Ratner v. McNerney et al
Plaintiff: Ratner and Jason Ratner
Defendant: McNerney, James W. McNerney, Jr., Dennis A. Muilenburg, Gregory D. Smith, David L. Calhoun, Arthur D. Collins, Jr., Linda Z. Cook, Kenneth M. Duberstein, Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr., Lynn J. Good, Lawrence W. Kellner, Edward M. Liddy, Susan C. Schwab, Ronald A. Williams, Mike S. Zafirovski and The Boeing Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv03589
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2016 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #30 , this case is dismissed without prejudice, with all parties to bear their own costs and fees. The 6/2/2016 status hearing is vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 9, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jason Ratner Without Prejudice (Fistel, Michael)
May 8, 2016 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 6/2/2016 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
April 29, 2016 Filing 28 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 50.00, receipt no. 0752-11846699, (Fistel, Michael)
April 28, 2016 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jason Ratner by Michael I. Fistel, Jr (Fistel, Michael)
April 26, 2016 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jason Ratner by Michael I. Fistel, Jr (Fistel, Michael)
April 26, 2016 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The application of Michael Fistel to appear pro hac vice #24 is granted. Counsel is directed to promptly contact the Clerk of Court to establish an e-filing account in this district if he has not already done so. (mk)
April 20, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11846926. (Fistel, Michael)
April 20, 2016 Filing 23 Notice of Motion for Michael Fistel, Jr.'s Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice NOTICE of Motion by Lori Ann Fanning for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/3/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Fanning, Lori)
April 20, 2016 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Boeing Co.'s agreed motion for extension of time #20 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 6/6/2016. (mk)
April 18, 2016 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Frederick William Watson (Watson, Frederick)
April 18, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 -- Agreed (Rabinovitz, Joshua)
April 18, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Z Rabinovitz for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Rabinovitz, Joshua)
April 11, 2016 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. James W. McNerney, Jr waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Susan C. Schwab waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Ronald A. Williams waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Mike S. Zafirovski waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Lawrence W. Kellner waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Lynn J. Good waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Linda Z. Cook waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Kenneth M. Duberstein waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Gregory D. Smith waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Edward M. Liddy waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Dennis A. Muilenburg waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. David L. Calhoun waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Ratner. Arthur D. Collins, Jr waiver sent on 4/7/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Ratner as to The Boeing Company on 3/31/2016, answer due 4/21/2016. (Miller, Marvin)
March 25, 2016 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants David L. Calhoun, Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Linda Z. Cook, Kenneth M. Duberstein, Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr, Lynn J. Good, Lawrence W. Kellner, Edward M. Liddy, James W. McNerney, Jr, Dennis A. Muilenburg, Susan C. Schwab, Gregory D. Smith, The Boeing Company, Ronald A. Williams, Mike S. Zafirovski (pg, )
March 25, 2016 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (ags, )
March 24, 2016 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jason Ratner by Lori Ann Fanning (Fanning, Lori)
March 24, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fanning, Lori)
March 24, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jason Ratner; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11755043. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Verification)(Fanning, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratner v. McNerney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ratner
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Lori Ann Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. McNerney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis A. Muilenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur D. Collins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Z. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M. Duberstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund P. Giambastiani, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn J. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence W. Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike S. Zafirovski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Represented By: Frederick William Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?