Andersen v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Andersen
Defendant: The City of Chicago, James Bednarkiewicz, Richard Bedran, Craig Cegielski, Dan Fitzgerald, John Herman, James Higgins, Daniel McWeeny, Ted Melko, Paul Nielsen, John Olson, L. Pawlowski, N. Rajewski, Michael Riley, Richard Rochowicz and Unknown Employees of the City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2016cv01963
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 674 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/14/2020. Defendants combined motion both moving for reconsideration of the exclusion of Dr. Krane's testimony and arguing that he may testify as to the general topic of uncertainty 660 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' motion to reconsider the exclusion of Dr. Krane's testimony is denied. Consistent with this Opinion and the June 16, 2020 Order, Dr. Krane may testify in a limited capacity on the general topic of uncertainty in interpreting partial DNA profiles with an unknown number of contributors. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 656 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/16/2020. Andersen's Motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Krane 392 is granted. Andersen's Motion to exclude Dr. Krane's undisclosed opinions 449 is dismissed as moot. Defendants are granted leave to file a limited supplemental brief, consistent with this Opinion, within 14 days of the filing of this Opinion. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 651 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/14/2020. Defendants' Motion to exclude Brzeczek's testimony 389 is granted. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 649 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/13/2020. Andersen's motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Warren 392 is granted in part and denied in part. Andersen's motion to exclude Dr. Warren's undisclosed opinions 449 is also granted in part and denied in part. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/26/2019. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 327 is granted in part and denied in part. The Court grants Summary Judgment for Defendants on Count III because An dersen has failed to establish a genuine dispute of material fact as to whether evidence was destroyed in bad faith. Summary judgment is otherwise denied. Defendants Rajewski and Pawlowski are dismissed as Defendants in this case. Trial will proceed against all other Defendants on the counts that remain. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani on 2/4/2019. Mailed notice(lxs, )
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/14/2016. City of Chicago's Motion to bifurcate and stay discovery on Andersen's Monell claim 74 is granted. Mailed notice(lk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andersen v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Roshna Bala Keen
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Joshua Alan Tepfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bednarkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Bedran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Cegielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel McWeeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Melko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Pawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Rajewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rochowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees of the City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?