Herrera-Nevarez v. Ethicon, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Rocio Herrera-Nevarez |
Defendant: |
Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv03930 |
Filed: |
May 24, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside the State of IL |
Presiding Judge: |
Matthew F. Kennelly |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 23, 2018 |
Filing
348
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/23/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies defendants' renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law [dkt. no 321] and denies plaintiff's motion for a new trial [dkt. no. 322]. Defendants' motion for judgment as a matter of law [dkt. no. 296] and prior renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law [dkt. no. 311] are terminated as moot. Lastly, the Court grants plaintiff's bill of costs in part and denies it in part [dkt. no. 326]. The Court will tax defendants $28,813.63, plus the recalculated cost of fees for printed or electronically recorded transcripts (claimed as "fees of the court reporter" in the bill of costs). Herrera is to provide the requested recalculation within five days of entry of this order. The remainder of the bill of costs is overruled. (mk)
|
August 6, 2017 |
Filing
267
ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/6/2017. The Court rules on the parties motions in limine as stated in the accompanying order. Final ruling on two motions (defendants' motions 6 and 9) is deferred pending further discussion as stated in the order. The matter is set for a status hearing on 8/8/2017 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
|
June 15, 2017 |
Filing
196
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/15/2017: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies defendants' motion for summary judgment [dkt. no. 179]. The Court also denies Herrera-Nevarez's request for sanctions. (mk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?