In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Plaintiff: Louetta Schulze, Thomas Moors, John Hollis, Diann Kohn, Paul Hanna, Edwin Mourino, Rosalynd Lugo, George Marshall, Martin Angiulli, Mary Farrell, Dale Kardasz, Joseph McMahon, Kelly Reyes, Sherri Lowe, Charles Haje, Sean James Cummins, Jacqueline Manning, Justin Allsup, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Erika Strojny Myers, Jennifer Hernandez, Shane Sparks, Anita Mireles, Paul De La Torre, Judy Owens, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Larry Karst, Mary Ellis, Shaina Andrews, Denise Kramer, Louise Williams, Neal Eisenbraun, Julia Jacobus, Joel Cohn, Jimmy Phifer, Janine Cook, Elizabeth Stokes, Dorothy Lee, Robin Chrystal Hale, Eduardo Gomez, Alyssa Clemmons, John Burns, Katherine Howes, Figueriredo, David Fensterstock, Varonica Beal, Melissa Harris, Brian William McCrudden, Joshua Ogden, Anthony Linsalata, Scott Dahlin, Jason Birnhak, Nilsa Cintron, Russell Marks, Victoria Shahrashian, Yousef Haiderzad, Carolyn Stevens, Donald Weeks, Michelle Fine, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Mercedes Taketa, Marcie Goodman, Jennifer Yates, Ron Coats, William P Mobley, Gretchen Dore, Melanie Barber, Jeffrey Greenfield, Jennie Mayer, Candace Dunlap, Linda Boss, Jennifer Chamberlin, Karen Jones, Alex Trinidad, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Richard E. Frazier, III, Jerdrychowski, Dave Mager, Paul O'Donnell, Cynthia Oravecz, Lois Walker, Valdez and Theresa Kurdt
Defendant: Walgreen Co., General Nutrition Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Target Corporation, Target Brands, Inc., GNC Holdings, Inc., General Nutrition Centers, Inc., NBTY, Inc. and Rafael Figueiredo
In Re: In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Case Number: 1:2015cv05070
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Amy J Eve
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's 8/21/17 dismissal order in 15 C 5070 (MDL 2619, all member cases are hereby dismissed. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/21/2017. Mailed notice. (bg, )
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal #227 , plaintiffs' individual claims are dismissed with prejudice and claims of the putative class are dismissed without prejudice. The parties will each bear their own fees and costs, unless otherwise mutually agreed by the Parties. All pending dates and deadlines are stricken. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/21/2017. Mailed notice. (bg, )
August 18, 2017 Filing 227 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Joint) (Groves, Amanda)
August 15, 2017 Filing 226 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 8/15/17 and continued to 8/22/17 at 9:00 a.m. Parties report that a settlement has been reached which requires signatures by all cases part of the MDL. Attorneys Michael London and/or Virginia Anello must appear at the 8/22/17 hearing unless the settlement agreement is signed by their client beforehand. Failure to do so may result in dismissal with prejudice of their clients or enforcement of the settlement against their clients. Parties wishing to appear via telephone on 8/22/17 are instructed to call the conference call line, (888) 273-3658. The access code for the conference call is 2217918. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 28, 2017 Filing 225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: At the parties' request, Status hearing set for 8/1/17 is stricken and reset to 8/15/2017 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
July 11, 2017 Filing 224 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the parties' settlement, the status hearing scheduled for August 21, 2017, and the in-person settlement conference scheduled for September 20, 2017, are cancelled. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Mailed notice (ma,)
July 11, 2017 Filing 223 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The parties have contacted chambers and represented that they have reached a settlement in all of the MDL cases. At the parties' request, Status hearing set for 7/13/17 is stricken and reset to 8/1/2017 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
June 27, 2017 Filing 222 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: At the parties' request, Status hearing set for 6/29/17 is stricken and reset to 7/13/2017 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
May 30, 2017 Filing 221 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Preliminary settlement discussion held by phone. Parties reported to the court that they are actively exploring settlement options in order to resolve the matter without the court's assistance. In the event that the parties need to explore settlement options with the assistance of this court, an in-person settlement conference is scheduled for September 20, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019. A status hearing is scheduled for August 21, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. by phone for an update on settlement discussions and to schedule deadlines for exchanging settlement position statements. Parties are to use the same call-in information. If the parties resolve the matter prior to the status hearing, they are to contact the court as soon as possible. Mailed notice (ma,)
May 22, 2017 Filing 220 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A preliminary settlement discussion with the attorneys of record is scheduled for May 30, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. (C.S.T.) by phone. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
May 22, 2017 Filing 219 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 5/22/2017 and continued to 6/29/2017 at 08:30 AM. Plaintiffs' third amended complaint shall be filed by 7/21/17. Mailed notice (kef, )
May 22, 2017 Filing 218 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(kef, )Mailed notice.
May 19, 2017 Filing 217 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #215 , #214 , #216 sent to Attorney Thomas A Evans returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Thomas A Evans a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing set for 5/22/2017 is reset from 9:15 a.m. to 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 215 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/19/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 214 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court denies Defendants' motions to strike, and the Court denies in part and grants in part without prejudice Defendants' motions to dismiss #193 #196 . Plaintiffs may file a Third Consolidated Class Action Complaint consistent with this opinion by 6/9/17 if they wish to do so. [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER: Motion for leave to withdraw appearance #211 is granted. Ryan McLaughlin is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Notice motion date of 4/13/17 is stricken. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/11/2017. Mailed notice. (bg, )
April 10, 2017 Filing 212 NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M Mclaughlin for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #211 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/13/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Mclaughlin, Ryan)
April 10, 2017 Filing 211 MOTION by Attorney Ryan M. McLaughlin to withdraw as attorney for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. No party information provided (Mclaughlin, Ryan)
April 7, 2017 Filing 210 SUR-REPLY by Defendants Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #193 (Paikin, Jonathan)
April 3, 2017 Filing 209 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates to reply to response to motion #202 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #193 (Clifford, Robert)
April 3, 2017 Filing 208 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to plaintiff Diann Kohn's notice of voluntary dismissal, plaintiff Diann Kohn's case is hereby dismissed. Diann Kohn terminated.Mailed notice (kef, )
March 31, 2017 Filing 207 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing set for 5/16/17 is stricken and reset to 5/22/2017 at 09:15 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/24/2017: The Court orders further briefing. Plaintiffs should file their brief by April 3, 2017. If Defendants believe a response is necessary, they may file a single, consolidated response by April 10, 2017. The parties' briefs should be no more than 8 pages. No further briefing is permitted unless ordered by the Court. Status hearing set for April 12, 2017 is stricken and reset to May 16, 2017 at 9:15 a.m. [For further details, see Order.]Mailed notice(kef, )
February 7, 2017 Filing 205 WITHDRAWING Luke Hasscamp as counsel for Plaintiffs Ron Coats, Rosalynd Lugo and substituting Allan Kanner as counsel of record (Kanner, Allan)
February 6, 2017 Filing 204 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #202 , #203 sent to Attorney Luke Hasskamp returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Luke Hasskamp a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 203 REPLY by NBTY, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co. to MOTION by Defendants Walgreen Co., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., NBTY, Inc. to dismiss and Strike the Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint #196 (In Support) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Groves, Amanda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 202 REPLY by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Strike, #193 (Paikin, Jonathan)
January 9, 2017 Filing 201 RESPONSE by Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Strike, #193 , MOTION by Defendants Walgreen Co., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., NBTY, Inc. to dismiss and Strike the Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint #196 (Berman, Steve)
November 16, 2016 Filing 200 NOTICE by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli of Change of Address (Bulgarelli, Mark)
November 16, 2016 Filing 199 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 11/16/2016 and continued to 4/12/17 at 8:30 a.m. Defendants' motions to strike and dismiss #193 #196 are entered. Responses by 1/9/17. Replies by 2/6/17. Mailed notice (kef, )
November 14, 2016 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM by NBTY, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co. in support of motion to dismiss #196 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Groves, Amanda)
November 14, 2016 Filing 197 NOTICE of Motion by Amanda L Groves for presentment of motion to dismiss #196 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/16/2016 at 02:00 PM. (Groves, Amanda)
November 14, 2016 Filing 196 MOTION by Defendants Walgreen Co., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., NBTY, Inc. to dismiss and Strike the Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Groves, Amanda)
November 14, 2016 Filing 195 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Paikin for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #193 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/16/2016 at 02:00 PM. (Paikin, Jonathan)
November 14, 2016 Filing 194 MEMORANDUM by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #193 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cease & Desist Notification, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Sen. Heinrich)(Paikin, Jonathan)
November 14, 2016 Filing 193 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Strike, (Paikin, Jonathan)
September 23, 2016 Filing 192 STATUS Report The Parties' Joint Statement Regarding the Court's Order to Meet and Confer on a Joint Discovery Plan by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Draft CMO)(Groves, Amanda)
September 20, 2016 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/1/16 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 10/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2016. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
September 19, 2016 Filing 190 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #188 sent to Attorney David Mcmullan returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney David Mcmullan a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
September 19, 2016 Filing 189 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #188 sent to Attorney John Barrett returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney John Barrett a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Concerning Parties' Extension of Time Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/19/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 16, 2016 Filing 187 NOTICE by Jonathan W. Cuneo of Change of Address Amended (Cuneo, Jonathan)
September 15, 2016 Filing 186 NOTICE by Jonathan W. Cuneo of Change of Address (Cuneo, Jonathan)
September 15, 2016 Filing 185 STIPULATION to Amend the Case Management Order (JOINT) (Groves, Amanda)
September 12, 2016 Filing 184 SECOND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION AMENDED complaint by Victoria Shahrashian, Louise Williams, Karen Jones, Nilsa Cintron, Joel Cohn, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Dale Kardasz, Russell Marks, Charles Haje, Varonica Beal, Jennifer Chamberlin, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Justin Allsup, William P Mobley, Linda Boss, John Burns, Donald Weeks, Melissa Harris, Martin Angiulli against NBTY, Inc., Target Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co. (Berman, Steve)
September 1, 2016 Filing 183 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 9/1/16 and continued to 11/16/16 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' motion to lift the stay pertaining to testing of herbal supplements #156 is granted and plaintiffs' motion for voluntary dismissal #156 is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' motion for clarification and relief #164 is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' second amended consolidated complaint shall be filed by 9/12/16. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 11/14/16. The parties are directed to meet and confer and file a joint proposed discovery plan by 9/16/16. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 30, 2016 Filing 182 RESPONSE by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation to MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott #156 (Additional Supplemental) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Paikin, Jonathan)
August 26, 2016 Filing 181 STATUS Report (Joint) by NBTY, Inc., Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co. (Groves, Amanda)
August 25, 2016 Filing 180 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to plaintiff Janine Cook's notice of voluntary dismissal #105 , plaintiff's claims against all defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Janine Cook terminated.Mailed notice (kef, )
August 19, 2016 Filing 179 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing set for 9/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in courtroom 1241. The parties are directed to file a JOINT status report by 8/26/16. The status report should include: 1) a brief summary of the claims; 2) a statement regarding who, if anyone, is lead counsel; 3) a list of any pending motions and a general description of the issues in the motions; 4) any deadline or agreements regarding the date for defendants to answer or otherwise plead; 5) the status of any pending discovery, including the status of any work done by the appointed independent experts; 6) proposed deadlines for discovery; 7) the status of any settlement discussions, including whether the parties request a settlement conference; and 8) any other relevant issues the parties wish to bring to the Court's attention. The Court stresses that the status report must be JOINT. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 19, 2016 Filing 178 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: The court has received an ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION in this matter to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 signed by the Honorable Sarah S. Vance; therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that MDL 2619 (Lead Case 15 C 5070 and any associated cases - see attached list), IN RE: HERBAL SUPPLEMENTS MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION, is to be reassigned to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/19/2016.(ks, )
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION: The Northern District of Illinois has notified the Panel of the need to reassign the actions in the above litigation to another judge in that district. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, with the consent of that court, this litigation is reassigned to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. MAILED notice(ks, )
August 19, 2016 Filing 176 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:At the hearing on August 11, 2016, Judge Durkin disqualified himself pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, for the reasons stated on the record. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a) and (e), the Court gave the parties the opportunity to waive Judge Durkin's disqualification. See R. 172. The Clerk's Office has informed the Court that the Clerk's Office did not receive a waiver from all parties in this case. Therefore, Judge Durkin is disqualified and the case will be reassigned. Mailed notice (srn, )
August 11, 2016 Filing 175 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #172 , #173 sent to Attorney Jonathan B. Nace returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Jonathan B. Nace a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (sxn, )
August 11, 2016 Filing 173 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 8/11/2016. The parties have to 4:00 p.m. on August 18, 2016 in which to consider Judge Durkin's disqualification. Mailed notice (srn, )
August 11, 2016 Filing 172 NOTICE Concerning Waiver of Judicial Disqualification. (td, )
August 10, 2016 Filing 171 NOTICE by Joseph P. Guglielmo of Change of Address (Guglielmo, Joseph)
August 9, 2016 Filing 174 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #170 sent to Attorney Howard Bushman returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Howard Bushman a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (sxn, )
August 9, 2016 Filing 170 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The status hearing previously set for 8/11/2016 at 09:30 a.m. stands. The Court will address a potential conflict under 28 U.S.C. 455 relating to the employment of the Court's brother at the Clifford Law Offices. No substantive decisions will be made on the case until that issue is resolved. Any party wishing to appear telephonically should call 877-402-9757, access code 4410831 promptly at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (srn, )
August 5, 2016 Filing 169 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: The court has received an ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION in this matter to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 signed by the Honorable Sarah S. Vance; therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that MDL 2619 (Lead Case 15 C 5070 and any associated cases-see attached list), IN RE: HERBAL SUPPLEMENTS MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION, is to be reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/5/16.(ks, )
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER: ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION: The Northern District of Illinois has notified the Panel of the need to reassign the actions in the above litigation to another judge in that district. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, with the consent of that court, this litigation is reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.MAILED notice(ks, )
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify #164 is entered and continued to 8/11/16 at 9:30 a.m. No appearances necessary on 8/3/16. All other dates remain as scheduled. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 7/28/2016. Mailed notice (nsf, )
July 28, 2016 Filing 166 RESPONSE by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation to MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scot #164 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paikin, Jonathan)
July 26, 2016 Filing 165 NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of motion to clarify,,,,, #164 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/3/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Clifford, Robert)
July 26, 2016 Filing 164 MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates to clarify (Clifford, Robert)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Appointing Independent Experts Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 7/20/2016. Mailed notice(nsf,)
July 19, 2016 Filing 162 REPLY by Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Service List, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates to response to motion, #161 , response in opposition to motion, #159 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott #156 (Clifford, Robert)
July 12, 2016 Filing 161 RESPONSE by NBTY, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott #156 (Supplemental) (Groves, Amanda)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift the Stay or, in the Alternative, for Voluntary Dismissal is entered and briefed as follows: response by 7/12/2016, reply by 7/19/2016. No appearances necessary on 6/30/2016. All other dates remain as scheduled. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 6/28/2016. MAILED notice(ks, )
June 28, 2016 Filing 159 RESPONSE by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporationin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott #156 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Paikin, Jonathan)
June 24, 2016 Filing 158 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #157 , #156 sent to Attorney Robert Baldwin Brown, III returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Robert Baldwin Brown, III a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
June 24, 2016 Filing 157 NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,,,,,, #156 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 6/30/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Clifford, Robert)
June 24, 2016 Filing 156 MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer YatesMOTION TO LIFT THE STAY PERTAINING TO TESTING OF HERBAL SUPPLEMENTS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (Clifford, Robert)
June 10, 2016 Filing 155 Letter to Judge Darrah by In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation (Groves, Amanda)
May 12, 2016 Filing 154 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-10-16 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2016. (Hacker, Mary)
May 10, 2016 Filing 153 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing held. Detailed order to follow. Mailed notice(maf)
May 9, 2016 Filing 152 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing set for 5/10/16 at 10:00 a.m. is re-set to 5/10/16 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Jeffrey Greenfield #143 is granted. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 5/6/2016. MAILED notice(ks, )
May 5, 2016 Filing 150 WITHDRAWING as counsel for Plaintiffs Candace Dunlap, Jennie Mayer, Paul O'Donnell and substituting Taylor Asen as counsel of record (Asen, Taylor)
May 4, 2016 Filing 149 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing set for 5/10/2016 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice(maf)
May 2, 2016 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/14/16 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2016. (Hacker, Mary)
April 29, 2016 Filing 146 Letter to Judge Darrah by Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates relating to Independent Experts (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clifford, Robert)
April 29, 2016 Filing 145 STATUS Report by NBTY, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Groves, Amanda)
April 14, 2016 Filing 148 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing held. Joint status report to be filed by 4/29/16. Mailed notice(maf)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER: Status hearing set for 4/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/7/2016. MAILED notice(ks, )
March 28, 2016 Filing 143 MOTION by Attorney Steven C Marks to withdraw as attorney for Jeffrey Greenfield. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marks, Steven)
March 14, 2016 Filing 142 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sean James Cummins without prejudice (Parekh, Behram)
March 4, 2016 Filing 141 Letter to Judge Darrah by Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates re Proposed Independent Experts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Clifford, Robert)
March 4, 2016 Filing 140 INDEPENDENT EXPERTS STATEMENT by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation AND Defendants Walmart, Walgreens, and NBTY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Paikin, Jonathan)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Withdraw Counsel #137 is granted. No appearances necessary on 3/8/2016. All other dates remain as scheduled.Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 3/4/2016. Mailed notice(ks, )
March 1, 2016 Filing 138 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth A. Fegan for presentment of motion to withdraw #137 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 3/8/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2016 Filing 137 MOTION by Plaintiffs Robin Chrystal Hale, Kaitlyn Pirtle to withdraw Motion for Leave to Withdraw Counsel (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 16, 2016 Filing 136 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING THE APPOINTMENT OF AN INDPENDENT EXPERT by Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates AND Defendants Target Brands, Inc. and Target Corporation, NBTY, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Co., Duane Reade, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC., Wal-Mart Starco, LLC., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-mart Stores Arkansas, LLC (Clifford, Robert)
February 4, 2016 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/02/16 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2016. (Hacker, Mary)
February 3, 2016 Filing 134 Letter to Judge Darrah by Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates Requesting Clarification of January 28, 2016 Order (Clifford, Robert)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER: Status hearing held. Parties shall submit a statement to the Court regarding issues raised on the record by 2/16/16. After review, the Court will set a further status conference. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/2/2016. Mailed notice (ks, )
February 1, 2016 Filing 132 STATUS Report for Plaintiffs by Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jagoda Jedrychowski, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Damon P. Little, Ph.D)(Berman, Steve)
January 29, 2016 Filing 131 STATUS Report (Defendants' Supplemental Status Report) by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Paikin, Jonathan)
January 29, 2016 Filing 130 STIPULATION of Dismissal AS IT PERTAINS TO ALL GNC DEFENDANTS (EDWIN MOURINO Ind. Case No. 1:15-cv-05423) (Hooper, John)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/28/2016: For the February 2, 2016 status hearing, the parties are ordered to be prepared to discuss the appointment of an independent expert to assist the Court in determining the appropriate test to evaluate the content of the subject supplements. The parties are further ordered to not perform any testing until further order of the Court. Mailed Notice.(gcy, )
January 26, 2016 Filing 128 STIPULATION of Dismissal AS IT PERTAINS TO ALL GNC DEFENDANTS (KELLY REYES - IND. CASE NO. 1:15-CV-05107) (Hooper, John)
January 26, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jagoda Jedrychowski Without Prejudice (Millen, Douglas)
January 26, 2016 Filing 126 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jagoda Jedrychowski by Douglas A Millen (Millen, Douglas)
January 19, 2016 Filing 125 STATUS Report (Joint) by Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates (Berman, Steve)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: Joint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement #122 is granted. Joint Statement shall be filed by January 19, 2016. No appearances necessary on January 14, 2016. All other dates remain as scheduled. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/12/2016. MAILED notice(ks, )
January 11, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE of Motion by Steve W. Berman for presentment of extension of time,,,,, #122 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Berman, Steve)
January 11, 2016 Filing 122 MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates for extension of time (Berman, Steve)
January 11, 2016 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/08/15 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2016. (Hacker, Mary)
December 29, 2015 Filing 120 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul O'Donnell (McNulty, Shannon)
December 29, 2015 Filing 119 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul De La Torre, Joshua Ogden (McNulty, Shannon)
December 29, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alyssa Clemmons (McNulty, Shannon)
December 11, 2015 Filing 117 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates to order on motion for leave to file,,, motion hearing, status hearing, set deadlines, set deadlines/hearings, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,,,,,, #115 , status report #110 Plaintiffs' Response to the Status Report Submitted by Defendants, NBTY, Inc., Walgreen Co. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Berman, Steve)
December 11, 2015 Filing 116 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates, In Re In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation to status report #107 , order on motion for leave to file,,, motion hearing, status hearing, set deadlines, set deadlines/hearings, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,,,,,, #115 Plaintiffs' Response to Target's "Status Report" (Berman, Steve)
December 9, 2015 Filing 114 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dave Mager (Cochran, George)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: Status hearing and ruling on motion hearing held. Motions for leave to file a response to the status reports are granted [108, 111]. Status hearing set for 2/2/2016 at 10:00 a.m. for further scheduling. Joint statement shall be filed on or before 1/12/16. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 12/8/2015.MAILED notice(ks, )
December 7, 2015 Filing 113 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gretchen Dore Without Prejudice (Moskowitz, Adam)
December 4, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE of Motion by Steve W. Berman for presentment of motion for leave to file,,,,,, #111 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 12/8/2015 at 10:00 AM. (Berman, Steve)
December 4, 2015 Filing 111 MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates for leave to file Plaintiffs' Response to the Status Report Submitted by Defendants NBTY, Inc., Walgreen Co. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Response to the Status Report Submitted by Defendants NBTY, Inc., Walgreen Co. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.)(Berman, Steve)
December 3, 2015 Filing 110 STATUS Report by NBTY, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Groves, Amanda)
December 3, 2015 Filing 109 NOTICE of Motion by Steve W. Berman for presentment of motion for leave to file,,,,,, #108 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 12/8/2015 at 10:00 AM. (Berman, Steve)
December 3, 2015 Filing 108 MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates for leave to file Plaintiffs' Response to Target's "Status Report" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Response to Target's "Status Report")(Berman, Steve)
December 2, 2015 Filing 107 STATUS Report by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Paikin, Jonathan)
November 18, 2015 Filing 106 CONSOLIDATED UNREDACTED AMENDED complaint by Victoria Shahrashian, Joshua Ogden, Louise Williams, Paul Hanna, Karen Jones, Shane Sparks, Yousef Haiderzad, Dorothy Lee, Mary Farrell, Melanie Barber, Rosalynd Lugo, Nilsa Cintron, Joel Cohn, Sherri Lowe, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Edwin Mourino, Dale Kardasz, Anthony Linsalata, Theresa Kurdt, Judy Owens, Jennie Mayer, Cynthia Oravecz, Katherine Howes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Russell Marks, Jennifer Yates, Valdez, Shaina Andrews, Ron Coats, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Figueriredo, Denise Kramer, Charles Haje, Erika Strojny Myers, George Marshall, Larry Karst, Julia Jacobus, Alex Trinidad, Varonica Beal, Marcie Goodman, Jacqueline Manning, Diann Kohn, Candace Dunlap, Jennifer Chamberlin, Kelly Reyes, John Hollis, Joseph McMahon, Paul De La Torre, Dave Mager, Carolyn Stevens, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Anita Mireles, Neal Eisenbraun, Lois Walker, Louetta Schulze, Jeffrey Greenfield, Elizabeth Stokes, Justin Allsup, Michelle Fine, Jennifer Hernandez, Janine Cook, Linda Boss, William P Mobley, Eduardo Gomez, Jimmy Phifer, Robin Chrystal Hale, Gretchen Dore, David Fensterstock, Alyssa Clemmons, John Burns, Donald Weeks, Mary Ellis, Melissa Harris, Jason Birnhak, Thomas Moors, Richard E. Frazier, III, Paul O'Donnell, Jerdrychowski, Martin Angiulli, Brian William McCrudden against NBTY, Inc., Target Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co. (Berman, Steve)
November 17, 2015 Filing 105 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Janine Cook (Pollack, Janine)
November 17, 2015 Filing 104 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Victoria Shahrashian of Defendant GNC Holdings, Inc. Without Prejudice (Bhujwala, Shehnaz)
November 17, 2015 Filing 103 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Motion for leave to file consolidated complaint under seal #96 is voluntarily withdrawn. No appearance is needed on 11/18/15. Mailed notice(maf)
November 17, 2015 Filing 102 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Smith, Cathy)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: Application to be Appointed Part of Plaintiff's Steering Committee #72 is denied as stated in the record of the August 20, 2015 status hearing. Plaintiff Kenneth Barry Tinsley's Motion to Withdraw #94 is granted. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 11/16/2015. MAILED notice (ks, )
November 16, 2015 Filing 100 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Diann Kohn (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Behan, Wendy)
November 12, 2015 Filing 99 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cynthia Oravecz with regard to all claims asserted against Defendant GNC Holdings, Inc. (Blythin, John)
November 12, 2015 Filing 98 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Martin Angiulli Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
November 11, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE of Motion by Steve W. Berman for presentment of motion for leave to file,,,,, #96 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 11/18/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Berman, Steve)
November 11, 2015 Filing 96 MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Jacqueline Manning, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates for leave to file Consolidated Complaint under seal. (Berman, Steve)
November 11, 2015 Filing 95 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED complaint by Victoria Shahrashian, Joshua Ogden, Louise Williams, Paul Hanna, Karen Jones, Shane Sparks, Yousef Haiderzad, Dorothy Lee, Mary Farrell, Melanie Barber, Rosalynd Lugo, Nilsa Cintron, Joel Cohn, Sherri Lowe, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Edwin Mourino, Dale Kardasz, Anthony Linsalata, Theresa Kurdt, Judy Owens, Jennie Mayer, Cynthia Oravecz, Katherine Howes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Russell Marks, Jennifer Yates, Valdez, Shaina Andrews, Ron Coats, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Figueriredo, Denise Kramer, Charles Haje, Erika Strojny Myers, George Marshall, Larry Karst, Julia Jacobus, Alex Trinidad, Varonica Beal, Marcie Goodman, Jacqueline Manning, Diann Kohn, Candace Dunlap, Kelly Reyes, Jennifer Chamberlin, John Hollis, Joseph McMahon, Paul De La Torre, Dave Mager, Carolyn Stevens, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Anita Mireles, Neal Eisenbraun, Lois Walker, Louetta Schulze, Jeffrey Greenfield, Elizabeth Stokes, Justin Allsup, Michelle Fine, Jennifer Hernandez, Janine Cook, Linda Boss, William P Mobley, Eduardo Gomez, Jimmy Phifer, Robin Chrystal Hale, Gretchen Dore, David Fensterstock, Alyssa Clemmons, John Burns, Donald Weeks, Mary Ellis, Melissa Harris, Jason Birnhak, Thomas Moors, Richard E. Frazier, III, Paul O'Donnell, Jerdrychowski, Martin Angiulli, Brian William McCrudden against Target Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co., NBTY, Inc. (Berman, Steve)
October 26, 2015 Filing 94 MOTION by Attorney Charles F. Barrett to withdraw as attorney for Kenneth Barry Tinsley. No party information provided (Barrett, Charles)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: Ruling on motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to 11/11/15 to file a consolidated complaint is granted #90 . Status hearing set for 10/29/15 is re-set to 12/8/15 at 10:00 a.m. Motion to withdraw attorney is granted #87 . Motion for appointment is moot #8 . Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/20/2015: Mailed notice(lk, )
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motions for Joinder #18 , #19 are denied as moot. Motion for Withdrawal of Christina Davis as Counsel for Defendants Target Corporation and Target Brands, Inc. #87 is granted. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/20/2015: Mailed notice. (lk, )
October 13, 2015 Filing 91 NOTICE of Motion by Steve W. Berman for presentment of extension of time,,,,, #90 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/20/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Berman, Steve)
October 13, 2015 Filing 90 MOTION by Plaintiffs Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Jason Birnhak, Linda Boss, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Alyssa Clemmons, Ron Coats, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Sean James Cummins, Sean James Cummins, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Gretchen Dore, Candace Dunlap, Neal Eisenbraun, Mary Ellis, Mary Farrell, David Fensterstock, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Richard E. Frazier, III, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Yousef Haiderzad, Charles Haje, Robin Chrystal Hale, Paul Hanna, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Larry Karst, Diann Kohn, Denise Kramer, Theresa Kurdt, Dorothy Lee, Anthony Linsalata, Sherri Lowe, Rosalynd Lugo, Dave Mager, Russell Marks, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Brian William McCrudden, Joseph McMahon, Anita Mireles, William P Mobley, Thomas Moors, Edwin Mourino, Erika Strojny Myers, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Judy Owens, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Kelly Reyes, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Carolyn Stevens, Elizabeth Stokes, Mercedes Taketa, Kenneth Barry Tinsley, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Donald Weeks, Louise Williams, Jennifer Yates for extension of time to file Consolidated Amended Complaint. Unopposed Motion. (Berman, Steve)
October 13, 2015 Filing 89 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2619. (mr, )
October 6, 2015 Filing 88 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph McMahon by Kristofer S. Riddle (Riddle, Kristofer)
October 2, 2015 Filing 87 MOTION by Attorney Christina Davis to withdraw as attorney for Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paikin, Jonathan)
September 23, 2015 Filing 86 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS AND NON-GNC DEFENDANTS. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/23/2015.MAILED notice (ks, )
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/10/2015. Mailed notice (ks, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: INTERIM CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER AGREED TO BY PLAINTIFFS AND THE GNC DEFENDANTS FOR INITIAL PRODUCTION. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/9/2015. Mailed notice (ks, )
September 9, 2015 Filing 83 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph McMahon by Edward R. Moor (Moor, Edward)
August 31, 2015 Filing 82 Proposed Joint Stipulated Protective Order by Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation (Paikin, Jonathan)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SCHEDULING ORDER No. 1: Applicable to plaintiffs and non-GMC defendants Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/28/2015. Mailed notice (jc, )
August 24, 2015 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/20/15 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015. (Hacker, Mary)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 1 APPLICABLE TO PLAINTIFFS AND THE GNC DEFENDANTS. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/21/2015. Mailed notice(ks, )
August 11, 2015 Filing 78 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Linda Boss by Elizabeth A. Kramer (Kramer, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2015 Filing 77 Consensus Plaintiffs' Application for Appointment of Lead Counsel by Justin Allsup, Shaina Andrews, Martin Angiulli, Melanie Barber, Varonica Beal, Linda Boss, John Burns, Jennifer Chamberlin, Nilsa Cintron, Joel Cohn, Janine Cook, Gretchen Dore, Neal Eisenbraun, Figueriredo, Michelle Fine, Eduardo Gomez, Marcie Goodman, Jeffrey Greenfield, Robin Chrystal Hale, Melissa Harris, Jennifer Hernandez, Jerdrychowski, Karen Jones, Dale Kardasz, Diann Kohn, Dave Mager, Russell Marks, Brian William McCrudden, Thomas Moors, Judy Owens, Jimmy Phifer, Kaitlyn Pirtle, Maria Valdez Rodriguez, Carolyn Stevens, Mercedes Taketa, Alex Trinidad, Valdez, Lois Walker, Louise Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Heins Mills firm resume, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Kozyak Tropin firm resume, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Milberg firm resume, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Scott + Scott firm resume)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #20 , #21 , #22 , #75 are granted. Parties are reminded that attorneys admitted to practice and in good standing in any United States District Court are admitted pro hac vice. Consensus Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Application for Appointment of Lead Counsel in Excess of Page Limits #54 is granted. No appearances are necessary on 8/12/2015. All other dates remain as scheduled. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/10/2015. Mailed notice (jc, )
August 7, 2015 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10952619. (Liang, Aron)
August 7, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE by Sarah N. Emery of Change of Address or Name (Emery, Sarah)
August 7, 2015 Filing 73 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Shahrashian by Raymond Paul Boucher (Boucher, Raymond)
August 7, 2015 Filing 71 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Scott Dahlin, John Hollis, George Marshall by Rachel Lynn Soffin (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Soffin, Rachel)
August 7, 2015 Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation by Amanda L Groves (Groves, Amanda)
August 7, 2015 Filing 69 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Candace Dunlap, Kenneth Barry Tinsley by John w don Barrett (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barrett, John w don)
August 7, 2015 Filing 68 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Burns, Karen Jones by Shannon Hopkins (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopkins, Shannon)
August 7, 2015 Filing 67 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Candace Dunlap, Kenneth Barry Tinsley by David Mcmullan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mcmullan, David)
August 6, 2015 Filing 72 APPLICATION of Michael Louis Kelly to be appointed part of Plaintiff's Steering Committee ("EXHIBITS"). (ks, )
August 6, 2015 Filing 66 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs William P Mobley, Elizabeth Stokes by Cyrus Dashtaki (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dashtaki, Cyrus)
August 6, 2015 Filing 65 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Shahrashian by Shehnaz M Bhujwala (Bhujwala, Shehnaz)
August 6, 2015 Filing 64 Application of Virginia E. Anello for Appointment to Plaintiff Steering Committee by Jason Birnhak, David Fensterstock, Anthony Linsalata (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Anello, Virginia)
August 6, 2015 Filing 63 Plaintiffs' Application for Appointment of Lead Counsel and Steering Committee by Alyssa Clemmons, Scott Dahlin, Paul De La Torre, Candace Dunlap, Mary Ellis, Charles Haje, John Hollis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Theresa Kurdt, George Marshall, Jennie Mayer, Joseph McMahon, William P Mobley, Paul O'Donnell, Joshua Ogden, Cynthia Oravecz, Louetta Schulze, Victoria Shahrashian, Shane Sparks, Elizabeth Stokes, Kenneth Barry Tinsley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Clifford, Robert)
August 6, 2015 Filing 62 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carolyn Stevens by Michael J. Estok (Estok, Michael)
August 6, 2015 Filing 61 List of Affiliated Companies and Counsel for Defendants Walgreens, Walmart, Target, and NBTY by In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation (Ahmad, Scott)
August 6, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth A. Fegan for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #54 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/12/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2015 Filing 59 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by GNC Holdings, Inc., General Nutrition Centers, Inc., General Nutrition Corp. (Hooper, John)
August 6, 2015 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants General Nutrition Centers, Inc., General Nutrition Corp., GNC Holdings, Inc. by John P. Hooper (Hooper, John)
August 6, 2015 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Daniel C. Girard regarding motion for leave to file excess pages #54 re Consensus Plaintiffs' Application for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Girard Gibbs LLP firm resume)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2015 Filing 56 Application of Allan Kanner for Lead Counsel and/or the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee by Ron Coats, Rosalynd Lugo (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kanner, Allan)
August 6, 2015 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. Fegan regarding motion for leave to file excess pages #54 re Consensus Plaintiffs' Application for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Hagen Berman firm resume, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Agenda for HarrisMartin MDL Conference, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Transcript in Toyota Unintended Acceleration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Transcript in Wiginton v. CB Richard Ellis, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Memorandum Order in In re Stericycle, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Proposed Confidentiality Order, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Proposed Scheduling Order, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Proposed Order re ESI Protocol, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Order re Discovery in Optical Disk Drive, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Order No. 3 in Toyota Unintended Acceleration, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Case Management Order 5 in In re Pharmaceutical AWP Litig., #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Court Order (Govt. Employees Hosp.))(Fegan, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2015 Filing 54 MOTION by Plaintiffs Jerdrychowski, Figueriredo, Valdez for leave to file excess pages re Consensus Plaintiffs' Application for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2015 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation by Scott M Ahmad (Ahmad, Scott)
August 6, 2015 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation by Scott P. Glauberman (Glauberman, Scott)
August 6, 2015 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation by Ronald Y Rothstein (Rothstein, Ronald)
August 6, 2015 Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cynthia Oravecz by Juan E Monteverde (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monteverde, Juan)
August 6, 2015 Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Janine Cook by Janine L Pollack (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pollack, Janine)
August 6, 2015 Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Scott Dahlin, John Hollis, George Marshall by John A. Yanchunis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Yanchunis, John)
August 6, 2015 Filing 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Burns, Karen Jones by Nancy A Kulesa (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kulesa, Nancy)
August 6, 2015 Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs William P Mobley, Elizabeth Stokes by John S Steward (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Steward, John)
August 6, 2015 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ron Coats, Rosalynd Lugo by Luke Hasskamp (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hasskamp, Luke)
August 6, 2015 Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ron Coats, Rosalynd Lugo by Allan Kanner (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kanner, Allan)
August 6, 2015 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mary Ellis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Theresa Kurdt, Louetta Schulze by Daniel J. Nordin (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nordin, Daniel)
August 6, 2015 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mary Ellis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Theresa Kurdt, Louetta Schulze by Cathy K. Smith (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Cathy)
August 6, 2015 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mary Ellis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Theresa Kurdt, Louetta Schulze by Daniel E Gustafson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gustafson, Daniel)
August 5, 2015 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Paul De La Torre, Joshua Ogden by Pierce Gore (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gore, Pierce)
August 5, 2015 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mary Ellis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Theresa Kurdt, Louetta Schulze by Amy Elisabeth Keller (Keller, Amy)
August 5, 2015 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mary Ellis, Katherine Howes, Julia Jacobus, Theresa Kurdt, Louetta Schulze by Edward Anthony Wallace (Wallace, Edward)
August 5, 2015 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Candace Dunlap, Jennie Mayer, Paul O'Donnell by Taylor Asen (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Asen, Taylor)
August 5, 2015 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Candace Dunlap, Jennie Mayer, Paul O'Donnell by Jonathan W. Cuneo (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cuneo, Jonathan)
July 31, 2015 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alyssa Clemmons by Thomas P. Thrash (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Thrash, Thomas)
July 31, 2015 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Shane Sparks by Thomas P. Thrash (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Thrash, Thomas)
July 30, 2015 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carolyn Stevens by Toby J. Marshall (Marshall, Toby)
July 30, 2015 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation by Matthew Martens (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martens, Matthew)
July 28, 2015 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation by Christina Davis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Davis, Christina)
July 28, 2015 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation by Charles Speth (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Speth, Charles)
July 28, 2015 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation by Jonathan Paikin (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Paikin, Jonathan)
July 24, 2015 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charles Haje by Dewitt M. Lovelace (Lovelace, Dewitt)
July 21, 2015 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Barry Tinsley by Charles F. Barrett (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barrett, Charles)
July 21, 2015 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Candace Dunlap, Kenneth Barry Tinsley by Richard Runft Barrett (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barrett, Richard)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 7/15/2015. Mailed notice(sr, )
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 7/15/2015. Mailed notice(sr, )
July 13, 2015 Filing 23 WITHDRAWING Joseph D. Cohen as counsel for Plaintiff Shaina Andrews and substituting Joseph P. Guglielmo as counsel of record (Guglielmo, Joseph)
July 13, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10857156. (Davis, Christina)
July 13, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10857108. (Speth, Charles)
July 13, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10856112. (Paikin, Jonathan)
July 6, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiffs Jennifer Hernandez, Mercedes Taketa for joinder JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS ROBIN CHRYSTAL HALE AND KAITLYN PIRTLE RESPONSE TO JOSEPH MCMAHONS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ronald, Marron)
July 6, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Melanie Barber for joinder IN PLAINTIFFS ROBIN CHRYSTAL HALE AND KAITLYN PIRTLE RESPONSE TO JOSEPH MCMAHONS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ronald, Marron)
July 6, 2015 Filing 17 Notice by In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO THE COURT TO CORRECT MISSTATEMENTS IN THE RECORD (Gore, Pierce)
July 2, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE by Candace Dunlap, Kenneth Barry Tinsley re Response #10 Plaintiff's Notice to the Court to Correct Misrepresentations and/or Misstatements in the Record (Thrash, Thomas)
July 2, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE by Charles Haje re Response #10 Plaintiff's Notice to the Court to Correct Misrepresentations and/or Misstatements in the Record (Thrash, Thomas)
July 2, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE by Kenneth Barry Tinsley re Response #10 Plaintiff's Notice to the Court to Correct Misrepresentations and/or Misstatements in the Record (Thrash, Thomas)
July 2, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE by Alyssa Clemmons re Response #10 Plaintiff's Notice to the Court to Correct Misrepresentations and/or Misstatements in the Record (Thrash, Thomas)
July 2, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE by Shane Sparks re Response #10 Plaintiff's Notice to the Court to Correct Misrepresentations and/or Misstatements in the Record (Thrash, Thomas)
July 2, 2015 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Robin Chrystal Hale, Kaitlyn Pirtle to MOTION by Plaintiff Joseph McMahonMotion for Appointment of Robert A. Clifford as Overall Lead Counsel of the MDL #8 (Fegan, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2015 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Robin Chrystal Hale, Kaitlyn Pirtle to motion for miscellaneous relief #8 (Fegan, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Robert A. Clifford for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #8 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/20/2015 at 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clifford, Robert)
June 26, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Joseph McMahonMotion for Appointment of Robert A. Clifford as Overall Lead Counsel of the MDL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Clifford, Robert)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Parties wishing to appear by telephone on August 20, 2015 at 10:30 a.m., are instructed to call the conference call line, (888) 684-8852. The access code for the conference call is 44336444. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 6/19/2015. Mailed notice. (kp, )
June 19, 2015 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2619. (mr, )
June 18, 2015 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph McMahon by Shannon Marie McNulty (McNulty, Shannon)
June 18, 2015 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph McMahon by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: By order of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL No. 2619, in re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation, has been assigned to this Court. The initial status date is set for August 20, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. Parties may appear by telephone and are instructed to contact the Courtroom Deputy, Melanie Foster, at (312) 435-5556, to do so. An order with further instructions for the initial status is forthcoming. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 6/17/2015. Mailed notice(ks, ) Modified on 7/2/2015 (maf, ).
June 16, 2015 Filing 2 MAILED MDL Lead Case Established Letter to all Counsel of record. (mr, )
June 9, 2015 Filing 1 TRANSFER Order of 6/9/2015 from MDL Panel establishing MDL 2619. Case No. 15C5070 master docket. (mr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louetta Schulze
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: Cathy K. Smith
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Moors
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Scarlette R. Burton
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Hans G. Poppe
Represented By: Kirk A. Laughlin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Emery
Represented By: Warner T. Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hollis
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: Elizabeth Hoskins Dow
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Patrick Owen Muench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diann Kohn
Represented By: Wendy M Behan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Gayle Meryl Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hanna
Represented By: Alex Lumaghi
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Mourino
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Stanley D Saltzman
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalynd Lugo
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Luke Hasskamp
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Marshall
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: Jonathan Betten Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Angiulli
Represented By: Christian A Jenkins
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Brent Sherwood
Represented By: Todd B Naylor
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Farrell
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Tran Hai Thi Nguyen
Represented By: John Joseph Fitzgerald, IV
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Kardasz
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McMahon
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Represented By: Edward R. Moor
Represented By: Kristofer S. Riddle
Represented By: Shannon Marie McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Reyes
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: John Marion Quaranta
Represented By: Ronald Peter Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Lowe
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jason Barnes
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, III
Represented By: James P Frickleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Haje
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Dewitt M. Lovelace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean James Cummins
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Michael L Kelly
Represented By: Heather Marie Baker Dobbs
Represented By: Behram V Parekh
Represented By: Justin Matthew Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Manning
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jonathan B. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Allsup
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Dominic J. Rizzi
Represented By: Nyran Rose Rasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Barry Tinsley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: John Barrett
Represented By: David Mcmullan
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Strojny Myers
Represented By: John L. Smith
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Vanessa Cantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hernandez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ronald Albert Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Sparks
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Kenneth Robert Shemin
Represented By: Marcus N. Bozeman
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Mireles
Represented By: Alex Lumaghi
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul De La Torre
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Pierce Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Owens
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Valdez Rodriguez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Thomas A. Tucker Ronzetti
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Represented By: Patrick Shawn Spellacy
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Karst
Represented By: Alex Lumaghi
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellis
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: Cathy K. Smith
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaina Andrews
Represented By: Joseph D. Cohen
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Dominic J. Rizzi
Represented By: Nyran Rose Rasche
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Kramer
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Michael L Kelly
Represented By: Heather Marie Baker Dobbs
Represented By: Behram V Parekh
Represented By: Justin Matthew Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Williams
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Thomas A. Tucker Ronzetti
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Represented By: Patrick Shawn Spellacy
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Eisenbraun
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr.
Represented By: Roberta A. Yard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Jacobus
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: Cathy K. Smith
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Cohn
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Henry J Kelston
Represented By: Andrei Vladimir Rado
Represented By: David R Woodward
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Phifer
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Cook
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Randall K Pulliam
Represented By: Janine L Pollack
Represented By: Joseph Henry "Hank&quot Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Stokes
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: John S Steward
Represented By: Cyrus Dashtaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Lee
Represented By: Kevin P. Green
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas P. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Chrystal Hale
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas E. Ahlering
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Represented By: Jason A. Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Gomez
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Mark L Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Clemmons
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Kenneth Robert Shemin
Represented By: Marcus N. Bozeman
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Burns
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nancy A Kulesa
Represented By: Randall K Pulliam
Represented By: Shannon Hopkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry "Hank&quot Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Howes
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: Cathy K. Smith
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Figueriredo
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fensterstock
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Virginia E Anello
Represented By: Lawrence P. Krasin
Represented By: Michael A London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varonica Beal
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Robert Baldwin Brown, III
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Represented By: David S. Wieder
Represented By: Patrick Shawn Spellacy
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Harris
Represented By: Ilan Chorowsky
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Bulgarelli
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberson-Young
Represented By: Roberta A. Yard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian William McCrudden
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr.
Represented By: Roberta A. Yard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ogden
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Pierce Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Linsalata
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Virginia E Anello
Represented By: Lawrence P. Krasin
Represented By: Michael A London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Dahlin
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: Jonathan Betten Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Birnhak
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Virginia E Anello
Represented By: Lawrence P. Krasin
Represented By: Michael A London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilsa Cintron
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Meagan Marie Keenan
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Henry J Kelston
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Marks
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Melito
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Shahrashian
Represented By: Maria L Weitz
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sahag Majarian, II
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Shehnaz M Bhujwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yousef Haiderzad
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Craig McKenzie Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Stevens
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Toby J. Marshall
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Weeks
Represented By: Kevin P. Green
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas P. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Fine
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Beatrice Skye Resendes
Represented By: Ronald Albert Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Pirtle
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas E. Ahlering
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Represented By: Jason A. Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Taketa
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Beatrice Skye Resendes
Represented By: Ronald Albert Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcie Goodman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Yates
Represented By: Alex Lumaghi
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Coats
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Luke Hasskamp
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Conlee Schell Whiteley
Represented By: Wilfred K Wright, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P Mobley
Represented By: Erich Paul Schork
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: John S Steward
Represented By: Cyrus Dashtaki
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Dore
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Thomas A. Tucker Ronzetti
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Barber
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Beatrice Skye Resendes
Represented By: Ronald Albert Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Greenfield
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman
Represented By: Thomas A. Tucker Ronzetti
Represented By: Steven C. Marks
Represented By: Lance A. Harke
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Represented By: Patrick Shawn Spellacy
Represented By: Sarah Clasby Engel
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Mayer
Represented By: Sara Jane Shanahan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Taylor Asen
Represented By: Jessica Gray Kelly
Represented By: Erica C Mirabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Dunlap
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Taylor Asen
Represented By: John Barrett
Represented By: David Mcmullan
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Boss
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Chamberlin
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: David R Woodward
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Jones
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Stephanie Bartone
Represented By: Shane T. Rowley
Represented By: Courtney Maccarone
Represented By: Nancy A Kulesa
Represented By: Randall K Pulliam
Represented By: Shannon Hopkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry "Hank&quot Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Trinidad
Represented By: Christian A Jenkins
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Brent Sherwood
Represented By: Todd B Naylor
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jagoda Jedrychowski
Represented By: Douglas A Millen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Frazier, III
Represented By: Nathan D. Williams
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Vanessa Cantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerdrychowski
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Mager
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: George W. Cochran, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul O'Donnell
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Taylor Asen
Represented By: Erica C Mirabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Oravecz
Represented By: Mark A. Eldridge
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Juan E Monteverde
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: Guri Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Walker
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Robert Baldwin Brown, III
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Represented By: David S. Wieder
Represented By: Patrick Shawn Spellacy
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valdez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Kurdt
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: Cathy K. Smith
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Amanda L Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Nutrition Corp.
Represented By: John P. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: David William Nelson
Represented By: David C Allen
Represented By: William M. McErlean
Represented By: Kevin Dale Rising
Represented By: Ryan M Mclaughlin
Represented By: Amanda L Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Martens
Represented By: Jonathan Paikin
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Casamassima
Represented By: Charles Speth
Represented By: Christina Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Martens
Represented By: Jonathan Paikin
Represented By: Charles Speth
Represented By: Christina Davis
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GNC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Nutrition Centers, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBTY, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda L Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Figueiredo
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: Herbal Supplements Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Represented By: Ronald Y Rothstein
Represented By: Scott P. Glauberman
Represented By: Scott M Ahmad
Represented By: Amanda L Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?