Coulas Viking Partners v. The Belt Railway Company of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Coulas Viking Partners
Defendant: The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, Ingredion Incorporated and Corn Products Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv03583
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2016 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/5/16 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, Tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2017. (Mccullough, Tracey)
July 20, 2016 Filing 42 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 7/19/2016 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (lf, )
July 19, 2016 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/19/2016:Mailed notice(rth, )
July 19, 2016 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's motion for remand is granted #21 and this case is remanded forthwith to the Circuit Court of Cook County. Ingredion's motion to dismiss #5 and Belt Railway's motion for judgment on the pleadings #20 are accordingly stricken as moot. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (rth, )
June 28, 2016 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 6/28/2016. Oral argument held on defendants' motions to dismiss #5 #20 and plaintiff's motion to remand #21 . Said motions are taken under advisement. Additional dates, as necessary will be set forth in the ruling.Mailed notice (rth, )
June 22, 2016 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: With respect to the oral argument set for 6/28/2016, each side will be permitted ten minutes for argument with the defendants presenting first. The defendants may allocate their time between themselves as they see fit. Both sides will be permitted to provide brief rebuttal arguments. The parties are encouraged to focus their arguments on the procedural validity of the attempted removal and on the existence of subject matter jurisdiction. Mailed notice (rth, )
June 21, 2016 Filing 37 SUPPLEMENT to response in opposition to motion, #27 Notice of Supplemental Factual Development (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June 7 Order)(Perry, Rodney)
June 6, 2016 Filing 36 RESPONSE by The Belt Railway Company of Chicagoin Support of MOTION by Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION by Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago for judgment on the pleadings #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities)(Matyas, Thomas)
June 6, 2016 Filing 35 REPLY by Ingredion Incorporated to memorandum in support of motion #6 , Response #25 (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authority that is only published on electronic databases)(Perry, Rodney)
June 6, 2016 Filing 34 REPLY by Coulas Viking Partners to memorandum in opposition to motion #28 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Authorities)(McIlwee, John)
June 6, 2016 Filing 33 REPLY by Coulas Viking Partners to response in opposition to motion, #27 And In Further Support of Viking Partners' Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Authorities)(McIlwee, John)
June 6, 2016 Filing 32 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Ingredion Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-5, #3 Exhibit 6 (part 1 of 14), #4 Exhibit 6 (part 2 of 14), #5 Exhibit 6 (part 3 of 14), #6 Exhibit 6 (part 4 of 14), #7 Exhibit 6 (part 5 of 14), #8 Exhibit 6 (part 6 of 14), #9 Exhibit 6 (part 7 of 14), #10 Exhibit 6 (part 8 of 14), #11 Exhibit 6 (part 9 of 14), #12 Exhibit 6 (part 10 of 14), #13 Exhibit 6 (part 11 of 14), #14 Exhibit 6 (part 12 of 14), #15 Exhibit 6 (part 13 of 14), #16 Exhibit 6 (part 14 of 14), #17 Exhibit 7-9)(Cole, Donald)
May 31, 2016 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Ingredion Inc.'s motion to seal Exhibit B to Response to Motion to Remand #29 is granted. No appearance required on 6/1/2016. Mailed notice (rth, )
May 23, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Rodney Perry for presentment of motion to seal document #29 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/1/2016 at 08:45 AM. (Perry, Rodney)
May 23, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendant Ingredion Incorporated to seal document Exhibit B to Response to Motion to Remand (Perry, Rodney)
May 23, 2016 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago in Opposition to motion to remand #21 (Matyas, Thomas)
May 23, 2016 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Ingredion Incorporatedin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners to remand #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Appendix Cited cases available only electronically)(Perry, Rodney)
May 23, 2016 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago (Matyas, Thomas)
May 23, 2016 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McIlwee, John)
April 25, 2016 Filing 24 CORRECTED Consent to Removal by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago (Matyas, Thomas)
April 25, 2016 Filing 23 Consent to Removal by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago (Fliegel, Joshua)
April 22, 2016 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Coulas Viking Partners in support of motion to remand #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1 of 3, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2 of 3, #5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3 of 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(McIlwee, John)
April 22, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners to remand (McIlwee, John)
April 15, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION by Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago for judgment on the pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dircks, Rebecca)
April 7, 2016 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ingredion Incorporated (Cole, Donald)
April 5, 2016 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 4/5/2016. Defendant Belt Railway's motion to join in defendant's motion to dismiss shall be filed by 4/15/2016. Plaintiff's motion for remand shall be filed by 4/25/2016. As to all said motions; Responses due by 5/23/2016. Replies due by 6/6/2016. Oral Argument set for 6/28/2016 at 10:30 AM. The court will set out parameters of the argument in a later minute entry. Application by Meryl Lori Macklin for leave to appear pro hac vice #10 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
April 4, 2016 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago by Thomas Ivan Matyas (Matyas, Thomas)
April 4, 2016 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago by Joshua Michael Fliegel (Fliegel, Joshua)
April 4, 2016 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago by Rebecca L Dircks (Dircks, Rebecca)
April 1, 2016 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners by John Conlaeth McIlwee (McIlwee, John)
April 1, 2016 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners by John Michael Touhy (Touhy, John)
March 30, 2016 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 400.00, receipt no. 0752-11754655, (Cole, Donald)
March 29, 2016 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners by Joseph Nevi Hosteny, III (Hosteny, Joseph)
March 25, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11758481. (Macklin, Meryl)
March 25, 2016 Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sj, )
March 25, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Rodney Perry for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #5 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/5/2016 at 08:45 AM. (Perry, Rodney)
March 25, 2016 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. (ags, )
March 24, 2016 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Ingredion Incorporated in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Rodney)
March 24, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Perry, Rodney)
March 24, 2016 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ingredion Incorporated by Rodney Perry (Perry, Rodney)
March 24, 2016 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ingredion Incorporated by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald)
March 24, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cole, Donald)
March 24, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (13-ch-28409) filed by Ingredion Incorporated 2d Amended Compl (Ex A); State Court Record (Ex B); Motion to Intervene (Ex C); Order Granting Intervention (Ex D); Notice of Filing (Ex E) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B(1)(a-b), #3 Exhibit B(1)(c), #4 Exhibit B(1)(d), #5 Exhibit B(1)(e-f), #6 Exhibit B(1)(f)(a), #7 Exhibit B(1)(f)(b), #8 Exhibit B(1)(g), #9 Exhibit B(1)(h)(part 1), #10 Exhibit B(1)(h)(part 2), #11 Exhibit B(1)(i), #12 Exhibit B(2)-(8), #13 Exhibit C, #14 Exhibit D, #15 Exhibit E)(Cole, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulas Viking Partners v. The Belt Railway Company of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Belt Railway Company of Chicago
Represented By: Joshua Michael Fliegel
Represented By: Rebecca L Dircks
Represented By: Thomas Ivan Matyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingredion Incorporated
Represented By: Meryl M Macklin
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Represented By: Donald Alexander Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corn Products Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Meryl M Macklin
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Represented By: Donald Alexander Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coulas Viking Partners
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: Joseph Nevi Hosteny, III
Represented By: John Michael Touhy
Represented By: Katharine Heitman Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?