Puroon, Inc. v. Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Puroon, Inc.
Defendant: Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv07811
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 4/23/19 is stricken. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 101 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 100 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice (Cohen, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 99 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone. Defendant to advise Plaintiff and the court by email on the issue discussed today by close of business tomorrow. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 20, 2019 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone and continued to tomorrow at 12:30 p.m. by phone. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 19, 2019 Filing 97 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 3/19/19. The parties report that they are scheduled to appear before Magistrate Judge Kim tomorrow. Status hearing set for 4/23/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 96 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Settlement discussion held by phone and continued to March 20, 2019, at 4:30 p.m. by phone, Parties are to use the same call-in information. Plaintiff is ordered to circulate a new draft settlement agreement and copy the court by noon tomorrow. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 15, 2019 Filing 95 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: At the request of the parties, a conference call with this court is scheduled for March 18, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. to discuss certain issues pertaining to finalizing the settlement agreement. The conference call number for the status hearing is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 26, 2019 Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 2/26/19. The parties report that they have reached a settlement and are memorializing the settlement terms. This case is closed for administrative purposes subject to reinstatement. Status hearing set for 3/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 93 SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on February 7, 2019 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874. (Hanhardt, Joene)
February 8, 2019 Filing 92 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 2/19/19 is reset to 2/26/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 91 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In-person settlement conference held. Parties were able to resolve the matter. Plaintiff is directed to serve a draft settlement agreement to Defendant by February 14, 2019. Defendant is to comment on the draft by no later than February 21, 2019. Parties are to file their stipulation to dismiss without prejudice with the assigned District Judge as soon as possible. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Mailed notice (ma,)
January 29, 2019 Filing 90 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 1/31/19 is reset to 2/19/19 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 89 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendant's unopposed request to reschedule the settlement conference is granted. The individual with the authority to settle on behalf of Defendant has medical reasons for needing the change. The settlement conference is rescheduled from December 10, 2018, to February 7, 2019, at noon in courtroom 1019. Mailed notice (ma,)
November 8, 2018 Filing 88 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Preliminary settlement discussion held by phone. A second in-person settlement conference is scheduled for December 10, 2018, at noon in courtroom 1019. Parties are ordered to review and follow this court's standing order on "Settlement Conferences" on its webpage. The individuals with the authority to settle this matter must appear in person. Plaintiff to provide its initial and supplemental settlement position statements to Defendant, with a copy to the court (settlement_statement_kim@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by November 27, 2018. Defendant to respond with its initial and supplemental settlement position statements, with a copy to the court, by December 4, 2018. Defendant must also provide a draft settlement and release to Plaintiff along with its position statements so that Plaintiff is advised of the collateral terms Defendant requires to resolve this matter. If the settlement position statements are more than 10 pages, parties must submit a hard copy by hand delivery or by mail to Chambers 1000. These settlement position statements are not to be filed with the clerk's office. Mailed notice (ma,)
November 8, 2018 Filing 87 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A preliminary settlement discussion with the attorneys of record is scheduled for today at 3:00 p.m. by phone. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
November 6, 2018 Filing 86 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: Settlement conference.(ca, ).Mailed notice.
November 6, 2018 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 11/6/18. A jury trial is set for 5/13/19 at 9:00 a.m. A pretrial conference is scheduled for 4/5/19 at 1:30 p.m. A proposed final pretrial order is due by 3/1/19 and should be submitted to the Court's proposed order mailbox and not filed on the docket. Motions in limine are due by 2/22/19; responses are due by 3/1/19. The parties must comply with the Court's standing order regarding the preparation and submission of proposed final pretrial orders; it is available on the Court's website. Oral motion to supplement the expert report is granted. Plaintiff is to serve the supplemental damages report by 12/21/18; an additional deposition, if necessary, should be scheduled for January; rebuttal reports are due by 2/15/19. At the parties' request, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kim for a settlement conference. Status hearing set for 1/31/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/2/18.Mailed notice(ca, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 83 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: For the reasons stated in the memorandum opinion and order, Midwest's motion for summary judgment #61 is granted as to Counts I, II, VI, and VII, and denied as to Counts III, IV, V, VIII, and IX. Puroon's motion for partial summary judgment #58 is denied. [For further details see memorandum opinion and order].Mailed notice (ca, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 82 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff Puroon, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment #58 is denied. Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc.'s cross-motion for summary judgment #61 is granted in part and denied in part. A written order will follow shortly. A status hearing is set for 11/6/18 at 9:00 a.m. so that the Court can set a trial date and a pre-trial schedule. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 12, 2018 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to withdraw as attorney #79 is granted. Anda Tatoiu is granted leave to withdraw as counsel. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 11, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Motion by Anda Tatoiu for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #79 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/30/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Tatoiu, Anda)
January 11, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION by Attorney Anda Tatoiu to withdraw as attorney for Puroon, Inc.. No party information provided (Tatoiu, Anda)
January 4, 2018 Filing 78 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. by Aaron Daniel Charfoos (Charfoos, Aaron)
January 3, 2018 Filing 77 REPLY by Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. to response in opposition to motion,, #69 , MOTION by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. for summary judgment #61 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Reply to Puroon's Statement of Additional Facts))(Oakley, James)
December 19, 2017 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff Puroon, Inc.'s motion to file under seal #74 portions of its reply brief in support of summary judgmentis granted. No appearance is necessary on 12/20/17. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 15, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE of Motion by Anda Tatoiu for presentment of motion to clarify #74 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/20/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Tatoiu, Anda)
December 15, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION by Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. to clarify Motion to Seal Portions of Puroon's Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Puroon's Brief (Redacted))(Tatoiu, Anda)
December 12, 2017 Filing 73 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff Puroon, Inc.'s motion to file under seal #70 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted as to Exhibits 2 and 4 of Puroon's reply brief in support of its motion for summary judgment #68 . It is denied as to the brief itself. Large portions of the brief do not contain Confidential Information. If Puroon wishes to file portions of the brief under seal, it should refile the motion and the brief in redacted form. No appearance is necessary on 12/13/17. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 5, 2017 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Michael Cohen regarding response in opposition to motion,, #69 (Amended) (Tatoiu, Anda)
December 4, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion by Anda Tatoiu for presentment of motion to seal, #70 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/13/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Tatoiu, Anda)
December 4, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION by Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. to seal Dkt. 68 Puroon's Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Midwest's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 2 through 4 of Cohen Declaration (Tatoiu, Anda)
December 4, 2017 Filing 69 RESPONSE by Puroon, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. for summary judgment #61 , MOTION by Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. for partial summary judgment #58 AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PUROON'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Reply to Midwest's Rule 56.1 Statement of Facts and Statement of Additional Facts, #2 Declaration (Second) of Elli Song, #3 Declaration of Michael Cohen, #4 Exhibit No. 1, #5 Exhibit Nos. 2 - 4 (REDACTED), #6 Exhibit No. 5, #7 Exhibit No. 6)(Tatoiu, Anda)
December 4, 2017 Filing 68 SEALED RESPONSE by Puroon, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion,, #59 , MOTION by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. for summary judgment #61 , memorandum in support of motion, #62 , MOTION by Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. for partial summary judgment #58 AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PUROON'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Supplement Unpublished decision, #2 Supplement Unpublished decision, #3 Supplement Unpublished decision, #4 Supplement Unpublished decision, #5 Supplement Unpublished decision, #6 Supplement Unpublished decision, #7 Supplement Unpublished decision, #8 Supplement Unpublished decision, #9 Supplement Unpublished decision, #10 Supplement Unpublished decision, #11 Exhibit No. 2 to Cohen Declaration, #12 Exhibit No. 3 to Cohen Declaration, #13 Exhibit No. 4 to Cohen Declaration)(Tatoiu, Anda)
November 21, 2017 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to withdraw as counsel of record #65 is granted. Aaron Charfoos is granted leave to withdraw as counsel. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 20, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Motion by Aaron Daniel Charfoos for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #65 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/29/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Charfoos, Aaron)
November 20, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION by Attorney Aaron D. Charfoos to withdraw as attorney for Puroon, Inc.. No party information provided (Charfoos, Aaron)
November 6, 2017 Filing 64 RESPONSE by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. to Rule 56 statement #60 (Oakley, James)
November 6, 2017 Filing 63 RULE 56 (c)(1) Statement by Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment #61 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Oakley, James)
November 6, 2017 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM by Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment #61 and Combined Response in Opposition to Puroon's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Dec. of Michael Daniel, #2 Exhibit 2 (Dec. of Holly Campbell, #3 Exhibit 3 (Dec. of Thaddeus Blenke))(Oakley, James)
November 6, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. for summary judgment (Oakley, James)
October 9, 2017 Filing 60 RULE 56 (c)(1) Statement by Puroon, Inc. regarding motion for partial summary judgment #58 (Charfoos, Aaron)
October 9, 2017 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM by Puroon, Inc. in support of motion for partial summary judgment #58 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Elli Song Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A1 - Non-Disclosure Agreement, #3 Declaration Aaron Charfoos Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B2 - Midwest E-mails, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B3 - Michael Daniel Dep. Transcript, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B4 - Midwest Responses to RTA, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B5 - Sae Kim Phone Call, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B6 - Midwest Responses to Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B7 - MPRC 000028, #10 Exhibit Exhibit B8 - Photograph of PMB, #11 Exhibit Group Exhibit B9 - Midwest Responses to Document Requests)(Charfoos, Aaron)
October 9, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION by Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. for partial summary judgment (Charfoos, Aaron)
September 7, 2017 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 9/7/17. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and memorandum shall be due by 10/9/17 and is limited to 15 pages. Defendant's response as well as cross motion shall be due by 11/6/17; the memorandum is limited to 25 pages. Plaintiff's response and reply memorandum shall be due by 12/4/17 and is limited to 25 pages; Defendant's reply memorandum shall be due by 1/3/18 and is limited to 15 pages; ruling will be by mail. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/15/2017 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2017. (Roth, Alexandra)
June 26, 2017 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion to strike #47 is denied. The court agrees with Defendant that the only order that applies to the issue raised by Plaintiff is the order of March 15, 2017, which extends fact discovery through June 30, 2017, (R. 40). While Plaintiff is correct that when the parties appeared before the court on March 15, 2017, they sought to extend the March 31, 2017 fact discovery deadline to complete the deposition of three witnesses. (R. 48-1 at 2-4.) However, when the court granted the request to extend the deadline, the court extended the deadline in general and did not limit it to fact depositions. (R. 40; R. 48-1 at 5.) As such, the court finds that Defendant's supplement of May 24, 2017, to be in compliance with Rule 26(e). In addition, Plaintiff does not and cannot claim harm here. Defendant supplemented its prior document disclosure with 33 additional pages of information. According to Plaintiff, these documents fall into three categories: "(a) a December 21, 2015 letter from [Defendant] to [Plaintiff] (id., MPRC000075-76[)]; (b) screenshots of what appears to be [Plaintiff's] website as of late 2016 (id., MPRC000077-84); and (c) patents and patent application publications, the most recent of which published in 2005 (id., MPRC000085-107)." (R. 48 at 4.) The first two categories of documents are documents that were already within Plaintiff's possession and knowledge. The third category of documents would have not altered Plaintiff's deposition of any fact witnesses as these were identified by Defendant's attorneys and not by any individual already deposed. Plus, these patent publications may become relevant during expert discovery. For these reasons, Plaintiff's motion to strike is denied. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Judge Honorable Young B. Kim no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 22, 2017 Filing 54 RESPONSE by Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. to strike Midwest's Untimely Document Production Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37 #47 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Campbell, Holly)
June 15, 2017 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion to strike #47 is entered and continued. Appearance is not necessary on June 16, 2017, to present this motion. Defendant has until June 22, 2017, to file a response to the motion. The court will rule electronically. Mailed notice (ma,)
June 13, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of Motion by Aaron Daniel Charfoos for presentment of motion to strike #47 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 6/16/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Charfoos, Aaron)
June 12, 2017 Filing 51 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: Plaintiff's motion to strike #47 .(ca, ).Mailed notice.
June 12, 2017 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendant's untimely document production #47 is referred to Magistrate Judge Kim. No appearance is required on 6/13/17.Mailed notice (ca, )
June 8, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Motion by Aaron Daniel Charfoos for presentment of motion to strike #47 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/13/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Charfoos, Aaron)
June 8, 2017 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM by Puroon, Inc. in support of motion to strike #47 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Charfoos, Aaron)
June 8, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION by Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. to strike Midwest's Untimely Document Production Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37 (Charfoos, Aaron)
May 24, 2017 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 5/24/17. The parties report that they were unable to settle the case and depositions have been scheduled. Fact discovery will close on 6/30/17. The parties should serve any expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2) by 7/31/17; the deposition of the expert should be completed by 8/31/17; rebuttal reports are due by 9/29/17. Status hearing set for 9/7/17 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
April 27, 2017 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In-person settlement conference held. Parties were unable to resolve the matter. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 21, 2017 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: At the parties' request, the settlement conference is rescheduled for April 27, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019. In light of this rescheduling, the deadlines for exchanging settlement position statements are also modified. Plaintiff to provide a settlement position statement to Defendant, with a copy to the court (proposed_order_kim@ilnd.uscourts.gov), by April 5, 2017. Plaintiff's position statement should include a copy of any written confidentiality or non-disclosure agreements executed by the parties. Defendant to respond in writing, with a copy to the court, by April 12, 2017. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 20, 2017 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Preliminary settlement discussion held by phone. Parties reported that they anticipate taking a total of three depositions. Parties also reported that they have been engaged in settlement discussions and that they would like to explore settlement options with the assistance of this court prior to moving forward with oral discovery. An in-person settlement conference is scheduled for April 5, 2017, at noon in courtroom 1019. If this date and time pose a scheduling conflict for those who are required to appear, parties must contact the court by noon tomorrow. If the settlement conference must be rescheduled, it will be rescheduled for April 27, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Parties are ordered to review and follow the court's standing order on "Settlement Conferences" on its webpage. The individuals with the authority to settle this matter must appear in person. Plaintiff to provide a settlement position statement to Defendant, with a copy to the court (proposed_order_kim@ilnd.uscourts.gov), by March 24, 2017. The position statement should include any written confidentiality or non-disclosure agreements executed by the parties. Defendant to respond in writing, with a copy to the court, by March 31, 2017. Defendant is also directed to provide Plaintiff a draft settlement and release along with its settlement statement so that Plaintiff is advised of the collateral terms Defendant will require to settle this matter. If the settlement position statements, along with exhibits, are more than 10 pages, parties must submit a hard copy by hand delivery or by mail to Chambers 1000. These settlement position statements are not to be filed with the clerk's office. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 15, 2017 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A preliminary settlement discussion with the attorneys of record is scheduled for March 20, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. by phone. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 15, 2017 Filing 41 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: Settlement conference.(ca, ).Mailed notice.
March 15, 2017 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 3/15/17. The parties report that they have reached an agreement and request a referral for a settlement conference. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kim for a settlement conference. Oral motion for an extension of fact discovery is granted. Fact discovery is extended until 6/30/17; this is the final extension. Status hearing set for 5/24/17 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. by Anda Tatoiu (Tatoiu, Anda)
January 30, 2017 Filing 38 AGREED Confidentiality Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/30/17. Mailed notice(ca, ).
January 30, 2017 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Joint motion for entry of agreed confidentiality #35 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 24, 2017 Filing 36 Joint NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Cohen for presentment of motion for protective order #35 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/31/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Cohen, Michael)
January 24, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION by Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. for protective order (Joint Motion for Agreed Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cohen, Michael)
January 19, 2017 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 1/19/17. Fact discovery shall close on 3/31/17. The parties should meet and confer within thirty days and contact the courtroom deputy if they would like a referral for a settlement conference. Status hearing set for 3/15/17 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 13, 2017 Filing 33 STATUS Report Joint by Puroon, Inc. (Charfoos, Aaron)
January 6, 2017 Filing 32 ANSWER to amended complaint by Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc.(Oakley, James)
December 9, 2016 Filing 31 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Puroon, Inc. against Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. (Charfoos, Aaron)
November 22, 2016 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 11/22/16. Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be due by 12/9/16. Defendants answer is due by 1/6/17. An updated status report is due by 1/13/17. Status hearing set for 1/19/17 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 21, 2016 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. to statement #28 Jurisdictional Amount in Controversy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oakley, James)
November 16, 2016 Filing 28 Statement Regarding Jurisdictional Amount in Controversy STATEMENT by Puroon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Charfoos, Aaron)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/1/16.Mailed notice(ca, ).
November 1, 2016 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/1/16.Mailed notice(ca, ).
November 1, 2016 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: For the reasons stated in the memorandum opinion and order, Midwests motion to transfer #14 is denied. [For further details see memorandum opinion and order.] Mailed notice (ca, )
October 19, 2016 Filing 24 REPLY by Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. to response to motion #23 , MOTION by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. to transfer case #14 (Campbell, Holly)
October 12, 2016 Filing 23 RESPONSE by Puroon, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. to transfer case #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Charfoos, Aaron)
September 22, 2016 Filing 22 STATUS Report JOINT INITIAL by Puroon, Inc. (Charfoos, Aaron)
September 21, 2016 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc.(Oakley, James)
September 21, 2016 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 9/21/16. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to transfer venue #14 is due by 10/12/16; reply due by 10/1916. Defendants motion for extension of time to answer plaintiff's complaint #18 is granted. The answer should be filed today. Plaintiff's request for default #17 is denied without prejudice. The deadline for Defendants answer is stayed until the ruling on the motion to transfer. Status hearing set for 11/22/16 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
September 20, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by James Leo Oakley for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #18 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/27/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Oakley, James)
September 20, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oakley, James)
September 19, 2016 Filing 17 REQUEST For Default for Failure to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron D. Charfoos, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Entry of Default)(Charfoos, Aaron)
September 16, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Holly Hannah Campbell for presentment of motion to transfer case #14 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/21/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Campbell, Holly)
September 16, 2016 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. in support of motion to transfer case #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Campbell, Holly)
September 16, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. to transfer case (Campbell, Holly)
August 25, 2016 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #11 is granted. Defendant's answer or responsive pleading shall be due by 9/16/16. The initial status hearing set for 9/14/16 is reset to 9/28/16 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file an initial status report as set forth in the Judge's standing order four business days prior to the status hearing. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
August 24, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by James Leo Oakley for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief #11 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/30/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Oakley, James)
August 24, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Oakley, James)
August 24, 2016 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. by Holly Hannah Campbell (Campbell, Holly)
August 24, 2016 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. by James Leo Oakley (Oakley, James)
August 22, 2016 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Puroon, Inc. as to Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. on 8/5/2016, answer due 8/26/2016. (Alton, Suzanne)
August 8, 2016 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 9/14/16 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file an initial status report as set forth in the Judge's standing order four business days prior to the status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, )
August 5, 2016 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc. (daj, )
August 4, 2016 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. by Michael I. Cohen (Cohen, Michael)
August 3, 2016 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Puroon, Inc. (Charfoos, Aaron)
August 3, 2016 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (mgh, )
August 3, 2016 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. by Suzanne Marie Alton (Alton, Suzanne)
August 3, 2016 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Puroon, Inc. by Aaron Daniel Charfoos (Charfoos, Aaron)
August 3, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Charfoos, Aaron)
August 3, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Puroon, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-12215716. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Charfoos, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puroon, Inc. v. Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puroon, Inc.
Represented By: Anda Tatoiu
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso
Represented By: Michael I. Cohen
Represented By: Aaron Daniel Charfoos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Photographic Resource Center, Inc.
Represented By: Holly Hannah Campbell
Represented By: James Leo Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?