Maui Jim, Inc. v. SmartBuy Guru Enterprises et al

Plaintiff: Maui Jim, Inc.
Defendant: SmartBuy Guru Enterprises, Motion Global Ltd., Smartbuyglasses Societa a Responsabilita Limitata and SmartBuyGlasses Optical Limited
Case Number: 1:2016cv09788
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Peoria
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2018 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 2/26/2018: The Objections of defendants to Judge Gilbert's December 18, 2017 Order denying defendants' combined motion to clarify and for entry of a protective order 74 are overruled in their entirety. Mailed notice(mad, )
February 14, 2018 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order and discussed during the February 8 hearing, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants [ECF No. 76] to produce documents responsive to Plainti ff's first requests for production nos. 12 and 14-22 is granted. The documents should be produced forthwith. Against a background of continuing disagreements about whether one party or the other is producing documents timely, if the parties cannot agree when these documents will be produced, then Plaintiff can bring that issue to the Court. See attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 2/14/2018. Mailed notice(ber, )
January 23, 2018 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/23/2018: Maui Jim's motion to dismiss counterclaim 42 is granted in part and denied in part. Maui Jim's motion is denied with respect to Count VIII. Maui Jim� 39;s motion to dismissis granted as to SmartBuyGlasses' remaining counterclaims. Accordingly, Counts I, II, III are dismissed, without prejudice. In addition, Counts IV, V, and VI are stricken, without prejudice. Count VII is dismissed, with prejudice for failure to state a claim.Mailed notice(mad, )
November 27, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 11/27/2017. Mailed notice(lxs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maui Jim, Inc. v. SmartBuy Guru Enterprises et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maui Jim, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Gabrielides
Represented By: Michelle Miller Mikol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmartBuy Guru Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Global Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smartbuyglasses Societa a Responsabilita Limitata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmartBuyGlasses Optical Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?