Tracy v. Hull et al
Plaintiff: |
Stephen Tracy |
Defendant: |
Michael Hull and City of Naperville |
Movant: |
Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd. |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv05052 |
Filed: |
June 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Du Page |
Presiding Judge: |
Jorge L. Alonso |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 19, 2017 |
Filing
78
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 62 is granted. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/19/2017. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
November 24, 2015 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court grants defendants' motion to dismiss 22 and, because plaintiff has been unable to state viable claims despite several opportunities to do so, dismisses with prejudice the state and federal false arrest c laims asserted in Counts I and II, the IIED claim asserted in Count III, and the § 1983 claims asserted against Naperville in Count V. The only claims that remain in this suit are the § 1983 unlawful search claim against Hull and indemnification claim against Naperville. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/24/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court grants in part and denies in part defendants' motion to dismiss 15 . The motion is granted with respect to: (1) the seizure claim against Hull in Count I, the intentional infliction of emotional distress claim in Count II, and the search and seizure claims against Naperville in Count IV, which are dismissed without prejudice; and (2) any claim for indemnification for punitive damages or attorney's fees in Count III, which is dismissed with preju dice. The motion is denied with respect to the search claim against Hull in Count I and the indemnification claim for compensatory damages against Naperville in Count III. Plaintiff has untilOctober 12, 2015 to amend Counts I, II and IV in accordance with this Order, if he can do so and comply with Rule 11. If plaintiff fails to amend these claims, the Court will dismiss them with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/28/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?