UIRC-GSA Holdings, LLC v. Rainier GSA Portfolio I, LLC
Plaintiff: UIRC-GSA Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Rainer GSA Portfolio I LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv09518
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/30/2022: For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, UIRC-GSA HOLDINGS, LLC's (UIRC) motion for summary judgment on Counts I IV of WILLIAM BLAIR & COMPANY, LLC's (Blair) counterclaim 429 is granted. Blair's motion for summary judgment on Counts I III of Blair's counterclaim 444 is denied. RAINIER REALTY ACQUISITIONS GP., LLC And RAINIER GSA PORTFOLIO I, LLC's (Raini er) motion for summary judgment on Counts I VI of Blair's third-party complaint 432 is granted. Blair's motion for summary judgment on Rainier's counterclaim and Counts I IV of its third-party claims 438 is granted in part and d enied in part. The court grants summary judgment for Blair on Rainier's counterclaim, but denies Blair's motion for summary judgement on Counts I IV of its third-party claims against Rainier. Blair's motion to file a sur-reply [499 ] is denied as moot. This opinion, along with the court's earlier order 414 holding that UIRC's copyrights were invalid, resolves all outstanding issues raised by the parties. After five years, this case is over. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/29/2021: For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, defendants' motions for summary judgment 365 368 are granted, and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied 382 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/26/2020: The court dismisses the fraudulent concealment and unjust enrichment counterclaims brought by Rainier Reality Acquisitions GP, LLC, and Rainier GSA Portfolio I, LLC, against William Blair & Company, LLC. Blair's motion to dismiss [Doc. 316 ] is otherwise denied. Blair must answer Rainier's counterclaim for breach of contract on or before March 18, 2020. This matter is set for a status hearing on March 25, 2020, at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion to dismiss [Doc. 251 ] is denied. Defendants are directed to answer the complaint on or before January 10, 2019. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report using this court's form on or before January 17, 2019. This case is set for a report on status on January 30, 2019, at 9:10 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/13/2018. Mailed notice (cn).
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/11/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/28/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/25/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/21/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/29/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UIRC-GSA Holdings, LLC v. Rainier GSA Portfolio I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UIRC-GSA Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Cary E. Donham
Represented By: Michael D. Froelich
Represented By: John Francis Kennedy
Represented By: Joseph F. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainer GSA Portfolio I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?