Ronin Private Investments, LLC v. House of Matriarch et al
Plaintiff: Ronin Private Investments, LLC
Defendant: House of Matriarch, Christi Meshell, Keiretsu Capital, LLC and Nathan McDonald
Case Number: 1:2016cv09872
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal, this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. The 7/5/2017 status hearing is vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 30, 2017 Filing 48 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Complaint with Prejudice (Joint) (Newman, Lauren)
June 19, 2017 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 6/19/2017 with attorneys for all remaining parties. The parties have reached a settlement, subject to completing payment. Status hearing is continued to 7/5/2017 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 1, 2017 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held on 6/1/2017 with attorneys for both sides. Status hearing is continued to 6/19/2017 at 9:00 a.m. This will be an in-person status hearing. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 22, 2017 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Michael T. Mason:Because the parties have resolved this matter on their own, the settlement conference set for 5/23/17 is stricken; no appearance is necessary on that date. All matters relating the referral of this case having been completed, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. Judge Michael T. Mason no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (rbf, )
May 8, 2017 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held on 5/8/2017 with attorneys for all parties. Telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, is set for 6/1/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
April 4, 2017 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 4/4/2017 with attorneys for both sides. The Court made some suggestions to the parties regarding settlement. Telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, is set for 5/8/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 28, 2017 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held on 3/28/2017 with attorneys for all parties. Status hearing is continued to 4/4/2017 at 9:00 a.m. The primary purpose will be to discuss the possibility of settlement as to defendant Meshell. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 14, 2017 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint by Christi Meshell(Charkow, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2017 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Ruling on motion hearing held on 2/28/2017. Motion to dismiss #22 is denied for reasons stated in open court. Answer to complaint is to be filed by 3/14/2017. Fact discovery to be completed by 9/29/2017. Telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, is set for 3/28/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
February 9, 2017 Filing 39 REPLY by Christi Meshell to response to motion #34 to dismiss the complaint (Charkow, Jeffrey)
February 2, 2017 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Keiretsu Capital, LLC, Nathan McDonald by Bret A Finkelstein (Finkelstein, Bret)
February 2, 2017 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Keiretsu Capital, LLC, Nathan McDonald by Douglas W Greene (Greene, Douglas)
February 1, 2017 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Keiretsu Capital, LLC, Nathan McDonald by Bret A Finkelstein (Finkelstein, Bret)
January 30, 2017 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ronin Private Investments, LLC by Stephen Eliot Ross (Ross, Stephen)
January 26, 2017 Filing 34 RESPONSE by Ronin Private Investments, LLC to MOTION by Defendant Christi Meshell to dismiss #22 (Rownd, David)
January 20, 2017 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held on 1/20/2017 with attorneys for all parties who have appeared by counsel. The Court advised that discovery will not be stayed pending the settlement conference. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
January 18, 2017 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case is set for a telephone conference with Judge Kennelly on 1/20/2017 at 9:00 AM. Counsel are to jointly call chambers at that time, or alternatively are to provide a call-in number to chambers by no later than 4:00 PM on the previous day. (mk)
January 17, 2017 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Michael T. Mason:Status hearing held. Settlement conference set for 5/23/17 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 2266. Parties were not available on the earlier offered dates in March and May. Parties shall strictly abide by this Court's Standing Order for Settlement Conference. As stated on the record, all parties must appear in person for the conference. Plaintiff to submit copies of plaintiff's demand letter, as well as defendants' response letters to chambers, room 2270, by 5/18/17. Mailed notice (rbf, )
January 11, 2017 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Michael T. Mason: Status hearing set for 1/17/2017 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 2266 for the sole purpose of scheduling a settlement conference. Mailed notice. (rbf, )
January 5, 2017 Filing 29 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Michael T. Mason for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
January 5, 2017 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held in chambers with attorneys for all parties other than defendant House of Matriarch. Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses Count 7 without prejudice. Defendant House of Matriarch is held in default with respect to Counts 1, 2, 3, and 6 of the complaint. Prove-up date to be set later. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are to be made by 2/9/17. On defendant Meshell's motion to dismiss or transfer #22 , the request for dismissal for lack of personal jurisdiction is denied, because it is argued only on the basis of what is alleged in the complaint, and the sorts of details that defendant says are missing need not be pleaded in a complaint. Plaintiff is directed to respond to the remainder of the motion to dismiss or transfer by 1/26/2017, and defendant is directed to reply to the response by 2/9/2017. Ruling on motion and status hearing are set for 2/28/2017 at 9:30 AM. The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Mason to conduct a settlement conference. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
January 5, 2017 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The applications of Douglas Greene and Bret Finkelstein to appear pro hac vice are granted. These attorneys are directed to promptly contact the Clerk of Court to establish e-filing accounts in this district if they have not already done so. (mk)
January 4, 2017 Filing 26 Corporate Ownership Disclosure Statement by Keiretsu Capital, LLC (Bucheit, John)
January 4, 2017 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the date and time for presentment of defendant Meshell's motion to dismiss or transfer is advanced to the previously set status hearing on 1/5/2017 at 9:00 AM. (mk)
January 3, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion to dismiss #22 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/10/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey)
January 3, 2017 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Christi Meshell in support of motion to dismiss #22 (Charkow, Jeffrey)
January 3, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Christi Meshell to dismiss (Charkow, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2016 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Keiretsu Capital, LLC, Nathan McDonald(Bucheit, John)
December 13, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12657899. Bret A. Finkelstein (Bucheit, John)
December 13, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12657842. Douglas W. Greene (Bucheit, John)
December 7, 2016 Filing 18 Corporate Ownership Disclosure Statement for Plaintiff Ronin Private Investments, LLC STATEMENT by Ronin Private Investments, LLC (Newman, Lauren)
November 29, 2016 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 1/5/2017 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
November 22, 2016 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Christi Meshell by Daniel Aaron Dorfman (Dorfman, Daniel)
November 22, 2016 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Christi Meshell by Jeffrey B. Charkow (Charkow, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2016 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The agreed motion of defendants McDonald and Keiretsu Capital LLC for extension of time #8 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 12/15/2016. (mk)
November 15, 2016 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed as to House of Matriarch on 11/6/2016. Answer due 11/27/2016 (Rownd, David)(Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office) Modified on 11/16/2016 (mc, ).
November 15, 2016 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed as to Keiretsu Capital (DE) on 10/25/2016 answer due 11/15/2016. (Rownd, David)(Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office) Modified on 11/16/2016 (mc, ).
November 15, 2016 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed as to Keiretsu Capital, LLC (WA) on 10/26/2016. Answer due 11/16/2016 (Rownd, David) (Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office). Modified on 11/16/2016 (mc, ).
November 15, 2016 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed as to Christi Meshell on 11/6/2016. Answer due 11/27/2016 (Rownd, David)(Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office). Modified on 11/16/2016 (mc, ).
November 15, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by John E. Bucheit for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief #8 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/22/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Bucheit, John)
November 15, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Keiretsu Capital, LLC, Nathan McDonald for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Bucheit, John)
November 15, 2016 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Keiretsu Capital, LLC, Nathan McDonald by Peter S. Roeser (Roeser, Peter)
November 15, 2016 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Keiretsu Capital, LLC, Nathan McDonald by John E. Bucheit (Bucheit, John)
November 2, 2016 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Christi Meshell (pg, )
October 24, 2016 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants House of Matriarch, Keiretsu Capital, LLC, Nathan McDonald, Christi Meshell. (kms)
October 20, 2016 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ronin Private Investments, LLC by Lauren Newman AMENDED (Newman, Lauren)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ronin Private Investments, LLC by Lauren Newman (Newman, Lauren)
October 20, 2016 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ronin Private Investments, LLC by David Matthew Rownd (Rownd, David)
October 20, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rownd, David)
October 20, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ronin Private Investments, LLC; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-12486598. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rownd, David)
October 20, 2016 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (dc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronin Private Investments, LLC v. House of Matriarch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House of Matriarch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Meshell
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Dorfman
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keiretsu Capital, LLC
Represented By: Bret A Finkelstein
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: John E. Bucheit
Represented By: Peter S. Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan McDonald
Represented By: Bret A Finkelstein
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: John E. Bucheit
Represented By: Peter S. Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronin Private Investments, LLC
Represented By: David Matthew Rownd
Represented By: Lauren Newman
Represented By: Stephen Eliot Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?