Gonzalez v. Madigan et al

Plaintiff: Jason Gonzalez
Defendant: Michael J. Madigan, Friends of Michael J. Madigan, 13th Ward Democratic Organization, Prison Review Board, Shaw Decremer, Silvana Tabares, Ray Hanania, Joe Barbosa and Grasiela Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2016cv07915
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/17/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum opinion and order, the Court grants the defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's state law claims in part and denies it in part [dkt. no. 71]. The Court dismisses counts 5, 6, 11, 12, 17, 18, 20, 21, 29, 30, 31, and 32 of plaintiff's second amended complaint. The Court denies the defendants' motion to dismiss counts 38 and 39. (mk)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants Gonzales's motion [dkt. no. 53] to alter the judgment. The Court vacates the judgment entered on June 20, 2017 and directs the Clerk to reinstate the case. The Court also grants Gonzales leave to file his proposed second amended complaint asserting a claim under 42 U.S.C. 1985(3). Gonzales's second amended complaint alleges the exact same counts that were in his first amended complaint, plus newly asserted count 40, the section 1985(3) claim. Therefore, for the reasons described in this opinion, the Court dismisses counts 1-2, 4, 7-8, 10, 13-14, 16, 19-22, 24-26, 28, 34, and 36 in plaintiff's second amended complaint. The Court also dism isses count 37 in the second amended complaint as against Hanania only. In addition, the Court dismisses any claim to the extent it is brought against Madigan and Tabares in their official capacities. Finally, the Court declines to strike Gonzales� 39;s request for injunctive relief. The ruling date of September 13, 2017 is converted to a status hearing on that date at 9:30 a.m. The Court will set at that time deadlines for making Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures, amending the pleadings and adding parties, and completing fact discovery. Counsel are to be prepared to propose appropriate deadlines. (mk)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/20/2017: For the reasons stated, the Court grants the joint defendants' motion to dismiss [dkt. no. 48]. And because it is apparent that Gonzales cannot make allegat ions plausibly supporting a contention that one or more of the defendants acted under color of state law, there is no good reason to give him further attempts to amend. The Court directs the Clerk to enter judgment dismissing with prejudice counts 1-4, 7-10, 13-16, 23-28, and 33-37 of the amended complaint and dismissing for lack of subject matter jurisdiction counts 5-6, 11-12, 17-18, 20-22, 29-32, and 38-39 of the amended complaint. Mailed notice. (pjg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Madigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Gonzalez
Represented By: Anthony J. Peraica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Madigan
Represented By: Joel David Bertocchi
Represented By: Michael James Kasper
Represented By: J William Roberts
Represented By: Robert Thomas Shannon
Represented By: Gretchen Harris Sperry
Represented By: Adam Robert Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of Michael J. Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13th Ward Democratic Organization
Represented By: Michael James Kasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Review Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Decremer
Represented By: Michael Kreloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvana Tabares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hanania
Represented By: Michael Thomas Del Galdo
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Giambrone
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Barbosa
Represented By: James Patrick Nally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grasiela Rodriguez
Represented By: Scott Brent Erdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?