Walls v. VRE Chicago Eleven, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Raymond L. Walls and Terryll Ann Walls
Defendant: VRE Chicago Eleven, LLC, Verdad Real Estate, Inc., EXP Realty Advisors, Inc. and Tartan Realty Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv04048
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Durkin
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants VPC Chicago11, LLC, Vestapoint Capital II LLC, and Aaron Stearn's motion to dismiss is granted. 218 Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/25/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion for reconsideration 210 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/1/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendants Baker Monroe PLLC, Chris Baker, and Justin Huston's motion to dismiss 94 is denied; Defendants VPC Chicago 11, LLC, Vestapoint Capital I LLC, and Aaron Stearn's motion to dismiss is granted 129 . Third-Party Defendants DTZ Americas, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., and Matthew McNeill's motion to dismiss 150 is denied; Defendant Matt Langfield's motion to dismiss 152 is granted; Third-Party Defendants Mark A. Reinsch, P.A ., and Mark A. Reinsch's motion to dismiss 166 is granted.If Verdad believes it can cure the deficiencies identified here, it may file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint on or before October 16, 2018. The motion should attach a redlined comparison between the current third-party complaint and the proposed amended complaint, and it should be supported by a brief of no more than five pages describing how the proposed amended complaint cures the deficiencies in the current third-party complaint. Reinsch is not to respond unless ordered to do so by the Court. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/25/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motions to dismiss 22 29 are denied. Status hearing set for 10/7/2016 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/29/2016:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. VRE Chicago Eleven, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond L. Walls
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Hardy
Represented By: Sharon Doherty Sirott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terryll Ann Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VRE Chicago Eleven, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verdad Real Estate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXP Realty Advisors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tartan Realty Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?