Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP d/b/a HBI International
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC and Republic Tobacco L.P.
Defendant: BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP d/b/a HBI International
Case Number: 1:2016cv03401
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 889 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached order, Republic's renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law, R. 819 , is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/29/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 887 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached order, HBI's motion to amend, R. 788 , as well as its supplemental motion, R. 822 , are denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/24/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 845 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached order, the Court grants in part and denies in part Republic's motion for sanctions, R. 816 . The motion is denied with respect to Republic's request for dismissal of HBI& #039;s counterclaims and a criminal referral to the United States Attorney's Office. The motion is granted with respect to Republic's attorney's fees and costs, to be paid by Mr. Kesselman. The parties shall follow Local Rule 54.3 rela ting to the amount of attorney's fees to be paid to Republic. By February 17, 2022, the parties are to submit their positions as to the availability of a monetary fine as an additional sanction. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/18/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 820 MOTION by Defendant BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP, Counter Claimant BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP for judgment BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP d/b/a HBI International's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Becker, David)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 793 MOTION by Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco L.P. for judgment Republic's Rule 50(a) Motion (Roeser, Peter)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 781 MOTION by Defendant BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP, Counter Claimant BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP for judgment BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP d/b/a HBI International's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Becker, David)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 709 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani on 1/14/2020. Mailed notice(lxs, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 11/20/2018. Mailed notice. (jj, )
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 9/27/2017. Mailed notice. (jj, )
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/7/2017. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/18/2017. (bg, )
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/26/2016. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/7/2016. Mailed notice (jdh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP d/b/a HBI International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC
Represented By: Andrew Starwalt Fraker
Represented By: Antony Joseph McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Tobacco L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Starwalt Fraker
Represented By: Antony Joseph McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBK Tobacco & Foods, LLP d/b/a HBI International
Represented By: William Gary Schur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?