Telephone Science Corporation v. Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Telephone Science Corporation
Defendant: Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv05182
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/5/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/8/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/5/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telephone Science Corporation v. Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telephone Science Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Hyslip
Represented By: Mark T. Lavery
Represented By: David Michael Menditto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Julian Dayal
Represented By: Catherine A. Miller
Represented By: Dara Chevlin Tarkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?