Johnson Sr. v. Frain et al

Plaintiff: Allen Johnson Sr.
Defendant: Kevin Frain, D Holcomb, John Doe, Tarry Williams, Asst. Warden Lamb, Asst. Warden Nicholson, Saleh Obaisi and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv02000
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/25/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
May 10, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, plaintiff's in forma pauperis application is denied. Plaintiff's motions for attorney representation 3 and 13 are denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/10/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
March 29, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order: Because this Court's recent memorandum order (the "Order," issued on March 24) identified Stateville Correctional Center ("Stateville") inmate Allen Johnson Sr. ("Johnson") as "the unusual (al most unique) pro se prisoner plaintiff who has actually paid the $400 filing fee up front," the Order addressed a Clerk's-Office-supplied form that Johnson had filed contemporaneously with his Complaint: a Motion for Attorney Represent ation ("Motion"). In that respect, to enable Johnson to pursue the Motion, the Order directed that he be sent copies of another Clerk's-Office-supplied form -- an In Forma Pauperis Application ("Application") -- whose comple tion would enable this Court to determine whether Johnson had demonstrated a financial condition that would qualify him for obtaining the legal services of a member of this District Court's trial bar. There is however one other aspect of Johnson 's perhaps unique status that requires attention. Because he has not qualified for the special form of in forma pauperis ("IFP") status available to prisoner plaintiffs under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 ("Section 1915") as the resu lt of his payment of the full filing fee, he is not in a position to invoke the provision of Section 1915(d)that obligates "officers of the court" (meaning the United States Marshals Service) to serve process on his targeted defendants. Th at should not however pose any difficulty for him, because the Rules of Civil Procedure (in this instance Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(2)) permit "[a]ny person who is at least 18 years old and not a party" to serve the summons and Complaint. That m eans that Johnson can authorize anyone who fits that undemanding description to do so. Needless to say, Johnson is also free to pursue his effort to obtain representation by counsel in the manner specified in the Order and, if he is successful in that respect, to request the designated counsel to take care of the service of process on the named defendants. This Court will await an appropriate communication by Johnson. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/29/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
March 24, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, this Court is contemporaneously transmitting to Johnson, together with a copy of this memorandum order three unfilled-out copies of the Clerk's-Office-supplied In Forma Pauperis A pplication. Johnson should complete that form and transmit two counterparts to the Court, one addressed to the Clerk's Office for filing and the other to this Court as its Judge's Copy. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/24/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Sr. v. Frain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Johnson Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Frain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst. Warden Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst. Warden Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saleh Obaisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?