In Re: 100% Grated Parmesan Cheese Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Plaintiff: Barbara Reinbott, Alfonso Fata, Alyson Davies, Catherine Higens, Nevina Saitta, John Lewis, Michael Hara, Debra Jackson, Robert Demario, Kristie Perkins, Jenelle Craggette, Michael Chmielewski, Sheldon Spector, Joseph Landara, Michael Jones, Yvonne Averhart, Melissa Leigh Randolph, Kenneth Manfredi, Derrick Sims, Rodney Zachary, Patty Morelos, Sheila Garland, George Brahler, Nancy Reeves, Ann Yankee, Becky Sikes, Rosemary Quinn, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Taniesha Harwell, Eric Tamayo, Ryan Schmidt, Debra Lee, Chrissy Sellers, Ronald Saitta, Marc Moschetta, Russell Levy, Michael Greene, Kiara Cruz, Carmen Pellitteri, Samantha Lewin, Chauncy Ellison, Alan Ducorsky, Jeffrey Dowdy, Cindy Bustamante, Ann Bell, Charlene Agles, Veronica Sutton, Michael Wills, Richard Evans, Britney Cooper, Elizabeth Bidgood, Karen Ford, Beverly Schulze, Fiona Lynch, Jeanette Costoso, Andrea Hogan, Rita Schmoll, Andrew Matecki, Camilla DeMario, Rhonda Lorenz, Nena Simon, Larry Tucker, Phyliss Lynn, Michael Campana, Erin Rudder, Carl Nitz, Dan Lang, Charles Bundy, Michelle Walker, Dallas Moreno, Tara Franklin, Renita Myers, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Adam Weiss, Janine Hechmer, Efrain Ruiz, Jason Martin and Jose Brown
Defendant: 100% Grated Parmesan Cheese Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Kraft Heinz Company, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Target Corporation, Supervalu, Inc., Albertsons, LLC, Albertson Companies, Inc, ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East
Amicus Curiae: Competitive Enterprise Institute Center for Class Action Fairness
In Re: In Re: 100% Grated Parmesan Cheese Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Case Number: 1:2016cv05802
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 368 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
June 26, 2019 Filing 367 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request, the status hearing set for 7/30/2019 #366 is stricken and re-set for 8/7/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 366 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #364 is granted. The deadline for filing a class certification motion is extended to 9/30/2019; responses due by 11/14/2019; replies due by 12/16/2019. Motion hearing set for 6/20/2019 #365 is stricken.The status hearing set for 7/9/2019 #360 is stricken and re-set for 7/30/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 365 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of extension of time, #364 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Barnow, Ben)
June 17, 2019 Filing 364 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills for extension of time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Barnow, Ben)
May 31, 2019 Filing 363 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #361 is granted. Attorney Kenneth Kiyul Lee is terminated as counsel for Defendant Kraft Heinz Company. Motion hearing set for 6/4/2019 #362 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 362 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth Kiyul Lee for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #361 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/4/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lee, Kenneth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 361 MOTION by Attorney Kenneth K. Lee to withdraw as attorney for Kraft Heinz Company. No party information provided (Lee, Kenneth)
May 29, 2019 Filing 360 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/9/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 359 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 a.m. #351 is re-set for 10:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 358 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER PROTECTING PRIVILEGE. Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/14/2019. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 357 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Protecting Privilege (Citera, Francis)
April 23, 2019 Filing 356 NOTICE by M. Frank Bednarz of Change of Address (Bednarz, M.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 355 PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/15/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 354 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for protective order #352 is granted. Enter agreed confidentiality order. Motion hearing set for 4/18/2019 #353 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 353 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of motion for protective order,, #352 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Barnow, Ben)
April 11, 2019 Filing 352 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary for protective order Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order, #2 Exhibit B: Redlined Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order)(Barnow, Ben)
April 5, 2019 Filing 351 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request, the status hearing set for 4/11/2019 #341 is stricken and re-set for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 350 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
March 27, 2019 Filing 349 Stipulated order for producing documents and ESI Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/27/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 348 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiffs motion to withdraw appearance of Andrea Clisura #346 is granted. Attorney Andrea Clisura is terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Elizabeth Bidgood, and Janine Hechmer. Motion hearing set for 03/26/2019 #347 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 347 NOTICE of Motion by Courtney Maccarone for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #346 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/26/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Maccarone, Courtney)
March 21, 2019 Filing 346 MOTION by Attorney Andrea Clisura to withdraw as attorney for Ann Bell, Elizabeth Bidgood, Janine Hechmer. No party information provided (Maccarone, Courtney)
March 19, 2019 Filing 345 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Elizabeth Bidgood, Janine Hechmer by Courtney Maccarone (Maccarone, Courtney)
March 15, 2019 Filing 344 STIPULATION Stipulation for Producing Documents and ESI (Blood, Timothy)
March 14, 2019 Filing 343 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #342 is granted.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 342 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15557514. (Maccarone, Courtney)
February 19, 2019 Filing 341 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 4/11/2019 at 2:00 p.m. The parties reported on the progress of discovery. Oral argument held on the pending motions, which are taken under advisement. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 340 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 2/19/2019 at 10:15 a.m. #337 is re-set for 10:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. The court will have questions regarding the pending motions.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 339 REPLY by Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. to motion for partial summary judgment, #309 REPLY MEMORANDUM BY ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ALBERTSONS LLC, AND SUPERVALU, INC. IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Collins, Joseph)
February 7, 2019 Filing 338 REPLY by Kraft Heinz Company to response in opposition to motion, #335 / Reply in Support of Defendant Kraft Heinz Company's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Panos, Dean)
January 30, 2019 Filing 337 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request, the status hearing set for 2/14/2019 #330 is stricken and re-set for 2/19/2019 at 10:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 336 RESPONSE by Ann Bell, Dan Lang, Michael Willsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Supervalu, Inc., Albertsons, LLC, Albertson Companies, Inc for partial summary judgment MOTION BY ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ALBERTSONS LLC, AND SUPERVALU, INC. FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #309 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts)(Barnow, Ben)
January 24, 2019 Filing 335 RESPONSE by Ann Bell, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Rosemary Quinn, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Adam Weiss, Michael Willsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company for judgment on the pleadings #314 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Kraft Heinz Company's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Blood, Timothy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 334 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages #332 is granted. Plaintiff is given leave to file a twenty-one page memorandum in opposition to Defendant Kraft Heinz Company's motion for judgment on the pleadings. Motion hearing set for 1/28/2019 #333 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 333 Notice of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Local Rule 7.1 Page Limit NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Gordon Blood for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #332 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/28/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Blood, Timothy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 332 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Rosemary Quinn, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills for leave to file excess pages Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Local Rule 7.1 Page Limit (Blood, Timothy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 331 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By agreement, the briefing schedule on Defendant Supervalu/Albertson's motion for judgment on the pleadings #309 shall be the same as the briefing schedule #330 on Defendant Kraft's motion for judgment on the pleadings #314 .Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 330 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #328 is granted. The time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant Kraft's motion for judgment on the pleadings #314 is extended to 1/24/2019; reply due by 2/7/2019. Motion hearing set for 1/22/2019 #329 is stricken. The status hearing set for 2/5/2019 #314 is stricken and re-set for 2/14/2019 at 2:00 p.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 329 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Gordon Blood for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #328 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Blood, Timothy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 328 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Rosemary Quinn, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills for extension of time to file response/reply as to order on motion for partial summary judgment,,, order on motion for judgment on the pleadings,,, motion hearing,,, terminate hearings,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,, #320 , motion for judgment on the pleadings #314 Unopposed (Blood, Timothy)
January 7, 2019 Filing 327 REPLY by Ann Bell, Alfonso Fata, Carmen Pellitteri, Nancy Reeves, Erin Rudder, Rodney Zachary to response in opposition to motion, #324 , response in opposition to motion, #325 (Barnow, Ben)
January 3, 2019 Filing 326 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
December 21, 2018 Filing 325 RESPONSE by ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporationin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alfonso Fata, Carmen Pellitteri, Nancy Reeves, Erin Rudder, Rodney Zachary for leave to file Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaints Against Publix and Target/ICCO #306 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Glikin, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Filing 324 RESPONSE by Publix Super Markets, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alfonso Fata, Carmen Pellitteri, Nancy Reeves, Erin Rudder, Rodney Zachary for leave to file Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaints Against Publix and Target/ICCO #306 OPPOSITION BY PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Collins, Joseph)
December 21, 2018 Filing 323 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Defendants' extension motion #321 is granted. The time for Defendants to serve their respective ESI protocols to Plaintiffs is extended to 1/14/2019. The 1/7/2019 motion hearing #322 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 322 NOTICE of Motion by Dean Nicholas Panos for presentment of extension of time #321 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Panos, Dean)
December 20, 2018 Filing 321 MOTION by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company for extension of time / Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Provide ESI Protocol (Panos, Dean)
December 12, 2018 Filing 320 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing held. Defendants Supervalu/Albertsons' motion for partial summary judgment #309 and Defendant Kraft Heinz's motion for judgment on the pleadings #314 are entered and continued. Plaintiffs' responses shall be filed by 1/17/2019; replies due by 01/31/2019. The 1/10/2019 status hearing is stricken and reset to 2/05/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice (mw, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 319 ANSWER to amended complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(Citera, Francis)
December 10, 2018 Filing 318 ANSWER to amended complaint by ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc.(Glikin, Joshua)
December 7, 2018 Filing 317 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request, hearing on Defendants' motion for partial judgment on the pleadings and partial summary judgment #309 set for 12/11/2018 #310 is stricken and re-set for 12/12/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 316 MEMORANDUM by Kraft Heinz Company in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings #314 (Panos, Dean)
December 7, 2018 Filing 315 NOTICE of Motion by Dean Nicholas Panos for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings #314 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/12/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Panos, Dean)
December 7, 2018 Filing 314 MOTION by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company for judgment on the pleadings (Panos, Dean)
December 7, 2018 Filing 313 ANSWER to amended complaint by Kraft Heinz Company(Panos, Dean)
December 6, 2018 Filing 312 RULE 56 LOCAL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS BY DEFENDANTS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ALBERTSONS LLC, AND SUPERVALU, INC. IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Statement by Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. regarding motion for partial summary judgment, #309 (Collins, Joseph)
December 6, 2018 Filing 311 MEMORANDUM by Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. in support of motion for partial summary judgment, #309 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Collins, Joseph)
December 6, 2018 Filing 310 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Edward Collins for presentment of motion for partial summary judgment, #309 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Collins, Joseph)
December 6, 2018 Filing 309 MOTION by Defendants Supervalu, Inc., Albertsons, LLC, Albertson Companies, Inc for partial summary judgment MOTION BY ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ALBERTSONS LLC, AND SUPERVALU, INC. FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Collins, Joseph)
November 28, 2018 Filing 308 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/10/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file second amended class action complaints against Defendants Publix, Target, and ICCO #306 is entered and continued. Response(s) due by 12/21/2018; reply due by 1/7/2019. The 12/5/2018 motion hearing #307 is stricken. The remaining defendants shall answer the surviving portions of the operative complaints by 12/10/2018. The parties shall provide their proposed ESI Protocols by 12/20/2018. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served 1/7/2019. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification shall be filed by 6/30/2019; responses due by 8/14/2019; replies due by 9/13/2019. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the next status hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 307 NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of motion for leave to file, #306 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/5/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Barnow, Ben)
November 28, 2018 Filing 306 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alfonso Fata, Carmen Pellitteri, Nancy Reeves, Erin Rudder, Rodney Zachary for leave to file Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaints Against Publix and Target/ICCO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Complaint Against Publix, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Second Amended Complaint Against Target/ICCO)(Barnow, Ben)
November 27, 2018 Filing 305 ANSWER to amended complaint , ANSWER to amended complaint by Supervalu, Inc.(Hansen, Gary)
November 27, 2018 Filing 304 ANSWER to amended complaint , ANSWER to amended complaint by Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC(Hansen, Gary)
November 20, 2018 Filing 303 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 11/28/2018 at 9:15 a.m. #298 is re-set for 9:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 302 STATUS Report (Joint Proposed Schedule on Discovery and Dispositive Motions) by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
November 13, 2018 Filing 301 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #299 is granted. Attorney Theodore Bell is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff Janine Hechmer and Elizabeth Bidgood. Motion hearing set for 11/15/2018 #300 is stricken. The Clerk is directed to terminate Attorney Bell in No. 16 C 2687 as well.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 300 NOTICE of Motion by Carl V. Malmstrom for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #299 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/15/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Malmstrom, Carl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 299 MOTION by Attorney Theodore B. Bell to withdraw as attorney for Elizabeth Bidgood, Janine Hechmer. No party information provided (Malmstrom, Carl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 298 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request, status hearing set for 11/15/2018 #294 is stricken and re-set for 11/28/2018 at 9:15 a.m. The parties shall file a joint status report with a proposed discovery and dispositive motion schedule by 11/19/2018. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 297 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/1/2018.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 296 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant Target/ICCO's motion to dismiss #237 and Defendant Publix Super Markets's motion to dismiss #246 are granted, and Defendant Wal-Mart's motion to dismiss #238 , Defendant Supervalu/Albertson's motion to dismiss #243 , and Defendant Kraft Heinz's motion to dismiss #249 are granted in part and denied in part. The 100% claims are dismissed in their entirety, as are all Anticaking claims against Target/ICCO and all Anticaking claims under Alabama law against Albertsons. The Anticaking claims under the ADTPA, CLRA, UCL, FDUTPA, MUTPA, MDTPA, MFSAA, MPCFA, NJCFA, and NYGBL are dismissed as well. The Anticaking claims under Connecticut, Michigan, and New York express warranty law are dismissed, as are the Anticaking claims against Kraft and SuperValu under Illinois express warranty law. The Anticaking claims against SuperValu under Alabama and Illinois implied warranty law are also dismissed. Plaintiffs may proceed on their Anticaking claims against Kraft under the CUTPA, ICFA, and MCFA, and against Albertsons/SuperValu under the ICFA. They may proceed with their Anticaking express warranty claims against Kraft under Alabama, California, Florida, and Minnesota law; against Albertsons under Illinois law; against SuperValu under Alabama law; and against Wal-Mart/ICCO under Alabama, California, Florida, Minnesota, and New Jersey law. They may proceed with their Anticaking implied warranty claims against Kraft under California, Connecticut, Michigan, and Minnesota law; against Albertsons under Illinois law; and against Wal-Mart/ICCO under Alabama, California, Florida, New Jersey, New York, and Minnesota law. Finally, Plaintiffs may proceed with their Anticaking unjust enrichment claims against Kraft, Albertsons/SuperValu, and Wal-Mart/ICCO, except for the claims against Albertsons under Alabama law. The Clerk is directed to terminate Publix Super Markets, Inc. and Target Corporation as party defendants. The remaining defendants shall answer the surviving portions of the operative complaints by 11/28/2018.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 295 NOTICE by Carl V. Malmstrom of Change of Address (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 18, 2018 Filing 294 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 11/15/2018 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint status report with a proposed discovery and dispositive motion schedule by 11/5/2018. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 293 NOTICE by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary of filing Quarterly Report (Barnow, Ben)
September 21, 2018 Filing 292 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 9/24/2018 #289 is stricken and re-set for 10/18/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 291 NOTICE by Janine L Pollack of Change of Address Firm, Telephone Number and Email Address (Pollack, Janine)
September 5, 2018 Filing 290 NOTICE by Andrea Clisura of Change of Address (Clisura, Andrea)
August 23, 2018 Filing 289 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 8/27/2018 #285 is stricken and re-set for 9/24/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 288 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #286 is granted. Attorney Michael Meredith is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff George Brahler. Motion hearing set for 9/12/2018 #287 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 287 NOTICE of Motion by Cari C Laufenberg for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #286 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/12/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Laufenberg, Cari)
August 16, 2018 Filing 286 MOTION by Attorney Michael Meredith to withdraw as attorney for George Brahler. No party information provided (Laufenberg, Cari)
July 13, 2018 Filing 285 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties, status hearing set for 8/13/2018 #284 is stricken and re-set for 8/27/2018 at 10:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 11, 2018 Filing 284 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/16/2018 #279 is stricken and re-set for 8/13/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 3, 2018 Filing 283 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
June 12, 2018 Filing 282 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #280 is granted. Attorney Maebetty Kirby terminated as counsel for Plaintiff Dan Lang. Motion hearing set for 6/21/2018 #281 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 11, 2018 Filing 281 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #280 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/21/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
June 11, 2018 Filing 280 MOTION by Attorney Maebetty Kirby to withdraw as attorney for Dan Lang. No party information provided (Zimmerman, Thomas)
June 1, 2018 Filing 279 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties, status hearing set for 7/12/2018 #278 is stricken and re-set for 7/16/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 30, 2018 Filing 278 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 6/4/2018 #277 is stricken and re-set for 7/12/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 18, 2018 Filing 277 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties, status hearing set for 5/31/2018 #275 is stricken and re-set for 6/4/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 13, 2018 Filing 276 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #275 sent to Attorney Roger L Scott returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Roger L Scott a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerks Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, )
April 13, 2018 Filing 275 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 4/17/2018 #270 is stricken and re-set for 5/31/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 3, 2018 Filing 274 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
February 21, 2018 Filing 273 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #271 , #272 sent to Attorney Rajesh Kanuru returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Rajesh Kanuru a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
February 21, 2018 Filing 272 NOTICE by Brant D. Penney of Change of Address (Penney, Brant)
February 21, 2018 Filing 271 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing on 4/17/2018 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 20, 2018 Filing 270 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 4/17/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Argument held on the pending motions to dismiss.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 14, 2018 Filing 269 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Applications to appear pro hac vice #262 and #263 are granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 9, 2018 Filing 268 REPLY by Defendants ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #237 (Glikin, Joshua)
February 9, 2018 Filing 267 REPLY by Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Supervalu, Inc. to motion to dismiss #246 , motion to dismiss #243 Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fisher, Heidi)
February 9, 2018 Filing 266 REPLY by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company to motion to dismiss #249 Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Against The Kraft Heinz Company (Panos, Dean)
February 9, 2018 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM by Kraft Heinz Company in support of motion to dismiss #238 the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Panos, Dean)
February 8, 2018 Filing 264 REPLY by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #238 (Citera, Francis)
February 6, 2018 Filing 263 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14090330. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Esworthy, Matthew)
February 6, 2018 Filing 262 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14089163. (Polasko, Cynthia)
January 31, 2018 Filing 261 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to file #259 is granted. The time for Defendants to reply in support of their motion to dismiss is extended to 2/9/2018. Strike 260. Motion hearing set for 2/5/2018 #260 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 30, 2018 Filing 260 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Glikin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #259 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/5/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Glikin, Joshua)
January 30, 2018 Filing 259 MOTION by Defendants ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation for extension of time to file response/reply as to memorandum in opposition to motion,, #255 (Glikin, Joshua)
January 22, 2018 Filing 258 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiffs' motion to exceed the page limit for Plaintiffs' consolidated opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss amended consolidated class action complaints #256 is granted. Motion hearing set for 1/25/2018 #257 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 19, 2018 Filing 257 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Gordon Blood for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,, #256 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/25/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Blood, Timothy)
January 19, 2018 Filing 256 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary for leave to file excess pages Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed the Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaints (Blood, Timothy)
January 19, 2018 Filing 255 MEMORANDUM by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary in Opposition to motion to dismiss #238 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #237 , motion to dismiss #246 , motion to dismiss #249 , motion to dismiss #243 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaints (Blood, Timothy)
January 3, 2018 Filing 254 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
December 4, 2017 Filing 253 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing on 2/20/2018 at 2:00 p.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 4, 2017 Filing 252 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 2/20/2018 at 2:00 p.m. Motion hearing held. Motions to dismiss #237 #238 #243 #246 #249 are entered and continued. For the reasons stated on the record, discovery remains stayed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 30, 2017 Filing 251 NOTICE of Motion by Dean Nicholas Panos for presentment of motion to dismiss #249 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/4/2017 at 01:45 PM. (Panos, Dean)
November 30, 2017 Filing 250 MEMORANDUM by Kraft Heinz Company in support of motion to dismiss #249 Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Against The Kraft Heinz Company (Panos, Dean)
November 30, 2017 Filing 249 MOTION by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company to dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Against The kraft Heinz Company (Panos, Dean)
November 30, 2017 Filing 248 NOTICE of Motion by Heidi A.O. Fisher for presentment of motion to dismiss #246 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/4/2017 at 01:45 PM. (Fisher, Heidi)
November 30, 2017 Filing 247 MEMORANDUM by Publix Super Markets, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #246 Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fisher, Heidi)
November 30, 2017 Filing 246 MOTION by Defendant Publix Super Markets, Inc. to dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fisher, Heidi)
November 30, 2017 Filing 245 NOTICE of Motion by Heidi A.O. Fisher for presentment of motion to dismiss #243 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/4/2017 at 01:45 PM. (Fisher, Heidi)
November 30, 2017 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM by Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #243 Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fisher, Heidi)
November 30, 2017 Filing 243 MOTION by Defendants Supervalu, Inc., Albertsons, LLC, Albertson Companies, Inc to dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fisher, Heidi)
November 30, 2017 Filing 242 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motion to dismiss amended consolidated class action complaints against Target Corporation and ICCO-Cheese Company #237 and motion to dismiss the amended consolidated class action complaint #238 set for 12/5/2017 #241 is re-set for 12/4/2017 at 1:45 p.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 30, 2017 Filing 241 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion to dismiss #238 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/5/2017 at 10:30 AM. (Citera, Francis)
November 30, 2017 Filing 240 MEMORANDUM by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #238 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Citera, Francis)
November 30, 2017 Filing 239 MEMORANDUM by ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #237 (Glikin, Joshua)
November 30, 2017 Filing 238 MOTION by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Citera, Francis)
November 30, 2017 Filing 237 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation (Glikin, Joshua)
November 13, 2017 Filing 236 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 12/4/2017 at 2:00 p.m. #232 is re-set for 1:45 p.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 6, 2017 Filing 235 NOTICE by Timothy Gordon Blood of Change of Address Notification of Change of Address (Blood, Timothy)
November 2, 2017 Filing 234 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charlene Agles by Rosanne Mah (Mah, Rosanne)
October 27, 2017 Filing 233 WITHDRAWING Rosemary Rivas and Quentin Roberts as counsel for Plaintiff Charlene Agles and substituting Rosanne Mah as counsel of record (Mah, Rosanne)
October 26, 2017 Filing 232 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/4/2017 at 2:00 p.m. Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss by 11/30/2017; Plaintiffs' responses due by 1/19/2018; replies due by 2/2/2018. Motion hearing set for 2/20/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 25, 2017 Filing 231 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 10/26/2017 at 9:30 a.m. #224 is re-set for 9:45 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 20, 2017 Filing 230 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the 10/26/2017 status hearing #224 , the court will ask Defendants whether they intend to answer or move to dismiss the amended complaints. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 19, 2017 Filing 229 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Nancy Reeves, Alan Ducorsky, Michael Wills, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Becky Sikes, Rita Schmoll against ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barnow, Ben)
October 19, 2017 Filing 228 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Nancy Reeves, Rodney Zachary, Ann Bell, Alfonso Fata against ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barnow, Ben)
October 19, 2017 Filing 227 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Dan Lang, Michael Wills, Ann Bell against Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barnow, Ben)
October 19, 2017 Filing 226 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Carmen Pellitteri, Erin Rudder against Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barnow, Ben)
October 19, 2017 Filing 225 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Samantha Lewin, Rosemary Quinn, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Karen Ford, Michael Wills, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Adam Weiss, Ann Bell, Alfonso Fata against Kraft Heinz Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barnow, Ben)
October 6, 2017 Filing 224 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #222 is granted. The time for Plaintiffs to file their amended complaints is extended to 10/19/2017. Motion hearing set for 10/10/2017 #223 is stricken. Status hearing set for 10/10/2017 #220 is stricken and re-set for 10/26/2017 at 9:30 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 5, 2017 Filing 223 NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of extension of time, #222 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/10/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Barnow, Ben)
October 5, 2017 Filing 222 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary for extension of time to File Amended Complaints (Barnow, Ben)
October 3, 2017 Filing 221 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
September 12, 2017 Filing 220 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to amend #218 is granted. The time for Plaintiffs to file their amended complaints is extended to 10/5/2017. Motion hearing set for 9/14/2017 #219 is stricken. Status hearing set for 9/21/2017 #217 is stricken and re-set for 10/10/2017 at 9:30 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) Modified on 10/6/2017 (jlj, ).
September 11, 2017 Filing 219 NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of motion for extension of time to amend, #218 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Barnow, Ben)
September 11, 2017 Filing 218 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary for extension of time to amend their complaints (Barnow, Ben)
September 11, 2017 Filing 217 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Because Plaintiffs have until 9/14/2017 to amend their complaints, status hearing set for 9/14/2017 #214 is stricken and re-set to 9/21/2017 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 24, 2017 Filing 216 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/24/2017.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
August 24, 2017 Filing 215 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendants' motions to dismiss #156 #160 #163 #167 #173 are denied in part (as to Rule 12(b)(1)) and granted in part (as to Rule 12(b)(6)). The consolidated amended class action complaints #120 #121 #122 #123 #143 are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs have until 9/14/2017 to amend their complaints. If they do not do so, the dismissals will convert automatically to dismissals with prejudice, and judgment will be entered. If Plaintiffs amend their complaints, Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 10/5/2017.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 18, 2017 Filing 214 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 8/21/2017 #213 is stricken and re-set for 9/14/2017 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. A ruling on the pending motions to dismiss will issue shortly.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 18, 2017 Filing 213 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties, status hearing set for 8/17/2017 #211 is stricken and re-set for 8/21/2017 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 13, 2017 Filing 212 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Julia Titolo 's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel #209 is granted. Attorney Julia Titolo is terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs. The 7/18/2017 motion hearing #210 is stricken. Mailed notice (lcw, )
July 12, 2017 Filing 211 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: The status hearing set for 7/17/2017 #207 is stricken and re-set to 8/17/2017 at 10:30 a.m. Any party that would like a status hearing before that date should contact the Courtroom Deputy. The motions to dismiss remain under submission. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice (lcw, )
July 12, 2017 Filing 210 NOTICE of Motion by Julia Lynn Titolo for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #209 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/18/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Titolo, Julia)
July 12, 2017 Filing 209 MOTION by Attorney Julia L. Titolo to withdraw as attorney for Michael Chmielewski, Catherine Higens, In Re: 100% Grated Parmesan Cheese Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation, Ryan Schmidt. No party information provided (Titolo, Julia)
June 30, 2017 Filing 208 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
June 13, 2017 Filing 207 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 6/14/2017 #199 is stricken and re-set for 7/17/2017 at 10:30 a.m. Any party that would like a status hearing before that date should contact the Courtroom Deputy. The motions to dismiss remain under submission. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 12, 2017 Filing 206 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ann Bell by Eduard Korsinsky (Korsinsky, Eduard)
June 5, 2017 Filing 205 NOTICE by Joshua Glikin of Change of Address (Glikin, Joshua)
May 30, 2017 Filing 204 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Application to appear pro hac vice #201 is granted. Motion to substitute attorney #202 is granted. Attorney Lori Feldman is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff Ann Bell (formerly Yankee). Substitute counsel may file his appearance for that plaintiff. Motion hearing set for 6/6/2017 #203 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 25, 2017 Filing 203 NOTICE of Motion by Lori G. Feldman for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #202 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/6/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Feldman, Lori)
May 25, 2017 Filing 202 MOTION by Plaintiff Ann Bell to substitute attorney Eduard Korsinsky for Lori G. Feldman (Feldman, Lori)
May 25, 2017 Filing 201 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13214382. (Korsinsky, Eduard)
May 23, 2017 Filing 200 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charlene Agles by Gordon Morris Fauth, Jr (Fauth, Gordon)
April 26, 2017 Filing 199 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 5/4/2017 #195 is stricken and re-set for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Any party that would like a status hearing before that date should contact the Courtroom Deputy. The motions to dismiss remain under submission. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 3, 2017 Filing 198 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
March 24, 2017 Filing 197 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Given the stipulation of dismissal of Plaintiff Greenstein's case #196 , motion to remand #183 is denied as moot.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 23, 2017 Filing 196 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Lee, Kenneth)
March 14, 2017 Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. Argument held on the pending motions to dismiss. Status hearing set for 5/4/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 13, 2017 Filing 194 REPLY by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company to Response, #193 // Kraft Heinz's Reply In Support Of Supplemental Request For Judicial Notice (Panos, Dean)
March 10, 2017 Filing 193 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary to other #189 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Kraft Heinz Company's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion to Dismiss (Blood, Timothy)
March 3, 2017 Filing 192 REPLY by Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Supervalu, Inc. to motion to dismiss #156 Consolidated Complaint (Hansen, Gary)
March 3, 2017 Filing 191 REPLY by Defendants ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation to memorandum in support of motion #164 (Glikin, Joshua)
March 3, 2017 Filing 190 REPLY by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion,, #185 (Citera, Francis)
March 3, 2017 Filing 189 Supplemental Request for JUDICIAL NOTICE in SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS by Kraft Heinz Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Panos, Dean)
March 3, 2017 Filing 188 REPLY by Kraft Heinz Company to MOTION by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company to dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint #160 /Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Panos, Dean)
February 13, 2017 Filing 187 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Given the notice of settlement #186 , motion to remand #183 is entered and continued to 3/14/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Motion hearing set for 2/14/2017 #184 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 13, 2017 Filing 186 Notice of Settlement by Kraft Heinz Company (Panos, Dean)
February 10, 2017 Filing 185 MEMORANDUM by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary in Opposition to motion to dismiss #173 , motion to dismiss #160 , motion to dismiss #167 , motion to dismiss #156 , motion to dismiss #163 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Defendants Albertsons Companies, Inc., Albertsons LLC, and Supervalue, Inc.; Target Corporation and ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc.; Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.; Kraft Heinz Company; and Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Blood, Timothy)
February 6, 2017 Filing 184 NOTICE of Motion by David Greenstein for presentment of motion for Remand to State Court #183 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/14/2017 at 09:00 AM. (ph, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 183 MOTION for Remand to State Court by David Greenstein. (ph, )
February 2, 2017 Filing 182 TRANSFER ORDER dated 2/2/2017 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2705. (mr, )
February 2, 2017 Filing 181 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #179 is granted. Attorney Patrick Buckler is terminated as counsel for Defendants Target Corp. and ICCO-Cheese Co. Motion hearing set for 2/6/2017 #180 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 1, 2017 Filing 180 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Glikin for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #179 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/6/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Glikin, Joshua)
February 1, 2017 Filing 179 MOTION by Attorney Patrick R. Buckler to withdraw as attorney for ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation. No party information provided (Glikin, Joshua)
January 12, 2017 Filing 178 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the parties, status hearing set for 3/14/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 11, 2017 Filing 177 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Because a briefing schedule #171 has already been set on Defendant Publix's motion to dismiss #173 , the 1/17/2017 motion hearing #176 is stricken. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
January 10, 2017 Filing 176 NOTICE of Motion by Heidi A.O. Fisher for presentment of motion to dismiss #173 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/17/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Fisher, Heidi)
January 10, 2017 Filing 175 AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Publix Super Markets, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Defendant Publix Super Markets, Inc. to dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint #173 - Declaration of Steve O'Hara (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fisher, Heidi)
January 10, 2017 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM by Publix Super Markets, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #173 Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fisher, Heidi)
January 10, 2017 Filing 173 MOTION by Defendant Publix Super Markets, Inc. to dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fisher, Heidi)
January 10, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE by Jayne Goldstein of Change of Address and Firm Affiliation (Goldstein, Jayne)
January 9, 2017 Filing 171 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to a date and time to be identified shortly. By the close of business on 1/11/2017, the parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy with mutually agreeable dates from 3/7/2017 and 3/16/2017. Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' responses to the motions to dismiss #156 #160 #163 #167 and to Publix's forthcoming motion to dismiss shall be filed by 2/10/2017; replies due by 3/3/2017.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 7, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE by Kraft Heinz Company // NOTICE of ERRATA (Attachments: #1 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS #160 )(Panos, Dean)
January 6, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion to dismiss #167 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/9/2017 at 10:30 AM. (Citera, Francis)
January 6, 2017 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #167 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Citera, Francis)
January 6, 2017 Filing 167 MOTION by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 9(b) (Citera, Francis)
January 6, 2017 Filing 166 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Glikin for presentment of motion to dismiss #163 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/9/2017 at 10:30 AM. (Glikin, Joshua)
January 6, 2017 Filing 165 Request for JUDICIAL NOTICE in SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS by Kraft Heinz Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Panos, Dean)
January 6, 2017 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM by ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation in support of motion to dismiss #163 Consolidated Class Action Complaints (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Glikin, Joshua)
January 6, 2017 Filing 163 MOTION by Defendants ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation to dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints (Glikin, Joshua)
January 6, 2017 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM by Kraft Heinz Company in support of motion to dismiss #160 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Panos, Dean)
January 6, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE of Motion by Dean Nicholas Panos for presentment of motion to dismiss #160 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/9/2017 at 10:30 AM. (Panos, Dean)
January 6, 2017 Filing 160 MOTION by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company to dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Panos, Dean)
January 5, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Motion by Heidi A.O. Fisher for presentment of motion to dismiss #156 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/9/2017 at 10:30 AM. (Fisher, Heidi)
January 5, 2017 Filing 158 AFFIDAVIT by Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Defendants Supervalu, Inc., Albertsons, LLC, Albertson Companies, Inc to dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint #156 - Declaration of Catherine Proper (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fisher, Heidi)
January 5, 2017 Filing 157 MEMORANDUM by Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #156 Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fisher, Heidi)
January 5, 2017 Filing 156 MOTION by Defendants Supervalu, Inc., Albertsons, LLC, Albertson Companies, Inc to dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fisher, Heidi)
January 5, 2017 Filing 155 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 1/9/2017 at 10:00 a.m. #113 is re-set for 10:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 4, 2017 Filing 154 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing on 1/9/2017 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 3, 2017 Filing 153 Quarterly Report by Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Carmen Pellitteri, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Erin Rudder, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Rodney Zachary (Barnow, Ben)
January 3, 2017 Filing 152 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By agreement #148 , Defendant Publix Super Markets will file its motion to dismiss and supporting memorandum by 1/11/2017.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 30, 2016 Filing 151 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions for leave to file excess pages #144 , #146 , and #149 are granted. Defendants may file oversized initial briefs, of up to 25 pages, in support of their forthcoming motions to dismiss. Motion hearings set for 1/3/2017 and 1/4/2017 #145 , #147 and #150 are stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 30, 2016 Filing 150 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #149 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/4/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Citera, Francis)
December 30, 2016 Filing 149 MOTION by Defendants ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for leave to file excess pages on Defendants Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaints (Citera, Francis)
December 29, 2016 Filing 148 STATUS Report (Joint) re Publix Suits by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Hansen, Gary)
December 29, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE of Motion by Dean Nicholas Panos for presentment of motion for leave to file #146 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/4/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Panos, Dean)
December 29, 2016 Filing 146 MOTION by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company for leave to file a Memorandum of Law in Excess of 15 pages (Panos, Dean)
December 28, 2016 Filing 145 NOTICE of Motion by Heidi A.O. Fisher for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #144 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/3/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Fisher, Heidi)
December 28, 2016 Filing 144 MOTION by Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. for leave to file excess pages for principal Motion to Dismiss Brief (Fisher, Heidi)
December 27, 2016 Filing 143 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Carmen Pellitteri, Erin Rudder against Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Barnow, Ben)
December 27, 2016 Filing 142 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file consolidated class action complaint against Publix Super Markets, Inc. #140 is granted. Plaintiffs Pellitteri and Rudder shall file as a separate docket entry their consolidated class action complaint against Publix. Motion hearing set for 1/3/2017 #141 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 22, 2016 Filing 141 NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of motion for leave to file #140 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/3/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Barnow, Ben)
December 22, 2016 Filing 140 MOTION by Plaintiffs Carmen Pellitteri, Erin Rudder for leave to file Consolidated Class Action Complaint Against Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Barnow, Ben)
December 13, 2016 Filing 139 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By 1/4/2017, the parties (including Publix Super Markets) shall file a status report setting forth their joint view or competing views regarding how the MDL should accommodate and incorporate the suits against Publix Super Markets. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 13, 2016 Filing 138 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #133 is granted. Attorney Christopher P.T. Tourek is terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs Catherine Higens and Ryan Schmidt. Motion hearing set for 12/15/2016 #134 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 12, 2016 Filing 137 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2705 (mr, )
December 12, 2016 Filing 136 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2705 (mr, )
December 12, 2016 Filing 135 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2705 (mr, )
December 12, 2016 Filing 134 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #133 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/15/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Tourek, Christopher)
December 12, 2016 Filing 133 MOTION by Attorney Christopher P.T. Tourek to withdraw as attorney for Catherine Higens, Ryan Schmidt. No party information provided (Tourek, Christopher)
November 21, 2016 Filing 132 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #130 is granted. The time for Defendants to answer the operative complaints is extended to noon Central time on 1/6/2017. Motion hearing set for 11/23/2016 #131 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 18, 2016 Filing 131 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief,,, #130 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/23/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Citera, Francis)
November 18, 2016 Filing 130 MOTION by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #122 , amended complaint #120 , amended complaint #121 , amended complaint #123 (Citera, Francis)
November 17, 2016 Filing 129 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ann Bell, Alan Ducorsky, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Dan Lang, Samantha Lewin, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Rita Schmoll, Becky Sikes, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Ann Yankee, Rodney Zachary by Ben Barnow (Barnow, Ben)
November 17, 2016 Filing 128 NOTICE by Theodore Beloyeannis Bell of Change of Address (Bell, Theodore)
November 17, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE by Carl V. Malmstrom of Change of Address (Malmstrom, Carl)
November 11, 2016 Filing 126 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #124 is granted. Attorney Joelle Shabat is terminated as counsel for Defendant Target Corporation. Motion hearing set for 11/14/2016 #125 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 7, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE of Motion by Joelle Marnie Shabat for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #124 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/14/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Shabat, Joelle)
November 7, 2016 Filing 124 MOTION by Attorney Joelle Marnie Shabat to withdraw as attorney for Target Corporation. No party information provided (Shabat, Joelle)
November 3, 2016 Filing 123 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Nancy Reeves, Alan Ducorsky, Michael Wills, becky sikes, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Rita Schmoll against ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Barnow, Ben)
November 3, 2016 Filing 122 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Nancy Reeves, Rodney Zachary, Ann Yankee, Alfonso Fata against ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation (Barnow, Ben)
November 3, 2016 Filing 121 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Dan Lang, Michael Wills, Ann Yankee against Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. (Barnow, Ben)
November 3, 2016 Filing 120 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED complaint by Samantha Lewin, Rosemary Quinn, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Karen Ford, Michael Wills, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Adam Weiss, Ann Yankee, Alfonso Fata against Kraft Heinz Company (Barnow, Ben)
October 18, 2016 On October 18, 2016 the Clerk audited this case file and discovered that Attorneys Christopher M. Hohn and Joelle Marnie Shabat are not receiving electronic notice. The Clerk modified CM/ECF to provide notice to the attorneys. The record indicates you are counsel of record in this case. If you are no longer representing this client, you must file a notice of withdraw from this case pursuant to LR 83.17. (lf, )
October 17, 2016 Filing 119 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff in 16 C 2971 has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal #118 , the terms of which are set forth therein. The Clerk is directed to administratively close Case 16 C 2971 (N.D. Ill.).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 13, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fiona Lynch (Turin, Yevgeniy)
October 3, 2016 Filing 117 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring case to become part of MDL 2705. (mr, )
September 26, 2016 Filing 116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #114 is granted. Attorney Matthew Tuccillo is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff Sheldon Spector. Motion hearing set for 9/28/2016 #115 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 23, 2016 Filing 115 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew L Tuccillo for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #114 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/28/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Tuccillo, Matthew)
September 23, 2016 Filing 114 MOTION by Attorney Matthew L. Tuccillo to withdraw as attorney for Sheldon Spector. No party information provided (Tuccillo, Matthew)
September 22, 2016 Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/9/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs shall file four consolidated complaints by 11/3/2016. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaints by 12/16/2016.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 21, 2016 Filing 112 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Elizabeth Bidgood, Janine Hechmer, Ann Yankee by Andrea Clisura (Clisura, Andrea)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER REGARDING INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE writtten by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/16/2016:Mailed notice.(jlj, )
September 16, 2016 Filing 110 Case Management Order No. 2 written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/16/2016. Majority Plaintiffs' motion for appointment of interim co-lead counsel #89 is granted. Moschetta Group's application for leadership positions #46 is denied. Enter order regarding interim co-lead counsel and executive committee. At the 9/22/2016 status hearing #109 , the parties shall be prepared to address whether and, if so, how these cases should be tracked. Mailed notice.(jlj, )
September 9, 2016 Filing 109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 9/12/2016 #88 is stricken and re-set for 9/22/2016 at 10:30 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing on 9/22/2016 at 10:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 7, 2016 Filing 108 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Applications to appear pro hac vice #105 and #107 are granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 7, 2016 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12334153. (Smith, Alexander) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 9/7/2016) (rm, ).
September 6, 2016 Filing 106 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #105 sent to Attorney Matthew L Tuccillo returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Matthew L Tuccillo a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
September 6, 2016 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12331992. (Lee, Kenneth)
August 24, 2016 Filing 104 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, David Greenstein motion to remand #91 is denied without prejudice to his bringing his motion in California or, if the case is transferred to this court, in this court. Status hearing set for 9/12/2016 #88 shall stand.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER VACATING Conditional Transfer Order and Vacating the September 29, 2016, Hearing Session Order signed by the MDL Panel. (mr, )
August 23, 2016 Filing 102 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yvonne Averhart by Mark T. Lavery (Lavery, Mark)
August 23, 2016 Filing 101 RESPONSE by Kraft Heinz Companyin Opposition to MOTION by Unknown David Greenstein to remand #91 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Panos, Dean)
August 22, 2016 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motion to remand #91 set for 8/24/2016 at 9:00 a.m. #94 is re-set for 10:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the motion hearing on 8/24/2016 at 10:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 22, 2016 Filing 99 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Application to appear pro hac vice #93 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 18, 2016 Filing 98 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Charlene Agles, Michael Campana, Britney Cooper, Jenelle Craggette, Camilla DeMario, Robert Demario, Jeffrey Dowdy, Sheila Garland, Joseph Landara, Russell Levy, Fiona Lynch, Phyliss Lynn, Jason Martin, Renita Myers, Carl Nitz, Efrain Ruiz, Nevina Saitta, Ronald Saitta, Nena Simon, Derrick Sims, Sheldon Spector, Veronica Sutton, Larry Tucker The Moschetta Group's Response in Further Support of its Application for Leadership Positions (Turin, Yevgeniy)
August 18, 2016 Filing 97 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Yvonne Averhart, Elizabeth Bidgood, George Brahler, Jose Brown, Charles Bundy, Cindy Bustamante, Alyson Davies, Alan Ducorsky, Chauncy Ellison, Richard Evans, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Tara Franklin, Michael Greene, Michael Hara, Taniesha Harwell, Janine Hechmer, Andrea Hogan, Debra Jackson, Michael Jones, Debra Lee, Samantha Lewin, John Lewis, Rhonda Lorenz, DALLAS MORENO, Kenneth Manfredi, Andrew Matecki, Patty Morelos, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Barbara Reinbott, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Rita Schmoll, Beverly Schulze, Michelle Walker, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Ann Yankee, Rodney Zachary, becky sikes to the Moschetta Group's Application for Appointment (Barnow, Ben)
August 18, 2016 Filing 96 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Catherine Higens, Ryan Schmidt to memorandum, #90 , status report,,, #46 , motion for miscellaneous relief,,, #89 to Applications for Interim Lead Counsel (Titolo, Julia)
August 18, 2016 Filing 95 RESPONSE by Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Supervalu, Inc., Target Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East to order on motion to substitute attorney,,, terminate hearings,,, add and terminate attorneys,, #75 (Sellinger, David)
August 17, 2016 Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motion to remand #91 set for 8/24/2016 at 9:00 a.m. #92 .Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 16, 2016 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12259317. (Rohrberger, Robert)
August 15, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE of Motion by David Greenstein for presentment of MOTION of David his case Greenstein to remand to California State Court #91 (nsf, ) Modified on 8/17/2016 (nsf, ).
August 15, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION of David his case Greenstein to remand to California State Court by Unknown David Greenstein (nsf, )
August 11, 2016 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM by Charlene Agles, Michael Campana, Britney Cooper, Jenelle Craggette, Camilla DeMario, Robert Demario, Jeffrey Dowdy, Sheila Garland, Joseph Landara, Russell Levy, Fiona Lynch, Phyliss Lynn, Jason Martin, Marc Moschetta, Renita Myers, Carl Nitz, Efrain Ruiz, Nevina Saitta, Ronald Saitta, Nena Simon, Derrick Sims, Sheldon Spector, Veronica Sutton, Larry Tucker Supplemental Memorandum in Support of the Moschetta Group's Application for Lead Counsel (Turin, Yevgeniy)
August 11, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Bidgood, George Brahler, Jose Brown, Alyson Davies, Alan Ducorsky, Chauncy Ellison, Alfonso Fata, Karen Ford, Tara Franklin, Michael Greene, Michael Hara, Janine Hechmer, Andrea Hogan, Debra Jackson, Michael Jones, Debra Lee, Samantha Lewin, John Lewis, Rhonda Lorenz, Kenneth Manfredi, Andrew Matecki, Patty Morelos, Yvette Ramona Knight Nash, Rosemary Quinn, Nancy Reeves, Larry Rollinger, Jr, Michelle Walker, Adam Weiss, Michael Wills, Ann Yankee, becky sikes, Yvonne Averhart, Charles Bundy, Cindy Bustamante, Rita Schmoll, Barbara Reinbott, becky sikes, Richard Evans, Taniesha Harwell, DALLAS MORENO, Beverly Schulze, Rodney Zachary for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Executive Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Ben Barnow Resume, #2 Exhibit B: Timothy G. Blood Resume, #3 Exhibit C: Lori G. Feldman Resume, #4 Group Exhibit D: Resumes of Proposed Plaintiffs' Executive Committee)(Barnow, Ben)
August 10, 2016 Filing 88 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 9/12/2016 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing on 9/12/2016 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 9, 2016 Filing 87 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Applications to appear pro hac vice #82 , #83 , #84 , #85 , #86 are granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 9, 2016 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12233471. (Tunheim, Samuel)
August 9, 2016 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12233438. (Fisher, Heidi)
August 9, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12233411. (Hansen, Gary)
August 8, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12231592. (Clisura, Andrea)
August 8, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12229199. (Laufenberg, Cari)
August 8, 2016 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to remand #80 is denied without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.3(b).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 5, 2016 Filing 79 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CATHERINE HIGENS, Ryan Schmidt by David Max Oppenheim (Oppenheim, David)
August 5, 2016 Filing 78 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CATHERINE HIGENS, Ryan Schmidt by Julia Lynn Titolo (Titolo, Julia)
August 4, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION by unknown party David Greenstein to remand to California State Court. (Exhibits) (bg, )
August 4, 2016 Filing 77 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. by Joseph Edward Collins (Collins, Joseph)
August 4, 2016 Filing 76 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karen Ford by Charles E. Schaffer (Schaffer, Charles)
August 4, 2016 Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. Applications to serve in Plaintiffs' leadership structure (or to supplement a prior application) shall be filed by 8/11/2016; responses due by 8/18/2016. Motion for substitution of attorney #66 is granted. Attorneys Sarah L. Brew, Colby Anne Kingsbury, and Kate E. Middleton are terminated as counsel for Defendants Alberton Companies, Inc., Albertsons, LLC, and Supervalu, Inc. Substitute counsel may file their appearances. The 8/9/2016 motion hearing #67 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 4, 2016 Filing 74 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Britney Cooper, Jenelle Craggette, Camilla DeMario, Robert Demario, Jeffrey Dowdy, Sheila Garland, Joseph Landara, Russell Levy, Phyliss Lynn, Jason Martin, Marc Moschetta, Renita Myers, Carl Nitz, Efrain Ruiz, Nevina Saitta, Ronald Saitta, Nena Simon, Derrick Sims, Derrick Sims, Veronica Sutton, Larry Tucker by Jason P. Sultzer (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Sultzer, Jason)
August 4, 2016 Filing 73 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Hara, Andrea Hogan, Larry Rollinger, Jr by Brant D. Penney (Penney, Brant)
August 4, 2016 Filing 72 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Yvette Ramona Knight Nash by Erich Paul Schork (Schork, Erich)
August 4, 2016 Filing 71 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Yvette Ramona Knight Nash by Ben Barnow (Barnow, Ben)
August 4, 2016 Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jose Brown, Alyson Davies, Chauncy Ellison, Michael Greene, Debra Jackson, Michael Jones, Debra Lee, Fiona Lynch, Kenneth Manfredi, Andrew Matecki by John J Driscoll (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs List)(Driscoll, John)
August 3, 2016 Filing 69 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff George Brahler by Tana Lin (Lin, Tana)
August 3, 2016 Filing 68 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Samantha Lewin by Krivoshey Olegovich Yeremey (Yeremey, Krivoshey)
August 3, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE of Motion by Kate E Middleton for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #66 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/9/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Middleton, Kate)
August 3, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION by Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. to substitute attorney (Middleton, Kate)
August 3, 2016 Filing 65 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jose Brown, Alyson Davies, Chauncy Ellison, Michael Greene, Debra Jackson, Michael Jones, Debra Lee, Fiona Lynch, Kenneth Manfredi, Andrew Matecki by Philip Sholtz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs List)(Sholtz, Philip)
August 3, 2016 Filing 64 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fiona Lynch by Evan M Meyers (Meyers, Evan)
August 3, 2016 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Agreed motions to reassign case #48 , #53 and #61 are granted. The court recommends to the Executive Committee that it reassign Nash v. Kraft Heinz Foods Co., 16 C 5265; Higens v. Kraft Heinz Foods Co., No. 16 C 3016; and Lynch v. ICCO-Cheese Company, No. 16 C 2971, to be part of In re: 100% Grated Parmesan Cheese Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation, No. 16 C 5802 (MDL 2705) (Feinerman, J.). Because they are being incorporated into MDL 2705, those three cases should be terminated as separate cases for administrative purposes. Motion hearings set for 8/4/2016 #51 , #54 and #62 are stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 2, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Buckler for presentment of motion to reassign case #61 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/4/2016 at 10:00 AM. (Buckler, Patrick)
August 2, 2016 Filing 61 MOTION by Defendants ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation to reassign case (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buckler, Patrick)
August 2, 2016 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 3361828, Access Code: 4082461 for the status hearing on 8/4/2016 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 2, 2016 Filing 59 Defendants' Supplemental Status Conference STATEMENT by Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Kraft Heinz Company, Supervalu, Inc., Target Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Gibbons, John)
August 2, 2016 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Lewis, Rhonda Lorenz, Nancy Reeves, Michelle Walker, Michael Wills by S. Clinton Woods (Woods, S. Clinton)
August 2, 2016 Filing 57 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sheldon Spector by Jayne Goldstein (Goldstein, Jayne)
August 2, 2016 Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sheldon Spector by Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom (Dahlstrom, Patrick)
August 2, 2016 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Elizabeth Bidgood, Janine Hechmer, Ann Yankee by Lori G. Feldman (Feldman, Lori)
July 29, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Dean Nicholas Panos for presentment of motion to reassign case #53 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/4/2016 at 10:00 AM. (Panos, Dean)
July 29, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION by Defendant Kraft Heinz Company to reassign case (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Panos, Dean)
July 28, 2016 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rhonda Lorenz, Nancy Reeves, Michelle Walker, Michael Wills, Karen Ford, John Lewis by Michael Andrew Mcshane (Mcshane, Michael)
July 26, 2016 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Plaintiff's agreed motion for reassignment #48 set for 8/2/2016 #49 is stricken and re-set for 8/4/2016 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 25, 2016 Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Elizabeth Bidgood, Janine Hechmer by Janine L Pollack (Pollack, Janine)
July 22, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of motion to reassign case #48 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/2/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Barnow, Ben)
July 22, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION by Movant Yvette Ramona Knight Nash to reassign case (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Class Action Complaint)(Barnow, Ben)
July 22, 2016 Filing 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Elizabeth Bidgood, Janine Hechmer by Carl Vincent Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl)
July 20, 2016 Filing 46 STATUS Report Moschetta Group's Status Conference Statement and Application for Leadership Positions by Fiona Lynch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Jason Sultzer, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jason Sultzer, #3 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Jayne A. Goldstein, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jayne A. Goldstein, #5 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Evan M. Meyers, #6 Exhibit 4 Declaration of David Pastor, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of David Pastor, #8 Exhibit 5 Declaration of Adam R. Gonnelli, #9 Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam R. Gonnelli, #10 Exhibit 6 Declaration of Marc L. Godino, #11 Exhibit A to Declaration of Marc L. Godino, #12 Exhibit 7 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas, #13 Exhibit A to Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas)(Turin, Yevgeniy)
July 20, 2016 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fiona Lynch by Yevgeniy Y. Turin (Turin, Yevgeniy)
July 20, 2016 Filing 44 STATUS Report Defendants' and Certain Plaintiffs' Status Conference Statement by Adam Weiss, Patty Morelos (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Blood, Timothy)
July 20, 2016 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Application to appear pro hac vice #39 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 20, 2016 Filing 42 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Target Corporation (Glikin, Joshua)
July 20, 2016 Filing 41 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc. (Glikin, Joshua)
July 19, 2016 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc., Target Corporation by Joshua Glikin (Glikin, Joshua)
July 19, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12160330. (Buckler, Patrick)
July 14, 2016 Filing 38 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wal-Mart Store East, LLC (Sellinger, David) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 7/14/2016) (rm, ).
July 14, 2016 Filing 37 Brief of Amicus Curiae by Competitive Enterprise Institute Center for Class Action Fairness (St. John, Anna)
July 14, 2016 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion of Competitive Enterprise Institute's Center for Class Action Fairness for leave to file instanter its amicus curiae brief #32 is granted. Amicus should file its brief as a separate docket entry. Motion hearing set for 7/18/2016 #33 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 14, 2016 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. by Sarah L. Brew (Brew, Sarah)
July 14, 2016 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Application to appear pro hac vice #31 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 13, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Frank Bednarz for presentment of motion to file instanter, #32 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/18/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bednarz, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION by Amicus Competitive Enterprise Institute Center for Class Action Fairness to file instanter its Amicus Curiae Brief (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief for Competitive Enterprise Institutes Center for Class Action Fairness, #2 Local Rule 3.2 Notification)(Bednarz, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12144203. (St. John, Anna)
July 13, 2016 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Competitive Enterprise Institute Center for Class Action Fairness by Michael Frank Bednarz (Bednarz, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Filing 29 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Sellinger, David)
July 13, 2016 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by Francis A Citera (Citera, Francis)
July 13, 2016 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by John F. Gibbons (Gibbons, John)
July 13, 2016 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by David Eric Sellinger (Sellinger, David)
July 8, 2016 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Case Management Order No. 1 #9 is further amended as follows. Paragraphs 7, 9, and 11 are amended to extend the 7/13/2016 deadlines to 7/20/2016. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 8, 2016 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Case Management Order No. 1 #9 is amended. The initial status hearing set for 7/20/2016 is stricken and re-set for 8/4/2016 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 8, 2016 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/20/2016 #7 is stricken and re-set for 8/4/2016 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 7, 2016 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Albertson Companies, Inc (Kingsbury, Colby)
July 7, 2016 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Albertsons, LLC (Kingsbury, Colby)
July 7, 2016 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Supervalu, Inc. (Kingsbury, Colby)
July 7, 2016 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Applications to appear pro hac vice #14 #15 and #16 are granted.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 6, 2016 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Kraft Heinz Company (Panos, Dean)
July 6, 2016 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kraft Heinz Company by Dean Nicholas Panos (Panos, Dean)
July 6, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12119362. Appearing on behalf of Alm, Karen and Ader, Dawn (ED-NY) (Muhlstock, Todd)
July 6, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12118017. (Sellinger, David)
June 29, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12102373. (Brew, Sarah)
June 29, 2016 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. by Kate E Middleton (Middleton, Kate)
June 29, 2016 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Albertson Companies, Inc, Albertsons, LLC, Supervalu, Inc. by Colby Anne Kingsbury (Kingsbury, Colby)
June 29, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE by Mark Reinhardt of Change of Address (Reinhardt, Mark)
June 27, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE by Brandon Stewart Morris of Change of Address (Morris, Brandon)
June 27, 2016 Filing 9 MDL Case Management Order No. 1, written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/27/2016.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
June 27, 2016 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2705. (mr, )
June 24, 2016 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/20/2016 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Order No. 1 to follow shortly. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 13, 2016 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2705. (mr, )
June 7, 2016 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #3 is granted. The deadline for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint in the Shulze Action is vacated and will be re-set at the initial status hearing. Motion hearing set for 6/14/2016 #4 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 6, 2016 Filing 4 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Hale Claydon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,, motion for relief, #3 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/14/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Claydon, Jonathan)
June 6, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION by Service List for extension of time to file answer regarding other #1 /Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Southern District of Illinois Case No.: 3:16-CV-208-SMY-SCW) (Claydon, Jonathan)
June 3, 2016 Filing 2 MAILED MDL Lead Case Established Letter to Counsel of Record. (mr, )
June 2, 2016 Filing 1 TRANSFER Order of 6/2/2016 from MDL Panel establishing MDL 2705. Case No. 16cv5802 master docket. (mr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: 100% Grated Parmesan Cheese Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 100% Grated Parmesan Cheese Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Ted C. Craig
Represented By: Heidi A.O. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Company
Represented By: Dean Nicholas Panos
Represented By: Kenneth Kiyul Lee
Represented By: Alexander M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John F. Gibbons
Represented By: David Eric Sellinger
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: Francis A Citera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Cynthia Lynn Polasko
Represented By: Patrick Buckler
Represented By: Eileen Marie Letts
Represented By: Joshua Glikin
Represented By: Joelle Marnie Shabat
Represented By: Matthew Anselm Sodaro Esworthy
Represented By: Martin Peter Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervalu, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Hansen
Represented By: Heidi A.O. Fisher
Represented By: Robert J Rohrberger
Represented By: Samuel John Tunheim
Represented By: Kate E Middleton
Represented By: Sarah L. Brew
Represented By: Colby Anne Kingsbury
Represented By: Joseph Edward Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons, LLC
Represented By: Gary Hansen
Represented By: Heidi A.O. Fisher
Represented By: Robert J Rohrberger
Represented By: Samuel John Tunheim
Represented By: Kate E Middleton
Represented By: Sarah L. Brew
Represented By: Colby Anne Kingsbury
Represented By: Joseph Edward Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson Companies, Inc
Represented By: Gary Hansen
Represented By: Heidi A.O. Fisher
Represented By: Robert J Rohrberger
Represented By: Samuel John Tunheim
Represented By: Kate E Middleton
Represented By: Sarah L. Brew
Represented By: Colby Anne Kingsbury
Represented By: Joseph Edward Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICCO-Cheese Company, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Lynn Polasko
Represented By: Patrick Buckler
Represented By: Joshua Glikin
Represented By: Matthew Anselm Sodaro Esworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Reinbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Fata
Represented By: Todd Seth Garber
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyson Davies
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Higens
Represented By: James Michael Smith
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Julia Lynn Mohan
Represented By: David Max Oppenheim
Represented By: Phillip A. Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevina Saitta
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lewis
Represented By: Michael Andrew Mcshane
Represented By: S. Clinton Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hara
Represented By: Brant D. Penney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Jackson
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Angela Beranek Brandt
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Demario
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Perkins
Represented By: Phillip Timothy Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenelle Craggette
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chmielewski
Represented By: Phillip Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldon Spector
Represented By: Matthew L Tuccillo
Represented By: Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom
Represented By: Jayne Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Landara
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Averhart
Represented By: James Patrick Batson
Represented By: Mark T. Lavery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Leigh Randolph
Represented By: William Charles Wright
Represented By: Grey Tesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Manfredi
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Fletcher V Trammell
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Sims
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Zachary
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Morelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Garland
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Brahler
Represented By: Cari C Laufenberg
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Reeves
Represented By: Michael Andrew Mcshane
Represented By: S. Clinton Woods
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Sean Clinton Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Yankee
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Courtney Maccarone
Represented By: Andrea Clisura
Represented By: Carol V Gilden
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Sikes
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Quinn
Represented By: Todd Seth Garber
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Rollinger, Jr
Represented By: Brant D. Penney
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taniesha Harwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Tamayo
Represented By: Robert C Schubert
Represented By: Willem F. Jonckheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Schmidt
Represented By: James Michael Smith
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Julia Lynn Mohan
Represented By: David Max Oppenheim
Represented By: Phillip A. Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lee
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrissy Sellers
Represented By: Phillip Timothy Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Saitta
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Moschetta
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Levy
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Greene
Represented By: Brandon Stewart Morris
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiara Cruz
Represented By: Alexander Jan-Yura Korolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Pellitteri
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Richard J. Lantinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Lewin
Represented By: Yeremey Olegovich Krivoshey
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chauncy Ellison
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Ducorsky
Represented By: Todd Seth Garber
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Dowdy
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Bustamante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Bell
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Courtney Maccarone
Represented By: Eduard Korsinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Agles
Represented By: Timothy Gordon Blood
Represented By: Thomas J. O'Reardon, II
Represented By: Walter L Haines
Represented By: Eric A Schreiber
Represented By: Quentin Alexandre Roberts
Represented By: Peggy J Reali
Represented By: Edwin C Schreiber
Represented By: Alexander M Smith
Represented By: Ean M Schreiber
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne Mah
Represented By: Gordon Morris Fauth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Sutton
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wills
Represented By: Michael Andrew Mcshane
Represented By: S. Clinton Woods
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Sean Clinton Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britney Cooper
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Bidgood
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Courtney Maccarone
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Andrea Clisura
Represented By: Janine L Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ford
Represented By: Michael Andrew Mcshane
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiona Lynch
Represented By: Eugene Y. Turin
Represented By: Evan M Meyers
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Costoso
Represented By: Jason T. Brown
Represented By: Patrick S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Hogan
Represented By: Brant D. Penney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Schmoll
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Matecki
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla DeMario
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Lorenz
Represented By: Michael Andrew Mcshane
Represented By: S. Clinton Woods
Represented By: Sean Clinton Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nena Simon
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Tucker
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyliss Lynn
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Campana
Represented By: Adam R. Gonnelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Rudder
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Richard J. Lantinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Nitz
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Lang
Represented By: Maebetty Kirby
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Represented By: Nickolas J. Hagman
Represented By: Kristofer S. Riddle
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Shannon Marie McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Walker
Represented By: Michael Andrew Mcshane
Represented By: S. Clinton Woods
Represented By: Sean Clinton Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Franklin
Represented By: Richard J. Lantinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renita Myers
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Ramona Knight Nash
Represented By: Erich Paul Schork
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Blake
Represented By: Rajesh Kanuru
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Weiss
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Hechmer
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Courtney Maccarone
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Andrea Clisura
Represented By: Janine L Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Ruiz
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Martin
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Brown
Represented By: Brandon Stewart Morris
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Competitive Enterprise Institute Center for Class Action Fairness
Represented By: M. Frank Bednarz
Represented By: Anna St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In Re: 100% Grated Parmesan Cheese Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?