Starr Indemnity & Liability Company et al v. YRC, Inc.

Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Defendant: YRC, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv06902
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 12/26/2018. Mailed notice(cdh, )
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 2/15/2018. Mailed notice(cdh, )
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 1/17/2017. Mailed notice(cdh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company et al v. YRC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Steven C. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC, Inc.
Represented By: David M Buffo
Represented By: Bruce Craig Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?