Bradford et al v. City of Chicago, a municipal corporation et al
Plaintiff: Linda Bradford
Defendant: City Of Chicago, Phyllis Gill, John Otto and Darius West
Case Number: 1:2016cv01663
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court acknowledges the unfortunate nature of the events in this case and empathizes with Bradford's family over the loss of Bradford's life. But even construing the facts and all reasonable inferences in Pl aintiffs' favor, there is no evidence to support that those events are legally attributable to Defendants' actions (or inaction). Accordingly, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in full, R. 198 , and this civil case is terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/31/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Defendants' motion to the extent it seeks to bifurcate and stay Plaintiff's Monell claim and the expert discovery on that claim, and enter the Limited Consent. R. 175 . The Court denies Defendants' motion as moot to the extent it seeks to stay fact discovery on the Monell claim. R. 175 Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/16/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the forgoing reasons, the City's motion to dismiss, 56 , is denied. The parties are to appear to discuss a reasonable discovery schedule on the Monell claim at the status hearing set for 5/31/2017 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/15/2017:Mailed notice(srn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford et al v. City of Chicago, a municipal corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bradford
Represented By: Victor P. Henderson
Represented By: Rebecca Rejeanne Kaiser
Represented By: Vivian Therese Tarver-Varnado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Represented By: Jonathan Clark Green
Represented By: Tiffany Yvette Harris
Represented By: Bret Anthony Kabacinski
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Gill
Represented By: Tiffany Yvette Harris
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Otto
Represented By: Tiffany Yvette Harris
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darius West
Represented By: Tiffany Yvette Harris
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?