Hennen v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Susan Hennen
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv09452
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A stipulation of dismissal of counterclaim has been filed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and 41(c), the counterclaim is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #120 ; USCA Case No. 21-3383 (daj, )
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #120 . Notified counsel. (jh, )
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #120 . (jh, )
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DOCKETING Statement by Susan Hennen regarding notice of appeal #120 (Sherman, Martina)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of appeal by Susan Hennen regarding orders #118 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-19003932. Receipt number: n (Sherman, Martina)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counterclaim with Prejudice (von Schleicher, W.)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 12/6/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached order, Hennen's motion for summary judgment, R. #100 , is denied in its entirety. MetLife's motion for summary judgment, R. #102 , is granted, and its motion for summary judgment on its counterclaim is denied. MetLife's request for attorney's fees is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/6/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone status hearing held on 11/8/2021. Parties reported that they have exhausted all efforts to settle. The Court will rule on the cross-motions for summary judgment. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone status hearing is set for 11/8/2021 at 9:15 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone status hearing set for 8/31/2021 is vacated. The Court will rule by mail on the pending cross motions for summary judgment. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: On the request of the parties, the telephone status hearing set for 8/26/2021 is reset for 8/31/2021 at 9:00 a.m. The dial-in information will remain the same. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone status hearing set for 8/24/2021 is reset for 8/26/2021 at 9:00 a.m. The dial-in information will remain the same. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone status hearing set for 6/28/2021 is reset for 8/24/2021 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RESPONSE by Counter Claimant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to Rule 56 statement #99 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Material Facts (von Schleicher, W.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to MOTION by Plaintiff Susan Hennen, Counter Defendant Susan Hennen for summary judgment , Cross-Motion #98 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE by Susan Hennenin Opposition to MOTION by Counter Claimant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for summary judgment , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment #101 and in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Sherman, Martina)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Susan Hennen to Rule 56 statement #104 Plaintiff's Response to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts (Sherman, Martina)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to file response/reply #105 is granted. Cross Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment are to be filed by 5/19/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment #101 , motion for summary judgment #98 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for a 3-Business Day Extension to File Cross Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RULE 56.1 Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company regarding motion for summary judgment #101 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts (von Schleicher, W.)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of Filing Administrative Record, Parts XII to XXVIII (Attachments: #1, Admin Record, Pt. 12, #2, Admin Record, Pt. 13, #3, Admin Record, Pt. 14, #4, Admin Record, Pt. 15, #5, Admin Record, Pt. 16, #6, Admin Record, Pt. 17, #7, Admin Record, Pt. 18, #8, Admin Record, Pt. 19, #9, Admin Record, Pt. 20, #10, Admin Record, Pt. 21, #11, Admin Record, Pt. 22, #12, Admin Record, Pt. 23, #13, Admin Record, Pt. 24, #14, Admin Record, Pt. 25, #15, Admin Record, Pt. 26, #16, Admin Record, Pt. 27, #17, Admin Record, Pt. 28)(von Schleicher, W.)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company in support of motion for summary judgment #101 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION by Counter Claimant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for summary judgment , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM by Susan Hennen in support of motion for summary judgment #98 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sherman, Martina)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RULE 56 Statement by Susan Hennen regarding motion for summary judgment #98 Plaintiff's Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sherman, Martina)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION by Plaintiff Susan Hennen, Counter Defendant Susan Hennen for summary judgment , Cross-Motion (Sherman, Martina)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to file #96 is granted. The parties are to file their Cross Motions for Summary Judgment by 3/23/2021. Cross Response Briefs will still be due on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION by Counter Claimant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for extension of time to file , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for a 2-Business Day Extension to File Cross Motions for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to file #94 is granted. The parties are to file their cross motions for summary judgment by 3/19/2021, and to file their cross response briefs by 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION by Counter Claimant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for extension of time to file , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for a 14-Day Extension to File Cross Motions for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Joint motion for extension of time #92 is granted. The new due date for the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment is 3/5/2021, with consolidated response/reply briefs due 4/30/2021. Parties may file briefs of up to 20 pages in support of their motions for summary judgment and in response to the other party's motion for summary judgment. Parties may also file Local Rule 56.1 Statements containing up to 120 numbered statements of material fact and, in response, up to 40 additional statements of fact. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION by Plaintiff Susan Hennen, Counter Defendant Susan Hennen for extension of time of Briefing Schedule and for Leave to File Briefs in Excess of 15 Pages and Expanded Local Rule 56.1 Statements, Joint (Sherman, Martina)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing held on 10/19/2020. The parties have agreed to the following summary judgment schedule. Cross-motions for summary judgment are due by 2/12/2021. Responses are due by 4/9/2021. A telephone status conference is set for 6/28/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Please call (877)402-9757, access code 4410831 to participate in the hearing. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing held on 9/2/2020. Fact discovery to be closed by 11/20/2020. Telephone status hearing set for 10/19/2020 at 9:00 AM. Please call (877)402-9757, access code 4410831 to participate in the hearing. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 9:00 a.m. To join, dial 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk3, Docket)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Plaintiff Susan Hennen's ANSWER to counterclaim by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Susan Hennen(Sherman, Martina)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ANSWER to amended complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company against Susan Hennen , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Counterclaim. by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(von Schleicher, W.)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket13, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/28/20 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Oral ruling. Order Number: 38228. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2020. (Renke, Laura)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STATUS Report , Joint by Susan Hennen (Sherman, Martina)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE by Susan Hennen re amended complaint #78 , of Filing (Sherman, Martina)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 First AMENDED complaint by Susan Hennen against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sherman, Martina)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:For the reasons stated orally, plaintiff's motion to reopen case #72 is granted. Status hearing held on 2/28/2020. Case reopened. A joint status report is due by 3/6/2020. Plaintiff's amended complaint is to be filed by 2/28/2020. Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead by 3/20/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY by Susan Hennen to response to motion #75 to Reinstate Case (Sherman, Martina)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to MOTION by Plaintiff Susan Hennen to reopen case #72 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate Action (von Schleicher, W.)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion hearing held on 2/13/2020. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion to reopen case #72 is due by 2/20/2020. Plaintiff's reply is due by 2/25/2020. Status hearing set for 2/28/2020 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (srn, )
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Motion by Martina B. Sherman for presentment of motion to reopen case #72 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/13/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Sherman, Martina)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION by Plaintiff Susan Hennen to reopen case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sherman, Martina)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PROPOSED AGREED REMAND ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/10/2018. Mailed notice (aee, )
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Defendant's joint motion for entry of a remand order is granted. #68 The parties, Plaintiff Susan Hennen and Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company ("Metlife"), agree to observe the ERISA claims regulations applicable to appeals of adverse disability benefit determinations in 29 CFR 2560.503-1, in effect as of 2012 (the date of Hennen's disability claim) during the administative remand proceedings before Metlife. The 12/10/2018 status hearing is vacated. The 12/13/2018 notice motion date is vacated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/10/2018. Mailed notice (aee, )
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (aee, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Motion by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #68 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (von Schleicher, W.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company , Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Proposed Remand Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(von Schleicher, W.)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's joint motion to reset the status hearing #65 is granted. The 12/3/2018 status hearing is vacated and reset for 12/10/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Motion by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for presentment of motion to reset #65 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM. (von Schleicher, W.)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to reset Status Hearing , Joint Motion to Reset Status Hearing (von Schleicher, W.)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 10/29/2018. Status hearing set for 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CERTIFIED COPY OF OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 4/6/18; Decided 9/14/18 in USCA case no. 17-3080. (gcy, )
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 COPY OF USCA FINAL JUDGMENT dated 9/14/18 regarding notice of appeal #48 ; USCA No. 17-3080.; REVERSED and REMANDED. (gcy, ) Text Modified on 10/24/2018 (gcy, ).
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 10/16/18 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #48 ; Appellate case no. : 17-3080. (gcy, )
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 BILL of Costs; USCA 17-3080. (gcy, )
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MANDATE of USCA dated 10/24/18 regarding notice of appeal #48 ;USCA No.17-3080 ; No record to be returned. (gcy, )
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:At the request of counsel, the 10/10/2018 status hearing is vacated and reset for 10/29/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:At the request of counsel, the 9/26/2018 status hearing is vacated and reset for 10/10/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 9/26/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 USCA RECEIVED on 3/5/18 the long record regarding notice of appeal #48 . (smm)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFIED and transmitted to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #48 (USCA no. 17-3080). (smm)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE to Transmit Record on Appeal regarding notice of appeal #48 ; USCA Case No. 17-3080. (jh, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #48 ; USCA Case No. 17-3080. (ph, )
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #48 . Notified counsel. (gcy, )
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #48 . (gcy, )
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DOCKETING Statement by Susan Hennen regarding notice of appeal #48 (DeBofsky, Mark)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of appeal by Susan Hennen regarding orders #46 , #47 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-13660848. (DeBofsky, Mark)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed on 9/20/2017:Mailed notice(srn, )
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order; For the foregoing reasons, Hennen's motion for summary judgment #25 is denied. MetLife's motion for summary judgment #29 is granted, but its request for attorney's fees and costs is denied. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/20/2017:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The 7/13/2016 status date is vacated. The Court will rule by mail on the pending summary judgment motion. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to memorandum in support of motion #26 , motion for summary judgment #25 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages #41 is granted. No appearance required on 7/6/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #41 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/6/2016 at 09:00 AM. (von Schleicher, W.)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for leave to file excess pages , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Response Brief in Excess of 15 Pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(von Schleicher, W.)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to Rule 56 statement, #27 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts (von Schleicher, W.)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Susan Hennen TO DEFENDANTS LOCAL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Sherman, Martina)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Susan Hennen RESPONSE/REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Sherman, Martina)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant Metropolitan Life's motion for extension of time to file cross responses to motions for summary judgment is granted. #35 Cross responses are due by 6/30/2016. No appearance required on 7/6/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #35 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/6/2016 at 09:00 AM. (von Schleicher, W.)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for extension of time to file response/reply , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for 4-Business Day Extension to File Cross Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company in support of motion for summary judgment #29 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(von Schleicher, W.)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages #31 is granted. No appearance required on 5/23/2016.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #31 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/23/2016 at 09:00 AM. (von Schleicher, W.)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for leave to file excess pages , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of 15 Pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(von Schleicher, W.)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RULE 56.1 Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company regarding motion for summary judgment #29 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts (von Schleicher, W.)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for summary judgment , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of Filing Administrative Record, Parts I to XI (Attachments: #1 Admin Record, Pt. 1, #2 Admin Record, Pt. 2, #3 Admin Record, Pt. 3, #4 Admin Record, Pt. 4, #5 Admin Record, Pt. 5, #6 Admin Record, Pt. 6, #7 Admin Record, Pt. 7, #8 Admin Record, Pt. 8, #9 Admin Record, Pt. 9, #10 Admin Record, Pt. 10, #11 Admin Record, Pt. 11)(von Schleicher, W.)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RULE 56.1 Statement by Susan Hennen regarding motion for summary judgment #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Sherman, Martina)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Susan Hennen in support of motion for summary judgment #25 (Sherman, Martina)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Susan Hennen for summary judgment (Sherman, Martina)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant Metropolitan Life's unopposed motion for extension of time to file cross motions for summary judgment #22 is granted. The parties are to file their cross motions for summary judgment by 5/17/2016, with cross replies due by 6/24/2016. No appearance required on 5/23/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for presentment of extension of time #22 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/23/2016 at 09:00 AM. (von Schleicher, W.)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for extension of time , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for 2-Business Day Extension to File Cross Motions for Summary Judgment (von Schleicher, W.)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file cross motions for summary judgment #19 is granted. Cross motions for summary judgment are due by 5/13/2016. Cross responses are due 6/24/2016. No appearance required on 4/28/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Martina Brendel Sherman for presentment of extension of time #19 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/28/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Sherman, Martina)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Susan Hennen for extension of time (unopposed) (Sherman, Martina)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 2/5/2016. Cross motions for summary judgment are to be filed by 4/29/2016. Cross responses due 5/27/2016. Status hearing set for 7/13/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 1/6/2016. Status hearing set for 2/5/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Susan Hennen (Sherman, Martina)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(von Schleicher, W.)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to 12/21/15 to answer or otherwise plead #12 is granted. No appearance required on 12/16/15. (srn, )
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief,, #12 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/16/2015 at 09:00 AM. (von Schleicher, W.)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Second Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (von Schleicher, W.)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to 12/14/15 to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Joint Status Report is now due by 12/30/2015. Status hearing reset for 1/6/2016 at 09:00 AM. The 12/11/15 status date is stricken. No appearance required on 11/19/15. Mailed notice (srn, )
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Jacqueline J. Herring (Herring, Jacqueline)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief,, #8 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/19/2015 at 09:00 AM. (von Schleicher, W.)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (von Schleicher, W.)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by W. Sebastian von Schleicher (von Schleicher, W.)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2015. Status hearing set for 12/11/2015 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/29/2015:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Hennen as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company on 10/26/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (DeBofsky, Mark)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (jn, )
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SUSAN HENNEN by Mark D. DeBofsky (DeBofsky, Mark)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SUSAN HENNEN by Martina Brendel Sherman (Sherman, Martina)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeBofsky, Mark)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SUSAN HENNEN; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11221926. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DeBofsky, Mark)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hennen v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hennen
Represented By: Mark D. DeBofsky
Represented By: Martina B. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: W. Sebastian von Schleicher
Represented By: Jacqueline J. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?