Johnson v. City Of Chicago et al

Plaintiff: David E Johnson
Defendant: City Of Chicago, Det. Murphy, Det. Stover and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2017cv01961
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order: In the appeal taken by prisoner plaintiff David Johnson ("Johnson") from this Cour's dismissal, on statute of limitations grounds, of his pro se Complaint and action against the City of Chicago ("City"), Jo hnson has filed a motion for in forma pauperis treatment at the Court of Appeals level on July 10, 2017 (Dkt. No. 27). Because this Court has already dealt with that subject in its July 10, 2017 memorandum order, that motion is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/17/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
July 10, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/10/2017. Mailed notice(cc, )
May 15, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order: In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Order, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 16 is denied. See Order for further details. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/15/2017. Mailed notice(ep, )
March 29, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/29/2017. Mailed notice(cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?