Wheeler v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Wheeler
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv11152
Filed: December 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/26/2020. The Court grants in part and denies in part Wheeler's Motion for Summary Judgment 165 . The Court denies Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment [ 163] and dismisses Defendants' Motion to bar Goldsmith 160 as moot. The Court concludes that Wheeler has standing and that he has established that MCM violated the FDCPA. Consistent with this Opinion, the case will proceed to trial on damages and on whether Midland Funding and Encore may be held liable. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/24/2018. Plaintiff Wheeler's Renewed Motion for Class Certification 62 is granted. Mailed notice(lk, )
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/31/2017. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 44 is denied. Mailed notice(lk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wheeler
Represented By: Michelle A. Alyea
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Cassandra P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Todd A Gale
Represented By: Heather L. Kramer
Represented By: Theodore Wilson Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A Gale
Represented By: Heather L. Kramer
Represented By: Theodore Wilson Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A Gale
Represented By: Heather L. Kramer
Represented By: Theodore Wilson Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?