Paulsen v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Terry Paulsen
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc., Takeda Chemical Industries Inc. and AbbVie, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv04144
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 225 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories to seal Portion of Reply and Exhibit (Henning, Nicole)
March 13, 2020 Filing 224 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories Ex. BB regarding Rule 56 statement #223 (Henning, Nicole)
March 13, 2020 Filing 223 RULE 56 56.1(a) Statement in Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Exhibit BB, #3 Exhibit CC)(Henning, Nicole)
March 13, 2020 Filing 222 SEALED REPLY by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories to MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories for summary judgment #196 (Henning, Nicole)
March 13, 2020 Filing 221 REPLY by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories to motion for summary judgment #196 Redacted (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Henning, Nicole)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER : STANDING ORDER REGARDING REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: This Standing Order applies to all civil cases reassigned as of February 28, 2020 to the calendar of District Judge John F. Kness. Unless otherwise ordered: (1) all previously-set status or motion hearing dates are vacated; (2) any trials or evidentiary hearings scheduled between March 9, 2020 and May 1, 2020 are continued and will be re-set by the Court at a future hearing; and (3) all other previously-set deadlines and schedules (other than hearing dates) shall remain in effect. See Order for details. Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 3/9/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 219 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of the Executive Committee order #218 reassigning this case to Judge Kness, the motion hearing before Judge Dow on 3/4/2020 is stricken and the motion should be re-noticed before Judge Kness. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 218 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 20-0008 - Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on February 24, 2020 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable John F. Kness; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 313 cases be reassigned to the Honorable John F. Kness; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable John F. Kness' webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable John F. Kness to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that he shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable John F. Kness for all further proceedings. Honorable Joan B. Gottschall no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/28/2020. (kp, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 217 NOTICE of Motion by Alan Scott Levin for presentment of motion for reconsideration, #215 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 3/4/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Levin, Alan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 216 RESPONSE by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen for reconsideration regarding order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, terminate hearings,, terminate motions, #214 #215 (DeGrand, Erin)
February 25, 2020 Filing 215 MOTION by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen for reconsideration regarding order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, terminate hearings,, terminate motions, #214 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alan S. Levin ISO Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alan S. Levin, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Alan S. Levin)(Levin, Alan)
February 25, 2020 Filing 214 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' motion to extend time to file their reply in support of their motion for summary judgment #212 is granted. Notice of motion date of 2/27/2020 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 213 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Kies DeGrand for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #212 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/27/2020 at 09:15 AM. (DeGrand, Erin)
February 24, 2020 Filing 212 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories for extension of time to file response/reply (DeGrand, Erin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 211 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file certain exhibits under seal #209 is granted. Exhibits B and E identified in the motion may be filed under seal. Notice of motion date of 2/11/2020 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (ags)
February 7, 2020 Filing 210 NOTICE of Motion by Alan Scott Levin for presentment of Sealed motion #209 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/11/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Levin, Alan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 209 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen Exhibits B and E (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit E)(Levin, Alan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 208 Request for Judicial Notice by Terry Paulsen (Levin, Alan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 207 DECLARATION regarding Response #206 , memorandum in opposition to motion #205 authenticating exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Levin, Alan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 206 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen to Rule 56 statement,, #198 (Levin, Alan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM by Terry Paulsen in Opposition to motion for summary judgment #196 (Levin, Alan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 204 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment #196 is due 2/7/2020; Defendant's reply is due 2/28/2020 and may be up to and including thirty pages; motion is taken under advisement; and the court will issue a ruling by mail. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' motion for leave to file certain exhibits under seal #200 is granted. Case remains set for status on 11/26/2019. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 202 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories by Nicole C. Henning (Henning, Nicole)
November 18, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE of Motion by Nicole C. Henning for presentment of motion to seal document #200 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/26/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Henning, Nicole)
November 18, 2019 Filing 200 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories to seal document exhibit #199 (Henning, Nicole)
November 18, 2019 Filing 199 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories regarding Rule 56 statement,, #198 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K, #5 Exhibit L, #6 Exhibit M)(Henning, Nicole)
November 18, 2019 Filing 198 RULE 56 (c)(1) Statement by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories regarding motion for summary judgment #196 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Henning, Nicole)
November 18, 2019 Filing 197 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories in support of motion for summary judgment #196 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Henning, Nicole)
November 18, 2019 Filing 196 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories for summary judgment (Henning, Nicole)
November 13, 2019 Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for leave to file excess pages #193 is granted. Notice of motion date of 11/14/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. (cdh, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Kies DeGrand for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #193 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/14/2019 at 09:15 AM. (DeGrand, Erin)
November 11, 2019 Filing 193 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories for leave to file excess pages (DeGrand, Erin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 192 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear. The Court sets a further status hearing for 11/26/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 191 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Limited Fact Discovery and Dispositive Motions #189 is granted. Status hearing set for 10/2/2019 is reset to 10/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of motion date of 9/25/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Kies DeGrand for presentment of extension of time #189 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/25/2019 at 09:15 AM. (DeGrand, Erin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 189 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories for extension of time Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Limited Fact Discovery and Dispositive Motions (DeGrand, Erin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 188 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories by Erin Kies DeGrand (DeGrand, Erin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE by All Defendants re attorney appearance #185 Withdrawal of Appearance (Castle, Patrick)
July 24, 2019 Filing 186 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 7/24/2019. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 185 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories by Patrick J. Castle (Castle, Patrick)
April 8, 2019 Filing 184 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held. Counsel for Plaintiff participates by telephone. The Court adopts the deadlines set out in the parties' joint status report #183 , including the fact discovery deadline of 10/3/2019 and the dispositive motion deadline of 11/3/2019. This case is set for further status hearing on 7/24/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 183 STATUS Report Joint by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories (Dore, Kathryn)
April 2, 2019 Filing 182 ANSWER to amended complaint Second by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories(Dore, Kathryn)
March 19, 2019 Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 3/19/2019. For the reasons explained above, Defendants' motions [144; 147; 150] are granted in part and denied in part. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5), TAP is dismissed from this action with prejudice. With regard to Defendants' motions under Rule 12(b)(6), all Counts 40 against TPUSA as successor in interest to TAP are dismissed with prejudice; all claims but Count II against AbbVie are dismissed; and all claims but Counts II & V against Abbott are dismissed. The Court sets this matter for further status on April 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. to set a schedule for limited discovery regarding: (1) when Plaintiff's claim accrued; (2) whether the second amended complaint as to AbbVie properly relates back under Rule 15(c)(3); and (3) the roles of the remaining defendants vis--vis the manufacturing and development of Lupron. The parties should submit a joint status report and a proposed schedule for limited discovery no later than April 4, 2019. Finally, as an administrative matter, the motion for Rule 11 Sanctions by AbbVie, Abbott, and TPUSA #153 is stricken without prejudice in light of the notice of withdrawal filed on October 30, 2018 #180 . Mailed notice(cdh, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 180 NOTICE by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for sanctions Rule 11 #153 Withdrawal of Rule 11 Motion (Dore, Kathryn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 179 REPLY by AbbVie, Inc. to response in opposition to motion #163 (Dore, Kathryn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 178 REPLY by Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. to response in opposition to motion #168 (Dore, Kathryn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 177 REPLY by Abbott Laboratories to response in opposition to motion #162 (Dore, Kathryn)
October 16, 2018 Filing 176 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' unopposed motion to extend time to reply #174 is granted. Notice of motion date of 10/18/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 175 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #174 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/18/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
October 15, 2018 Filing 174 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #147 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #150 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #144 , motion for sanctions #153 Unopposed (Dore, Kathryn)
October 3, 2018 Filing 173 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Follow regarding the motion to seal documents #158 which was granted on 10/2/2018: Docket numbers 160, 166, 170, and 171 were filed under seal and should remain under seal. Additionally, the Clerk's Office is directed to seal docket numbers 161-4, 161-5, 165-1, and 165-2 (confidential documents). Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 172 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff did not appear. As discussed on the record, Plaintiff's motion for leave to file certain exhibits under seal #158 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 171 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen CORRECTED REPLACEMENT (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
September 28, 2018 Filing 170 SEALED RESPONSE by Terry Paulsen to response in opposition to motion #169 , sealed response, #160 CORRECTED (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
September 28, 2018 Filing 169 RESPONSE by Terry Paulsenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for sanctions Rule 11 #153 CORRECTED (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
September 26, 2018 Filing 168 RESPONSE by Terry Paulsenin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. Second Amended Complaint #147 (Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 167 DECLARATION of Alan S Levin, MD, JD regarding motion for sanctions #153 , response in opposition to motion, #161 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 166 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen Declaration of Alan Levin In Opposition to Defendants Rule 11 Motion for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 165 Correction to exhibits by Terry Paulsen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit K)(Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 164 Correction to exhibits by Terry Paulsen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E)(Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 163 RESPONSE by Terry Paulsenin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant AbbVie, Inc. Second Amended Complaint #150 (Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 162 RESPONSE by Terry Paulsenin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Abbott Laboratories Second Amended Complaint #144 (Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 161 RESPONSE by Terry Paulsenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for sanctions Rule 11 #153 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 160 SEALED RESPONSE by Terry Paulsen to MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for sanctions Rule 11 #153 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 159 NOTICE of Motion by Alan Scott Levin for presentment of (Levin, Alan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 158 MOTION by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen to seal certain exhibits (Levin, Alan)
August 15, 2018 Filing 157 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Counsel for Plaintiff failed to appear. The following motions are taken under advisement: Defendant Abbott Laboratories' motion to dismiss second amended complaint pursuant to rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) #144 , Defendants Takeda Pharmaceuticials U.S.A. Inc. and Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc.'s motion to dismiss second amended complaint pursuant to rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) #147 , Defendant Abbvie Inc.'s motion to dismiss second amended complaint pursuant to rules 12(b)(6) #150 , and Defendants' Rule 11 motion for sanctions #153 ; Plaintiff's responses are due 9/26/2018; Defendants' replies are due 10/16/2018; the Court will issue a ruling by mail. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE OF CORRECTION (Document was entered on the incorrect case number.) (cdh, ).
August 6, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion for sanctions #153 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/15/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in support of motion for sanctions #153 Rule 11 (Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 153 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for sanctions Rule 11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #150 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/15/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #150 Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 150 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant AbbVie, Inc. Second Amended Complaint (Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #147 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/15/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 148 MEMORANDUM by Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #147 Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 147 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. Second Amended Complaint (Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #144 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/15/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM by Abbott Laboratories in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #144 Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dore, Kathryn)
August 6, 2018 Filing 144 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Abbott Laboratories Second Amended Complaint (Dore, Kathryn)
July 27, 2018 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (kb, )
July 6, 2018 Filing 143 Second AMENDED complaint by Terry Paulsen against All Defendants (Levin, Alan)
June 20, 2018 Filing 142 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion to allow Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint and to set amended pleading/response deadlines #140 is granted. Status hearing set for 7/3/2018 is stricken and reset to 8/15/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 18, 2018 Filing 141 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion for leave to file #140 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/21/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
June 18, 2018 Filing 140 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. for leave to file JOINT -- Amended Complaint (Dore, Kathryn)
June 11, 2018 Filing 139 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion for extension of time to answer #137 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/13/2018 is stricken and reset to 7/3/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of motion date of 6/12/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 5, 2018 Filing 138 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #137 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/12/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
June 5, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #117 JOINT (Dore, Kathryn)
June 5, 2018 Filing 136 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie, Inc. by Kathryn Leahy Dore (Dore, Kathryn)
May 29, 2018 Filing 135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for extension of time to answer #133 is granted. Notice of motion date of 5/30/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 25, 2018 Filing 134 (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by Paula Sue Quist for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #133 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/30/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Quist, Paula)
May 25, 2018 Filing 133 MOTION by Defendant Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) (Quist, Paula)
May 25, 2018 Filing 132 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. by Paula Sue Quist (Quist, Paula)
May 23, 2018 Filing 131 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for extension of time to answer #125 is granted. Notice of motion date of 5/24/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 130 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Paulsen as to Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. on 5/7/2018, answer due 5/29/2018. (Levin, Alan)
May 21, 2018 Filing 129 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Paulsen as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 5/7/2018, answer due 5/29/2018. (Levin, Alan)
May 21, 2018 Filing 128 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Paulsen as to AbbVie, Inc. on 5/7/2018, answer due 5/29/2018. (Levin, Alan)
May 21, 2018 Filing 127 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Paulsen as to Abbott Laboratories on 5/7/2018, answer due 5/29/2018. (Levin, Alan)
May 17, 2018 Filing 126 Unopposed Motion / NOTICE of Motion by Paula Sue Quist for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #125 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/24/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Quist, Paula)
May 17, 2018 Filing 125 MOTION by Defendant AbbVie, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Quist, Paula)
May 17, 2018 Filing 124 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by AbbVie, Inc. (Quist, Paula)
May 17, 2018 Filing 123 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie, Inc. by Paula Sue Quist (Quist, Paula)
May 7, 2018 Filing 122 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants Abbott Laboratories and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.'s motion to extend time until June 7, 2018 to answer and otherwise plead #119 is granted. Notice of motion date of 5/8/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Status hearing set for 5/24/2018 is stricken and reset to 6/13/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 121 RESPONSE by Terry Paulsen to MOTION by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #117 #119 (Levin, Alan)
May 3, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Motion by Paula Sue Quist for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #119 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/8/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Quist, Paula)
May 3, 2018 Filing 119 MOTION by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #117 (Quist, Paula)
May 3, 2018 Filing 118 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Paula Sue Quist (Quist, Paula)
May 2, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. (jjr, )
May 1, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (yt)
April 24, 2018 Filing 117 First AMENDED complaint by Terry Paulsen against Abbott Laboratories, Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc., AbbVie, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Levin, Alan)
April 10, 2018 Filing 116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant Abbott Laboratories' motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead #113 is granted. Notice of motion date of 4/11/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 9, 2018 Filing 115 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen to motion for extension of time to file answer #113 (Levin, Alan)
April 6, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #113 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/11/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
April 6, 2018 Filing 113 MOTION by Defendant Abbott Laboratories for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Dore, Kathryn)
April 5, 2018 Filing 112 INTERNET Citation Note. Decision re memorandum opinion and order #111 cited material from the internet. The cited material is attached. (TAP Pharmaceuticals) (Library, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/27/2018. Mailed notice(ks, )
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendants' motions #96 and #99 are granted in part and denied in part. The motion to dismiss TAP as a Defendant pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) is granted to the extent that Plaintiff is given until May 22, 2018 to serve an amended complaint upon a proper defendant (whether that is TAP or a proper successor to TAP). If Plaintiff fails to serve a proper defendant by this date, TAP will be dismissed from the case. All claims against Defendant Takeda Inc. (and Takeda Ltd., to the extent this is the party Plaintiff intended to name) are dismissed with prejudice. All claims against Defendant TPNA are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Abbott for negligence, breach of express warranty, breach of implied warranty, fraudulent misrepresentation, and negligent misrepresentation are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff can proceed against Abbott on her claims for strict products liability and strict products liability failure to warn. Plaintiff is given until April 24, 2018 to file an amended complaint consistent with this opinion, if Plaintiff believes that she can overcome the deficiencies identified above for the dismissed claims. This case is set for further status hearing on May 24, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/27/2018. mailed notice(ks, ) Modified on 3/27/2018 (ks, ).
October 20, 2017 Filing 109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: All matters pending before Judge Gottschall are stricken. This case is reassigned to Judge Dow. Mailed notice (mjc, )
October 19, 2017 Filing 108 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 294(b)for all further proceedings. Honorable Joan B. Gottschall no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/19/2017.(ks, )
May 24, 2017 Filing 107 REPLY by Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion #104 (Dore, Kathryn)
May 10, 2017 Filing 106 DECLARATION regarding other #105 , memorandum in opposition to motion #104 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--SEC-FORM-10K)(Tsadik, Tesfaye)
May 10, 2017 Filing 105 Request for Judicial Notice by Terry Paulsen (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
May 10, 2017 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM by Terry Paulsen in Opposition to motion to dismiss #96 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #99 (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
April 11, 2017 Filing 103 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant Abbott Laboratories' renewed Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss #99 is briefed as follows: response due 5/10/17; reply due 5/24/17. Motion hearing set for 4/12/17 is stricken; no appearance required. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 11, 2017 Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendants' renewed motion to dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(5), 12(b)(6), and 9(b) #96 is briefed as follows: response due 5/10/17; reply due 5/24/17. Status hearing set for 4/12/17 is stricken. Motion hearing set for 4/12/17 is stricken; no appearance required. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 7, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #99 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 4/12/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
April 7, 2017 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM by Abbott Laboratories in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #99 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dore, Kathryn)
April 7, 2017 Filing 99 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Dore, Kathryn)
April 7, 2017 Filing 98 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion to dismiss #96 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 4/12/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
April 7, 2017 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM by Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #96 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Dore, Kathryn)
April 7, 2017 Filing 96 MOTION by Defendants Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. to dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(5), 12(b)(6), and 9(b) (Dore, Kathryn)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/15/2017.Mailed notice(mjc, )
March 15, 2017 Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant Abbott Laboratories' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Threshold Issue of Real Party in Interest #70 is denied. See separate Order. The parties are free to resubmit any dispositive motions previously denied without prejudice. Status is set for April 12, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 5, 2017 Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Motion of June K. Ghezzi to withdraw appearance #91 is granted. Attorney June K. Ghezzi may withdraw her appearance on behalf of the defendants. Motion hearing set for 1/6/17 is stricken; no appearance required. Mailed notice (mjc, )
December 21, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE of Motion by June K. Ghezzi for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #91 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/6/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Ghezzi, June)
December 21, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION by Attorney June K. Ghezzi to withdraw as attorney for Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc.. No party information provided (Ghezzi, June)
October 4, 2016 Filing 90 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Abbott's motion for leave to file Exhibit N under seal #88 is granted. Motion hearing set for 10/5/16 is stricken; no appearance required. Mailed notice (mjc, )
September 28, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief #88 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 10/5/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
September 28, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION by Defendant Abbott Laboratories to File Exhibit N Under Seal #87 . (Dore, Kathryn) (Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office) (eaa).
September 28, 2016 Filing 87 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Abbott Laboratories Exhibit N (Dore, Kathryn)
September 28, 2016 Filing 86 RESPONSE by Defendant Abbott Laboratories to Rule 56 statement #81 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O)(Dore, Kathryn)
September 28, 2016 Filing 85 REPLY by Abbott Laboratories to memorandum in opposition to motion #80 (Dore, Kathryn)
September 14, 2016 Filing 84 Exhibit 3 by Terry Paulsen CORRECTED-EXHIBIT 3- EXCERPT-DEF-RESPONSE TO RFA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Tsadik, Tesfaye)
September 14, 2016 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Tesfaye Tsadik Authenticating Documents and in Support of Judicial Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Tsadik, Tesfaye) (Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office) (eaa ).
September 14, 2016 Filing 82 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen to memorandum in opposition to motion #80 , Rule 56 statement #81 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
September 14, 2016 Filing 81 RULE 56 Statement by Terry Paulsen regarding motion for summary judgment #70 (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
September 14, 2016 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM by Terry Paulsen in Opposition to motion for summary judgment #70 (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
September 6, 2016 Filing 79 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Abbott's motion for leave to file certain exhibits under seal #77 is granted. Abbott may file its Exhibits D, H, I and L under seal. Motion hearing set for 9/7/16 is stricken; no appearance required. Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 24, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion to seal #77 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/7/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
August 24, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION by Defendant Abbott Laboratories to seal Certain Exhibits (Dore, Kathryn)
August 24, 2016 Filing 76 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Abbott Laboratories Exhibit L regarding statement in support, #72 (Dore, Kathryn)
August 24, 2016 Filing 75 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Abbott Laboratories Exhibit I regarding statement in support, #72 (Dore, Kathryn)
August 24, 2016 Filing 74 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Abbott Laboratories Exhibit H regarding statement in support, #72 (Dore, Kathryn)
August 24, 2016 Filing 73 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Abbott Laboratories Exhibit D regarding statement in support, #72 (Dore, Kathryn)
August 24, 2016 Filing 72 STATEMENT by Defendant Abbott Laboratoriesin Support of MOTION by Defendant Abbott Laboratories for summary judgment on the Threshold Issue of Real Party in Interest #70 Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Dore, Kathryn)
August 24, 2016 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM by Abbott Laboratories in support of motion for summary judgment #70 on the Threshold Issue of Real Party in Interest (Dore, Kathryn)
August 24, 2016 Filing 70 MOTION by Defendant Abbott Laboratories for summary judgment on the Threshold Issue of Real Party in Interest (Dore, Kathryn)
August 3, 2016 Filing 69 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status hearing held. Discovery is completed. Abbott shall file a motion for summary judgment on the real party in interest issue by 8/24/16. The plaintiff shall respond by 9/14/16. Abbot shall file its reply by 9/28/16. Mailed notice (mjc, )
July 14, 2016 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status hearing set for 8/3/16 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mjc, )
July 7, 2016 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 7/7/16. In response to the Court's inquiry, the parties report that discovery concerning the issue of Abbott's status as a real party in interest is concluded. Accordingly, all matters relating to this referral having been addressed, this case is returned to the District Judge for further proceedings. Referral terminated. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 29, 2016 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This matter is set for a status hearing on 7/7/16 at 10:00 a.m. to address whether all matters relating to the referral have been addressed and, if so, terminate the referral. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: The parties' Joint Motion to Resolve Discovery Dispute #63 is granted. The Court has reviewed the parties' positions as set forth in the Joint Motion and concludes that Defendant Abbott is not required to do anything more in responding to Plaintiff's written discovery on the limited issue as to which the District Judge has permitted discovery to go forward in this case concerning Abbott's status as a real party in interest. See attached Statement for further explanation. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 6/29/2016. Mailed notice(ber, )
April 1, 2016 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the Court's instance, the motion and status hearing set for 4/4/16 at 10:00 a.m. is stricken. The Court will rule on the parties' Joint Motion to Resolve Discovery Disputes #63 either via CM/ECF or set the motion for in-court hearing and ruling in a future order. Mailed notice (ber, )
March 28, 2016 Filing 63 MOTION by Defendant Abbott Laboratories to Resolve Discovery Disputes (JOINT) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Henning, Nicole)
March 17, 2016 Filing 62 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/17/2016. Mailed notice(mjc, )
March 17, 2016 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Joint motion to enter protective order #59 is granted. Enter order. Motion hearing set for 3/18/16 is stricken; no appearance required. Mailed notice (mjc, )
March 15, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Motion by Nicole C. Henning for presentment of motion for protective order, #59 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/18/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Henning, Nicole)
March 15, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. for protective order (JOINT) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Henning, Nicole)
February 9, 2016 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Initial status hearing held on 2/9/16. By 2/16/16, Plaintiff will serve any written discovery that she believes she needs on the real party in interest issue that Judge Gottschall held open in the Order dated 1/6/16 #52 . The parties shall meet and confer about any disputes they may have with respect to the written discovery and, if they cannot resolve the disputes themselves, the parties shall file a joint motion to resolve discovery dispute(s) by 3/28/16. Status hearing and motion hearing on any potential discovery motion set for 4/4/16 at 10:00 a.m. Out of town counsel will not be permitted to participate by telephone in the motion hearing on 4/4/16 if there will be extensive argument. Mailed notice (ber, )
January 29, 2016 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert for the purpose of discovery supervision relating to the question as to whether Abbott is a real party in interest, with the authority to adjust discovery cut-off date. Initial status hearing scheduled for 2/9/16 at 10:30 a.m. An initial status report is not required. Prior to the status hearing, however, the parties shall familiarize themselves with the subjects referenced in Magistrate Judge Gilbert's Standing Order for Initial Status Report posted on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges as applicable to referral cases. Out of town counsel may participate by telephone with advance notice to the Court's courtroom deputy. Mailed notice (ber, )
January 25, 2016 Filing 56 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert for all further proceedings.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/25/16. (jc, )
January 20, 2016 Filing 55 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/20/16. (jc, )
January 19, 2016 Filing 54 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. (mjc, )Mailed notice.
January 19, 2016 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status hearing set for 1/20/16 is stricken; no appearance required. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kim for discovery supervision relating to the question as to whether Abbott is a real party in interest. Judge Kim has the authority to adjust discovery cutoff date as he and the parties feel is appropriate. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The parties' supplemental briefing regarding the statute of limitations #50 #51 is before the court. The court previously held the defendants' motions to dismiss #25 #28 , as well as a related motion for sanctions and to stay discovery #41 , in abeyance pending a determination of whether plaintiff Terry Paulsen had timely refiled her complaint. For the following reasons, limited discovery shall proceed regarding Abbott's contention that it is not a real party in interest. All pending motions #25 #28 #41 are denied without prejudice pending resolution of the statute of limitations issue, and the date for the defendants to answer or otherwise plead is held in abeyance pending further court order. This case is set for status on January 20, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. The parties should be prepared to set a firm cutoff for the limited discovery outlined in this order. See order for details. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/6/2016.Mailed notice(mjc, )
December 16, 2015 Filing 51 RESPONSE by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. to sur-reply #50 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dore, Kathryn)
December 4, 2015 Filing 50 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen to motion for order, #41 (Levin, Alan)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The defendants' motions to dismiss #25 #28 are before the court. The court will afford Ms. Paulsen an opportunity to address which state's law governs the refiling of her complaint if she wishes to do so. She may file a sur-reply by December 4, 2015. The defendants shall file a consolidated sur-response by December 18, 2015. The parties' briefs shall not exceed five pages each. The motions to dismiss, as well as a related motion for sanctions and to stay discovery #41 , shall be held in abeyance pending a determination of whether Ms. Paulsen timely refiled her complaint. See order for details. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 11/20/2015. Mailed notice(mjc, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Alan S. Levin's application to appear pro hac vice #47 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
November 8, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11276611. (Levin, Alan)
November 6, 2015 Filing 46 REPLY by Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion #44 To Award Costs of Dismissed Action and To Stay Discovery (Dore, Kathryn)
October 30, 2015 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Terry Paulsen in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. for order to Award Costs of Dismissed Action and to Stay Discovery #41 (Levin, Alan)
October 30, 2015 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by Terry Paulsen in Opposition to motion for order, #41 AWARD OF COSTS (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
October 15, 2015 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendants' motion to award costs of dismissed action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(d) and to stay discovery #41 is briefed as follows: response due 10/30/15; reply due 11/6/15. Motion hearing set for 10/16/15 is stricken; no appearance required. Mailed notice (mjc, )
October 13, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion for order, #41 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 10/16/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
October 13, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. for order to Award Costs of Dismissed Action and to Stay Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dore, Kathryn)
August 7, 2015 Filing 40 REPLY by Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #37 (Dore, Kathryn)
August 7, 2015 Filing 39 REPLY by Abbott Laboratories to response in opposition to motion, #37 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dore, Kathryn)
July 24, 2015 Filing 38 OBJECTIONS by Terry Paulsen to memorandum in support of motion #26 (Levin, Alan)
July 24, 2015 Filing 37 RESPONSE by Terry Paulsenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. to dismiss #28 , MOTION by Defendant Abbott Laboratories to dismiss #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Levin, Alan)
July 17, 2015 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: This case was recently reassigned to this court. The dates set by Judge Feinerman on 7/14/2015 shall stand, except that the court will set a status date when it rules on the defendants' motions to dismiss #25 #28 , which are scheduled to be fully briefed on 8/7/2015. Mailed notice (mjc, )
July 17, 2015 Filing 35 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, due to a clerical error, 15 c 4144, Paulsen v. Abbott Laboratories, et al. was randomly assigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman and designated Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez, and It further appearing, 15 c 4144, Paulsen v. Abbott Laboratories, et al. is the refiling of case 11 c 4860, Cardenas, et al. v. Abbott Laboratories, et al. assigned to Judge Joan B. Gottschall and designated Magistrate Judge Young B. Kim, and It further appearing, that Judge Gottschall and Judge Feinerman agree that reassignment to Judge Gottschall is in the interest of efficient judicial administration, therefore It is hereby ordered that, pursuant to IOP 13(d) the Clerk is to reassign 15 c 4144, Paulsen v. Abbott Laboratories, et al. to Judge Gottschall and designate Magistrate Judge Kim. Case reassigned to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/2015.(mr, )
July 17, 2015 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 9/8/2015 #33 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 14, 2015 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 9/8/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendants' motions to dismiss #25 #28 are entered and continued. Responses due by 7/24/2015; replies due by 8/7/2015. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 9/1/2015. Initial written discovery requests shall be served by 9/29/2015. Fact discovery shall be completed by 4/22/2016. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 4/29/2016. Plaintiff's expert(s) shall be deposed by 5/27/2016. Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 6/3/2016. Defendants' expert(s) shall be deposed by 7/1/2016. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 7/28/2016. Motions to amend the pleadings or add new parties shall be filed by 11/3/2015.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 10, 2015 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status and motion hearings set for 7/14/2015 at 9:00 a.m. #6 , #27 and #30 are re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 7, 2015 Filing 31 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. (Dore, Kathryn)
July 6, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion to dismiss #28 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/14/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
July 6, 2015 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #28 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Dore, Kathryn)
July 6, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION by Defendants Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. to dismiss (Dore, Kathryn)
July 6, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion to dismiss #25 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/14/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
July 6, 2015 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Abbott Laboratories in support of motion to dismiss #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dore, Kathryn)
July 6, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Abbott Laboratories to dismiss (Dore, Kathryn)
June 16, 2015 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #22 is granted. The time for Defendant Tap Pharmaceutical Products to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint is extended to 7/6/2015. Motion hearing set for 7/6/2015 #23 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 15, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief #22 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/6/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
June 15, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Notification as to Affiliates)(Dore, Kathryn)
June 15, 2015 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. by Kathryn Leahy Dore (Dore, Kathryn)
June 15, 2015 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. by Nicole C. Henning (Henning, Nicole)
June 15, 2015 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. by June K. Ghezzi (Ghezzi, June)
June 8, 2015 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. regarding Summons & Complaint served on Derrick Hackett on 6/02/2015, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Paulsen as to Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. on 6/2/2015, answer due 6/23/2015. (Dolan, Martin)
June 1, 2015 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendants unopposed motions for extension of time to answer #10 and #12 are granted. The time for Defendants Abbott, Takeda Chemicals, and Takeda Pharmaceuticals to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint is extended to 7/6/2015. Motion hearings set for 6/4/2015 #11 and #13 are stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc. regarding Complaint & Summons served on Alice Greene on 5/14/15, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Paulsen as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc. on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015. (Dolan, Martin)
June 1, 2015 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Takeda Chemical Industries Inc. regarding Summons & Complaint served on Alice Greene on 5/14/15, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Paulsen as to Takeda Chemical Industries Inc. on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015. (Dolan, Martin)
June 1, 2015 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories regarding Complaint & Summons served on Robin Lura on 5/14/15, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Paulsen as to Abbott Laboratories on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015. (Dolan, Martin)
May 29, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief,, #12 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/4/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
May 29, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Attachments: #1 TPUSA Notification as to Affiliates, #2 TCI Notification as to Affiliates)(Dore, Kathryn)
May 29, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Leahy Dore for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief #10 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/4/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Dore, Kathryn)
May 29, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Abbott Laboratories for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Notification as to Affiliates)(Dore, Kathryn)
May 29, 2015 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc. by Kathryn Leahy Dore (Dore, Kathryn)
May 29, 2015 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc. by Nicole C. Henning (Henning, Nicole)
May 29, 2015 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc. by June K. Ghezzi (Ghezzi, June)
May 14, 2015 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 7/14/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 7/7/2015. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the initial status hearing and Initial Status Report.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 14, 2015 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Application to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 13, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10638288. (Tsadik, Tesfaye)
May 12, 2015 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Chemical Industries Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc., Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. (pg, )
May 12, 2015 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terry Paulsen by Martin A. Dolan (Dolan, Martin)
May 12, 2015 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (jn, )
May 11, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Levin, Alan)
May 11, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Terry Paulsen; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10631566.(Levin, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulsen v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Paulsen
Represented By: Tesfaye Tsadik
Represented By: Alan Scott Levin
Represented By: Martin A. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Leahy Dore
Represented By: Patrick J. Castle
Represented By: Paula Sue Quist
Represented By: Nicole C. Henning
Represented By: Erin Kies DeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Leahy Dore
Represented By: Paula Sue Quist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals of North America, Inc.
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Leahy Dore
Represented By: Nicole C. Henning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tap Pharmaceutical Products, Inc.
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Leahy Dore
Represented By: Paula Sue Quist
Represented By: Nicole C. Henning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Chemical Industries Inc.
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Leahy Dore
Represented By: Nicole C. Henning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Leahy Dore
Represented By: Patrick J. Castle
Represented By: Paula Sue Quist
Represented By: Nicole C. Henning
Represented By: Erin Kies DeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?