Williams v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Williams
Defendant: SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC, Amazon.com Inc, Staff Management Solutions LLC doing business as Staff Management - SMX and SMX LLC doing business as Staff Management - SMX
Case Number: 1:2015cv07256
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2016 Filing 84 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The parties have filed a stipulation of dismissal #83 , the terms of which are set forth therein. Status hearing set for 4/7/2016 #82 is stricken. All pending motions are denied as moot. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 18, 2016 Filing 83 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Settlement (Soumilas, John)
February 17, 2016 Filing 82 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 4/7/2016 at 9:00 a.m. The parties reported on the progress of discovery. The parties and the court discussed the parties' views as to whether Plaintiff may simultaneously pursue actual and statutory damages.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 7, 2015 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/7/2015. After being turned down for a job, Gregory Williams filed this putative class action, which alleges violations of the Fair Credit Reporting Act ("FCRA"), 15 U.S.C. 1681 et seq. Doc. 1. Defendants made Williams an offer of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68, Doc. 62-1, Williams moved to strike the offer, Doc. 69, and the court denied the motion, Doc. 77. This opinion explains that decision.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
November 25, 2015 Filing 80 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: By agreement #79 , the following schedule is entered. Plaintiff shall supplement his Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 12/4/2015. Fact discovery shall be bifurcated as between individual and class discovery, and fact discovery on Plaintiff's individual claims shall commence immediately and close 4/29/2016. Dispositive motions on Plaintiff's individual claims shall be filed by 5/31/2016. If Defendants do not move for summary judgment on Plaintiff's individual claims, or if Defendants move for summary judgment and the motion is denied, the parties then shall propose a class discovery schedule. The parties disagree #79 about the timing of Rule 23 motions. If a motion under Rule 23 is filed prior to the close of class discovery, the court at that time will determine whether to proceed with briefing or to enter and continue the motion until the close of class discovery. Given the entry of this schedule, the 12/1/2015 status hearing #77 is stricken and re-set for 2/17/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
November 24, 2015 Filing 79 STATUS Report Supplemental Joint Status Report by Gregory Williams (Soumilas, John)
November 24, 2015 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Gregory Williams (Amended) (Soumilas, John)
November 17, 2015 Filing 77 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/1/2015 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion for leave to file amended summary judgment motion #62 and Plaintiff's motion to strike offer of judgment #69 are denied. The parties shall submit a joint status report regarding the discovery and dispositive motion schedule by 11/24/2015. Given Plaintiff's counsel's argument that "[e]ven if he wanted to, Plaintiff is not at liberty to accept the [offer of judgment]," Doc. 69-1 at 4-5, the court is concerned that Plaintiff's declaration #71 may have been made under the mistaken impression that he could not accept the offer of judgment even if he wanted to. Accordingly, Plaintiff Gregory Williams (the party, not counsel) shall file an amended declaration expressly stating that he understands that he may accept the Rule 68 offer of judgment if he so desires and, if he still wishes to reject the offer, stating that he is aware that he has been offered $13,000.00 (plus attorney fees and costs) to settle the case, that he has decided to reject that offer, and that he is aware that if the judgment ultimately entered is not more favorable than the unaccepted offer, he will be required to pay the costs incurred by Defendants from 10/7/2015 through the date of judgment.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 13, 2015 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: The 11/17/2015 status hearing #73 is re-set from 9:00 a.m. to 9:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Mailed notice (ao,)
November 11, 2015 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM by Gregory Williams in support of motion to strike #69 Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Offer of Judgment (Soumilas, John)
November 10, 2015 Filing 74 REPLY by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC to motion for leave to file #62 in support of motion for leave to file amended summary judgment motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Siebert, Melissa)
November 4, 2015 Filing 73 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. The 11/12/2015 status hearing #65 is stricken and re-set for 11/17/2015 at 9:00 a.m. By 11/11/2015, Plaintiff shall file supplement brief in support of motion to strike offer of judgment #69 . The time for Defendants to file a reply brief in support of their motion for leave to file an amended summary judgment motion #62 is extended to 11/10/2015. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 29, 2015 Filing 72 RESPONSE by Gregory Williamsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC for leave to file Amended Summary Judgment Motion #62 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Soumilas, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Errata 3)(Soumilas, John)
October 22, 2015 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Gregory Williams (Soumilas, John)
October 21, 2015 Filing 70 NOTICE of Motion by John Soumilas for presentment of motion to strike #69 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/4/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Soumilas, John)
October 21, 2015 Filing 69 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Williams to strike Offer of Judgment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(Soumilas, John)
October 21, 2015 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Applications to appear pro hac vice #66 #67 are granted.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 16, 2015 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11194701. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David R. Ongaro (Sherman, Cara)
October 16, 2015 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11194656. (Sherman, Cara)
October 15, 2015 Filing 65 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. The 10/21/2015 status hearing #59 is stricken and re-set for 11/12/2015 at 9:00 a.m. The parties need not file a joint status report. Plaintiff's motion for class certification #60 is entered and continued. Defendants' motion for leave to file an amended summary judgment motion #62 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond by 10/29/2015; reply due by 11/5/2015. If the offer of judgment (Doc. 62-1) is rejected, then by 10/22/2015, Plaintiff Gregory Williams (the party, not counsel) shall execute, and his counsel shall file, a declaration averring that he is aware that he has been offered $13,000.00 (plus attorney fees and costs) to settle the case, that he has decided to reject that offer, and that he is aware that if the judgment ultimately entered is not more favorable than the unaccepted offer, he will be required to pay the costs incurred by Defendants from 10/7/2015 through the date of judgment.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 13, 2015 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motion for leave to file amended summary judgment motion #62 set for 10/15/2015 at 9:00 a.m. #63 is re-set for 9:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 9, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion for leave to file #62 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
October 9, 2015 Filing 62 MOTION by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC for leave to file Amended Summary Judgment Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Siebert, Melissa)
October 8, 2015 Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by John Soumilas for presentment of motion to certify class #60 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/21/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Soumilas, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 60 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Williams to certify class (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Soumilas, Esq., #2 Exhibit)(Soumilas, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 10/21/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' summary judgment motion #52 is denied. The parties shall file a joint amended status report by 10/21/2015.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 8, 2015 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to certify class #57 is denied without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.3(b).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 7, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION by Plaintiff Gregory Williams to certify class Responses due by 10/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Soumilas, Esq., #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of John Soumilas, Esq.)(Soumilas, John)
October 5, 2015 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing #46 and hearing on Defendants' motion for summary judgment #54 set for 10/7/2015 at 9:00 a.m. are re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 30, 2015 Filing 55 Defendants' Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is no Genuine Issue by Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC (Siebert, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion for summary judgment #52 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/7/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM by Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC in support of motion for summary judgment #52 (Siebert, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Staff Management Solutions LLC, SMX LLC for summary judgment (Siebert, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint by SMX LLC(Siebert, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint by Staff Management Solutions LLC(Siebert, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Filing 49 Amazon.com.dedc, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Amazon.com Inc(Siebert, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC by Bonnie L. Keane (Keane, Bonnie)
September 22, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE by Larry Paul Smith of Change of Address (Smith, Larry)
September 9, 2015 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 10/7/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Defendants' summary judgment motion and responsive pleading shall be filed by 9/30/2015. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 10/21/2015.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 8, 2015 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #43 is granted. Attorney Regina Culbert is terminated as counsel for Defendants. Motion hearing set for 9/9/2015 #44 is stricken.Mailed notice (jlj, )
September 3, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #43 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/9/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
September 3, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION by Attorney Regina V. Culbert to withdraw as attorney for Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC. No party information provided (Siebert, Melissa)
September 3, 2015 Filing 42 STATUS Report by Gregory Williams (Soumilas, John)
August 24, 2015 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Applications to appear pro hac vice #36 , #37 and #38 are granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 21, 2015 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC by Joel Griswold (Griswold, Joel)
August 21, 2015 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
August 21, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10997154. (Brennan, Lauren)
August 20, 2015 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10994476. (Francis, James)
August 20, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10994403. (Soumilas, John)
August 19, 2015 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gregory Williams by Larry Paul Smith (Smith, Larry)
August 19, 2015 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 9/9/2015 at 9:00 a.m. By 9/3/2015, the parties shall jointly file a status report in the format set forth under the "Cases Reassigned to Judge Feinerman" tab on Judge Feinerman's web page on the Northern District's website. Mailed notice (np, )
August 18, 2015 Filing 33 MAILED Local Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (meg, )
August 18, 2015 Filing 32 RECEIVED from Washington Western; Case Number 2:15-cv-00542. (meg)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Change Venue; withdrawing #20 Motion to Dismiss; granting #21 Motion to Transfer Case; case transferred to Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
August 14, 2015 Filing 30 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue Noting Date 8/14/2015, (Green, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
July 17, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, on its own motion and in the interest of judicial economy, hereby orders the Status Conference continued to 10/20/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
June 23, 2015 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour Denying Plaintiff's #25 Motion for Extension of Time as Moot. Motions #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division, and #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss are renoted to 9/11/2015. (LMK) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
June 22, 2015 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Gregory Williams, to #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. (Green, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
June 22, 2015 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION REGARDING LIMITED DISCOVERY PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Plaintiff Gregory Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/22/2015, (Green, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
June 18, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time To Oppose Motion By Defendants To Transfer Venue by Plaintiff Gregory Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/26/2015, (Green, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
June 12, 2015 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC, TO RESPONSE to #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Culbert, Regina) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
June 5, 2015 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Gregory Williams, to #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss . (Green, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
June 4, 2015 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Juan Maxinez filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division (Culbert, Regina) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
June 4, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/26/2015, (Culbert, Regina) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 20, 2015 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/12/2015, (Culbert, Regina) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 19, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney David R Ongaro. Filed by Defendant Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Ongaro, David) Modified Address on 5/20/2015 (DS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melissa A Siebert for Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, and for Staff Management Solutions LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joel C Griswold for Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, and for Staff Management Solutions LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David R Ongaro for Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, and for Staff Management Solutions LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 18, 2015 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melissa A. Siebert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4020948 (Culbert, Regina) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 18, 2015 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joel C. Griswold FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4020937 (Culbert, Regina) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 18, 2015 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David R. Ongaro FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4020923 (Culbert, Regina) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 8, 2015 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have until May 20, 2015 to respond to the complaint, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TM) Text Modified on 5/12/2015 (TM). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 6, 2015 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC. Noting Date 5/6/2015, (Culbert, Regina) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
May 6, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Regina Vogel Culbert on behalf of Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Culbert, Regina) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Soumilas for Gregory Williams, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James A Francis for Gregory Williams, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 21, 2015 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Soumilas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Gregory Williams (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3988337 (Green, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 21, 2015 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jim Francis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Gregory Williams (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3988336 (Green, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 8, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION OF CAMERAS IN THE COURTROOM. The Western District of Washington is participating in the Judiciary's Pilot Project on #Cameras in the Courtroom. The project is a 3-year study to evaluate the effects of cameras in the courtrooms. This case is eligible to have proceedings video recorded and made available to the public via the U.S. Court's and Western District of Washington's web sites. Please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk for United States District Judge John C. Coughenour to indicate whether or not you agree to participate in the pilot project. If you should desire to participate, the court will require formal consent for the recording of each scheduled proceeding. Please contact the Courtroom Deputy at: paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov. Please do not e-file your response. (PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 8, 2015 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (206) 370-8805 at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 8/11/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 7, 2015 Filing 2 Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC and Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 7, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc, SMX, LLC, Staff Management Solutions, LLC (Receipt # 0981-3970448) Attorney Christopher E Green added to party Gregory Williams(pty:pla), filed by Gregory Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Staff Management Solutions LLC, #3 Summons Amazon.com Inc, #4 Summons SMX LLC)(Green, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]
April 7, 2015 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/18/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMX LLC
Represented By: David R Ongaro
Represented By: Cara Robin Sherman
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Regina Vogel Culbert
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Management Solutions LLC
Represented By: David R Ongaro
Represented By: Cara Robin Sherman
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Regina Vogel Culbert
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: David R Ongaro
Represented By: Cara Robin Sherman
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Regina Vogel Culbert
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Management Solutions LLC doing business as Staff Management - SMX
Represented By: David R Ongaro
Represented By: Cara Robin Sherman
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Regina Vogel Culbert
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMX LLC doing business as Staff Management - SMX
Represented By: David R Ongaro
Represented By: Cara Robin Sherman
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Regina Vogel Culbert
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Williams
Represented By: Larry Paul Smith
Represented By: James A. Francis
Represented By: Lauren KW Brennan
Represented By: John Soumilas
Represented By: Christopher E Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?