Robert Carlyle v. Akorn, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert Carlyle |
Defendant: |
Akorn, Inc., John N. Kapoor, Kenneth S. Abramowitz, Adrienne L. Graves, Ronald M. Johnson, Steven J. Meyer, Terry A. Rappuhn, Brian Tambi and Alan Weinstein |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv05022 |
Filed: |
July 6, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside the State of IL |
Presiding Judge: |
Sharon Johnson Coleman |
Nature of Suit: |
Stockholders Suits |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 78 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 10, 2025 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached order, Frank's motion 129 is granted. The Court orders further briefing on the propriety of additional sanctions. Each Plaintiffs' attorney implicated in these cases is permitted a brief of not more than ten pages, due by 4/21/2025. Frank is permitted a reply brief of no more than 20 pages, due by 5/5/2025. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/10/2025. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
|
June 24, 2019 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Plaintiffs' cases should have been "dismissed out of hand." See id. at 724. Since the Court failed to take that action, the Court exercises its inherent authority to rectify the injustice that occurred as a result. See Dale M., ex rel. Alice M. v. Bd. of Educ. of Bradley-Bourbonnais High Sch. Dist. No. 307, 282 F.3d 984, 986 (7th Cir. 2002). The settlement agreements are abrogated and the Court orders Plaintiffs' counsel to return to Akorn the a ttorney's fees provided by the settlement agreements. Plaintiffs' counsel should file a status report by July 8, 2019 certifying that the fees have been returned.Dated: June 24, 2019 Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/24/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: In sum, Frank's motion for reconsideration 26 is denied in part and granted in part. He is not granted leave to intervene as a party. But his motion is granted insofar as the Court will exercise its inherent aut hority to apply the standard set forth by the Seventh Circuit in Walgreen to the settlement at issue in this case, and Frank is granted leave to file a brief as an amicus curiae as described above. Frank should file a notice in case 17 C 5018 by October 1, 2018, stating whether he will accept the Court's invitation to participate as amicus curiae. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/25/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
|
July 5, 2017 |
Filing
15
RULING and ORDER granting 3 MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Case transferred to District of Northern District of Illinois. The Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Ruling and order in each of the following actions: 17- cv-00359-BAJ-RLB Jorge Alcarez v. Akorn, Inc., et al; 17-cv-00367-BAJ-EWD Shaun A. House v. Akorn, Inc., et al; 17-cv-00373-BAJ-RLB Sean Harris v. Akorn, Inc., et al; 17-cv-00389-BAJ-RLB Robert Carlyle v. Akorn, Inc., et al; 17-cv-00395-BAJ-RLB Demetrios Pullos v. Akorn, Inc., et al. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/5/2017. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/6/2017.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Robert Carlyle v. Akorn, Inc., et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Robert Carlyle |
Represented By: |
Lewis S Kahn |
Represented By: |
Christopher James Kupka |
Represented By: |
Daniel Kuznicki |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Akorn, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Robert H. Baron |
Represented By: |
Robert B. Bieck, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Alexander Breckinridge, V |
Represented By: |
Anthony C. Porcelli |
Represented By: |
Sohil M. Shah |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John N. Kapoor |
Represented By: |
Robert H. Baron |
Represented By: |
Robert B. Bieck, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Alexander Breckinridge, V |
Represented By: |
Anthony C. Porcelli |
Represented By: |
Sohil M. Shah |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Kenneth S. Abramowitz |
Represented By: |
Robert H. Baron |
Represented By: |
Robert B. Bieck, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Alexander Breckinridge, V |
Represented By: |
Anthony C. Porcelli |
Represented By: |
Sohil M. Shah |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Adrienne L. Graves |
Represented By: |
Robert H. Baron |
Represented By: |
Robert B. Bieck, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Alexander Breckinridge, V |
Represented By: |
Anthony C. Porcelli |
Represented By: |
Sohil M. Shah |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ronald M. Johnson |
Represented By: |
Robert H. Baron |
Represented By: |
Robert B. Bieck, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Alexander Breckinridge, V |
Represented By: |
Anthony C. Porcelli |
Represented By: |
Sohil M. Shah |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Steven J. Meyer |
Represented By: |
Robert H. Baron |
Represented By: |
Robert B. Bieck, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Alexander Breckinridge, V |
Represented By: |
Anthony C. Porcelli |
Represented By: |
Sohil M. Shah |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Terry A. Rappuhn |
Represented By: |
Robert H. Baron |
Represented By: |
Robert B. Bieck, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Alexander Breckinridge, V |
Represented By: |
Anthony C. Porcelli |
Represented By: |
Sohil M. Shah |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Brian Tambi |
Represented By: |
Robert H. Baron |
Represented By: |
Robert B. Bieck, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Alexander Breckinridge, V |
Represented By: |
Anthony C. Porcelli |
Represented By: |
Sohil M. Shah |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Alan Weinstein |
Represented By: |
Robert H. Baron |
Represented By: |
Robert B. Bieck, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Alexander Breckinridge, V |
Represented By: |
Anthony C. Porcelli |
Represented By: |
Sohil M. Shah |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?