Chaudhry et al v. International House of Pancakes, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Azhar Chaudhry, ARS Restaurant, Inc. and Lucky Star #5409, Inc. |
Defendant: |
International House of Pancakes, LLC |
Counter_claimant: |
IHOP Restaurants LLC and International House of Pancakes, LLC |
Counter_defendant: |
ARS Restaurant, Inc. and Azhar Chaudhry |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv03504 |
Filed: |
April 21, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Cook |
Presiding Judge: |
John W. Darrah |
Nature of Suit: |
Franchise |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
91
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/13/2016. Mailed notice (lf, )
|
November 18, 2015 |
Filing
87
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 11/18/2015. Mailed notice (tt, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Chaudhry et al v. International House of Pancakes, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Azhar Chaudhry |
Represented By: |
Carmen David Caruso |
Represented By: |
Shane Donovan Valenzi |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: ARS Restaurant, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Carmen David Caruso |
Represented By: |
Shane Donovan Valenzi |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Lucky Star #5409, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Carmen David Caruso |
Represented By: |
Shane Donovan Valenzi |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: International House of Pancakes, LLC |
Represented By: |
Michael David Hultquist |
Represented By: |
Robert H. King, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Michael Bernard Potere |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: IHOP Restaurants LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert H. King, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Michael David Hultquist |
Represented By: |
Robert H. King, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Michael Bernard Potere |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: International House of Pancakes, LLC |
Represented By: |
Michael David Hultquist |
Represented By: |
Robert H. King, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Michael Bernard Potere |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: ARS Restaurant, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Carmen David Caruso |
Represented By: |
Shane Donovan Valenzi |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Azhar Chaudhry |
Represented By: |
Carmen David Caruso |
Represented By: |
Shane Donovan Valenzi |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?