Moore v. MB Financial Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: LaTanya Moore
Defendant: MB Financial Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2017cv04716
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF MANDATE of USCA dated 8/10/2018 regarding notice of appeal #39 ;USCA No.17-3546 ; No record to be returned. (yap, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 50 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT dated 8/10/2018 regarding notice of appeal #39 ; USCA No. 17-3546: Upon consideration of the NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, filed on August 10, 2018, by counsel for the parties, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (yap, )
April 16, 2018 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to withdraw Jeffrey D. Kaliel as attorney #47 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
March 28, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION by Attorney Jeffrey Kaliel to withdraw as attorney for LaTanya Moore. No party information provided (Kaliel, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2018 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for leave to withdraw appearance of Adam Prom #44 is granted. Motion hearing set for 1/11/2018 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
January 4, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by Adam Michael Prom for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #44 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/11/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Prom, Adam)
January 4, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION by Attorney Adam Prom to withdraw as attorney for LaTanya Moore. No party information provided (Prom, Adam)
December 15, 2017 Filing 43 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #39 ; USCA Case No. 17-3546 (nsf, )
December 14, 2017 Filing 42 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #39 . Notified counsel (ek, )
December 14, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #39 (ek, )
December 14, 2017 Filing 40 DOCKETING Statement by LaTanya Moore regarding notice of appeal #39 (Wallace, Edward)
December 14, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of appeal by LaTanya Moore regarding orders #37 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-13910005. (Wallace, Edward)
November 16, 2017 Filing 38 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Court grants MB Financial's motion to dismiss with prejudice #22 . It is so ordered. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/16/2017. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 6, 2017 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: MB Financial Bank, N.A. Motion for leave to file response to plaintiff's surreply #34 is granted. Motion hearing set for 11/14/2017 is stricken, no appearance is required. In court ruling set for 11/14/2017 is stricken, Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 2, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Vangel Panoff for presentment of motion for leave to file #34 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/14/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Panoff, Thomas)
November 2, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION by Defendant MB Financial Bank, N.A. for leave to file Response to Plaintiff's Surreply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Panoff, Thomas)
November 2, 2017 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a surreply in opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss #31 is granted. Motion hearing set for 11/7/2017 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 31, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey D Kaliel for presentment of motion for leave to file #31 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/7/2017 at 09:30 PM. (Kaliel, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION by Plaintiff LaTanya Moore for leave to file Surreply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kaliel, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2017 Filing 30 REPLY by MB Financial Bank, N.A. to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: #13 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #22 (Panoff, Thomas)
October 5, 2017 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by LaTanya Moore in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #22 (Streisfeld, Jonathan)
September 14, 2017 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Defendant MB Financial Bank, N.A.'s motion to dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint #22 is entered and briefed as follows: Response is due by 10/5/2017; Reply is due by 10/19/2017. In court ruling is set for 11/14/2017 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 12, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Correction regarding Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot(MIDP) #26 (nsf, )
September 12, 2017 Filing 26 ENTERED In Error Modified on 9/12/2017 (nsf, ).
September 11, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Correction regarding #22 . (jk, )
September 11, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Vangel Panoff for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #22 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/14/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Panoff, Thomas)
September 11, 2017 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by MB Financial Bank, N.A. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #22 (Panoff, Thomas)
September 11, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: #21 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Panoff, Thomas) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office 09/11/2017).
August 28, 2017 Filing 21 AMENDED complaint by LaTanya Moore against All Defendants Amended Class Action Complaint (Streisfeld, Jonathan)
August 10, 2017 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Defendant MB Financial Bank, N.A.'s motion to dismiss #15 is entered and briefed as follows: Response is due by 8/31/2017; Reply is due by 9/14/2017. Court will rule by mail. Status hearing set for 8/15/2017 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 9, 2017 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 8/15/2017 at 8:30 a.m. is re-set to 9:30 a.m. (TIME CHANGE ONLY) Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 7, 2017 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MB Financial Bank, N.A. by Jed Wolf Glickstein (Glickstein, Jed)
August 7, 2017 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by MB Financial Bank, N.A. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 (Panoff, Thomas)
August 7, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Vangel Panoff for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/10/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Panoff, Thomas)
August 7, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Panoff, Thomas)
August 7, 2017 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MB Financial Bank, N.A. (Panoff, Thomas)
August 7, 2017 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MB Financial Bank, N.A. by Thomas Vangel Panoff (Panoff, Thomas)
August 7, 2017 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MB Financial Bank, N.A. by Debra L Bogo-Ernst (Bogo-Ernst, Debra)
August 7, 2017 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MB Financial Bank, N.A. by Lucia Nale (Nale, Lucia)
August 7, 2017 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LaTanya Moore by Jeffrey D Kaliel (Kaliel, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2017 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 8/15/2017 at 8:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 20, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LaTanya Moore as to MB Financial Bank, N.A. on 7/19/2017, answer due 8/9/2017. (Prom, Adam)
July 14, 2017 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LaTanya Moore by Jonathan Marc Streisfeld (Streisfeld, Jonathan)
July 6, 2017 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LaTanya Moore by Adam Michael Prom (Prom, Adam)
July 6, 2017 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LaTanya Moore by Edward A. Wallace (Wallace, Edward)
June 27, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 400, receipt no. 0752-13309080, (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2017 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LaTanya Moore by Jeffrey M. Ostrow (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by LaTanya Moore; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13309132.(Ostrow, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2017 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant MB Financial Bank, N.A. (pg, )
June 23, 2017 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. MB Financial Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MB Financial Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Debra L Bogo-Ernst
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Jed Wolf Glickstein
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTanya Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Adam M. Prom
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey D Kaliel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?