Thakkar v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nirav Thakkar
Defendant: Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Baxol Properties, LLC, Laudan Properties, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Altisource Solutions, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Green Group Corp.
Case Number: 1:2015cv10109
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 403 STATUS Report Joint Status Report on Mediation by Nirav Thakkar (Wooten, Nick)
October 7, 2019 Filing 402 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Status hearing held on 10/7/2019 and continued to 1/13/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Pretrial conference set for 3/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Jury trial reset to 5/4/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status report regarding mediation by 10/25/2019. (rao, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 401 STATUS Report Joint Status Report for Reassigned Case by Nirav Thakkar (Wooten, Nick)
September 20, 2019 Filing 400 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:The parties are directed to use the attached outline for the joint status report. (Attachments: #1 Reassignment Status Report) (rao, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 399 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 9/27/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 10/7/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 398 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC by Jason Edward Hunter AMENDED (Hunter, Jason)
August 30, 2019 Filing 397 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon reassignment of this case to Judge Pacold, any scheduled hearings will not be conducted by Judge Tharp. Any queries regarding modifications to the pretrial and trial schedule must be directed to Judge Pacold. Mailed notice (air, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 396 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0025 Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Martha M. Pacolds webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/23/2019.(las, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 395 RESPONSE by Baxol Properties, LLC(an Indian limited liability company) to MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 4 #367 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 5 #368 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 6 #354 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 1 #351 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 7 #355 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 2 #352 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 3 #353 and Related Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence of Breach (Rasp, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 394 RESPONSE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(A Delaware limited liability company)in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to take deposition of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Motion for Leave to Take a Trial Deposition of Ocwen Loan Servicing #347 (Hansen, Forrest)
August 22, 2019 Filing 393 SEALED EXHIBIT by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Opposition to Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Evidence and Witnesses regarding response in opposition to motion, #392 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Hansen, Forrest)
August 22, 2019 Filing 392 RESPONSE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(A Delaware limited liability company)in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkarin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES AT TRIAL #340 (Hansen, Forrest)
August 22, 2019 Filing 391 SEALED EXHIBIT by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Opposition to Motion for Determination of Agency regarding response to motion, #389 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Hansen, Forrest)
August 22, 2019 Filing 390 MOTION by Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC to join Responses to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Filed by other Defendants (Deutschle, Kathrin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 389 RESPONSE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(A Delaware limited liability company) to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav ThakkarRequest for Determination of Agency as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, for Determination of Liability for Trespass as a Matter of Law #344 (Hansen, Forrest)
August 22, 2019 Filing 388 MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp. to join CERTAIN RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 387 Exhibit List Updated Ocwen Trial Exhibit 2 To PTO [Docket 358] by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(A Delaware limited liability company). (Hansen, Forrest)
August 22, 2019 Filing 386 MOTION by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC to join Response by Altisource to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Nos. 1, 2, 3, 17, 18, and 19 (Rasp, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 385 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. to join Responses to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Filed by Other Defendants (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 384 RESPONSE by Altisource Solutions, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav ThakkarRequest for Determination of Agency as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, for Determination of Liability for Trespass as a Matter of Law #344 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 383 RESPONSE by Altisource Solutions, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkarin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES AT TRIAL #340 No. 20 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 382 RESPONSE by Altisource Solutions, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkarin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES AT TRIAL #340 No. 19 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 381 RESPONSE by Altisource Solutions, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkarin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES AT TRIAL #340 Nos. 4, 17 and 18 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 380 RESPONSE by Altisource Solutions, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkarin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES AT TRIAL #340 Nos. 1 and 2 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 379 RESPONSE by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC to motion for miscellaneous relief #344 for Determination of Agency as a Matter of Law (Rasp, Kevin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 378 NOTICE by Nick Heath Wooten of Change of Address (Wooten, Nick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 377 NOTICE of Motion by Nick Heath Wooten for presentment of motion in limine #340 , motion for miscellaneous relief #344 , motion to take deposition #347 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM. (Wooten, Nick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 376 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkar to MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 4 #367 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 25 #322 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 24 #319 , MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Evidence of Prior Find #338 , MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine #332 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 21 #316 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 2 #352 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. to join Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion to Bifurcate Trial (DK. 336) #346 , MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to bifurcate The Issue of Punitive Damages #336 , MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine #334 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 3 #353 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 26 #324 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 23 #318 , MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Hears #348 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 31 #345 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 29 #328 , MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Unauthenticated Third #341 , MOTION by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Baxol Properties, LLCin limine CombinedMOTION by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Baxol Properties, LLC to join Motions in Limine by Altisource #350 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 27 #325 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 22 #317 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 28 #326 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 8 #356 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 1 #351 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 6 #354 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 5 #368 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 30 #329 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 7 #355 , MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine Nos. 1-20 #315 , MOTION by Defendant Laudan Properties, LLCin limine #343 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 9 #357 Plaintiff's Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motions in Limine (Wooten, Nick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 375 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkar to MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Hears #348 (Wooten, Nick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 374 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkar to MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Evidence of Prior Find #338 (Wooten, Nick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 373 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkar to MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. to join Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion to Bifurcate Trial (DK. 336) #346 , MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to bifurcate The Issue of Punitive Damages #336 (Wooten, Nick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 372 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkar to MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine #334 (Wooten, Nick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 371 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkar to MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine #332 (Wooten, Nick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 370 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkar to MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 25 #322 (Wooten, Nick)
August 11, 2019 Filing 369 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar by Rusty A. Payton (Payton, Rusty)
August 9, 2019 Filing 368 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 367 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 4 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 366 EXHIBIT by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp. regarding proposed jury instructions #364 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 365 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar Green Group Exhibit 4 to PTO - Voir Dire regarding proposed voir dire #361 (Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 364 PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Nirav Thakkar (Attachments: #1 Ocwen Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Altisource Proposed Jury Instructions)(Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 363 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar Exhibit 5 to PTO - Proposed Questionnaire regarding proposed pretrial order #358 (Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 362 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar Exhibit 3 to PTO for Ocwen, Laudan and Green Group regarding proposed pretrial order #358 (Attachments: #1 Laudan Exhibit 3 to PTO, #2 Green Group Exhibit 3 to PTO)(Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 361 PROPOSED Voir Dire by Nirav Thakkar (Attachments: #1 Ocwen Exhibit 4 to PTO, #2 Altisource Exhibit 4 to PTO, #3 Laudan Exhibit 4 to PTO, #4 Baxol Exhibit 4 to PTO)(Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 360 Exhibit List Exhibit 2 to PTO by Nirav Thakkar. (Attachments: #1 Ocwen Exhibit 2 to PTO, #2 Ocwen Exhibit 2-A to PTO, #3 Altisource Exhibit 2 to PTO, #4 Baxol Exhibit 2 to PTO, #5 Laudan Exhibit 2 to PTO, #6 Green Group Exhibit 2 to PTO)(Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 359 WITNESS List by Nirav Thakkar (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 1 to PTO, #2 Exhibit Green Group's Exhibit 1 to PTO)(Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 358 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 357 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 9 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 356 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 8 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 355 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 7 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 354 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 6 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 353 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 3 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 352 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 2 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 351 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 1 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 350 MOTION by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Baxol Properties, LLCin limine Combined, MOTION by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Baxol Properties, LLC to join Motions in Limine by Altisource (Rasp, Kevin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 349 SEALED EXHIBIT by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC regarding MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Hears #348 (Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 348 MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Hearsay Statements in Police Reports (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 347 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to take deposition of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Motion for Leave to Take a Trial Deposition of Ocwen Loan Servicing (Attachments: #1 Appendix Documents in Support of Motion)(Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 346 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. to join Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion to Bifurcate Trial (DK. 336) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 345 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 31 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 344 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav ThakkarRequest for Determination of Agency as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, for Determination of Liability for Trespass as a Matter of Law (Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 343 MOTION by Defendant Laudan Properties, LLCin limine (Hunter, Jason)
August 8, 2019 Filing 342 SEALED EXHIBIT by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC regarding MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Unauthenticated Third #341 (Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 341 MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Unauthenticated Third Party Documents (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 340 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkarin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES AT TRIAL (Wooten, Nick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 339 SEALED EXHIBIT by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC regarding MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Evidence of Prior Find #338 (Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 338 MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine to Preclude Evidence of Prior Findings (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 337 SEALED EXHIBIT by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC regarding MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to bifurcate The Issue of Punitive Damages #336 (Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 336 MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to bifurcate The Issue of Punitive Damages From Liability and Compensatory Damages (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 335 SEALED EXHIBIT by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC regarding MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine #334 (Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 334 MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 333 SEALED DOCUMENT by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 332 MOTION by Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin limine (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hansen, Forrest)
August 8, 2019 Filing 331 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. Ex. B regarding MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 30 #329 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 330 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. Ex. A (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 329 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 30 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 328 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 29 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 327 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. Ex. C (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 326 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 28 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D)(Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 325 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 27 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 324 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 26 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 323 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. B-K (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 322 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 321 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. Ex. B (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 320 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. Ex. A regarding MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 24 #319 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 319 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 24 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F)(Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 318 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 23 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 317 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 22 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 316 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine No. 21 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 315 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. in limine Nos. 1-20 (Mendoza, Adrian)
August 6, 2019 Filing 314 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp. by Stanley A. Kitzinger (Kitzinger, Stanley)
July 31, 2019 Filing 313 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motion to withdraw as counsel for defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Jena Valdertero, Katharine Lessaris, Maria Vathis, and Eric D. Martin #311 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 312 NOTICE of Motion by Jena M. Valdetero for presentment of motion to withdraw #311 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Valdetero, Jena)
July 25, 2019 Filing 311 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Valdetero, Jena)
July 18, 2019 Filing 310 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Alexander Dominic Bono (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bono, Alexander)
July 18, 2019 Filing 309 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Cross Claimant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Forrest R Hansen (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hansen, Forrest)
July 17, 2019 Filing 308 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant Ocwen's motion for leave to file additional attorney appearances pursuant to LR 83.17 #306 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Counsel are directed to file their appearances as separate entries on the docket. Mailed notice (air, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 307 NOTICE of Motion by Jena M. Valdetero for presentment of motion for leave to file #306 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 7/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Valdetero, Jena)
July 16, 2019 Filing 306 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for leave to file Additional Attorney Appearances Pursuant to LR 83.17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Valdetero, Jena)
May 17, 2019 Filing 305 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 5/17/2019. Mailed notice(air, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 304 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held. All pending summary judgment motions #232 #235 #244 #248 are denied. Memorandum Opinion and Order to follow. The pretrial schedule is set as follows: Pretrial conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 9/5/19; submission of the pretrial order, motions in limine, proposed jury instructions (agreed and disputed) and proposed voir dire is due on 8/8/19; responses and objections to motions in limine and proposed voir dire are due on 8/22/19. Mailed notice (air, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 303 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The status hearing set on 5/9/19 is reset for 5/16/19 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 302 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon the parties' agreed telephonic request, the trial in this matter is reset for 9/23/19 at 9:00 a.m. A status hearing is set on 5/9/19 at 9:00 a.m., at which time the Court will set a schedule for the submission of a preliminary pretrial order and a date for the pretrial conference. Mailed notice (air, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 301 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC by Michael L. Hahn (Hahn, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 300 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp. by Joanne M Krol (Krol, Joanne)
January 9, 2019 Filing 299 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Material Facts in Response to Ocwen's Motion for Summary Judgment - Exhibits to be filed Under Seal per This Court's Order (Attachments: #1 (282-1) Exh 1 - Ocwens Detailed Transaction History (Ocwen 000339-000358), #2 (282-2) Exh 2 - Altisource documents from October break-in (ALT0016-0059), #3 (282-3) Exh 3 - Exhibit 2 to Green Groups Deposition, Bates Labeled Green Group Deposition Exhibit 2 - 000001-000010, #4 (282-4) Exh 4 - Altisource pictures from January 2014 break-in (ALT000105-106), #5 (282-8) Exh 8 - First Thakkar Dispute Letter to Ocwen, dated August 7, 2013 (PLTF 0050-0055), #6 (282-10) Exh 10 - Ocwen contract with Altisource s.a.r.l. for property preservation services (ALT000905-000969), #7 (282-11) Exh 11 - Altisource contract Baxol for property preservation services, #8 (282-12) Exh 12 - Altisource contract with Laudan for property preservation services (ALT000178-000202), #9 (282-13) Exh 13 - Altisource 2013 presentation to property preservation vendors (ALT001029-001041), #10 (282-14) Exh 14 - Altisource Pre-Foreclosure Vendor Guide for VMS (ALT000435-000536), #11 (282-23) Exh 23 - December 16, 2013 Ocwen letter to Thakkar (PLTF0078-0079), #12 (282-25) Exh 25 - HUD-1 Closing Statement from Nirav Thakkar purchase of the property at 311 Danbury Drive)(Wooten, Nick)
January 9, 2019 Filing 298 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion for leave to file exhibits under seal nunc pro tunc #296 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Plaintiff has leave to file the exhibits referenced in the motion under seal nunc pro tunc. Mailed notice (air, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 297 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Sotelo for presentment of motion for leave to file #296 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Sotelo, Stephen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 296 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for leave to file exhibits under seal (Sotelo, Stephen)
December 26, 2018 Filing 295 REPLY by Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Laudan Properties, LLC (Hunter, Jason)
December 21, 2018 Filing 294 REPLY by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC in Support of It's Motion for Summary Judgment (Lessaris, Katharine)
December 21, 2018 Filing 293 NOTICE by Altisource Solutions, Inc. re reply #291 , Response #292 (Mendoza, Adrian)
December 21, 2018 Filing 292 RESPONSE by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts in Response to Altisource's Motion for Summary Judgment (Mendoza, Adrian)
December 21, 2018 Filing 291 REPLY by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Mendoza, Adrian)
December 21, 2018 Filing 290 RESPONSE by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar's Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Material Facts in Response to Ocwen's Motion for Summary Judgment (Lessaris, Katharine)
December 21, 2018 Filing 289 REPLY by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC to memorandum in opposition to motion #280 in Support of Baxol's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Rasp, Kevin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 288 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant Ocwen's unopposed motion for an extension of time for all of defendants' reply briefs #286 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. All of defendants' reply briefs are now due on 12/21/18. Mailed notice (air, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 287 NOTICE of Motion by Jena M. Valdetero for presentment of extension of time #286 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/12/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Valdetero, Jena)
December 4, 2018 Filing 286 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time for All Defendants' Reply Briefs [UNOPPOSED] (Valdetero, Jena)
November 26, 2018 Filing 285 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages nunc pro tunc #283 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 284 Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar's NOTICE of Motion by Nick Heath Wooten for presentment of motion for leave to file #283 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/29/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Wooten, Nick)
November 23, 2018 Filing 283 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for leave to file excess pages nunc pro tunc. (Wooten, Nick)
November 20, 2018 Filing 282 RULE 56 (b)(3)(C) Statement by Nirav Thakkar regarding motion for summary judgment #232 by Ocwen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Wooten, Nick)
November 20, 2018 Filing 281 RULE 56 (b)(3)(C) Statement by Nirav Thakkar regarding motion for partial summary judgment #235 by Altisource (Wooten, Nick)
November 20, 2018 Filing 280 MEMORANDUM by Nirav Thakkar in Opposition to motion for partial summary judgment #244 by Baxol (Wooten, Nick)
November 20, 2018 Filing 279 MEMORANDUM by Nirav Thakkar in Opposition to motion for partial summary judgment #235 by Altisource (Wooten, Nick)
November 20, 2018 Filing 278 MEMORANDUM by Nirav Thakkar in Opposition to motion for summary judgment #232 by Ocwen (Wooten, Nick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 277 RULE 56 (b)(3) Statement by Nirav Thakkar regarding motion for summary judgment #232 by Ocwen (Wooten, Nick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 276 RULE 56 (b)(3) Statement by Nirav Thakkar regarding motion for partial summary judgment #235 by Altisource (Wooten, Nick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 275 RULE 56 (b)(3) Statement by Nirav Thakkar regarding motion for partial summary judgment #244 by Baxol (Wooten, Nick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 274 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend the deadline to file responses to defendants' dispositive motions #272 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The deadline for filing all responses to defendants' dispositive motions is now 11/19/18. The deadline for filing all replies is now 12/10/18. Mailed notice (air, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 273 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Nick Heath Wooten for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, #272 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/21/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Wooten, Nick)
November 16, 2018 Filing 272 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for extension of time to file response/reply as to sealed document, #247 , sealed document, #237 , motion for summary judgment #232 , motion for partial summary judgment #235 , sealed document #234 , motion for partial summary judgment #244 , memorandum in support of motion #240 , Rule 56 statement, #246 , sealed document, #243 , memorandum in support of motion #238 , Rule 56 statement, #236 , memorandum in support of motion #245 , declaration #233 , Rule 56 statement, #239 Plaintiff's UNOPPOSED Motion to Extend Deadline to File Responses to Defendants' Dispositive Motions (Wooten, Nick)
November 9, 2018 Filing 271 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend the deadline to file responses to defendants dispositive motions #269 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The deadline for filing all responses to defendants' dispositive motions is now 11/16/18. The deadline for filing all replies is now 12/7/18. Mailed notice (air, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 270 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Nick Heath Wooten for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, #269 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Wooten, Nick)
November 8, 2018 Filing 269 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for extension of time to file response/reply as to sealed document, #247 , sealed document, #237 , motion for summary judgment #232 , motion for partial summary judgment #235 , sealed document #234 , motion for partial summary judgment #244 , memorandum in support of motion #240 , Rule 56 statement, #246 , sealed document, #243 , memorandum in support of motion #238 , Rule 56 statement, #236 , memorandum in support of motion #245 , declaration #233 , Rule 56 statement, #239 Plaintiff's UNOPPOSED Motion to Extend Deadline to File Responses to Defendants' Dispositive Motions (Wooten, Nick)
November 7, 2018 Filing 268 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. For reasons stated on the record, plaintiff's motion to unseal documents #265 is denied. Mailed notice (air, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 267 RESPONSE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to unseal document sealed document, #247 , sealed document, #237 , sealed document, #243 , declaration #233 #265 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vathis, Maria)
October 31, 2018 Filing 266 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Sotelo for presentment of motion to unseal document #265 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/7/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Sotelo, Stephen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 265 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to unseal document sealed document, #247 , sealed document, #237 , sealed document, #243 , declaration #233 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sotelo, Stephen)
October 19, 2018 Filing 264 RESPONSE by ThirdParty Plaintiff Laudan Properties, LLC to Rule 56 statement #250 (Hunter, Jason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 263 MEMORANDUM by Laudan Properties, LLC in Opposition to motion for summary judgment #248 (Hunter, Jason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 262 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend the deadline to file responses to defendants' dispositive motions #254 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The deadline for filing all responses to defendants' dispositive motions is now 11/9/18. The deadline for filing all replies is now 11/30/18. Mailed notice (air, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 261 RESPONSE by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to Rule 56 statement #250 of Uncontested Material Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Defendant Green Group Corporation (Lessaris, Katharine)
October 19, 2018 Filing 260 RESPONSE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp. for summary judgment #248 (Lessaris, Katharine)
October 19, 2018 Filing 259 RESPONSE by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC to Rule 56 statement #250 of Uncontested Facts (Rasp, Kevin)
October 19, 2018 Filing 258 RESPONSE by Baxol Properties, LLC(an Indian limited liability company)in Opposition to MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp. for summary judgment #248 (Rasp, Kevin)
October 18, 2018 Filing 257 RESPONSE by Altisource Solutions, Inc. in Opposition to MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp. for summary judgment #248 (Mendoza, Adrian)
October 18, 2018 Filing 256 RESPONSE by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. to Rule 56 statement #250 (Mendoza, Adrian)
October 18, 2018 Filing 255 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Nick Heath Wooten for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, #254 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 10/24/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Wooten, Nick)
October 18, 2018 Filing 254 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for extension of time to file response/reply as to sealed document, #247 , sealed document, #237 , status hearing,,, set/reset hearings,,, set case scheduling order,, #208 , motion for summary judgment #232 , motion for partial summary judgment #235 , sealed document #234 , motion for partial summary judgment #244 , memorandum in support of motion #240 , Rule 56 statement, #246 , sealed document, #243 , memorandum in support of motion #238 , Rule 56 statement, #236 , memorandum in support of motion #245 , declaration #233 , Rule 56 statement, #239 Plaintiff's UNOPPOSED Motion to Extend Deadline to File Responses to Defendants' Dispositive Motions (Wooten, Nick)
October 15, 2018 Filing 253 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC's motion for leave to join the summary judgment motions of Baxol Properties, LLC and Altisource Solutions, Inc. #251 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 252 NOTICE of Motion by Jason Edward Hunter for presentment of motion to join #251 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 10/24/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Hunter, Jason)
October 12, 2018 Filing 251 MOTION by Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Laudan Properties, LLC to join Summary Judgment Motions of Baxol Properties, LLC and Altisource Solutions, Inc. (Hunter, Jason)
September 21, 2018 Filing 250 RULE 56 (a) Statement by Green Group Corp. regarding motion for summary judgment #248 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 249 MEMORANDUM by Green Group Corp. in support of motion for summary judgment #248 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 248 MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp. for summary judgment (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 247 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC per Agreed Confidentiality Order in Support of Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BaXol Service Agreement with Green Group, #2 Errata D - BaXol Field Vendor Agreement with Altisource, #3 Errata F - Altisource Work Orders 10-4-13, #4 Exhibit G - Altisource Work Orders 12-31-13)(Rasp, Kevin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 246 RULE 56 56.1(a) Statement by Baxol Properties, LLC regarding motion for partial summary judgment #244 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Altisource Deposition - Part I, #2 Exhibit C - Altisource Deposition - Part II, #3 Exhibit E - BaXol Deposition, #4 Exhibit H - Second Thakkar Deposition)(Rasp, Kevin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 245 MEMORANDUM by Baxol Properties, LLC in support of motion for partial summary judgment #244 (Rasp, Kevin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 244 MOTION by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC for partial summary judgment (Rasp, Kevin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 243 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts - Exhibits to be filed Under Seal per This Court's Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M, #6 Exhibit N, #7 Exhibit O, #8 Exhibit Q, #9 Exhibit R, #10 Exhibit S)(Mendoza, Adrian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 242 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant Altisources motion for leave to file exhibits to its Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal and for leave to file a brief in excess of the page limitation #230 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant is permitted to file the exhibits referenced in its motion under seal. The parties are advised, however, that to the extent any judgment by the Court is based on information contained in a sealed exhibit, the Court may sua sponte unseal that exhibit and refer to the information in an opinion announcing the ruling, unless the exhibit has previously been sealed pursuant to a particularized motion setting forth specific reasons justifying the sealing of the document beyond the generic justification that it contains confidential and proprietary information. See generally Baxter Intl, Inc. v. Abbott Laboratories, 297 F.3d 544 (7th Cir. 2002). Defendant is also permitted to exceed the page limitation set forth in Local Rule 7.1 by six (6) pages in its Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff will likewise be permitted to exceed the page limitation by six (6) pages in its response to that motion.Mailed notice (slb, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 241 NOTICE by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (Mendoza, Adrian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 240 MEMORANDUM by Altisource Solutions, Inc. in support of motion for partial summary judgment #235 (Mendoza, Adrian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 239 RULE 56.1 Statement by Altisource Solutions, Inc. regarding motion for partial summary judgment #235 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit P)(Mendoza, Adrian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 238 MEMORANDUM by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC in support of motion for summary judgment #232 (Lessaris, Katharine)
September 21, 2018 Filing 237 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC -Statement of Material Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 and This Court's Standing Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Lessaris, Katharine)
September 21, 2018 Filing 236 RULE 56.1 Statement of Material Facts and Pursuant to This Court's Standing Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Lessaris, Katharine)
September 21, 2018 Filing 235 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. for partial summary judgment (Mendoza, Adrian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 234 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC , Declaration of Gina Feezer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lessaris, Katharine)
September 21, 2018 Filing 233 DECLARATION of Gina Feezer regarding motion for summary judgment #232 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lessaris, Katharine)
September 21, 2018 Filing 232 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for summary judgment (Lessaris, Katharine)
September 20, 2018 Filing 231 NOTICE of Motion by Adrian Mendoza, Jr for presentment of motion for leave to file, #230 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 9/25/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Mendoza, Adrian)
September 20, 2018 Filing 230 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. for leave to file Exhibits to Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under Seal and for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitation (Mendoza, Adrian)
September 20, 2018 Filing 229 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant's motion for leave to file exhibits to its Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts and Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and for leave to file a brief in excess of the page limitation #227 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant is permitted to file the exhibits referenced in its motion under seal. The parties are advised, however, that to the extent any judgment by the Court is based on information contained in a sealed exhibit, the Court may sua sponte unseal that exhibit and refer to the information in an opinion announcing the ruling, unless the exhibit has previously been sealed pursuant to a particularized motion setting forth specific reasons justifying the sealing of the document beyond the generic justification that it contains confidential and proprietary information. See generally Baxter Int'l, Inc. v. Abbott Laboratories, 297 F.3d 544 (7th Cir. 2002). Defendant is also permitted to exceed the page limitation set forth in Local Rule 7.1 by eight (8) pages in its Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff will likewise be permitted to exceed the page limitation by eight (8) pages in its response to that motion. Mailed notice (air, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 228 NOTICE of Motion by Katharine Flynn Lessaris for presentment of motion for leave to file, #227 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 9/25/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Lessaris, Katharine)
September 19, 2018 Filing 227 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for leave to file Exhibits to Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts and Declaration in Support of Summary Judgment Under Seal and for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitation (Lessaris, Katharine)
September 12, 2018 Filing 226 ANSWERS to Green Group Corporation's Affirmative Defenses by Laudan Properties, LLC (Hunter, Jason) (Docket text modified on 9/13/2018 by Clerk's Office).
August 22, 2018 Filing 225 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Green Group Corp.(Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 22, 2018 Filing 224 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Green Group Corp.(Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 22, 2018 Filing 223 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status and motion hearing held. Cross defendant Baxol orally withdraws its motion to compel #219 . Trial is set for 5/7/19 at 9:00 a.m. A status hearing is set on 2/19/19 at 9:00 a.m., at which time the Court will set a schedule for the submission of a preliminary pretrial order and a date for the pretrial conference. Mailed notice (air, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 222 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Green Group Corp.(Karlsgodt, Nathan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 221 Amended Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Baxol Properties, LLC(an Indian limited liability company) (Rasp, Kevin)
August 17, 2018 Filing 220 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Christopher Rasp for presentment of motion to compel, #219 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/22/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Rasp, Kevin)
August 17, 2018 Filing 219 MOTION by Cross Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC to compel Answers and Responses to Written Discovery against Defendant, Laudan Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Rasp, Kevin)
August 17, 2018 Filing 218 Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Laudan Properties, LLC (Hunter, Jason)
July 5, 2018 Filing 217 NOTICE by Cornelius Edward McKnight of Change of Address for McKnight & Kitzinger, LLC (McKnight, Cornelius)
June 6, 2018 Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Defendant Altisource's motion to substitute counsel #213 is granted. Attorneys with the firm of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner, LLP is terminated as counsel for Altisource (but not for defendant Ocwen). Parties are to confer in advance of the 8/22/18 status date for possible trial dates and call the courtroom deputy at (312) 435-5861 if an agreement is reached. Mailed notice (air, )
May 25, 2018 Filing 215 NOTICE by Jena M. Valdetero of Change of Address or Name (Valdetero, Jena)
May 25, 2018 Filing 214 NOTICE of Motion by Adrian Mendoza, Jr for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #213 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 6/6/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Mendoza, Adrian)
May 25, 2018 Filing 213 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. to substitute attorney (Mendoza, Adrian)
May 25, 2018 Filing 212 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. by Angela Marie Iaria, Ms (Iaria, Angela) (Linked document has the incorrect case number) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 5/29/2018 (jk, ).
May 25, 2018 Filing 211 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. by Adrian Mendoza, Jr (Mendoza, Adrian) (Linked document has the incorrect case number) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 5/29/2018 (jk, ).
May 17, 2018 Filing 210 NOTICE by Maria Zoee Vathis of Change of Address Change of Law Firm Name and E-Mail Address (Vathis, Maria)
May 14, 2018 Filing 209 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: All matters relating to the referral of this action having been resolved, the case is returned to the assigned judge. Mailed notice (lp, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 208 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued to 8/22/18 at 9:00 a.m., at which time all parties should be prepared to set a trial date; such date will be no later than 5/7/19. All discovery to close on 8/17/18. Disclosure of experts by 6/15/18; disclosure of any rebuttal experts by 7/20/18. Any dispositive motions and/or Daubert motions due 9/21/18; responses due by 10/19/18; replies due by 11/9/18; any such motions need not be noticed for presentment. In view of the foregoing schedule, the referral to the assigned Magistrate Judge is closed. Mailed notice (air, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 207 STATUS Report Plaintiff's status report by Nirav Thakkar (Wooten, Nick)
May 7, 2018 Filing 206 Defendants' and Third-Party Defendant's Proposed Discovery Plan by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Vathis, Maria)
April 11, 2018 Filing 205 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued to 5/9/18 at 9:00 a.m. Parties are to confer and submit their proposed agreed or respective discovery schedules by 5/7/18. Mailed notice (air, )
April 3, 2018 Filing 204 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:A status hearing is scheduled on 4/11/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
September 27, 2017 Filing 203 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Baxol Properties, LLC(Rasp, Kevin)
September 6, 2017 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 9/6/2017: Defendant BaXol's motion to dismiss #128 and Third-party defendant Green Group's motion for more definite statement #163 are denied. Defendant Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A.'s motion to dismiss #136 is granted without prejudice. (For further details see order) Mailed notice(air, )
August 28, 2017 Filing 201 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motion to withdraw as attorney #199 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Denean Sturino's appearance as counsel shall be terminated. Mailed notice (air, )
August 25, 2017 Filing 200 NOTICE of Motion by Denean K. Sturino for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #199 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/31/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Sturino, Denean)
August 25, 2017 Filing 199 MOTION by Attorney Denean K. Sturino to withdraw as attorney for Baxol Properties, LLC. No party information provided (Sturino, Denean)
August 24, 2017 Filing 198 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC by Kevin Christopher Rasp (Rasp, Kevin)
August 23, 2017 Filing 197 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendants Baxol Properties, LLC, Baxol Properties, LLC, Baxol Properties, LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Baxol Properties, LLC, Baxol Properties, LLC, Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC, Cross Claimant Baxol Properties, LLC by Katherine Decker (Decker, Katherine)
August 21, 2017 Filing 196 NOTICE by Ross Michael Zambon of Change of Address (Zambon, Ross)
June 9, 2017 Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Green Group's motion for leave to file its answer to Baxol's amended third party complaint instanter #193 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
June 8, 2017 Filing 194 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan Pear Karlsgodt for presentment of motion for leave to file, #193 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 6/20/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
June 8, 2017 Filing 193 MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp. for leave to file Answer to Baxol's Amended 3rd Party Complaint Instanter (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
June 8, 2017 Filing 192 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint of Baxol Properties, LLC by Green Group Corp.(Karlsgodt, Nathan)
June 8, 2017 Filing 191 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Add Parties to Agreed Confidentiality Order #189 is granted. Scope of the operative Agreed Confidentiality Order is expanded to include the intended parties. Motion hearing set for 6/13/17 stricken. Mailed notice (lp, )
June 6, 2017 Filing 190 Notice of Unopposed Motion NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of motion for order #189 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 6/13/2017 at 10:15 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
June 6, 2017 Filing 189 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for order Unopposed Motion to Add Parties to Agreed Confidentiality Order (Vathis, Maria)
June 1, 2017 Filing 188 Amended Jurisdiction STATEMENT by Nirav Thakkar (Sotelo, Stephen)
June 1, 2017 Filing 187 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Laudan Properties, LLC re text entry,,,, #183 and FRCP 7.1 (Hunter, Jason)
May 31, 2017 Filing 186 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant Laudan Properties LLC has failed to comply with this Court's order #183 instructing all parties to comply with Local Rule 3.2 by 5/26/17. Laudan Properties LLC is directed to file a notification of affiliates in compliance with Local Rule 3.2 by 6/2/17 or it will be required to show cause why it should not be held in contempt. Mailed notice (air, )
May 26, 2017 Filing 185 Jurisdiction STATEMENT by Nirav Thakkar (Sotelo, Stephen)
May 15, 2017 Filing 184 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Baxol Properties, LLC(an Indian limited liability company) (Sturino, Denean)
May 15, 2017 Filing 183 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The Plaintiff is directed to submit, by 5/26/17, a supplemental jurisdictional statement with sufficient information for the Court to determine whether it has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. The allegations in the first amended complaint are insufficient for the Court to determine the citizenship of Laudan Properties, LLC and BaXol Properties, LLC. A limited liability corporation is a citizen of every state in which its members are citizens. See generally Belleville Catering Co. v. Champaign Market Place, L.L.C., 350 F.3d 691 (7th Cir. 2003). If either of these companies are non-diverse, the parties will be directed by further order to address whether their joinder destroys diversity jurisdiction. See Perez v. Arcobaleno Pasta Machs., Inc.,261 F. Supp. 2d 997, 999 (N.D. Ill. 2003). All parties are further directed to ensure they have complied, by 5/26/17, with Local Rule 3.2's requirement that any "nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, shall file a statement identifying all its publicly held affiliates" as it appears only two parties have done so. Mailed notice (air, )
May 5, 2017 Filing 182 THIRD party complaint by Baxol Properties, LLC against Green Group Corp. .(Sturino, Denean)
May 1, 2017 Filing 181 REPLY by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC in Support of its Motion to Dismiss (Sturino, Denean)
April 28, 2017 Filing 180 REPLY by Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A.in Support of MOTION by Defendant Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim and to quash service #136 (Vathis, Maria) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 5/1/2017 (pk, ).
April 21, 2017 Filing 179 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant Baxol's agreed motion to dismiss the third party complaint against third party defendant Green Group without prejudice #177 is granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The motion for leave to file an amended third party complaint #178 is granted. Defendant Baxol shall file an amended third party complaint within 14 days, Defendant's response shall be due 30 days after the First Amended Third-Party Complaint is filed. Mailed notice (air, )
April 20, 2017 Filing 178 MOTION by Cross Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC for leave to file Amended Third Party-Complaint (Sturino, Denean)
April 20, 2017 Filing 177 MOTION by Cross Defendants Baxol Properties, LLC, Baxol Properties, LLC to dismiss Contribution Claim Againat Third-Party Defendant (Sturino, Denean)
April 20, 2017 Filing 176 RESPONSE by Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A., Baxol Properties, LLC, Green Group Corp., Laudan Properties, LLC to MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp.for more definite statement amended #163 (Vathis, Maria)
April 18, 2017 Filing 175 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond #172 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Plaintiff's response #174 is considered timely. Defendants may file their replies by May 1, 2017. Mailed notice (air, )
April 16, 2017 Filing 174 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkarin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #128 (Sotelo, Stephen)
April 14, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen T. Sotelo for presentment of extension of time, motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #172 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 4/20/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Sotelo, Stephen)
April 14, 2017 Filing 172 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for extension of time , MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss #128 (Sotelo, Stephen)
April 14, 2017 Filing 171 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkarin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim and to quash service #136 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sotelo, Stephen)
April 11, 2017 Filing 170 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond #168 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Plaintiff's response to the motions to dismiss #128 , #136 is now due April 14, 2017. Defendants' replies are now due April 28, 2017. Mailed notice (air, )
April 10, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen T. Sotelo for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief, #168 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 4/18/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Sotelo, Stephen)
April 10, 2017 Filing 168 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss #128 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #136 (UNOPPOSED MOTION) (Sotelo, Stephen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 167 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Valdetero, Jena)
March 30, 2017 Filing 166 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion hearing held. Motion by third-party defendants Green Group for a more definite statement #156 is denied as moot. Third-party defendants Green Group's amended motion for a more definite statement #163 is taken under advisement. Any party that wishes to respond to this motion must do so by 4/20/17. Absent any response, the motion will be granted. No appearance is required on 4/6/17. Mailed notice (air, )
March 29, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan Pear Karlsgodt for presentment of motion for more definite statement #163 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 4/6/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 29, 2017 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM by Green Group Corp. in support of motion for more definite statement #163 amended (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 29, 2017 Filing 163 MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp.for more definite statement amended (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 29, 2017 Filing 162 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Green Group Corp.'s motion #159 to amend/correct its previous motion for a more definite statement is granted. No appearance on that motion is required. Green Group Corp. may file its updated motion for a more definite statement by 3/30/17. Mailed notice (air, )
March 28, 2017 Filing 161 Answer to Laudan Properties LLC's Cross Claim for Contribution by Baxol Properties, LLC (Sturino, Denean)
March 28, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan Pear Karlsgodt for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief,,,, #159 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 4/4/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 28, 2017 Filing 159 MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp. to amend/correct MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp.for more definite statement #156 , memorandum in support of motion #157 on its face (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 24, 2017 Filing 158 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan Pear Karlsgodt for presentment of motion for more definite statement #156 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/30/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 24, 2017 Filing 157 MEMORANDUM by Green Group Corp. in support of motion for more definite statement #156 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 24, 2017 Filing 156 MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp.for more definite statement (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 24, 2017 Filing 155 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Third party defendant Green Group Corp.'s motion for a more definite statement #153 is denied without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.3. All motions must be noticed for presentment in compliance with the local rules. Green Group may refile its motion with proper presentment. Mailed notice (air, )
March 23, 2017 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM by Green Group Corp. in support of motion for more definite statement #153 (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 23, 2017 Filing 153 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.for more definite statement (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 16, 2017 Filing 152 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Laudan Properties by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(A Delaware limited liability company)(Vathis, Maria)
March 16, 2017 Filing 151 ANSWER to Crossclaim of BaXol Properties by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(A Delaware limited liability company)(Vathis, Maria)
March 16, 2017 Filing 150 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Laudan Properties by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (A Delaware corporation)(Vathis, Maria)
March 16, 2017 Filing 149 ANSWER to Crossclaim of BaXol Properties by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (A Delaware corporation)(Vathis, Maria)
March 14, 2017 Filing 148 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion hearing held. Defendants, Baxol and Altisource Portfolio's motions to dismiss [128, 136] are taken under advisement. Plaintiff's responses to these motions are due by 4/11/17; Defendants' replies are due by 4/25/17. Once the motions are fully briefed, the court will rule via CM/ECF and set further dates as appropriate. Mailed notice (air, )
March 8, 2017 Filing 147 ANSWER to Crossclaim of BaXol Properties, LLC by Laudan Properties, LLC(an Ohio limited liability company)(Hunter, Jason)
March 8, 2017 Filing 146 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Altisource Solutions, Inc.'s Crossclaim for Contribution by Laudan Properties, LLC(an Ohio limited liability company)(Hunter, Jason)
March 8, 2017 Filing 145 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for Contribution by Laudan Properties, LLC(an Ohio limited liability company)(Hunter, Jason)
March 2, 2017 Filing 144 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Third party defendant Green Group Corporation's motion for an extension of time to answer #142 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant's answer shall be due on 3/23/17. Mailed notice (air, )
March 1, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE of Motion by Cornelius Edward McKnight for presentment of extension of time #142 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/9/2017 at 09:00 AM. (McKnight, Cornelius)
March 1, 2017 Filing 142 MOTION by Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp. for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (McKnight, Cornelius)
March 1, 2017 Filing 141 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp. by Nathan Pear Karlsgodt (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
March 1, 2017 Filing 140 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendants Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Green Group Corp., Cross Defendant Green Group Corp. by Cornelius Edward McKnight (McKnight, Cornelius)
February 28, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #136 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/14/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
February 28, 2017 Filing 138 DECLARATION by Defendant Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. of Michelle D. Esterman In Support of Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Quash Service of Process and to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint at Law Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(2), (5) and (6) #136 (Vathis, Maria) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 3/1/2017) (rm, ).
February 28, 2017 Filing 137 MEMORANDUM by Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #136 (Vathis, Maria)
February 28, 2017 Filing 136 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim and to quash service (Vathis, Maria)
February 27, 2017 Filing 135 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses, THIRD party complaint by Laudan Properties, LLC against Green Group Corp. ., CROSSCLAIM by Laudan Properties, LLC against Altisource Solutions, Inc., Baxol Properties, LLC(an Indian limited liability company), Green Group Corp., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC . by Laudan Properties, LLC(Hunter, Jason)
February 27, 2017 SUMMONS Issued as to Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp. (pg, )
February 24, 2017 Filing 134 THIRD party complaint by Baxol Properties, LLC against Green Group Corp. .(Sturino, Denean)
February 24, 2017 Filing 133 CROSSCLAIM by Baxol Properties, LLC against Altisource Solutions, Inc., Laudan Properties, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC For Contribution.(Sturino, Denean)
February 24, 2017 Filing 132 Answer by Baxol Properties, LLC DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT, BAXOL PROPERTIES, LLCS ANSWER TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-CLAIMANT OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLCS CROSS CLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTION (Sturino, Denean)
February 24, 2017 Filing 131 Answer by Baxol Properties, LLC DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT, BAXOL PROPERTIES, LLCS ANSWER TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-CLAIMANT ALTISOURCE SOLUTIONS, INC.S CROSSCLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTION AND INDEMNITY (Sturino, Denean)
February 24, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE of Motion by Denean K. Sturino for presentment of motion to dismiss #128 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/14/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Sturino, Denean)
February 24, 2017 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM by Baxol Properties, LLC in support of motion to dismiss #128 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sturino, Denean)
February 24, 2017 Filing 128 MOTION by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Sturino, Denean)
February 24, 2017 SUMMONS Issued as to Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp. (pg, )
February 21, 2017 Filing 127 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC, Cross Defendants Laudan Properties, LLC, Laudan Properties, LLC by Kathrin Mary Deutschle (Deutschle, Kathrin)
February 21, 2017 Filing 126 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC as to Green Group Corp. on 2/17/2017, answer due 3/10/2017. (Vathis, Maria)
February 16, 2017 Filing 125 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Magistrate Judge status hearing held on 2/16/17. No further dates set at this time. Mailed notice (lp, )
February 15, 2017 Filing 124 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC by Denean K. Sturino (Sturino, Denean)
February 14, 2017 Filing 123 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant Altisource Portfolio Solutions' unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer #120 is granted. Defendant's answer is now due February 28, 2017. No appearance on the motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
February 13, 2017 Filing 122 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nirav Thakkar as to Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. on 1/24/2017, answer due 2/14/2017. (Sotelo, Stephen)
February 13, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE of Motion by Jena M. Valdetero for presentment of extension of time #120 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 2/23/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Valdetero, Jena)
February 13, 2017 Filing 120 MOTION by Defendant Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. for extension of time [UNOPPOSED] to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint at Law (Valdetero, Jena)
February 10, 2017 Filing 119 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC, Cross Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC by Jason Edward Hunter (Hunter, Jason)
February 10, 2017 SUMMONS Issued as to Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp. (pg, )
February 8, 2017 Filing 118 ANSWER to amended complaint , THIRD party complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC against Green Group Corp. ., CROSSCLAIM by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC against Baxol Properties, LLC, Laudan Properties, LLC . by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(Valdetero, Jena)
February 8, 2017 Filing 117 ANSWER to amended complaint , THIRD party complaint by Altisource Solutions, Inc. against Green Group Corp. ., CROSSCLAIM by Altisource Solutions, Inc. against Baxol Properties, LLC, Laudan Properties, LLC . by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (Valdetero, Jena)
February 6, 2017 Filing 116 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC by Steven Walter Mastrantonio Amended Notice (Mastrantonio, Steven)
February 6, 2017 Filing 115 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC by Steven Walter Mastrantonio (Mastrantonio, Steven)
February 3, 2017 Filing 114 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorney Mastrantonio's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #113 is granted. Counsel is directed to file an appearance form on the docket. Mailed notice (air, )
February 2, 2017 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12817702. (Mastrantonio, Steven)
January 30, 2017 Filing 112 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant Baxol Properties' unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer #110 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant's answer shall now be due February 24, 2017. The 2/16 status hearing before Judge Valdez stands. Mailed notice (air, )
January 27, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Nolan for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief #110 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 2/2/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Nolan, Daniel)
January 27, 2017 Filing 110 MOTION by Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #88 (Nolan, Daniel)
January 27, 2017 Filing 109 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Baxol Properties, LLC by Daniel Joseph Nolan (Nolan, Daniel)
January 26, 2017 Filing 108 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants Ocwen and Altisource's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer #106 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendants' answer is due by February 8, 2017. The 2/16 status hearing before Judge Valdez stands. Mailed notice (air, )
January 25, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of extension of time #106 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/31/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
January 25, 2017 Filing 106 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time to respond to first amended complaint at law (Vathis, Maria)
January 18, 2017 Filing 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Motion hearing held on 1/18/17. Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Altisource Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with this Court's Order of January 3, 2017 #100 is hereby granted. Defendants' deadline to comply with the Court's January 3, 2017 Order is extended to 1/31/17. Status hearing set for 1/31/17 at 10:00 a.m. is stricken and reset to 2/16/17 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (lp, )
January 17, 2017 Filing 104 REPLY by Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to response in opposition to motion, #103 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vathis, Maria)
January 17, 2017 Filing 103 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkarin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time to comply with this Court's Order of January 3, 2017 #100 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sotelo, Stephen)
January 14, 2017 Filing 102 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nirav Thakkar as to Baxol Properties, LLC on 1/6/2017, answer due 1/27/2017. (Sotelo, Stephen)
January 13, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of extension of time #100 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 1/18/2017 at 10:15 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
January 13, 2017 Filing 100 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time to comply with this Court's Order of January 3, 2017 (Vathis, Maria)
January 6, 2017 Filing 99 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #97 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendants answer is now due January 25, 2017. Mailed notice (lxs, )
January 5, 2017 Filing 98 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of extension of time #97 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/10/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
January 5, 2017 Filing 97 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time to respond to first amended complaint at law (Vathis, Maria)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 1/3/2017. [For further details see order] Mailed notice (np, )
January 3, 2017 Filing 95 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: For the reasons stated within the order, Plaintiff's Amended Renewed Motion to Compel or Alternatively to Reconsider the Court's Order Dated November 16, 2016 #76 is granted. Altisource shall make disclosures consistent with the Court's Order within 14 days. Order to follow. Mailed notice (np, )
December 29, 2016 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A., Baxol Properties, LLC, Laudan Properties, LLC (pg, )
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 12/21/2016:Mailed notice(lp, )
December 21, 2016 Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: For the reasons stated within the order, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Communications Between Altisource and Third Party Vendors #59 is granted in part and denied in part. Altisource shall make disclosures consistent with the Court's Order within 5 days. Order to follow. Mailed notice (lp, )
December 21, 2016 Filing 92 Entered in error. (lp, ).
December 19, 2016 Filing 91 REPLY by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to memorandum in opposition to motion, #87 , reply to response to motion #90 (CORRECTED FORMAT #90 ) (Wooten, Nicholas)
December 16, 2016 Filing 90 REPLY by Nirav Thakkar to memorandum in opposition to motion, #87 (Wooten, Nicholas)
December 13, 2016 Filing 89 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiff's Motion to seal #86 is stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.3(b). The moving party shall refile its motion and the appropriate notice of motion in compliance with Local Rule 5.3(b). Likewise, the moving party must state why good cause exists to seal the materials at issue, detailing the documents, and explaining why confidentiality is necessary consistent with the Seventh Circuit's descriptions of what is protectable. Mailed notice (lp, )
December 9, 2016 Filing 88 AMENDED complaint by Nirav Thakkar against All Defendants (Sotelo, Stephen)
December 9, 2016 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM by Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC in Opposition to motion to amend/correct, motion for relief,, #79 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel, or Alternatively, to Reconsider, The Court's Order Dated November 16, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lessaris, Katharine)
December 8, 2016 Filing 86 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to seal document Documents 76-3 and 79-3 (Wooten, Nicholas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The Court has reviewed the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Communications between Altisource and Third-Party Vendors #59 . For a proper evaluation of the Plaintiff's Motion, the Court orders the Defendant to submit for in camera review, all documents enumerated in Defendant's privilege log [59-3]. The Defendant may submit an electronic copy of the aforementioned documents to Proposed_Order_Valdez@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (lp, )
December 7, 2016 Filing 84 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Motion Hearing held on 12/7/16. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Communications between Altisource and third-party vendors #59 , Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel and for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against Defendants for Noncompliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #66 are entered and continued. Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel or Alternatively to Reconsider the Court's Order Dated November 16, 2016 #76 is entered and continued; the briefing schedule stated on the Record in the Court's 12/1/16 motion hearing to stand. Previously set status hearing form 1/31/17 at 10:00 a.m. to stand. Mailed notice (lp, )
December 7, 2016 Filing 83 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #80 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading to the complaint is due by 1/11/17. The case remains under referral to Magistrate Judge Valdez, and further requests relating to additional discovery should be directed to Judge Valdez. Mailed notice (air, )
December 6, 2016 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11-08-2016 before the Honorable Maria Valdez. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (Warren, Pamela)
December 2, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE of Motion by Ross Michael Zambon for presentment of motion for leave to file #80 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/7/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Zambon, Ross)
December 2, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for leave to file His First Amended Complaint, To Add Party Defendants, and Add a Cause of Action for Civil Conspiracy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zambon, Ross)
December 1, 2016 Filing 79 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to amend/correct MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for reconsideration regarding order #72 #76 Plaintiff's Amended Renewed Motion to Compel, or Alternatively, to Reconsider the Court's Order Dated November 16, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Zambon, Ross)
December 1, 2016 Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Motion hearing held 12/1/16. For the reasons stated in open court, the Plaintiff may depose the pre-designated representative of Defendant Altisource following the discovery cutoff date. The Plaintiff's Motion #66 is hereby entered and continued. Status hearing is set for 1/31/2017 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (lp, )
December 1, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas Heath Wooten for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief #76 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 12/7/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Wooten, Nicholas)
November 30, 2016 Filing 76 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for reconsideration regarding order #72 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wooten, Nicholas)
November 21, 2016 Filing 75 REPLY by Nirav Thakkar to response in opposition to motion, #70 , MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to compel production of communications between Altisource and third-party vendors #59 (Sotelo, Stephen)
November 17, 2016 Filing 74 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Motion Hearing held on 11/17/16 on Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel and for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against Defendants for Noncompliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #66 . For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is hereby entered and continued. Motion hearing is set for 12/1/2016 at 10:15 AM. Mailed notice (lp, )
November 16, 2016 Filing 73 RESPONSE by Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to compel Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel andMOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for order Imposing Sanctions Against Defendants for Noncompliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #66 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lessaris, Katharine)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 11/15/2016: Mailed notice (lp, )
November 15, 2016 Filing 71 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez:Magistrate Judge status and motion hearing held on 11/8/16. For the reasons stated on the record within the Court's Order, Defendants' Motion to Compel and for an Order Imposing Sanctions for Noncompliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 and 37 #43 is denied. Enter Order. Mailed notice (lp, )
November 14, 2016 Filing 70 RESPONSE by Altisource Solutions, Inc. in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to compel Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel andMOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for order Imposing Sanctions Against Defendants for Noncompliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #66 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lessaris, Katharine)
November 13, 2016 Filing 68 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Ross Michael Zambon for presentment of motion to compel, motion for order,, #66 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 11/17/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Zambon, Ross)
November 13, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE of Motion by Ross Michael Zambon for presentment of motion to compel, motion for order,, #66 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/17/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Zambon, Ross)
November 13, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to compel Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel and, MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for order Imposing Sanctions Against Defendants for Noncompliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zambon, Ross)
November 11, 2016 Filing 65 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Eric David Martin (Martin, Eric)
November 9, 2016 Filing 63 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Katharine Flynn Lessaris (Lessaris, Katharine)
November 8, 2016 Filing 69 SUR-REPLY by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to Plaintiff's Supplement to Motion to Compel #53 . (jjr, )
November 8, 2016 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez:Motion hearing held on 11/8/16. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' Motion to File a Sur-Reply #54 is granted. Defendant's Motion to Serve Additional Interrogatories #57 is also granted. The Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Communications between Altisource and Third-Party Vendors #59 is taken under submission. The Defendants shall file responses within five days; the Plaintiff shall file his reply, if any, within ten days. Mailed notice (lp, )
November 7, 2016 Filing 62 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkarin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCDefendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Altisource Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories #57 (Sotelo, Stephen)
November 7, 2016 Filing 61 RESPONSE by Nirav Thakkarin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for leave to file Defendants' Motion for Leave to File One-Page Surreply to Plaintiff's Supplement to Motion to Compel #54 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sotelo, Stephen)
November 3, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen T. Sotelo for presentment of motion to compel, #59 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 11/8/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Sotelo, Stephen)
November 3, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to compel production of communications between Altisource and third-party vendors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Sotelo, Stephen)
November 3, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #57 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 11/8/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
November 3, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLCDefendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Altisource Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vathis, Maria)
October 31, 2016 Filing 56 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of motion for leave to file, #54 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 11/8/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
October 27, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of motion for leave to file, #54 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 11/3/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
October 27, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for leave to file Defendants' Motion for Leave to File One-Page Surreply to Plaintiff's Supplement to Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vathis, Maria)
October 25, 2016 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENT to motion to compel,, motion for sanctions, #43 Plaintiff's Supplement in Support of His Motion to Compel (Zambon, Ross)
October 25, 2016 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM by Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC in Opposition to motion to compel,, motion for sanctions, #43 [SUPPLEMENTAL] (Vathis, Maria)
October 24, 2016 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/18/16 before the Honorable Maria Valdez. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2017. (Fennell, Kathleen)
October 18, 2016 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Motion hearing held on 10/18/16. As stated in open Court, the parties are to simultaneously submit in writing any supporting argument regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against Defendants for Non Compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 and 37 #43 . Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery #47 is hereby granted. Deadline for fact discovery is extended to 12/1/2016. Status hearing set for 10/27/16 at 10:00 a.m. is stricken. Mailed notice (lp, )
October 17, 2016 Filing 49 RESPONSE by Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to compel MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for sanctions for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against Defendants for Noncompliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 and 37 #43 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Vathis, Maria)
October 13, 2016 Filing 48 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #47 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 10/18/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
October 13, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time to complete discovery Unopposed (Vathis, Maria)
October 12, 2016 Filing 46 Second Amended NOTICE of Motion by Ross Michael Zambon for presentment of motion to compel, motion for sanctions,, #43 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 10/18/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Zambon, Ross)
October 7, 2016 Filing 45 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Ross Michael Zambon for presentment of motion to compel,, motion for sanctions, #43 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 10/19/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Zambon, Ross)
October 6, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Ross Michael Zambon for presentment of motion to compel,, motion for sanctions, #43 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 10/18/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Zambon, Ross)
October 6, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to compel , MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for sanctions for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against Defendants for Noncompliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 and 37 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Zambon, Ross)
September 27, 2016 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Magistrate Judge status hearing held on 9/27/16 and continued to 10/27/16 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (lp, )
September 1, 2016 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: On the Court's own motion, status hearing set to 9/22/16 is reset to 9/27/16. Mailed notice (lp, )
August 11, 2016 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Magistrate Judge status hearing held. The parties report that a settlement conference would not be fruitful at this time. Status hearing set to 9/22/16 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (lp, )
July 28, 2016 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Jena M. Valdetero (Valdetero, Jena)
July 15, 2016 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar by Ross Michael Zambon (Zambon, Ross)
July 15, 2016 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar by Nicholas Heath Wooten (Wooten, Nicholas)
July 15, 2016 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The uncontested motion for leave to file additional appearances #34 is granted. Counsel are directed to file their appearances as separate docket entries in accordance with Local Rule 83.16. Mailed notice (air, )
July 14, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen T. Sotelo for presentment of motion for leave to file #34 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 7/20/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Sotelo, Stephen)
July 14, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar for leave to file Additional Appearances of Trial Bar Attorneys Pursuant to LR 83.17 (UNCONTESTED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Additional Appearances)(Sotelo, Stephen)
July 1, 2016 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez:On the Court's own motion, the status hearing set for 7/19/2016 is hereby stricken and no appearance is required. Mailed notice (lp, )
July 1, 2016 Filing 32 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 7/1/2016:Mailed notice(lp, )
June 30, 2016 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2016. Parties' Agreed Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order and to Extend the Deadline to Complete Fact Discovery #29 is granted in part and denied in part as stated in open court. The deadline for fact discovery is extended to 11/1/2016. Status Hearing is set for 8/11/2016 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (lp, )
June 17, 2016 Filing 30 AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of motion for protective order #29 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 6/30/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
June 17, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for protective order and to extend deadline to complete fact discovery (AGREED) (Vathis, Maria)
February 25, 2016 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 2/25/2016. At the request of the parties, with agreement of the Court, status hearing is set for 7/19/2016 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (lp, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 27 AMENDED Affirmative Defenses by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (Vathis, Maria)
February 24, 2016 Filing 26 AMENDED Affirmative Defenses by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Vathis, Maria)
February 1, 2016 Filing 25 AGREED Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses and Leave to Amend Affirmative Defenses. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 2/1/2016:Mailed notice(air, )
January 26, 2016 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Magistrate Judge status hearing held on 1/26/16 and continued to 2/25/16. As stated in open Court, all fact discovery is to be completed by August 1, 2016. Parties will advise the Court of any expert discovery. Parties were also advised to continue settlement negotiations. Mailed notice (lp, )
January 14, 2016 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Initial status hearing is set before Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez on January 26, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 1041. Parties shall deliver a copy of an initial status report, to Judge Valdezs Courtroom Deputy, Lisa Provine, Room 1036, four business days before the initial status hearing. The parties must follow the format for an Initial Status Report found on the Judge's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, or the parties can contact courtroom deputy, Lisa Provine, at (312)408-5135 for a copy. If the parties have recently prepared and filed an initial status report, the submission of the previously filed initial status report is sufficient. Mailed notice (lp, )
January 14, 2016 Filing 22 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Maria Valdez for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery scheduling and supervision and any possible settlement conference. (air, )Mailed notice.
January 14, 2016 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status hearing held. Parties are to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 1/28/16. Plaintiff's motion to strike defendants' affirmative defenses #19 is taken under advisement. Defendants' response to the motion is due by 2/4/16. Plaintiff's reply is due by 2/18/16. The notice of presentment date of 1/26/16 is terminated. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Valdez for discovery scheduling and supervision and any settlement conference the parties may wish to conduct. Mailed notice (air, )
January 13, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen T. Sotelo for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief, #19 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/26/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Sotelo, Stephen)
January 13, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to strike answer to complaint #16 , answer to complaint #15 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses (Sotelo, Stephen)
January 7, 2016 Filing 18 STATUS Report Jointly Filed by Nirav Thakkar (Sotelo, Stephen)
December 28, 2015 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The initial status conference in this matter is set for 1/14/16 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Tharp's web site, which may be accessed at [www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judges] and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/7/16. Mailed notice (air, )
December 23, 2015 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (Vathis, Maria)
December 23, 2015 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(Vathis, Maria)
November 25, 2015 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The uncontested motion for an extension #12 is granted. The defendants have until 12/23/15 to respond to the complaint. No appearance on this motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
November 24, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/1/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
November 24, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time (Vathis, Maria)
November 10, 2015 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (Vathis, Maria)
November 10, 2015 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Vathis, Maria)
November 9, 2015 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar by Stephen T. Sotelo (Sotelo, Stephen)
November 9, 2015 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record via email. (sxn, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The uncontested motion for an extension of time to answer #5 is granted. The defendants must answer by 12/1/15. No appearance on this motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of extension of time #5 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/17/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Vathis, Maria)
November 9, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time (Vathis, Maria)
November 6, 2015 Filing 4 Consent to Removal by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (Vathis, Maria)
November 6, 2015 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Maria Zoee Vathis (Vathis, Maria)
November 6, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vathis, Maria)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Will County, case number (15 L 713) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11273340. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vathis, Maria)
November 6, 2015 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (mgh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thakkar v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Baxol Properties, LLC
Represented By: Denean K. Sturino
Represented By: Katherine Decker
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Laudan Properties, LLC
Represented By: Jason Edward Hunter
Represented By: Steven Walter Mastrantonio
Represented By: Kathrin Mary Deutschle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Dominic Bono
Represented By: Forrest R Hansen
Represented By: Katharine Flynn Lessaris
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Represented By: Jena M. Valdetero
Represented By: Maria Zoee Vathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Altisource Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katharine Flynn Lessaris
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Represented By: Jena M. Valdetero
Represented By: Maria Zoee Vathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Green Group Corp.
Represented By: Nathan Pear Karlsgodt
Represented By: Stanley A. Kitzinger
Represented By: Joanne M Krol
Represented By: Cornelius Edward McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nirav Thakkar
Represented By: Nick Heath Wooten
Represented By: Rusty A. Payton
Represented By: Stephen Sotelo
Represented By: Ross Michael Zambon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?