Alan Ross Machinery Corporation v. Machinio Corp.

Plaintiff: Alan Ross Machinery Corporation
Defendant: Machinio Corp.
Case Number: 1:2017cv03569
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order; For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Machinio's motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, R. 56 , is granted with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/22/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Machinio's motion to dismiss the complaint, R. 42 , is granted. Plaintiff Alan Ross Machinery's Lanham Act claim is dismissed with prejudice. The Court will allow Alan Ro ss to file a second amended complaint if it believes it can cure the deficiencies identified in this opinion with respect to its copyright allegations. Any motion for leave to file a second amended complaint shall be filed by December 7, 2018. The mo tion should attach a redlined comparison between the current complaint and the proposed amended complaint, and it should be supported by a brief of no more than five pages describing how the proposed amended complaint cures the deficiencies in the current complaint. Machinio is not to file a response unless directed to do so by the Court. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/16/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Machinio's motion to dismiss the complaint, R. 16 , is granted without prejudice. If Plaintiff Alan Ross Machinery believes it can cure the deficiencies identified in this opi nion, it may file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint on or before July 30, 2018. The motion should attach a redlined comparison between the current complaint and the proposed amended complaint, and it should be supported by a brief of no more than five pages describing how the proposed amended complaint cures the deficiencies in the current complaint. Machinio is not to file a response unless directed to do so by the Court. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/9/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alan Ross Machinery Corporation v. Machinio Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Ross Machinery Corporation
Represented By: Brian S. Feldman
Represented By: Kyle G. Fonjemie
Represented By: John M Sheldon
Represented By: Elliot Scott Wiczer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machinio Corp.
Represented By: Susan M. Razzano
Represented By: James B. Speta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?