Wu et al v. Prudential Financial, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael H. Wu and Christine T. Wu
Defendant: Prudential Financial, Inc., John Robert Strangfeld, Jr., Mark Brown Grier, Richard J. Carbone, Pruco Life Insurance Company, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., John P. Havens, LSV Asset Management, Marsico Capital Management LLC, T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. and William Blair & Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv02238
Filed: March 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM Order: Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate was filed in Case No. 14 C 5392. Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate Case No. 14 C 5392 and Case No. 15 C 2238 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/18/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Supplement to MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order dated 7/29/2015. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/29/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM Order: With Michael and Christine Wu having finally retained counsel after this Court's repeated urging that they do so rather than trying to go it alone in this complex litigation, this Court's docket review has revealed that at torney Andrew May filed a proposed Amended Complaint in each of these cases on July 20 without complying with this District Court's LR 5.2(f) requirement that paper copies of all filings be delivered to this Court's chambers within one work ing day. Although this Court never issues this type of memorandum order without allowing appropriate flexibility as to the timing of that required delivery, in this instance -- with a preset status hearing having been scheduled for July 29 -- counsel 's several days' delinquency in compliance is simply not excusable. Accordingly attorney May is ordered: 1. to deliver a paper copy of the new filing in each of the two cases to this Court's chambers forthwith -- not later than Monday, July 27; and 2. to accompany that delivery with a check for $200 payable to the Clerk of Court as a fine for counsel's noncompliance, with no reimbursement to be sought from the clients. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/24/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM Order: This memorandum order is being entered now so that Wus' new counsel has the maximum possible time available to be responsive to the consideration outlined here. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/19/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/20/2015: This case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of all defendants and against plaintiffs. Status hearing set for 6/8/2015 is vacated. All pending motions are terminated.Mailed notice(clw, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: This Court orders the parties to come prepared to discuss, at the rescheduled May 18 presentment date for the Prudential Defendants' motion, whether the earlier case calls for a reconversion to a with-prejudice dismissal (including the question whether there is jurisdiction to do so), so that the current action would be barred on claim preclusion grounds. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/4/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Initial status hearing is set for 9:00 a.m. June 8, 2015. (For further details see Memorandum Opinion and Order) Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/23/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu et al v. Prudential Financial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael H. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine T. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Financial, Inc.
Represented By: George D Sax
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Robert Strangfeld, Jr.
Represented By: George D Sax
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brown Grier
Represented By: George D Sax
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Carbone
Represented By: George D Sax
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: George D Sax
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSV Asset Management
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Cristina Covarrubias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsico Capital Management LLC
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Cristina Covarrubias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Allen Carnes
Represented By: Patrick William Chinnery
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company LLC
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Cristina Covarrubias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?