
December 1, 2015 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation to Discover Assets to Pethinaidu Veluchamy served on Pethinaidu Veluchamy on 11/24/2015 (Klein, Beverley)
December 1, 2015 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation to Discover Assets to Parameswari Veluchamy served on Parameswari Veluchamy on 11/24/2015 (Klein, Beverley)
December 1, 2015 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation to Discover Assets to New York Life Insurance Company served on Antonio Gonzalez, Paralegal on 11/19/2015 (Klein, Beverley)
December 1, 2015 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation to Discover Assets to Northwestern Mutual Insurance Company served on Luanne Purdy, Paralegal on 11/19/2015 (Klein, Beverley)
December 1, 2015 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. regarding Citation to Discover Assets to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on Donna Kravzman, Corporate Counsel on 11/19/2015 (Klein, Beverley)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Defendants Pethinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy's Motion Pursuant to Rules 60(a),(b), to Modify Paragraph 9 of the Judgment Entered on August 27, 2015 #43 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 11/23/2015. Mailed notice(rm, )
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Defendants Pethinaidu and Parameswari Veluchamy's Motion Pursuant to Rule 59(a), 59(e), and 60(b), to Reconsider Portions of Opinion and Order Entered on August 19, 2015 and Judgment Entered on August 31, 2015 #37 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 11/23/2015. Mailed notice(rm, )
November 20, 2015 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to supplement the record #51 is granted. Motion hearing held on 11/20/2015. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 19, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy re response in opposition to motion, #54 (Brustein, Abraham)
November 19, 2015 Filing 54 RESPONSE by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamyin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. to supplement the Record with Information Uncovered During the Recent Arrest of the Veluchamys for Passport Fraud #51 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brustein, Abraham)
November 19, 2015 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy by Thomas M Lombardo (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Lombardo, Thomas)
November 13, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion to supplement #51 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 11/20/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
November 13, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. to supplement the Record with Information Uncovered During the Recent Arrest of the Veluchamys for Passport Fraud (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Roin, Howard)
November 6, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy re reply #49 (Brustein, Abraham)
November 6, 2015 Filing 49 REPLY by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to motion to amend/correct, motion for relief #43 (Brustein, Abraham)
October 30, 2015 Filing 48 RESPONSE by Bank of America, N.A. to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to amend/correct order #31 #43 (Estate Representative's Response to the Veluchamys' Rule 60 Motion to Modify Judgment) (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-25)(Roin, Howard)
October 16, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE by Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy re reply #46 (Brustein, Abraham)
October 16, 2015 Filing 46 REPLY by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to motion for reconsideration, motion for relief, #37 (Brustein, Abraham)
October 8, 2015 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Response to the Motion to Modify Paragraph 9 of the Judgment Entered on August 27, 2015 #43 is due on or before 10/30/2015. Reply, if any is due on or before 11/6/2015. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, October 9, 2015. Mailed notice (ewf, )
October 6, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Abraham Brustein for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief #43 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 10/9/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Brustein, Abraham)
October 6, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy to amend/correct order #31 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brustein, Abraham)
September 24, 2015 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for leave to file #40 is granted. Defendants' reply, if any, in support of their motion for reconsideration is due on or before 10/16/2015. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, September 25, 2015. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 23, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for leave to file, #40 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/25/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
September 23, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. for leave to file an Appendix Containing Transcripts and Exhibits Relevant to the Veluchamys' Motion to Reconsider (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Roin, Howard)
September 23, 2015 Filing 39 RESPONSE by Bank of America, N.A. to MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order #27 , order #31 Pursuant to Rules 59(a), 59(e) and 60(b) #37 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roin, Howard)
September 16, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion by Abraham Brustein for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief, #37 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/25/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Brustein, Abraham)
September 16, 2015 Filing 37 MOTION by Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order #27 , order #31 Pursuant to Rules 59(a), 59(e) and 60(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brustein, Abraham)
September 2, 2015 Filing 36 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #32 ; USCA Case No. 15-2902. (kp, )
September 2, 2015 Filing 35 DOCKETING Statement by Anu Veluchamy, Arun Veluchamy regarding notice of appeal #32 (Weissberg, Ariel)
September 2, 2015 Filing 34 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #32 . Notified counsel. (ea, )
September 2, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #32 . (ea, )
September 1, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE of appeal by Anu Veluchamy, Arun Veluchamy regarding orders #26 , #27 , #31 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-11039894. (Weissberg, Ariel)
August 27, 2015 Filing 31 JUDGMENT. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/27/2015. Mailed notice. (kp, )
August 27, 2015 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: The August 28, 2015 notice of motion hearing date is stricken. The court will issue an order. Mailed notice (ewf,)
August 25, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for judgment #28 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/28/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
August 25, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. for judgment (Plaintiff-Estate Representative's Motion for Rule 58 Judgment) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Roin, Howard)
August 19, 2015 FINAL closing order dated 8/18/2015 entered on USBC docket. (kp, )
August 18, 2015 Filing 27 OPINION and ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/18/2015. Mailed notice (kp, )
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Court adopts the Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law #1 that were entered by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Illinois on December 17,2014. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/18/2015. Mailed notice (kp, )
July 16, 2015 Filing 25 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report) by Bank of America, N.A. (Roin, Howard)
April 10, 2015 Filing 24 STATUS Report (Joint) by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Roin, Howard)
March 23, 2015 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: This case having been reassigned, status hearing set for 3/30/15 is stricken. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 19, 2015 Filing 22 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr for all further proceedings pursuant to Rule 13. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/19/15. (sj, )
March 18, 2015 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Bank of America's motion for leave to file status report #14 is granted. No appearance is required on the 3/23/15 notice date. Status hearing set for 3/30/15 is stricken. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 18, 2015 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Counsel is directed to re-file the civil cover sheet and indicate whether there are any related cases by 3/20/15. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 17, 2015 Filing 19 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Roin, Howard)
March 17, 2015 Filing 18 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Weissberg, Ariel)
March 16, 2015 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sonia Veluchamy by Precious Stephanie Jacobs (Jacobs, Precious)
March 16, 2015 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sonia Veluchamy by Vincent E. Lazar (Lazar, Vincent)
March 16, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Howard J. Roin for presentment of motion for leave to file #14 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/23/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Roin, Howard)
March 16, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. for leave to file Status Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roin, Howard)
March 16, 2015 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The party who filed the appeal which opened this case (15C2075) is directed to complete and file a civil cover sheet by 3/20/15.Mailed notice (kef, )
March 13, 2015 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anu Veluchamy, Arun Veluchamy by John Burke Wolf (Wolf, John)
March 13, 2015 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anu Veluchamy, Arun Veluchamy by Ariel Weissberg (Weissberg, Ariel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy by Derek D. Samz (Samz, Derek)
March 13, 2015 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Parameswari Veluchamy, Pethinaidu Veluchamy by Abraham Brustein (Brustein, Abraham)
March 13, 2015 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. by Joshua M. Grenard (Grenard, Joshua)
March 13, 2015 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. by Beverley Janis Klein (Klein, Beverley)
March 13, 2015 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. by Thomas S. Kiriakos (Kiriakos, Thomas)
March 13, 2015 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. by Howard J. Roin (Roin, Howard)
March 12, 2015 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing set for 3/30/2015 at 08:30 AM in courtroom 1241. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 12, 2015 Filing 3 MAILED 83.16 Letter and Rule 8010 letter to counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(sj, )
March 10, 2015 Filing 2 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve for all further proceedings pursuant to IOP 13(f). Signed by Executive Committee on 3/10/15.(sj, )
March 9, 2015 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (jn, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 1 PROPOSED FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 12A01715 (Judge Wedoff) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Bk6hpoindexter, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A., v. Veluchamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Howard J. Roin
Represented By: Joshua M. Grenard
Represented By: Sara Norval
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Represented By: James C. Schroeder
Represented By: Thomas S. Kiriakos
Represented By: Frank M Dickerson, Iii
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Vincent J. Connelly
Represented By: Beverley Janis Klein
Represented By: Rue Koester Toland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veluchamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Veluchamy
Represented By: Precious Stephanie Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent E. Lazar
Represented By: Charles B. Sklarsky
Represented By: Sally Kristen Sears Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arjun Parthasarathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakbrook Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Precious Stephanie Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent E. Lazar
Represented By: Sally Kristen Sears Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajiv Parthasarathy
Represented By: William Jeffrey Factor
Represented By: David Paul Holtkamp
Represented By: Sara E. Lorber
Represented By: Jeffrey Kimball Paulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anu Veluchamy
Represented By: Precious Stephanie Jacobs
Represented By: John Burke Wolf
Represented By: Vincent E. Lazar
Represented By: Ariel Weissberg
Represented By: Charles B. Sklarsky
Represented By: Daniel Arlen Zazove
Represented By: Sally Kristen Sears Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parameswari Veluchamy
Represented By: Julia Jensen Smolka
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Durkin
Represented By: Thomas Keith McQueen
Represented By: James David Trail
Represented By: Derek D. Samz
Represented By: Thomas M Lombardo
Represented By: Louis David Bernstein
Represented By: Abraham Brustein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pethinaidu Veluchamy
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Durkin
Represented By: Thomas Keith McQueen
Represented By: James David Trail
Represented By: Derek D. Samz
Represented By: Thomas M Lombardo
Represented By: Louis David Bernstein
Represented By: Abraham Brustein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veluchamy 2009 Dynasty Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arun Veluchamy
Represented By: Debra Rae Bernard
Represented By: John Burke Wolf
Represented By: Ariel Weissberg
Represented By: Daniel Arlen Zazove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Veluchamy Family Foundation
Represented By: Ariel Weissberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?