Boim et al v. American Muslims for Palestine et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Boim and Stanley Boim
Defendant: Osama Abu Irshaid, American Muslims for Palestine, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation and Rafeeq Jaber
Case Number: 1:2017cv03591
Filed: May 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Because the motion to dismiss at docket number #188 is identical to the motion to dismiss at docket number #189 , the Court strikes the motion at 188 as a duplicate. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 REPLY by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation to response in opposition to motion, #206 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Jump, Christina)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 REPLY by Rafeeq Jaberin Support of MOTION by Defendant Rafeeq Jaber to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #197 (Jump, Christina) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 5/28/2020) (pj, ).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 6/8/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: On the Court's own motion pursuant to 2(c) of the Third Amended General Order 20-0012, defendants' reply briefs as to their motions to dismiss #188 , #189 , #197 are due on or before 5/29/2020. Once the motions are fully briefed, the Court will take them under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file documents provisionally under seal #207 is granted. No appearance necessary on 3/24/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE of Motion by Seth Corthell for presentment of motion to seal #207 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/24/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Corthell, Seth)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to seal Response in Opposition to Dkts. 189 and 197 and Exhibits D, E, F, J, and K thereto (Corthell, Seth)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESPONSE by Joyce Boim, Stanley Boimin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, American Muslims for Palestine to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #189 , MOTION by Defendant Rafeeq Jaber to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #197 (Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit L)(Corthell, Seth)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SEALED RESPONSE by Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to MOTION by Defendants Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, American Muslims for Palestine to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #189 , MOTION by Defendant Rafeeq Jaber to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #197 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit K)(Corthell, Seth)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' agreed motion to extend briefing schedule and combine briefs #201 is granted. Plaintiffs' response to the defendants' motion to dismiss to be filed by 3/13/2020. Plaintiffs may combine their response in a single brief of up to 30 pages. Defendants' reply to be filed by 4/3/2020. No appearance necessary on 3/3/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension and Request to File Combined Brief STATEMENT by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Rafeeq Jaber (Jump, Christina)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE of Motion by Seth Corthell for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #201 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/3/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Corthell, Seth)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #189 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #197 (Agreed Motion with respect to the week-long extension) (Corthell, Seth)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Rafeeq Jaber has refiled his motion to dismiss #197 , plaintiff's response is to be filed by 3/6/2020. Reply to be filed by 3/27/2020. No appearance necessary on 2/5/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Second NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #197 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/5/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of (Jump, Christina)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION by Defendant Rafeeq Jaber to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration)(Jump, Christina)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 1/28/2020. Defendant Rafeeq Jaber's motion to dismiss #186 is withdrawn. Defendant Jaber is given leave to file his Rule 12(b)(1) motion by 1/31/2020. Defendants AMP and AJP's for leave to file its Rule 12(b)(1)motion to dismiss under seal #191 is granted. Defendants AMP and AJP's motion to dismiss under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) #193 is withdrawn. Plaintiffs' response to defendants AMP and AJP's motion to dismiss under FRCP 12(b)(1) #188 to be filed by 3/6/2020. Reply to be filed by 3/27/2020. Status hearing is set for 6/8/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The matter was referred for discovery and settlement. All discovery relating to jurisdiction has been completed, an amended complaint has been filed as have motions to dismiss, and the parties have not expressed any interest in settlement discussions. We therefore terminate the referral. Mailed notice. (dal, )
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #193 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/28/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Combined Exhibits, #2 Supplement Unpublished Opinions Mentioned in Motion)(Jump, Christina)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion to seal document, #191 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/28/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation to seal document MOTION by Defendants Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, American Muslims for Palestine to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #189 , SEALED MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) #188 (Jump, Christina)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of Sealed motion, #188 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #189 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/28/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION by Defendants Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, American Muslims for Palestine to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits, #2 Supplement Unpublished Opinions Mentioned in Motion)(Jump, Christina)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SEALED MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Combined Exhibits, #2 Supplement Unpublished Opinions Mentioned in Motion)(Jump, Christina)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion to dismiss #186 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/28/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION by Defendant Rafeeq Jaber to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Supplement Unpublished Opinions Mentioned in Motion)(Jump, Christina)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the amended complaint #183 is granted. Responsive pleadings to be filed by 1/14/2020. No appearance necessary on 1/7/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Notice of Presentment of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #183 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/7/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Rafeeq Jaber for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint, #179 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Jump, Christina)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file documents provisionally under seal #180 is granted. No appearance necessary on 1/7/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Motion by Seth Corthell for presentment of motion to seal document #180 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/7/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Corthell, Seth)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to seal document sealed document #178 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Corthell, Seth)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Stanley Boim, Joyce Boim against American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Rafeeq Jaber and terminating Abdelbasset Hamayel and Osama Abu Irshaid (Corthell, Seth)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim First Amended Complaint (Corthell, Seth)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE by Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim of Filing of First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Corthell, Seth)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER: The Court, in its discretion, grants plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a first amended complaint brought pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2). [148, 149]. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/13/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorneys Stephen J. Landes, W. Allen Woolley, Michael B. Kind, and Joshua M. Fliegel's motion for leave to withdraw appearances of attorneys at Locke Lord, LLP #173 is granted. Attorneys Stephen J. Landes, William Allen Woolley, Joshua Michael Fliegel, and Michael Brett Kind terminated. No appearance necessary on 12/17/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Michael Fliegel for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #173 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/17/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Fliegel, Joshua)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION by Attorney Stephen J. Landes, W. Allen Woolley, Michael B. Kind, and Joshua M. Fliegel to withdraw as attorney for Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim. No party information provided (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The status hearing set for 6/3/2019 is stricken. The plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend #148 , #149 , being fully briefed, is taken under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPLY by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to sealed response, #164 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Corthell, Seth)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 5/8/2019: Mailed notice (lp, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: ENTER ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion to remove confidentiality designations (doc. # #156 - #157 ) is granted. Mailed notice (lp, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Defendants' motion for leave to file documents provisionally under seal (doc. #166 ) is granted; no appearance on the motion is required. Defendants are further given leave to file their response in opposition to plaintiffs' second motion to remove confidentiality designations provisionally under seal. Mailed notice. (jj, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Notice of Presentment for Motion for Leave to File Under Seal NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion for leave to file #166 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 5/8/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Jump, Christina)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for leave to file Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Jump, Christina)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 RESPONSE by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaberin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations (redacted) #157 Redacted Response in Opposition (Jump, Christina)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 SEALED RESPONSE by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations #156 In Opposition (Jump, Christina)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The plaintiffs' motion #161 is granted in part and denied in part. The Court declines to convert the defendants' response brief into a motion to dismiss. The Court grants the plaintiffs' request for an extension of time. Accordingly, the plaintiffs' reply is due by 5/17/2019. Once fully briefed, the matter will be taken under advisement. No appearance necessary on 4/30/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Motion by Seth Corthell for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #161 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/30/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Corthell, Seth)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to (1) Convert Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint to a Motion to Dismiss and (2) Extend the Deadline or Set a Date for Plaintiffs to File a Reply and/or Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Corthell, Seth)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 RESPONSE by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaberin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim for leave to file First Amended Complaint #149 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim for Leave to File an Amended Complaint #148 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Courtesy Copies of Cases)(Jump, Christina)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Plaintiffs have filed a motion to remove confidentiality designations (docs. #'s #156 - #157 ) and a motion for leave to file certain exhibits to the motion under seal (doc. #158 ). The motion for leave to file under seal Exhibits 1-5 and 8 to the motion to strike confidentiality designations (doc. #158 ) is granted. Defendants shall file any response to the motion to remove confidentiality designations by 4/29/19; no reply shall be filed. We will rule on the motion in writing. Mailed notice. (jj, )
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to seal document SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations #156 (Corthell, Seth)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations (redacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, 6, and 8, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 7)(Corthell, Seth)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 8)(Corthell, Seth)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The parties agreed request for extension of time #153 is granted. The defendant's response is due by 4/24/2019. Reply due by 5/3/2019. No appearance necessary on 4/17/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #153 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/17/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for leave to file #149 Agreed Request for Extensions of Time (Jump, Christina)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 4/4/2019. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file documents provisionally under seal #150 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Motion by Seth Corthell for presentment of motion to seal #150 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/4/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Corthell, Seth)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Exhibits Thereto (Corthell, Seth)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Corthell, Seth)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Corthell, Seth)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02-06-2019 before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Order Number: 33618. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/transcript-order-form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 4/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2019. (Warren, Pamela)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/6/19 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Order Number: 33689. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019. (Labella, Nancy)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, defendant's motion to redact transcript (doc. #142 ) is denied. The Court will not set a further status hearing at this time. Mailed notice. (jj, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: At the request and by agreement of the parties, the motion hearing set for 2/26/19 regarding defendant's motion to redact transcript (doc. #142 ) before the magistrate judge is RESET to 3/05/19 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Presentment of NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of Motion to Redact Transcript #142 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 2/26/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Jump, Christina)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION to Redact transcript #134 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Redaction Request)(Jump, Christina)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report that they have completed jurisdictional discovery and that plaintiff will be filing an amended complaint before the district judge. In light of the parties' report, the Court will not set a further status hearing at this time. Mailed notice. (jj, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 2/6/2019. Parties report that jurisdictional discovery was completed at the end of January. Plaintiffs to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint by 3/29/2019. Defendants response to the motion to be filed by 4/19/2019. Plaintiffs reply, if necessary, to be filed by 4/26/2019. Status hearing is set for 6/3/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Transcript Redaction Request re #134 transcript,,, by attorney Christina A Jump (Jump, Christina)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 2/1/2019 is stricken and reset to 2/6/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties need not appear until their status hearing with Magistrate Judge Schenkier is concluded. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: In light of the Court's closure due to inclement weather, the status hearing set for 1/30/19 before the magistrate judge is RESET to 2/06/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Due to the inclement weather, the status hearing set for 1/30/2019 is stricken and reset to 2/1/2019 at 10:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The status hearing set for 1/18/2019 is stricken and reset for 1/30/2019 at 9:30 AM. The parties need not appear until their status hearing with Magistrate Judge Schenkier is concluded. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/18/18 before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Order Number: 33239. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2019. (Mullen, Patrick)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time (doc. #131 ) is granted; no appearance on the motion is required. The deposition of Mr. Abuirshaid shall take place on 1/28/19. In all other respects, the deadlines set in the 12/20/18 order remain unchanged. The status hearing with the magistrate judge set for 1/30/19 remains unchanged. Mailed notice. (jj, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #131 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 1/10/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Jump, Christina)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for extension of time to complete discovery UNOPPOSED (Jump, Christina)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SEALED RESPONSE by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to response in opposition to motion,, #114 CORRECTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibits)(Jump, Christina)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to file corrected exhibits to their response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for leave to take two additional depositions, to compel answers to deposition questions, and to compel further document production (doc. #118 ) is granted; no appearance on the motion is required. Defendants are further given leave to file their corrected exhibits with respect to document #114 as promptly as possible. Mailed notice. (jj, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Correction regarding 126 (cc, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status and motion hearings held. Without objection, plaintiffs' and defendants' motions for leave to file documents provisionally under seal #110 , #116 , #119 , #120 , #124 are granted. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to take two additional depositions, to compel answers to deposition questions, and to compel further document production #106 , #108 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (1) by 1/31/19, Plaintiffs may take the depositions of Hatem Bazian and Salah Sarsour for a period not to exceed three hours each limited to questioning relevant to the alter ego issue; (2) with respect to questioning of Mr. Jaber for which there were instructions not to answer, by 01/18/19 defendants shall serve on plaintiff's counsel a declaration or affidavit from Mr. Jaber stating whether he agreed with the cited statements in the document on which he was questioned; (3) with respect to the questioning of Mr. Abuirshaid, by 01/18/19 he shall be produced for a reconvened deposition by telephone, not to exceed one hour in length, to answer the questions on which he was instructed not to answer at Pages 160-164 and 286-290; and (4) by 01/18/19, defendants shall produce the current mailing list for newsletters which will be treated by plaintiffs' counsel under an attorney's eyes only restriction. In all other respects, the motion is denied. This matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 1/30/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (cc, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ENTERED IN ERROR (cc, ).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Motion by William Allen Woolley for presentment of motion to seal document #124 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/20/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Woolley, William)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to seal document reply #123 (Woolley, William)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SEALED REPLY by Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to reply, #122 (unredacted) (Woolley, William)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to response in opposition to motion,, #114 , motion to take deposition,,, motion to compel,, #106 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O, #3 Exhibit P, #4 Exhibit Q, #5 Exhibit R, #6 Exhibit S)(Woolley, William)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion for leave to file, #120 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Jump, Christina)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for leave to file CORRECTED Exhibits to Response in Opposition Provisionally Under Seal (Jump, Christina)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SEALED MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber re Document 114 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CORRECTED Unredacted Exhibits to Response in Opposition, #2 Exhibit Corrected Unredacted Response in Opposition)(Jump, Christina)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for leave to file CORRECTED EXHIBITS TO DOC 114 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Combined Redacted Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Corrected Response in Opposition)(Jump, Christina)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion for leave to file, #116 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Jump, Christina)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for leave to file MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT PROVISIONALLY UNDER SEAL (Jump, Christina)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 SEALED RESPONSE by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to take deposition of Hatem Bazian and Salah Sarsour andMOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to compel Answers to Deposition Questions, And to Compel Further Document Production #106 UNREDACTED TEXT IN RESPONSE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts from July 12, 2018 hearing)(Jump, Christina)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RESPONSE by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaberin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to take deposition of Hatem Bazian and Salah Sarsour andMOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to compel Answers to Deposition Questions, And to Compel Further Document Production #106 REDACTED IN PART (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts from July 12, 2018 hearing)(Jump, Christina)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Motion by William Allen Woolley for presentment of motion to seal, #110 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Woolley, William)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to take deposition of Hatem Bazian and Salah Sarsour andMOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to compel Answers to Deposition Questions, And to Compel Further Document Production #106 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C (to Motion to Compel), #2 Exhibit D (to Motion to Compel), #3 Exhibit E (to Motion to Compel), #4 Exhibit F (to Motion to Compel))(Woolley, William)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Motion by William Allen Woolley for presentment of (Woolley, William)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to seal Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take Two Additional Depositions, to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions, and to Compel Further Document Production and Exhibits Thereto (Woolley, William)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim Exhibit A to Sealed Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M)(Woolley, William)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim (Woolley, William).
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Motion by William Allen Woolley for presentment of motion to take deposition,,, motion to compel,, #106 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Woolley, William)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to take deposition of Hatem Bazian and Salah Sarsour and, MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to compel Answers to Deposition Questions, And to Compel Further Document Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D (Redacted), #5 Exhibit E (Redacted), #6 Exhibit F (Redacted), #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I (Sealed in full), #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Woolley, William)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier:Status hearing held. Defendants' attorney, Christina Anne Jump, appeared by phone. The parties report on the status of depositions. The parties are to meet and confer regard plaintiffs' request to take two additional depositions to pursue certain written discovery in connection with the jurisdictional issues. If the parties are unable to reach agreement on those matters, Plaintiffs shall file any motion to compel by 12/7/18 and notice it for hearing on the date of the next status hearing. The matter is set for a status hearing and a motion hearing for 12/18/18 at 10:00 a.m. If plaintiffs do not file a motion to compel, the Court will strike the status hearing. Mailed notice. (cc, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 10/26/2018 is stricken and reset to 1/18/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. This matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 11/20/18 at 9:00 a.m. Defense counsel, Christina Anne Jump, is granted leave to participate by telephone. Defense counsel shall contact Judge Schenkier's Courtroom Deputy, Jenny Jauregui, by no later than 11/15/18 to provide contact information for the telephone conference. Mailed notice. (jj, )
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: At the request and by agreement of the parties, the deadline for the parties to take the four depositions authorized by the Court's 7/12/18 order is extended. The four depositions shall take place between 10/10/18 and 11/09/18. The status hearing set for 9/13/18 before the magistrate judge is RESET to 10/16/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 9/5/2018. Mailed notice. (jj, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: ENTER ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion challenging defendants' designations of documents as confidential (doc. #'s #84 - #85 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Mailed notice. (jj, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPLY by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to response in opposition to motion, #95 , Sealed motion, #84 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Woolley, William)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Defendants' motion for leave to file an Exhibit to defendants' response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to remove designation provisionally under seal (doc. #96 ) is granted. Defense counsel is further given leave to provisionally file Exhibit D (doc. #97 ) of defendants' response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to remove improper confidentiality designations (doc. #95 ) under seal. Mailed notice. (jj, )
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber Exhibit D to Doc 95 (Jump, Christina)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for leave to file Exhibit Provisionally Under Seal (Jump, Christina)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaberin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations (redacted) #85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Jump, Christina)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/12/2018 before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Order Number: 31468. Court Reporter Contact Information: Judith A. Walsh, CSR, RDR, F/CRR. Official Court Reporter. judith_walsh@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 8/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2018. (Walsh, Judy)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 7/30/2018 is stricken and reset to 10/26/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The Court has reviewed the joint statement of the parties regarding the jurisdictional discovery to be completed pursuant to the Court's 7/12/18 order (doc. #91 ). As proposed in the joint statement, defendants shall supplement their written discovery responses by 8/27/18. The four depositions authorized by the Court's 7/12/18 order shall take place between 9/26/18 and 10/26/18. The matter is set for a status hearing with the magistrate judge on 9/13/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 JOINT STATEMENT by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber Deadlines for Discovery Supplements (Jump, Christina)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: MOTION HEARING HELD. For the reasons fully stated on the record: (1) we grant plaintiff's motion to file documents provisionally under seal (doc. # 80); (2) we grant in part and deny in part plaintiff's motion to compel (doc. # 54). By 07/23/18, the parties shall file a joint statement proposing a deadline for defendants to produce the discovery required by the Court's rulings on the record, with depositions to commence no sooner than 30 days after the production has been completed and to be completed 30 days after that. As agreed by the parties, defendants' response to discovery requests asking for information concerning "network entities" and "network persons" is not an admission by defendants that any such "networks" exist and shall not be asserted by plaintiffs to be such an admission. Any discovery produced by the defendants concerning donors or sponsors may be designated as confidential under the confidentiality order; (3) defendants' motion to quash and for protective order (doc. # 65) is granted in part and denied in part. We deny the motion insofar as it seeks to foreclose any further production of information as to written discovery requests that already have been served, and we deny the request to quash the four deposition notices. We deny the defendants' oral motion to limit the depositions to three hours each. We deny the defendants' oral motion to bar any questioning for the period after 12/31/10, but reminded plaintiffs of the Court's determination that information for the period after that date is of marginal relevance at best and that any inquiry into that time period should be extremely limited. We grant the motion insofar as it seeks to prevent the issuance of any additional requests for depositions or other discovery. No further discovery may issue absent written agreement of the parties or Court order; and (4) we set the following briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion to remove confidentiality designations (doc. # 84-85): defendants shall respond by 08/13/18, and plaintiff shall reply by 08/27/18. We will set a further status hearing after reviewing the report that the parties file on 07/23/18. Mailed notice (np, )
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/17/18 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Order Number: 30929. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (Mccullough, Tracey)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OBJECTIONS by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations (redacted) #85 , reply #82 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations #84 , sur-reply #83 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jump, Christina)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The Court RESETS the TIME of the status and motion hearings regarding plaintiffs' motion for leave to file documents provisionally under seal (doc. #80 ), sealed motion to remove improper confidentiality designations (doc. #84 ), and redacted motion to remove improper confidentiality designations (doc. #85 ) before the magistrate judge to 7/12/18 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Motion by William Allen Woolley for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #85 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 7/12/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Woolley, William)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations (redacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10)(Woolley, William)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to Remove Improper Confidentiality Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Woolley, William)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to reply to response to motion,, #77 , reply to response to motion #76 (redacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woolley, William)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SEALED REPLY by Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to reply to response to motion,, #77 , reply to response to motion #76 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woolley, William)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Motion by William Allen Woolley for presentment of motion for leave to file #80 before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 7/12/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Woolley, William)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim for leave to file Documents Provisionally Under Seal (Woolley, William)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: At the request of the parties, the status hearing set for 7/05/18 before the magistrate judge is RESET to 7/12/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The status hearing set for 6/20/18 before the magistrate judge is RESET to 7/05/18 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPLY by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to response in opposition to motion, #73 , MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to quash deposition notices of defendants, and Motion for protective order as to fur #65 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jump, Christina)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY by Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to memorandum in opposition to motion, #74 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woolley, William)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman:No appearance is necessary before the District Court on 6/5/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The motions to quash and for protective order #65 that are noticed for presentment before this Court on 6/5/2018 have been referred to Magistrate Judge Schenkier, Status hearing set for 7/30/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber in Opposition to motion to compel #54 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jump, Christina)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE by Joyce Boim, Stanley Boimin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to quash deposition notices of defendants, and Motion for protective order as to fur #65 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Woolley, William)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STATUS Report (Joint) by Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim (Woolley, William)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order. Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 5/23/2018. (Exhibits). Mailed notice. (jj, )
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Enter Agreed Confidentiality Order. Mailed notice. (jj, )
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. Defendants' counsel, Christina Anne Jump, appears by telephone conference. The parties report on the status of the case. For the reasons stated on the record and by no later than 5/29/18, the parties are to file a joint status report as to whether there is any objection to Magistrate Judge Schenkier presiding over discovery in the case. Defendants' motion for entry of agreed confidentiality order (doc. #52 ) is granted. The parties are further instructed to submit their proposed agreed confidentiality order to Judge Schenkier's proposed order box by no later than the close of business day today. Defendants' emergency motion to quash and emergency motion for protective order (doc. #58 ) is terminated, as it is superseded by defendants' recently filed motion to quash and motion for protective order regarding requested discovery (doc. #65 ). By agreement, the Courts sets a briefing schedule regarding plaintiff's motion to compel complete responses to their first sets of jurisdiction document requests and interrogatories (doc. #54 ) and defendants' motion to quash and motion for protective order regarding requested discovery (doc. #65 ) as follows: the parties' responses are due by 5/29/18; the parties' replies are due by 6/05/18. The Court will notify the parties as to whether it wishes to hear oral argument on the motions. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 6/20/18 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber by Thomas Anthony Durkin (Durkin, Thomas)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUPPLEMENT to motion to quash, #65 Brief in Support of Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, with Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jump, Christina)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Notice of Presentment of Motion to Quash and for Protective Order NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion to quash, #65 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/5/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Jump, Christina)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to quash deposition notices of defendants, and Motion for protective order as to further discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jump, Christina)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE by All Defendants Designation of Local Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jump, Christina)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The Court, sua sponte, sets the matter for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 5/22/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement conference. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 5/17/2018. Counsel for Defendants appeared by phone. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Schenkier for discovery supervision and settlement. Defendants' motion for entry of agreed confidentiality order #52 and Plaintiffs' motion to compel complete responses to their first sets of jurisdiction document requests and interrogatories #54 are entered and continued to 6/5/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED motion to quash,,, motion for protective order,, #58 Amended Exhibit A, replacing Document 58.2, to reflect all relevant responses to date of both parties (Jump, Christina) (Document does not have a court caption,) Modified on 5/17/2018 (ek, ).
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED motion to quash,,, motion for protective order,, #58 Corrected Brief in Support Replacing Former 58.1, Corrected to Replace Erroneous Reference in Paragraph 8 and Paragraph Numbering (Jump, Christina)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to quash Emergency Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for protective order (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Jump, Christina)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim by Seth Corthell (Corthell, Seth)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM by Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim in support of motion to compel #54 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 1-5, #3 Exhibit 6-8, #4 Exhibit 9-13, #5 Exhibit 14-19)(Woolley, William)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Motion by William Allen Woolley for presentment of motion to compel #54 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/17/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Woolley, William)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to compel Complete Responses to Their First Sets of Jurisdiction Document Requests and Interrogatories (Woolley, William)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Motion by Christina A Jump for presentment of motion for protective order, #52 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/17/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for protective order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jump, Christina)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Minute entry #50 is amended to include: Accordingly, this Court will vacate its previous order dismissing the case without prejudice and permit plaintiffs to conduct discovery solely to address jurisdiction. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: On plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration dismissal of their complaint for lack of jurisdiction #43 and the motion is granted as set forth herein. Plaintiff moves for reconsideration pursuant to Rule 54(b) or, alternatively, Rule 59(e), arguing that this Court made a manifest error of law in ruling that plaintiffs had not sufficiently alleged an alter ego theory to establish subject matter jurisdiction. While this Court disagrees that it misapplied the law, upon further reflection, this Court placed too much weight to defendants' declarations without providing plaintiffs with the opportunity to conduct limited jurisdictional discovery on the existence of an alter ego relationship. Accordingly, this Court will vacate its previous order dismissing the case with prejudice and permit plaintiffs to conduct discovery solely to address jurisdiction. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to response in opposition to motion, #48 (Fliegel, Joshua)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaberin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order #41 #43 (Swift, Charles)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/6/17 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2017. (Mccullough, Tracey)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: By agreement of the parties, on plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration #43 , response due by 10/3/2017. Reply due by 10/18/2017. No appearance necessary on 10/3/2017. Mailed notice (rth)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Michael Fliegel for presentment of motion for reconsideration #43 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/3/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Fliegel, Joshua)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Michael Fliegel for presentment of motion for reconsideration #43 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/26/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Fliegel, Joshua)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order #41 (Fliegel, Joshua)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to this courts Memorandum Opinion and Order (#41) The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Plaintiffs motion to reassign case pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 (15) is denied as moot. Mailed notice (rth, )
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/18/2017. Mailed notice(rth, )
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may refile a complaint in the event that they further develop the allegations establishing an alter ego theory of liability. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order.Mailed notice (rth, )
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' motion to dismiss #31 being fully briefed, the status hearing set to 8/11/2017 is hereby stricken. No appearance necessary on 8/11/2017.Mailed notice (rth, )
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to Response #37 , MOTION by Defendants Abdelbasset Hamayel, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, American Muslims for Palestine, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to dismiss All Exhibits A-F #31 (Jump, Christina)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to motion to dismiss #31 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration))(Kind, Michael)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Christina Anne Jump for presentment of motion to dismiss #31 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/11/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Christina Anne Jump for presentment of (Jump, Christina)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages #29 is granted. No appearance necessary on 6/14/2017. Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages #28 is stricken as duplicative. Mailed notice (rth, )
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by All Defendants re MOTION by Defendant American Muslims for Palestine for leave to file excess pages #28 , MOTION by Defendants Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for leave to file excess pages #29 (Jump, Christina)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE by All Defendants re MOTION by Defendants Abdelbasset Hamayel, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, American Muslims for Palestine, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to dismiss All Exhibits A-F #31 (Jump, Christina)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION by Defendants Abdelbasset Hamayel, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, American Muslims for Palestine, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber to dismiss All Exhibits A-F (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jump, Christina)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Christina Anne Jump for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #28 , motion for leave to file excess pages #29 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/14/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Jump, Christina)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION by Defendants Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for leave to file excess pages (Jump, Christina)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Defendant American Muslims for Palestine for leave to file excess pages (Jump, Christina)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber by Christina Anne Jump Notice Of Appearance (Jump, Christina)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 6/6/2017. Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer #21 is granted. No appearance necessary on 6/13/2017. Consolidated motion to dismiss due by 6/12/2017. Response due by 7/11/2017. Reply due by 7/25/2017. Plaintiffs' motion to reassign case #15 is taken under advisement. Status hearing set for7/10/2017 is stricken and reset to 8/11/2017 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim by Alyza D Lewin (Lewin, Alyza)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim by Nathan Lewin (Lewin, Nathan)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE by American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaberin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to reassign case pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 #15 (Swift, Charles)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Charles D. Swift for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #21 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/13/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Swift, Charles)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION by Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber for extension of time to file answer (Swift, Charles)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber by Charles D. Swift (Swift, Charles)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Applications by Charles Davidson Swift #17 and Christina A. Jump #18 for leave to appear pro hac vice are granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13235637. for Christina A. Jump (Swift, Charles)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13234927. (Swift, Charles)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Michael Fliegel for presentment of motion to reassign case #15 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/6/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim to reassign case pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Motion for Reassignment)(Fliegel, Joshua)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Boim, Joyce Boim as to Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation on 5/18/2017, answer due 6/8/2017. (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Boim, Joyce Boim as to American Muslims for Palestine on 5/18/2017, answer due 6/8/2017. (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Boim, Joyce Boim as to Rafeeq Jaber on 5/21/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Boim, Joyce Boim as to Abdelbasset Hamayel on 5/16/2017, answer due 6/6/2017. (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing set for 7/10/2017 at 09:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report by 7/6/2017 in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Applications by Alyza D. Lewin #6 and Nathan Lewin #7 for leave to appear pro hac vice are granted. Mailed notice (rth, )
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim by William Allen Woolley (Woolley, William)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim by Stephen J. Landes (Landes, Stephen)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13168153. for Nathan Lewin (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13168111. for Alyza D. Lewin (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim by Michael Brett Kind (Kind, Michael)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim by Daniel I. Schlessinger (Schlessinger, Daniel)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joyce Boim, Stanley Boim by Joshua Michael Fliegel (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fliegel, Joshua)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stanley Boim, Joyce Boim; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13168012.(Fliegel, Joshua)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (lcw, )
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants American Muslims for Palestine, Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation, Abdelbasset Hamayel, Osama Abu Irshaid, Rafeeq Jaber (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boim et al v. American Muslims for Palestine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Boim
Represented By: William Allen Woolley
Represented By: Stephen J. Landes
Represented By: Joshua Michael Fliegel
Represented By: Michael Brett Kind
Represented By: Daniel I. Schlessinger
Represented By: Alyza D Lewin
Represented By: Seth Corthell
Represented By: Nathan Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Boim
Represented By: William Allen Woolley
Represented By: Stephen J. Landes
Represented By: Joshua Michael Fliegel
Represented By: Michael Brett Kind
Represented By: Daniel I. Schlessinger
Represented By: Alyza D Lewin
Represented By: Seth Corthell
Represented By: Nathan Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osama Abu Irshaid
Represented By: Charles D. Swift
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Durkin
Represented By: Christina Anne Jump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Muslims for Palestine
Represented By: Charles D. Swift
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Durkin
Represented By: Christina Anne Jump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdelbasset Hamayel
Represented By: Charles D. Swift
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Durkin
Represented By: Christina Anne Jump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americans for Justice in Palestine Educational Foundation
Represented By: Charles D. Swift
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Durkin
Represented By: Christina Anne Jump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafeeq Jaber
Represented By: Charles D. Swift
Represented By: Christina Anne Jump
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?