Abdi et al v. Scrub, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Jordan, Eusebio Calderon, Edgar Barajas, Miguel Cortez, Nnennaya Nkumeh, Angel Rios, Theoda Bynum, Robert Groce, Maria Garay, Katiyana Walls, Jesse Espinosa, Roberta Walker, Alexander Morales, Tony Retana, Vasyl Miz, Hassan Abdi, Portia Stevenson, Rafael Sola, Mariana Atanasova, Jasmine Greer, Jatesha Williams, Jamayri Calderon Fuentes, Dobrin Valev, Maria Bonete, Juan Carlos Leon, Czeslan Oleszewskik, Rhonda Butler, Vasyl Bartko, Angelica M.R., Armando Diaz Roman, Jaime Villagomez, Florije Purballari, Jorge L. Rodriguez, Adilia Colon, Shaher Mansur, Zdzislaw Mazurkiewicz, Martell Graham, Oliva Almaraz, Eledet Cortes, Zu Wang, Dennis Williams, Grazyna Magiera, Kobi Burks, Eyob Belachew, Anprzej Cwanek, Edwin Perez - Morales, Tiatisha Reed, Luz Lucero-Vargas, Andre Elrod, Kwaniqua Mcthay, Santiago Vargas, Callie Perry, Lucyna Solinska, Ramon Duenas, Jazzmine Robinson, Jerell Turner, Bogusia Buss, Vonda Wright, Akrour Ajamila, Nora Llarena, Wilfredo Soto Ortiz, Marie Kaoty, Robert Terry, Kim Lee, Maria Alvarez, Nicole D Dorsey, Hector Lopez, Mark Hawkins, Marek Maciej, Lyubou Morban, Ruperto Cortes, Javier Cubillo, Ilia Isallari, Like Asfaw, Lyndell Hodges, Eyerusalem Bekele, Carrie Marks, Agustina Briones Yuman, Robert Robinson, Delia Paez, Nicholas Hernandez, Ricardo Alicea, Santia Camacho-Ortiz, Nancy Acosta, Victoria Almaguer, Michael Houston, Genoveva Naut Gonzalez, Vone Hudson, Lucinda Woodridge-Carter, Scottie Hayes, Thomeesha Cobbs, Tunoka Jett, Ramiro Cieza, Dulce Maria Yerbes De Ramirez, Juan Acupina, Catarino Vega, Cassandra Warren, Delores Hawkins, Beverly F ranzen, Ada Resendez, Pamela Tillman, Charlita Hardy, Oralia Gerogorio Quezada, Nicholas Morales, Anthony Salazar-Carranza, Veronica Rojas, Leszek Magiera, Ma Lourdes Diaz, Alhdie Mhmede, Segundo Marinas-Araujo, Orissa Barksdale, Betzabel Serrano Nieves, Rifa Khosaba, Isidoro Contreras, Melissa Stevenson, Nepton Guerra Montalvo, Nydia Rodriguez, Zofia Borodziuk, Michelle Thompson, Gene Willingham, Rozalia Gazek, Gregory James, Ethelene Morrison, Concepcion Malinek, Dorota Cabala, Noel Brock, Mercedes Sanchez, Latricia Allen, Derrick Brown, Myeisha Grant, Yared Gebregziabher, Gerry Pointer Sr., Darrell Cain, Alanda Washington, Kathleen Mondie, Ana Hall, Aretha Davis, Francisco Rodriguez, Hilderto Gallardo, Milena Asenova, Diana Rosa, Jesus Garcia Figueroa, Jessie Padilla, Ernestina Naut-Gonzalez, Elidate Peroltade, Domitila Ovalle, Maria Sobier, Jasmine Jenkins, Edjar Vega, Hector Figuereo, Mariana Cruz, Gary Benjamin, Andrea Crumb, Valentine Whittaker, Natalia Hryciuk, Augusto Jurado, Marek Gurga, Lolita Cooper, Maria Knych, Maria Sycz, Demetruise Dye, Nkeyah Weathersby, Leonardo Marin, Jadwiga Pucilowska, Rosa Flores, Gacek Rozalia, Micheal Landa, Janice Fredericks-Williams, Tamara Hampton, Luz Lucero Vargas, Georgetta Williams, Angel Torres, Jose Pena, Sylvia Morris, Eloisa Avila, Edna Staples, John Pender, Jennifer Williams, Edward Turner, Pellump Purballari, Cassandra Austin, Wanita Hoyle, Nicole Garay, Rosa Aguilera, Kazimierz Grabowski, Diane Henderson, Leonard Wdzieczny, Deborah English, Jose J. Garcia, Silvina Morales De Salez, Desiderio Santiago, Josette White, Jose Resendez, Lucia Irazoquea, Olga Ortiz-Albino, Javier Espinoza, Adam Stankiewicz, Marva Billingslea, Palomina Hinton, Monique Love, Luicelia Raices, Judy Flynn, Gracia Kapinga Arina, Maranda Mitchell, Rebeca Medina, Jolanta Twarowska, Jose C. Martinez, Jaree Noel, Maricela Garro, Daniel Barajas, Maria Stolowska, Jose Seda, Rogatien Mboboshi, Chantel Hargrove, Angel Cifuentes, Eloina Moreno, Leonya Pickel, Julian Benitez Caez, Maureen Reed, Danny Vasquez, Darnell Gaither, Chresha Sawyer, Carla Jones, Spas Sirakov, Jose Sanchez, Rita Vega, Jerzy Omylak, Ernestine Johnson, Tranra Zubeva, Maria Weglarz, Stanley Garmon, Solinska Lucyna, Maribel Corrales-Nunez, Syed Qadri, Danny Smith, Icela Vallejo, Debbie Thompson, Krystyna Dopart, Enrique Ortega, Dora Andrade, Gustavo Fernandes, Dantonette Wallace, Sergio Sanchez, Lisa Posey, Kyle Anderson, Sheena Watts, Camille Cummings, James Lewis and Teresa Ballesteros
Case Number: 1:2017cv05136
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (air, )
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER of Final Approval of Settlement Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/16/2018: Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation of Settlement)(air, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION by Plaintiffs Hassan Abdi, Fernando Acono, Julia Acosta, Nancy Acosta, Juan Acupina, Ada Resendez, Imelda Adame, Antonio Adan, Mawuli Agblewonou, Angel Aguilar, Mirella Aguilar, Rosa Aguilera, Miguel Aguiniga-Gonzalez, Akrour Ajamila, Deneen Akins, Abdul Al Juboory, Abeba Alemu, Ricardo Alicea, Antonio Allen, Frederick Allen, Latricia Allen, Victoria Almaguer, Oliva Almaraz, Karen Alvarado, Maria Alvarez, Marta Alvarez Martinez, Anais Rocha, Brenda Anderson, Kyle Anderson, Dora Andrade, Angel Rios, Jorge Angeles, Bernardo Trujillo Antia, Annex Anyanwu, Petko Apostolov, April Rodgers, Janina Archacka, Irma Arriaga, Marta Arroyo, Antionetta Artis, Milena Asenova, Like Asfaw, Mariana Atanasova, Aubert Relucio, Cassandra Austin, Eden Avila, Eloisa Avila, Maria Ayala, Emiliette Ayi, Gelacio Bahena, William Baker, Teresa Ballesteros, James Baltimore, Daniel Barajas, Edgar Barajas, Tewodros Baraki, William Barcenas, Orissa Barksdale, Jovan Barnes-Cooper, Christopher Barrientos, Edgar Barrios, Vasyl Bartko, Omar Bassam, Bob Bassett, Beatriz Perez, Eyerusalem Bekele, Eyob Belachew, Karonda Bell, Josue Beltran, Julian Benitez Caez, Gary Benjamin, Sarah Bennett, Eric Benson, Ahreem Bentley, Freddie Berrios, Marian Bess, Maria Betancourt, Marva Billingslea, Sisson Billy, Will Binns, Tiara Bishop, Armando Blanco, John Bolden, Maria Bonete, Zofia Borodziuk, Gavin Bovan, Alina Bozecka, Spencer Brandt, Preston Braxton, Brenda Rios, Agustina Briones Yuman, Lydia Brito Cartagena, Noel Brock, Sindia Broeker, Antjuan Brown, Charnese Brown, Damion Brown, Derrick Brown, Mildred Brown, Angel Bruno, Helena Brzezinska, Juan Buckner, Ruth Bueno De Sanchez, Kobi Burks, Bogusia Buss, Rhonda Butler, Theoda Bynum, Dorota Cabala, Maria Cabrales, Jessica Cabrera, Veronica Cabrera, Benita Cabrera-Orduna, Darrell Cain, Eusebio Calderon, Jesus Calderon, Jamayri Calderon Fuentes, Callie Perry, Santia Camacho-Ortiz, Miguel Campbell, Lidia Cartagena, Ebony Carter, Marina Carvajal, Javier Casas, Zunilda Castillo, Catalina Castillo De Jimen ez, Lucy Castillo Florentino, Maria Castrejon, Antonio Castro, Catalina Quiros, Sharon Cathey, Ernestina Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Chandler Patterson, Charles Randle, Chatara Robinson, Nancy Chavez, Rosa Chiqui, Elzbieta Ciesielska, Ramiro Cieza, Angel Cifuentes, Maria Cifuentes, James Clark, Thomeesha Cobbs, Murdennia Coleman, Olicia Collins, Tolanda Collins, Adilia Colon, Alcides Comas, Cruz Contreras, Isidoro Contreras, Lolita Cooper, Miosha Cooper, Luis Coral, Maribel Corrales-Nunez, Eledet Cortes, Emeterio Cortes, Ruperto Cortes, Miguel Cortez, Dwight Crayton, Roberta Crosby, Leonard Crowder, Bradford Crowell, Andrea Crumb, Mariana Cruz, Javier Cubillo, Camille Cummings, Anprzej Cwanek, Dajon Phillips, Daniel Ramirez, Geneva Daniels, Mansah Darku, Aretha Davis, Charles Davis, Darrell Davis, Hugo De La Paz, Julio De Los Santos, Dulce Maria Yerbes De Ramirez, Silvina De Sales, Maria Del Carmen Mayen-Yantuche, Sonia Delgado, Vanessa Delgado, Christine Dell, Andrea Dent, Destiny Pendleton, Diane Petty, Alinson Diaz, Cesar Diaz, Joe Diaz, Simeon Diaz, Armando Diaz Roman, Kussai Dkhan, Viaceslavas Donecas, Krystyna Dopart, Nicole D Dorsey, April Dudley, Ramon Duenas, Dulce Rodriguez, Sandrica Dupart, Demetruise Dye, Warren Edwards, Edwin Perez - Morales, Maria Elena Paniagua De Cortez, Elidate Peroltade, Elidet C Peralta De Cortes, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Andre Elrod, Natalie Emery, Deborah English, Tanya Eskilson, Marsha Eskridge, Jesse Espinosa, Oscar Espinosa, Javier Espinoza, Zina Essa, Ethien Rivera, Beverly F ranzen, Rosa Maria Falcon, Annette Faulkner, Gustavo Fernandes, Remedios Fernandez De Pilar, Hector Figuereo, Jesus Garcia Figueroa, Maria Flores, Raymond Flores, Rosa Flores, Florije Purballari, Judy Flynn, Tierra Foreman, Charles Foster, Antoni Frackowiak, Ashawna Franklin, Janice Fredericks-Williams, Angela Freeman, Darnell Gaither, Jaime Galarza, Hilderto Gallardo, Victor Galvez, Maria Garay, Nicole Garay, Blanca Garcia, Ingrid Garcia, Jose J. Garcia, Matthew Garcia, Moises Garcia, Norma Garcia, Sindy Garcia, Stanley Garmon, Maricela Garro, Rozalia Gazek, Yared Gebregziabher, Gemoueto Petuei, Genowefa Potkaj, Kristina Georgieva, Gerry Pointer Sr., Henok Gezahne, Yad Ghalley, Jennifer Ghanayem, Cuba Gibson, Deshunn Gilmore, Lashuna Gilmore, Ronald Gilmore, Luz Giron De Reyes, Daut Gjoshi, Deborah Glasper, Dawid Gniecki, Julio Godoy Sandoval, Angel Goldman, Angel Gomez, Antonio Gomez, Myrta Gomez, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Lissette Gonzalez, Maria Abril Gonzalez, James Gordon, Vickie Gould, Kazimierz Grabowski, Martell Graham, Charlene Granderson, Myeisha Grant, Jasmine Greer, Robert Groce, Nepton Guerra Montalvo, Guillermina Guillen, Bridgette Gunn, Marek Gurga, Eric Gutierrez, Ana Guzman, Kemal Haile, Ana Hall, Idella Hamilton, Shannon Hammond, Tamara Hampton, Charlita Hardy, Chantel Hargrove, Donetta Harris, Dyan Fisher Harris, Jerry Harris, Marsha Harris, Mortaza Hassanzoda, Sharon Hatch, Delores Hawkins, Mark Hawkins, Tracie Hawkins, Scottie Hayes, Tu Hei, Marcia Hemphill, Diane Henderson, Jezebel Hernandez, Lucia Hernandez, Nicholas Hernandez, Serafin Hernandez, Jose Hernandez-Velez, Alicia Herrera, Natalee Herrera, Dionne Herron, Alicia Hill, Palomina Hinton, Lyndell Hodges, Lyubov Horban, Michael Houston, Jackie Howard, Wanita Hoyle, Natalia Hryciuk, Vone Hudson, Tanika Humphries, Belinda Iglesia, Lucia Irazoquea, Erica Irizarry, Ilia Isallari, Jadwiga Pucilowska, Anne Marie James, Gregory James, Jasmine James, James Redmond, Teresa Javier, Jazzmine Robinson, Jasmine Jenkins, Keyshon Jenkins, Tunoka Jett, Olivia Jimenez, Teodoro Jimenez, Maria Jimenez-Hernandez, John Pender, Ernestine Johnson, Passionate Johnson, Brianna Jones, Carla Jones, Laura Jones, Samantha Jones, Teshina Jones, Kierra Jones Stinson, Modene Jordan, Phillip Jordan, Jorge Perez, Jorge Robles, Jose Pena, Jose Resendez, Jovan Powell, Jozef Pindel, Romulo Jubinal, Augusto Jurado, Sylva Kalonji Paguy, Maria Kaminska, Miroslawa Kaminska, Kandanise Ramseur, Marie Kaoty, Gracia Kapinga Arina, Piotr Katanowski, Rifa Khosaba, Cosme Kiki, Roger King, Dwayne Knighten, Maria Knych, Krystyna Kosiba, Dominic Kotey, Janina Kramarz, Joanna Kramarz, Krystyna Prasol, Micheal Landa, Latricia Price, Lawrence Patterson, Brittany Lee, Kim Lee, Lemuel Rodriguez, Jessica Leo Naut, Jose Luis Leon, Juan Carlos Leon, Leonya Pickel, James Lewis, Tonsha Lewis, Laura Lillio, Tracy Lin, Angelica Lindt, Lisa Posey, Tyeisha Little, Nora Llarena, Jose Loarte Fernandez, Krysta Loggins, Francine Lomax, Hector Lopez, Juana Lopez, Yomaira Lopez, Maribel Lopez Delgado, Inocencio Lorenzo, Ma Lourdes Diaz, Monique Love, Theresa Love, Steven Loyd, Jhonathan Lozada Sanchez, Victor Lozano-Ascencio, Luz Lucero-Vargas, Lucia Parra, Solinska Lucyna, Ludmila Prangova, Luicelia Raices, Luz Mary Ramirez, Luz Ramos, Angelica M.R., Mercedes Machado, Marek Maciej, Yolanda Madulara, Grazyna Magiera, Leszek Magiera, Ruby Malave, Jose P. Maldonado, Ruby Malibe, Concepcion Malinek, Jan Malinowski, Laymond Malone, Maricela Manrra, Shaher Mansur, Manuel Perez, Victor Marchan, Margarita Pina Jose De Abreau, Leonardo Marin, Segundo Marinas-Araujo, Marisol Reyes, Carrie Marks, Guadalupe Marquez-Valdivia, Randy Martin, Alba L. Martinez, Elvira Martinez, Jorge Martinez, Jose C. Martinez, Leonardo Martinez, Noe Martinez, Malachie Massamba, Malachie Massamba Baku, Maureen Reed, Zdzislaw Mazurkiewicz, Rogatien Mboboshi, Clarence Mcclinton, Dorothy Mcswine, Kwaniqua Mcthay, Rick Meaders, Pedro M. Medina, Rebeca Medina, Robert Medina, San Martin Medina, Alhdie Mhmede, Viridiana Milanes Arias, Dana M. Miller, Maranda Mitchell, Halyna Miz, Vasyl Miz, Kathleen Mondie, Monica Perez Alamillo, Luz Montero, Alexander Morales, Martha Morales, Nicholas Morales, Silvina Morales De Salez, Lyubou Morban, Eloina Moreno, Roberto Moreno, Aisha Morgan, Sylvia Morris, Ethelene Morrison, Danelle Moss, Alisha Motley, Stainslaw Mroz, Marian Nabieu, Stella Namuwanga, Naomi Perez, Emma Narvaez, Cristina Naut, Genoveva Naut Gonzalez, Ernestina Naut-Gonzalez, Nautica Purifoy - Ratliff, Nidia Perez, Manuel Nieves-Gollena, Nnennaya Nkumeh, Jaree Noel, James Nolan, Shavon Nunez, Luz M. O'hara, Michalina Olech, Stanislaw Olech, Henryka Oleksky, Czeslan Oleszewskik, Olympia Plasencia, Omar Robles, Jerzy Omylak, Betsy Oquendo, Oralia Gerogorio Quezada, Doris Orozco-Collins, Enrique Ortega, Reynaldo Ortiola, Elaine Ortiz Albino, Olga Ortiz-Albino, Javier Ortiz-Martinez, Edgar Osorio, Domitila Ovalle, Aaron Overstreet, Jasper Owens, Janette Padilla, Jessie Padilla, Victoria Padilla, Delia Paez, Pellump Purballari, Elda Duarte Quiroga, Jan Rado, Maria Rado, Krishna Rai, Jose Ramon Bernal, Robert Robinson, Roberto Reyes, Angelica Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Jorge L. Rodriguez, Martha Rodriguez, Norma Rodriguez, Nydia Rodriguez, Yajaira Rodriguez Ortiz, Maria Rodriguez-Soto, Veronica Rojas, Sofia Veronica Rojas Gutierrez, Antonio Romano, Rosa Roncal, Lyle Ropel, Diana Rosa, Jacarri Rose, Danielle Rowe, Gacek Rozalia, Miroslaw Rozylo, Mildred Rueda, Julian Rumbo, Fausat Salami, Araceli Salazar, Anthony Salazar-Carranza, Marcelina Salgado, Mariana Salgado DeMiranda, Emilio Salinas, Nofissa Samar, Slimane Samar, Hector Sanabria, Jose Sanchez, Mercedes Sanchez, Miguel Sanchez, Sabas Sanchez, Sergio Sanchez, Virginia Sanchez, Maria Sanchez DeMarin, Shona Sanderson, Desiderio Santiago, Nilsson Roman Santiago, Edward Sarfo, Oscar Sauceda, Chresha Sawyer, Aretha Scott, Dushawn Scott, Jose Seda, Leonicia Segarra, Magaly Segarra, Jose Segura, Margarita Segura, Michael Seidler, Denise Serna, Betzabel Serrano Nieves, Shakari Pendleton, Lyubka Shishmanova, Bukurie Shyti, Margarita Sierra De Custodio, Blanca Silva, Ramon Silva-Atiencia, Kenyon Simpson, Spas Sirakov, Ewa Siwik, Wladyslawa Skrzynrarz, Henry Slevey, Cecile Smith, Danny Smith, Darnell Smith, Gregory Smith, Larissa Smith, Maurice Smith, Prestonie Smith, Maria Sobier, Rosa Sol, Rafael Sola, Lucyna Solinska, Doris Solsol, Amber Somerville, Nicole Sossouki, Edgar Soto, Sasha Soto, Wilfredo Soto Ortiz, Tasha Spearman, Stanislaw Pawlus, Adam Stankiewicz, Edna Staples, Melissa Stevenson, Portia Stevenson, Candace
August 8, 2018 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued as a settlement approval hearing on 8/15/18 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's motion for approval of settlement is expected to be filed by the end of the day. Mailed notice (air, )
July 24, 2018 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued to 8/8/18 at 9:00 a.m. Parties report that settlement documents should be executed soon. Mailed notice (air, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued to 7/24/18 at 9:00 a.m. No defendant appeared. Plaintiffs report that the parties are close to reaching a resolution. Mailed notice (air, )
June 21, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent of Rogelio Vargas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Rogelio Vargas)(Dunn, Glen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent of Maria Paniagua (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Maria Paniagua)(Dunn, Glen)
May 10, 2018 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued to 7/10/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Scrub, Inc., Teresa Kaminska and Mark Rathke (Tiu, Terence)
April 16, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent of Ricardo Alicea (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dunn, Glen)
April 12, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent of Daniel Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dunn, Glen)
April 4, 2018 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On the Court's own motion, the status hearing set on 5/8/18 is reset for 5/10/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
March 12, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Filing of Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form)(Bakov, Angel)
March 7, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Filing of Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form)(Bakov, Angel)
March 2, 2018 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of Service of Defendants' Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery by Ryan A Haas on behalf of All Defendants (Haas, Ryan)
March 2, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Filing of Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)(Bakov, Angel)
February 20, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Filing of Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)(Bakov, Angel)
January 31, 2018 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 5/8/18 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiffs did not appear for today's hearing. Mailed notice (air, )
January 29, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE by All Defendants re answer to amended complaint #42 (Haas, Ryan)
January 29, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc.(Haas, Ryan)
January 23, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Of Opt in Form of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-In form)(Brown, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Opt in Form of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit list of opt-in names, #2 Exhibit opt-in forms)(Brown, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Opt in Form of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit list of opt-in names, #2 Exhibit Opt-in forms)(Brown, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Of Filing Of Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of opt-in names, #2 Exhibit Opt-in forms)(Brown, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re amended complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #36 (Brown, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Filing 36 AMENDED complaint by Jorge Angeles, Krystyna Kosiba, Miguel Sanchez, Ricardo Alicea, Diane Petty, Scott Trice, Darrell Cain against All Defendants and terminating Julia Acosta, Nancy Acosta, Juan Acupina, Ada Resendez, Imelda Adame, Antonio Adan, Mawuli Agblewonou, Angel Aguilar, Mirella Aguilar, Rosa Aguilera, Miguel Aguiniga-Gonzalez, Akrour Ajamila, Deneen Akins, Abdul Al Juboory, Abeba Alemu, Antonio Allen, Frederick Allen, Latricia Allen, Victoria Almaguer, Oliva Almaraz, Karen Alvarado, Maria Alvarez, Marta Alvarez Martinez, Anais Rocha, Brenda Anderson, Kyle Anderson, Dora Andrade, Angel Rios, Bernardo Trujillo Antia, Annex Anyanwu, Petko Apostolov, April Rodgers, Janina Archacka, Irma Arriaga, Marta Arroyo, Antionetta Artis, Milena Asenova, Like Asfaw, Mariana Atanasova, Aubert Relucio, Cassandra Austin, Eden Avila, Eloisa Avila, Maria Ayala, Emiliette Ayi, Gelacio Bahena, William Baker, Teresa Ballesteros, James Baltimore, Daniel Barajas, Edgar Barajas, Tewodros Baraki, William Barcenas, Orissa Barksdale, Jovan Barnes-Cooper, Christopher Barrientos, Edgar Barrios, Vasyl Bartko, Omar Bassam, Bob Bassett, Beatriz Perez, Eyerusalem Bekele, Eyob Belachew, Karonda Bell, Josue Beltran, Julian Benitez Caez, Gary Benjamin, Sarah Bennett, Eric Benson, Ahreem Bentley, Freddie Berrios, Marian Bess, Maria Betancourt, Marva Billingslea, Sisson Billy, Will Binns, Tiara Bishop, Armando Blanco, John Bolden, Maria Bonete, Zofia Borodziuk, Gavin Bovan, Alina Bozecka, Spencer Brandt, Preston Braxton, Brenda Rios, Agustina Briones Yuman, Lydia Brito Cartagena, Noel Brock, Sindia Broeker, Antjuan Brown, Charnese Brown, Damion Brown, Derrick Brown, Mildred Brown, Angel Bruno, Helena Brzezinska, Juan Buckner, Ruth Bueno De Sanchez, Kobi Burks, Bogusia Buss, Rhonda Butler, Theoda Bynum, Dorota Cabala, Maria Cabrales, Jessica Cabrera, Veronica Cabrera, Benita Cabrera-Orduna, Eusebio Calderon, Jesus Calderon, Jamayri Calderon Fuentes, Callie Perry, Santia Camacho-Ortiz, Miguel Campbell, Lidia Cartagena, Ebony Carter, Marina Carvajal, Javier Casas, Zunilda Castillo, Catalina Castillo De Jimen ez, Lucy Castillo Florentino, Maria Castrejon, Antonio Castro, Catalina Quiros, Sharon Cathey, Ernestina Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Chandler Patterson, Charles Randle, Chatara Robinson, Nancy Chavez, Rosa Chiqui, Elzbieta Ciesielska, Ramiro Cieza, Angel Cifuentes, Maria Cifuentes, James Clark, Thomeesha Cobbs, Murdennia Coleman, Olicia Collins, Tolanda Collins, Adilia Colon, Alcides Comas, Cruz Contreras, Isidoro Contreras, Lolita Cooper, Miosha Cooper, Luis Coral, Maribel Corrales-Nunez, Eledet Cortes, Emeterio Cortes, Ruperto Cortes, Miguel Cortez, Dwight Crayton, Roberta Crosby, Leonard Crowder, Bradford Crowell, Andrea Crumb, Mariana Cruz, Javier Cubillo, Camille Cummings, Anprzej Cwanek, Dajon Phillips, Daniel Ramirez, Geneva Daniels, Mansah Darku, Aretha Davis, Charles Davis, Darrell Davis, Hugo De La Paz, Julio De Los Santos, Dulce Maria Yerbes De Ramirez, Silvina De Sales, Maria Del Carmen Mayen-Yantuche, Sonia Delgado, Vanessa Delgado, Christine Dell, Andrea Dent, Destiny Pendleton, Alinson Diaz, Cesar Diaz, Joe Diaz, Simeon Diaz, Armando Diaz Roman, Kussai Dkhan, Viaceslavas Donecas, Krystyna Dopart, Nicole D Dorsey, April Dudley, Ramon Duenas, Dulce Rodriguez, Sandrica Dupart, Demetruise Dye, Warren Edwards, Edwin Perez - Morales, Maria Elena Paniagua De Cortez, Elidate Peroltade, Elidet C Peralta De Cortes, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Andre Elrod, Natalie Emery, Deborah English, Tanya Eskilson, Marsha Eskridge, Jesse Espinosa, Oscar Espinosa, Javier Espinoza, Zina Essa, Ethien Rivera, Beverly F ranzen, Rosa Maria Falcon, Annette Faulkner, Gustavo Fernandes, Remedios Fernandez De Pilar, Hector Figuereo, Jesus Garcia Figueroa, Maria Flores, Raymond Flores, Rosa Flores, Florije Purballari, Judy Flynn, Tierra Foreman, Charles Foster, Antoni Frackowiak, Ashawna Franklin, Janice Fredericks-Williams, Angela Freeman, Darnell Gaither, Jaime Galarza, Hilderto Gallardo, Victor Galvez, Maria Garay, Nicole Garay, Blanca Garcia, Ingrid Garcia, Jose J. Garcia, Matthew Garcia, Moises Garcia, Norma Garcia, Sindy Garcia, Stanley Garmon, Maricela Garro, Rozalia Gazek, Yared Gebregziabher, Gemoueto Petuei, Genowefa Potkaj, Kristina Georgieva, Gerry Pointer Sr., Henok Gezahne, Yad Ghalley, Jennifer Ghanayem, Cuba Gibson, Deshunn Gilmore, Lashuna Gilmore, Ronald Gilmore, Luz Giron De Reyes, Daut Gjoshi, Deborah Glasper, Dawid Gniecki, Julio Godoy Sandoval, Angel Goldman, Angel Gomez, Antonio Gomez, Myrta Gomez, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Lissette Gonzalez, Maria Abril Gonzalez, James Gordon, Vickie Gould, Kazimierz Grabowski, Martell Graham, Charlene Granderson, Myeisha Grant, Jasmine Greer, Robert Groce, Nepton Guerra Montalvo, Guillermina Guillen, Bridgette Gunn, Marek Gurga, Eric Gutierrez, Ana Guzman, Kemal Haile, Ana Hall, Idella Hamilton, Shannon Hammond, Tamara Hampton, Charlita Hardy, Chantel Hargrove, Donetta Harris, Dyan Fisher Harris, Jerry Harris, Marsha Harris, Mortaza Hassanzoda, Sharon Hatch, Delores Hawkins, Mark Hawkins, Tracie Hawkins, Scottie Hayes, Tu Hei, Marcia Hemphill, Diane Henderson, Jezebel Hernandez, Lucia Hernandez, Nicholas Hernandez, Serafin Hernandez, Jose Hernandez-Velez, Alicia Herrera, Natalee Herrera, Dionne Herron, Alicia Hill, Palomina Hinton, Lyndell Hodges, Lyubov Horban, Michael Houston, Jackie Howard, Wanita Hoyle, Natalia Hryciuk, Vone Hudson, Tanika Humphries, Belinda Iglesia, Lucia Irazoquea, Erica Irizarry, Ilia Isallari, Jadwiga Pucilowska, Anne Marie James, Gregory James, Jasmine James, James Redmond, Teresa Javier, Jazzmine Robinson, Jasmine Jenkins, Keyshon Jenkins, Tunoka Jett, Olivia Jimenez, Teodoro Jimenez, Maria Jimenez-Hernandez, John Pender, Ernestine Johnson, Passionate Johnson, Brianna Jones, Carla Jones, Laura Jones, Samantha Jones, Teshina Jones, Kierra Jones Stinson, Modene Jordan, Phillip Jordan, Jorge Perez, Jorge Robles, Jose Pena, Jose Resendez, Jovan Powell, Jozef Pindel, Romulo Jubinal, Augusto Jurado, Sylva Kalonji Paguy, Maria Kaminska, Miroslawa Kaminska, Teresa Kaminska, Kandanise Ramseur, Marie Kaoty, Gracia Kapinga Arina, Piotr Katanowski, Rifa Khosaba, Cosme Kiki, Roger King, Dwayne Knighten, Maria Knych, Dominic Kotey, Janina Kramarz, Joanna Kramarz, Krystyna Prasol, Micheal Landa, Latricia Price, Lawrence Patterson, Brittany Lee, Kim Lee, Lemuel Rodriguez, Jessica Leo Naut, Jose Luis Leon, Juan Carlos Leon, Leonya Pickel, James Lewis, Tonsha Lewis, Laura Lillio, Tracy Lin, Angelica Lindt, Lisa Posey, Tyeisha Little, Nora Llarena, Jose Loarte Fernandez, Krysta Loggins, Francine Lomax, Hector Lopez, Juana Lopez, Yomaira Lopez (Deceased), Maribel Lopez Delgado, Inocencio Lorenzo, Ma Lourdes Diaz, Monique Love, Theresa Love, Steven Loyd, Jhonathan Lozada Sanchez, Victor Lozano-Ascencio, Luz Lucero-Vargas, Lucia Parra, Solinska Lucyna, Ludmila Prangova, Luicelia Raices, Luz Mary Ramirez, Luz Ramos, Angelica M.R., Mercedes Machado, Marek Maciej, Yolanda Madulara, Grazyna Magiera, Leszek Magiera, Ruby Malave, Jose P. Maldonado, Ruby Malibe, Concepcion Malinek, Jan Malinowski, Laymond Malone, Maricela Manrra, Shaher Mansur, Manuel Perez, Victor Marchan, Margarita Pina Jose De Abreau, Leonardo Marin, Segundo Marinas-Araujo, Marisol Reyes, Carrie Marks, Guadalupe Marquez-Valdivia, Randy Martin, Alba L. Martinez, Elvira Martinez, Jorge Martinez, Jose C. Martinez, Leonardo Martinez, Noe Martinez, Malachie Massamba, Malachie Massamba Baku, Maureen Reed, Zdzislaw Mazurkiewicz, Rogatien Mboboshi, Clarence Mcclinton, Dorothy Mcswine, Kwaniqua Mcthay, Rick Meaders, Pedro M. Medina, Rebeca Medina, Robert Medina, San Martin Medina, Alhdie Mhmede, Viridiana Milanes Arias, Dana M. Miller, Maranda Mitchell, Halyna Miz, Vasyl Miz, Kathleen Mondie, Monica Perez Alamillo, Luz Montero, Alexander Morales, Martha Morales, Nicholas Morales, Silvina Morales De Salez, Lyubou Morban, Eloina Moreno, Roberto Moreno, Aisha Morgan, Sylvia Morris, Ethelene Morrison, Danelle Moss, Alisha Motley, Stainslaw Mroz, Marian Nabieu, Stella Namuwanga, Naomi Perez, Emma Narvaez, Cristina Naut, Genoveva Naut Gonzalez, Ernestina Naut-Gonzalez, Nautica Purifoy - Ratliff, Nidia Perez, Manuel Nieves-Gollena, Nnennaya Nkumeh, Jaree Noel, James Nolan, Shavon Nunez, Luz M. O'hara, Michalina Olech, Stanislaw Olech, Henryka Oleksky, Czeslan Oleszewskik, Olympia Plasencia, Omar Robles, Jerzy Omylak, Betsy Oquendo, Oralia Gerogorio Quezada, Doris Orozco-Collins, Enrique Ortega, Reynaldo Ortiola, Elaine Ortiz Albino, Olga Ortiz-Albino, Javier Ortiz-Martinez, Edgar Osorio, Domitila Ovalle, Aaron Overstreet, Jasper Owens, Janette Padilla, Jessie Padilla, Victoria Padilla, Delia Paez, Pellump Purballari, Elda Duarte Quiroga, Jan Rado, Maria Rado, Krishna Rai, Jose Ramon Bernal, Mark Rathke, Robert Robinson, Roberto Reyes, Angelica Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Jorge L. Rodriguez, Martha Rodriguez, Norma Rodriguez, Nydia Rodriguez, Yajaira Rodriguez Ortiz, Maria Rodriguez-Soto, Veronica Rojas, Sofia Veronica Rojas Gutierrez, Antonio Romano, Rosa Roncal, Lyle Ropel, Diana Rosa, Jacarri Rose, Danielle Rowe, Gacek Rozalia, Miroslaw Rozylo, Mildred Rueda, Julian Rumbo, Fausat Salami, Araceli Salazar, Anthony Salazar-Carranza, Marcelina Salgado, Mariana Salgado DeMiranda, Emilio Salinas, Nofissa Samar, Slimane Samar, Hector Sanabria, Jose Sanchez, Mercedes Sanchez, Sabas Sanchez, Sergio Sanchez, Virginia Sanchez, Maria Sanchez DeMarin, Shona Sanderson, Desiderio Santiago, Nilsson Roman Santiago, Edward Sarfo, Oscar Sauceda, Chresha Sawyer, Aretha Scott, Dushawn Scott, Scrub, Inc., Jose Seda, Leonicia Segarra, Magaly Segarra, Jose Segura, Margarita Segura, Michael Seidler, Denise Serna, Betzabel Serrano Nieves, Shakari Pendleton, Lyubka Shishmanova, Bukurie Shyti, Margarita Sierra De Custodio, Blanca Silva, Ramon Silva-Atiencia, Kenyon Simpson, Spas Sirakov, Ewa Siwik, Wladyslawa Skrzynrarz, Henry Slevey, Cecile Smith, Danny Smith, Darnell Smith, Gregory Smith, Larissa Smith, Maurice Smith, Prestonie Smith, Maria Sobier, Rosa Sol, Rafael Sola, Lucyna Solinska, Doris Solsol, Amber Somerville, Nicole Sossouki, Edgar Soto, Sasha Soto, Wilfredo Soto Ortiz, Tasha Spearman, Stanislaw Pawlus, A
December 20, 2017 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Minute entry #34 is corrected as follows: Plaintiffs to file the amended complaint by 12/31/17. Mailed notice (air, )
December 19, 2017 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued to 1/31/18 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend complaint and to toll the limitations period #23 is granted as to leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiffs to file the amended complaint by 12/31/18. Any issues as to statute of limitations and tolling will be addressed as presented going forward. Defendants' answer is due by 1/22/18. Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program rules apply. Mailed notice (air, )
December 13, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re reply to response to motion #32 (Brown, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2017 Filing 32 REPLY by Hassan Abdi to memorandum #30 In Response To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Amended Complaint (Brown, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE by All Defendants re memorandum #30 in support of response (Haas, Ryan)
November 28, 2017 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM response to motion #25 by Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Haas, Ryan)
November 15, 2017 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion for leave to file memorandum in support of their response to plaintiffs' motion to amend #27 is granted. Defendants' further memorandum, which is not to exceed 15 pages, is due by 11/29/17; plaintiffs' reply, which is not to exceed 20 pages, is due by 12/13/17. A status hearing set for 12/19/17 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
November 9, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Ryan A Haas for presentment of motion for leave to file, #27 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/15/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Haas, Ryan)
November 9, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendants Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc. for leave to file Memorandum of Law in support of Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, to Toll the Limitations Period and for Other Relief (Haas, Ryan)
November 9, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE by All Defendants re response to motion #25 Notice of Filing (Haas, Ryan)
November 9, 2017 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Hassan Abdi to amend/correct status hearing, #22 Motion For Leave To File Amended Complaint #23 (Haas, Ryan)
November 2, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiff Hassan Abdi to amend/correct status hearing, #22 Motion For Leave To File Amended Complaint #23 (Brown, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Hassan Abdi to amend/correct status hearing, #22 Motion For Leave To File Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email letter to Plaintiffs' counsel, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Brown, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2017 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held. Plaintiffs to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint and to toll statute of limitations for current plaintiffs who will not be named parties in that amended complaint. Motion due 11/2/17; response (if any) due 11/9/17; the motion need not be noticed for presentment. Further dates to be set upon ruling on the motion to amend. Mailed notice (air, )
October 23, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE by Hassan Abdi re status report #20 (Brown, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2017 Filing 20 STATUS Report Joint Initial Report of the Parties by Hassan Abdi (Brown, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2017 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion and status hearing held. Defendants Scrub, Inc., Teresa Kaminska and Mark Rathke's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #14 is granted; the response to the complaint is stayed pending further order of Court. Status hearing set for 10/26/17 stands. Mailed notice (air, )
October 11, 2017 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Hassan Abdi, Fernando Acono, Julia Acosta, Nancy Acosta, Juan Acupina, Ada Resendez, Imelda Adame, Antonio Adan, Mawuli Agblewonou, Angel Aguilar, Mirella Aguilar, Rosa Aguilera, Miguel Aguiniga-Gonzalez, Akrour Ajamila, Deneen Akins, Abdul Al Juboory, Abeba Alemu, Ricardo Alicea, Antonio Allen, Frederick Allen, Latricia Allen, Victoria Almaguer, Oliva Almaraz, Karen Alvarado, Maria Alvarez, Marta Alvarez Martinez, Anais Rocha, Brenda Anderson, Kyle Anderson, Dora Andrade, Angel Rios, Jorge Angeles, Bernardo Trujillo Antia, Annex Anyanwu, Petko Apostolov, April Rodgers, Janina Archacka, Irma Arriaga, Marta Arroyo, Antionetta Artis, Milena Asenova, Like Asfaw, Mariana Atanasova, Aubert Relucio, Cassandra Austin, Eden Avila, Eloisa Avila, Maria Ayala, Emiliette Ayi, Gelacio Bahena, William Baker, Teresa Ballesteros, James Baltimore, Daniel Barajas, Edgar Barajas, Tewodros Baraki, William Barcenas, Orissa Barksdale, Jovan Barnes-Cooper, Christopher Barrientos, Edgar Barrios, Vasyl Bartko, Omar Bassam, Bob Bassett, Beatriz Perez, Eyerusalem Bekele, Eyob Belachew, Karonda Bell, Josue Beltran, Julian Benitez Caez, Gary Benjamin, Sarah Bennett, Eric Benson, Ahreem Bentley, Freddie Berrios, Marian Bess, Maria Betancourt, Marva Billingslea, Sisson Billy, Will Binns, Tiara Bishop, Armando Blanco, John Bolden, Maria Bonete, Zofia Borodziuk, Gavin Bovan, Alina Bozecka, Spencer Brandt, Preston Braxton, Brenda Rios, Agustina Briones Yuman, Lydia Brito Cartagena, Noel Brock, Sindia Broeker, Antjuan Brown, Charnese Brown, Damion Brown, Derrick Brown, Mildred Brown, Angel Bruno, Helena Brzezinska, Juan Buckner, Ruth Bueno De Sanchez, Kobi Burks, Bogusia Buss, Rhonda Butler, Theoda Bynum, Dorota Cabala, Maria Cabrales, Jessica Cabrera, Veronica Cabrera, Benita Cabrera-Orduna, Darrell Cain, Eusebio Calderon, Jesus Calderon, Jamayri Calderon Fuentes, Callie Perry, Santia Camacho-Ortiz, Miguel Campbell, Lidia Cartagena, Ebony Carter, Marina Carvajal, Javier Casas, Zunilda Castillo, Catalina Castillo De Jimen ez, Lucy Castillo Florentino, Maria Castrejon, Antonio Castro, Catalina Quiros, Sharon Cathey, Ernestina Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Chandler Patterson, Charles Randle, Chatara Robinson, Nancy Chavez, Rosa Chiqui, Elzbieta Ciesielska, Ramiro Cieza, Angel Cifuentes, Maria Cifuentes, James Clark, Thomeesha Cobbs, Murdennia Coleman, Olicia Collins, Tolanda Collins, Adilia Colon, Alcides Comas, Cruz Contreras, Isidoro Contreras, Lolita Cooper, Miosha Cooper, Luis Coral, Maribel Corrales-Nunez, Eledet Cortes, Emeterio Cortes, Ruperto Cortes, Miguel Cortez, Dwight Crayton, Roberta Crosby, Leonard Crowder, Bradford Crowell, Andrea Crumb, Mariana Cruz, Javier Cubillo, Camille Cummings, Anprzej Cwanek, Dajon Phillips, Daniel Ramirez, Geneva Daniels, Mansah Darku, Aretha Davis, Charles Davis, Darrell Davis, Hugo De La Paz, Julio De Los Santos, Dulce Maria Yerbes De Ramirez, Silvina De Sales, Maria Del Carmen Mayen-Yantuche, Sonia Delgado, Vanessa Delgado, Christine Dell, Andrea Dent, Destiny Pendleton, Diane Petty, Alinson Diaz, Cesar Diaz, Joe Diaz, Simeon Diaz, Armando Diaz Roman, Kussai Dkhan, Viaceslavas Donecas, Krystyna Dopart, Nicole D Dorsey, April Dudley, Ramon Duenas, Dulce Rodriguez, Sandrica Dupart, Demetruise Dye, Warren Edwards, Edwin Perez - Morales, Maria Elena Paniagua De Cortez, Elidate Peroltade, Elidet C Peralta De Cortes, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Andre Elrod, Natalie Emery, Deborah English, Tanya Eskilson, Marsha Eskridge, Jesse Espinosa, Oscar Espinosa, Javier Espinoza, Zina Essa, Ethien Rivera, Beverly F ranzen, Rosa Maria Falcon, Annette Faulkner, Gustavo Fernandes, Remedios Fernandez De Pilar, Hector Figuereo, Jesus Garcia Figueroa, Maria Flores, Raymond Flores, Rosa Flores, Florije Purballari, Judy Flynn, Tierra Foreman, Charles Foster, Antoni Frackowiak, Ashawna Franklin, Janice Fredericks-Williams, Angela Freeman, Darnell Gaither, Jaime Galarza, Hilderto Gallardo, Victor Galvez, Maria Garay, Nicole Garay, Blanca Garcia, Ingrid Garcia, Jose J. Garcia, Matthew Garcia, Moises Garcia, Norma Garcia, Sindy Garcia, Stanley Garmon, Maricela Garro, Rozalia Gazek, Yared Gebregziabher, Gemoueto Petuei, Genowefa Potkaj, Kristina Georgieva, Gerry Pointer Sr., Henok Gezahne, Yad Ghalley, Jennifer Ghanayem, Cuba Gibson, Deshunn Gilmore, Lashuna Gilmore, Ronald Gilmore, Luz Giron De Reyes, Daut Gjoshi, Deborah Glasper, Dawid Gniecki, Julio Godoy Sandoval, Angel Goldman, Angel Gomez, Antonio Gomez, Myrta Gomez, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Lissette Gonzalez, Maria Abril Gonzalez, James Gordon, Vickie Gould, Kazimierz Grabowski, Martell Graham, Charlene Granderson, Myeisha Grant, Jasmine Greer, Robert Groce, Nepton Guerra Montalvo, Guillermina Guillen, Bridgette Gunn, Marek Gurga, Eric Gutierrez, Ana Guzman, Kemal Haile, Ana Hall, Idella Hamilton, Shannon Hammond, Tamara Hampton, Charlita Hardy, Chantel Hargrove, Donetta Harris, Dyan Fisher Harris, Jerry Harris, Marsha Harris, Mortaza Hassanzoda, Sharon Hatch, Delores Hawkins, Mark Hawkins, Tracie Hawkins, Scottie Hayes, Tu Hei, Marcia Hemphill, Diane Henderson, Jezebel Hernandez, Lucia Hernandez, Nicholas Hernandez, Serafin Hernandez, Jose Hernandez-Velez, Alicia Herrera, Natalee Herrera, Dionne Herron, Alicia Hill, Palomina Hinton, Lyndell Hodges, Lyubov Horban, Michael Houston, Jackie Howard, Wanita Hoyle, Natalia Hryciuk, Vone Hudson, Tanika Humphries, Belinda Iglesia, Lucia Irazoquea, Erica Irizarry, Ilia Isallari, Jadwiga Pucilowska, Anne Marie James, Gregory James, Jasmine James, James Redmond, Teresa Javier, Jazzmine Robinson, Jasmine Jenkins, Keyshon Jenkins, Tunoka Jett, Olivia Jimenez, Teodoro Jimenez, Maria Jimenez-Hernandez, John Pender, Ernestine Johnson, Passionate Johnson, Brianna Jones, Carla Jones, Laura Jones, Samantha Jones, Teshina Jones, Kierra Jones Stinson, Modene Jordan, Phillip Jordan, Jorge Perez, Jorge Robles, Jose Pena, Jose Resendez, Jovan Powell, Jozef Pindel, Romulo Jubinal, Augusto Jurado, Sylva Kalonji Paguy, Maria Kaminska, Miroslawa Kaminska, Kandanise Ramseur, Marie Kaoty, Gracia Kapinga Arina, Piotr Katanowski, Rifa Khosaba, Cosme Kiki, Roger King, Dwayne Knighten, Maria Knych, Krystyna Kosiba, Dominic Kotey, Janina Kramarz, Joanna Kramarz, Krystyna Prasol, Micheal Landa, Latricia Price, Lawrence Patterson, Brittany Lee, Kim Lee, Lemuel Rodriguez, Jessica Leo Naut, Jose Luis Leon, Juan Carlos Leon, Leonya Pickel, James Lewis, Tonsha Lewis, Laura Lillio, Tracy Lin, Angelica Lindt, Lisa Posey, Tyeisha Little, Nora Llarena, Jose Loarte Fernandez, Krysta Loggins, Francine Lomax, Hector Lopez, Juana Lopez, Yomaira Lopez, Maribel Lopez Delgado, Inocencio Lorenzo, Ma Lourdes Diaz, Monique Love, Theresa Love, Steven Loyd, Jhonathan Lozada Sanchez, Victor Lozano-Ascencio, Luz Lucero-Vargas, Lucia Parra, Solinska Lucyna, Ludmila Prangova, Luicelia Raices, Luz Mary Ramirez, Luz Ramos, Angelica M.R., Mercedes Machado, Marek Maciej, Yolanda Madulara, Grazyna Magiera, Leszek Magiera, Ruby Malave, Jose P. Maldonado, Ruby Malibe, Concepcion Malinek, Jan Malinowski, Laymond Malone, Maricela Manrra, Shaher Mansur, Manuel Perez, Victor Marchan, Margarita Pina Jose De Abreau, Leonardo Marin, Segundo Marinas-Araujo, Marisol Reyes, Carrie Marks, Guadalupe Marquez-Valdivia, Randy Martin, Alba L. Martinez, Elvira Martinez, Jorge Martinez, Jose C. Martinez, Leonardo Martinez, Noe Martinez, Malachie Massamba, Malachie Massamba Baku, Maureen Reed, Zdzislaw Mazurkiewicz, Rogatien Mboboshi, Clarence Mcclinton, Dorothy Mcswine, Kwaniqua Mcthay, Rick Meaders, Pedro M. Medina, Rebeca Medina, Robert Medina, San Martin Medina, Alhdie Mhmede, Viridiana Milanes Arias, Dana M. Miller, Maranda Mitchell, Halyna Miz, Vasyl Miz, Kathleen Mondie, Monica Perez Alamillo, Luz Montero, Alexander Morales, Martha Morales, Nicholas Morales, Silvina Morales De Salez, Lyubou Morban, Eloina Moreno, Roberto Moreno, Aisha Morgan, Sylvia Morris, Ethelene Morrison, Danelle Moss, Alisha Motley, Stainslaw Mroz, Marian Nabieu, Stella Namuwanga, Naomi Perez, Emma Narvaez, Cristina Naut, Genoveva Naut Gonzalez, Ernestina Naut-Gonzalez, Nautica Purifoy - Ratliff, Nidia Perez, Manuel Nieves-Gollena, Nnennaya Nkumeh, Jaree Noel, James Nolan, Shavon Nunez, Luz M. O'hara, Michalina Olech, Stanislaw Olech, Henryka Oleksky, Czeslan Oleszewskik, Olympia Plasencia, Omar Robles, Jerzy Omylak, Betsy Oquendo, Oralia Gerogorio Quezada, Doris Orozco-Collins, Enrique Ortega, Reynaldo Ortiola, Elaine Ortiz Albino, Olga Ortiz-Albino, Javier Ortiz-Martinez, Edgar Osorio, Domitila Ovalle, Aaron Overstreet, Jasper Owens, Janette Padilla, Jessie Padilla, Victoria Padilla, Delia Paez, Pellump Purballari, Elda Duarte Quiroga, Jan Rado, Maria Rado, Krishna Rai, Jose Ramon Bernal, Robert Robinson, Roberto Reyes, Angelica Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Jorge L. Rodriguez, Martha Rodriguez, Norma Rodriguez, Nydia Rodriguez, Yajaira Rodriguez Ortiz, Maria Rodriguez-Soto, Veronica Rojas, Sofia Veronica Rojas Gutierrez, Antonio Romano, Rosa Roncal, Lyle Ropel, Diana Rosa, Jacarri Rose, Danielle Rowe, Gacek Rozalia, Miroslaw Rozylo, Mildred Rueda, Julian Rumbo, Fausat Salami, Araceli Salazar, Anthony Salazar-Carranza, Marcelina Salgado, Mariana Salgado DeMiranda, Emilio Salinas, Nofissa Samar, Slimane Samar, Hector Sanabria, Jose Sanchez, Mercedes Sanchez, Miguel Sanchez, Sabas Sanchez, Sergio Sanchez, Virginia Sanchez, Maria Sanchez DeMarin, Shona Sanderson, Desiderio Santiago, Nilsson Roman Santiago, Edward Sarfo, Oscar Sauceda, Chresha Sawyer, Aretha Scott, Dushawn Scott, Jose Seda, Leonicia Segarra, Magaly Segarra, Jose Segura, Margarita Segura, Michael Seidler, Denise Serna, Betzabel Serrano Nieves, Shakari Pendleton, Lyubka Shishmanova, Bukurie Shyti, Margarita Sierra De Custodio, Blanca Silva, Ramon Silva-Atiencia, Kenyon Simpson, Spas Sirakov, Ewa Siwik, Wladyslawa Skrzynrarz, Henry Slevey, Cecile Smith, Danny Smith, Darnell Smith, Gregory Smith, Larissa Smith, Maurice Smith, Prestonie Smith, Maria Sobier, Rosa Sol, Rafael Sola, Lucyna Solinska, Doris Solsol, Amber Somerville, Nicole Sossouki, Edgar Soto, Sasha Soto, Wilfredo Soto Ortiz, Tasha Spearman, Stanislaw Pawlus, Adam Stankiewicz, Edna Staples, Melissa Stevenson, Portia Steve
October 11, 2017 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Hassan Abdi, Fernando Acono, Julia Acosta, Nancy Acosta, Juan Acupina, Ada Resendez, Imelda Adame, Antonio Adan, Mawuli Agblewonou, Angel Aguilar, Mirella Aguilar, Rosa Aguilera, Miguel Aguiniga-Gonzalez, Akrour Ajamila, Deneen Akins, Abdul Al Juboory, Abeba Alemu, Ricardo Alicea, Antonio Allen, Frederick Allen, Latricia Allen, Victoria Almaguer, Oliva Almaraz, Karen Alvarado, Maria Alvarez, Marta Alvarez Martinez, Anais Rocha, Brenda Anderson, Kyle Anderson, Dora Andrade, Angel Rios, Jorge Angeles, Bernardo Trujillo Antia, Annex Anyanwu, Petko Apostolov, April Rodgers, Janina Archacka, Irma Arriaga, Marta Arroyo, Antionetta Artis, Milena Asenova, Like Asfaw, Mariana Atanasova, Aubert Relucio, Cassandra Austin, Eden Avila, Eloisa Avila, Maria Ayala, Emiliette Ayi, Gelacio Bahena, William Baker, Teresa Ballesteros, James Baltimore, Daniel Barajas, Edgar Barajas, Tewodros Baraki, William Barcenas, Orissa Barksdale, Jovan Barnes-Cooper, Christopher Barrientos, Edgar Barrios, Vasyl Bartko, Omar Bassam, Bob Bassett, Beatriz Perez, Eyerusalem Bekele, Eyob Belachew, Karonda Bell, Josue Beltran, Julian Benitez Caez, Gary Benjamin, Sarah Bennett, Eric Benson, Ahreem Bentley, Freddie Berrios, Marian Bess, Maria Betancourt, Marva Billingslea, Sisson Billy, Will Binns, Tiara Bishop, Armando Blanco, John Bolden, Maria Bonete, Zofia Borodziuk, Gavin Bovan, Alina Bozecka, Spencer Brandt, Preston Braxton, Brenda Rios, Agustina Briones Yuman, Lydia Brito Cartagena, Noel Brock, Sindia Broeker, Antjuan Brown, Charnese Brown, Damion Brown, Derrick Brown, Mildred Brown, Angel Bruno, Helena Brzezinska, Juan Buckner, Ruth Bueno De Sanchez, Kobi Burks, Bogusia Buss, Rhonda Butler, Theoda Bynum, Dorota Cabala, Maria Cabrales, Jessica Cabrera, Veronica Cabrera, Benita Cabrera-Orduna, Darrell Cain, Eusebio Calderon, Jesus Calderon, Jamayri Calderon Fuentes, Callie Perry, Santia Camacho-Ortiz, Miguel Campbell, Lidia Cartagena, Ebony Carter, Marina Carvajal, Javier Casas, Zunilda Castillo, Catalina Castillo De Jimen ez, Lucy Castillo Florentino, Maria Castrejon, Antonio Castro, Catalina Quiros, Sharon Cathey, Ernestina Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Chandler Patterson, Charles Randle, Chatara Robinson, Nancy Chavez, Rosa Chiqui, Elzbieta Ciesielska, Ramiro Cieza, Angel Cifuentes, Maria Cifuentes, James Clark, Thomeesha Cobbs, Murdennia Coleman, Olicia Collins, Tolanda Collins, Adilia Colon, Alcides Comas, Cruz Contreras, Isidoro Contreras, Lolita Cooper, Miosha Cooper, Luis Coral, Maribel Corrales-Nunez, Eledet Cortes, Emeterio Cortes, Ruperto Cortes, Miguel Cortez, Dwight Crayton, Roberta Crosby, Leonard Crowder, Bradford Crowell, Andrea Crumb, Mariana Cruz, Javier Cubillo, Camille Cummings, Anprzej Cwanek, Dajon Phillips, Daniel Ramirez, Geneva Daniels, Mansah Darku, Aretha Davis, Charles Davis, Darrell Davis, Hugo De La Paz, Julio De Los Santos, Dulce Maria Yerbes De Ramirez, Silvina De Sales, Maria Del Carmen Mayen-Yantuche, Sonia Delgado, Vanessa Delgado, Christine Dell, Andrea Dent, Destiny Pendleton, Diane Petty, Alinson Diaz, Cesar Diaz, Joe Diaz, Simeon Diaz, Armando Diaz Roman, Kussai Dkhan, Viaceslavas Donecas, Krystyna Dopart, Nicole D Dorsey, April Dudley, Ramon Duenas, Dulce Rodriguez, Sandrica Dupart, Demetruise Dye, Warren Edwards, Edwin Perez - Morales, Maria Elena Paniagua De Cortez, Elidate Peroltade, Elidet C Peralta De Cortes, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Andre Elrod, Natalie Emery, Deborah English, Tanya Eskilson, Marsha Eskridge, Jesse Espinosa, Oscar Espinosa, Javier Espinoza, Zina Essa, Ethien Rivera, Beverly F ranzen, Rosa Maria Falcon, Annette Faulkner, Gustavo Fernandes, Remedios Fernandez De Pilar, Hector Figuereo, Jesus Garcia Figueroa, Maria Flores, Raymond Flores, Rosa Flores, Florije Purballari, Judy Flynn, Tierra Foreman, Charles Foster, Antoni Frackowiak, Ashawna Franklin, Janice Fredericks-Williams, Angela Freeman, Darnell Gaither, Jaime Galarza, Hilderto Gallardo, Victor Galvez, Maria Garay, Nicole Garay, Blanca Garcia, Ingrid Garcia, Jose J. Garcia, Matthew Garcia, Moises Garcia, Norma Garcia, Sindy Garcia, Stanley Garmon, Maricela Garro, Rozalia Gazek, Yared Gebregziabher, Gemoueto Petuei, Genowefa Potkaj, Kristina Georgieva, Gerry Pointer Sr., Henok Gezahne, Yad Ghalley, Jennifer Ghanayem, Cuba Gibson, Deshunn Gilmore, Lashuna Gilmore, Ronald Gilmore, Luz Giron De Reyes, Daut Gjoshi, Deborah Glasper, Dawid Gniecki, Julio Godoy Sandoval, Angel Goldman, Angel Gomez, Antonio Gomez, Myrta Gomez, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Lissette Gonzalez, Maria Abril Gonzalez, James Gordon, Vickie Gould, Kazimierz Grabowski, Martell Graham, Charlene Granderson, Myeisha Grant, Jasmine Greer, Robert Groce, Nepton Guerra Montalvo, Guillermina Guillen, Bridgette Gunn, Marek Gurga, Eric Gutierrez, Ana Guzman, Kemal Haile, Ana Hall, Idella Hamilton, Shannon Hammond, Tamara Hampton, Charlita Hardy, Chantel Hargrove, Donetta Harris, Dyan Fisher Harris, Jerry Harris, Marsha Harris, Mortaza Hassanzoda, Sharon Hatch, Delores Hawkins, Mark Hawkins, Tracie Hawkins, Scottie Hayes, Tu Hei, Marcia Hemphill, Diane Henderson, Jezebel Hernandez, Lucia Hernandez, Nicholas Hernandez, Serafin Hernandez, Jose Hernandez-Velez, Alicia Herrera, Natalee Herrera, Dionne Herron, Alicia Hill, Palomina Hinton, Lyndell Hodges, Lyubov Horban, Michael Houston, Jackie Howard, Wanita Hoyle, Natalia Hryciuk, Vone Hudson, Tanika Humphries, Belinda Iglesia, Lucia Irazoquea, Erica Irizarry, Ilia Isallari, Jadwiga Pucilowska, Anne Marie James, Gregory James, Jasmine James, James Redmond, Teresa Javier, Jazzmine Robinson, Jasmine Jenkins, Keyshon Jenkins, Tunoka Jett, Olivia Jimenez, Teodoro Jimenez, Maria Jimenez-Hernandez, John Pender, Ernestine Johnson, Passionate Johnson, Brianna Jones, Carla Jones, Laura Jones, Samantha Jones, Teshina Jones, Kierra Jones Stinson, Modene Jordan, Phillip Jordan, Jorge Perez, Jorge Robles, Jose Pena, Jose Resendez, Jovan Powell, Jozef Pindel, Romulo Jubinal, Augusto Jurado, Sylva Kalonji Paguy, Maria Kaminska, Miroslawa Kaminska, Kandanise Ramseur, Marie Kaoty, Gracia Kapinga Arina, Piotr Katanowski, Rifa Khosaba, Cosme Kiki, Roger King, Dwayne Knighten, Maria Knych, Krystyna Kosiba, Dominic Kotey, Janina Kramarz, Joanna Kramarz, Krystyna Prasol, Micheal Landa, Latricia Price, Lawrence Patterson, Brittany Lee, Kim Lee, Lemuel Rodriguez, Jessica Leo Naut, Jose Luis Leon, Juan Carlos Leon, Leonya Pickel, James Lewis, Tonsha Lewis, Laura Lillio, Tracy Lin, Angelica Lindt, Lisa Posey, Tyeisha Little, Nora Llarena, Jose Loarte Fernandez, Krysta Loggins, Francine Lomax, Hector Lopez, Juana Lopez, Yomaira Lopez, Maribel Lopez Delgado, Inocencio Lorenzo, Ma Lourdes Diaz, Monique Love, Theresa Love, Steven Loyd, Jhonathan Lozada Sanchez, Victor Lozano-Ascencio, Luz Lucero-Vargas, Lucia Parra, Solinska Lucyna, Ludmila Prangova, Luicelia Raices, Luz Mary Ramirez, Luz Ramos, Angelica M.R., Mercedes Machado, Marek Maciej, Yolanda Madulara, Grazyna Magiera, Leszek Magiera, Ruby Malave, Jose P. Maldonado, Ruby Malibe, Concepcion Malinek, Jan Malinowski, Laymond Malone, Maricela Manrra, Shaher Mansur, Manuel Perez, Victor Marchan, Margarita Pina Jose De Abreau, Leonardo Marin, Segundo Marinas-Araujo, Marisol Reyes, Carrie Marks, Guadalupe Marquez-Valdivia, Randy Martin, Alba L. Martinez, Elvira Martinez, Jorge Martinez, Jose C. Martinez, Leonardo Martinez, Noe Martinez, Malachie Massamba, Malachie Massamba Baku, Maureen Reed, Zdzislaw Mazurkiewicz, Rogatien Mboboshi, Clarence Mcclinton, Dorothy Mcswine, Kwaniqua Mcthay, Rick Meaders, Pedro M. Medina, Rebeca Medina, Robert Medina, San Martin Medina, Alhdie Mhmede, Viridiana Milanes Arias, Dana M. Miller, Maranda Mitchell, Halyna Miz, Vasyl Miz, Kathleen Mondie, Monica Perez Alamillo, Luz Montero, Alexander Morales, Martha Morales, Nicholas Morales, Silvina Morales De Salez, Lyubou Morban, Eloina Moreno, Roberto Moreno, Aisha Morgan, Sylvia Morris, Ethelene Morrison, Danelle Moss, Alisha Motley, Stainslaw Mroz, Marian Nabieu, Stella Namuwanga, Naomi Perez, Emma Narvaez, Cristina Naut, Genoveva Naut Gonzalez, Ernestina Naut-Gonzalez, Nautica Purifoy - Ratliff, Nidia Perez, Manuel Nieves-Gollena, Nnennaya Nkumeh, Jaree Noel, James Nolan, Shavon Nunez, Luz M. O'hara, Michalina Olech, Stanislaw Olech, Henryka Oleksky, Czeslan Oleszewskik, Olympia Plasencia, Omar Robles, Jerzy Omylak, Betsy Oquendo, Oralia Gerogorio Quezada, Doris Orozco-Collins, Enrique Ortega, Reynaldo Ortiola, Elaine Ortiz Albino, Olga Ortiz-Albino, Javier Ortiz-Martinez, Edgar Osorio, Domitila Ovalle, Aaron Overstreet, Jasper Owens, Janette Padilla, Jessie Padilla, Victoria Padilla, Delia Paez, Pellump Purballari, Elda Duarte Quiroga, Jan Rado, Maria Rado, Krishna Rai, Jose Ramon Bernal, Robert Robinson, Roberto Reyes, Angelica Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Jorge L. Rodriguez, Martha Rodriguez, Norma Rodriguez, Nydia Rodriguez, Yajaira Rodriguez Ortiz, Maria Rodriguez-Soto, Veronica Rojas, Sofia Veronica Rojas Gutierrez, Antonio Romano, Rosa Roncal, Lyle Ropel, Diana Rosa, Jacarri Rose, Danielle Rowe, Gacek Rozalia, Miroslaw Rozylo, Mildred Rueda, Julian Rumbo, Fausat Salami, Araceli Salazar, Anthony Salazar-Carranza, Marcelina Salgado, Mariana Salgado DeMiranda, Emilio Salinas, Nofissa Samar, Slimane Samar, Hector Sanabria, Jose Sanchez, Mercedes Sanchez, Miguel Sanchez, Sabas Sanchez, Sergio Sanchez, Virginia Sanchez, Maria Sanchez DeMarin, Shona Sanderson, Desiderio Santiago, Nilsson Roman Santiago, Edward Sarfo, Oscar Sauceda, Chresha Sawyer, Aretha Scott, Dushawn Scott, Jose Seda, Leonicia Segarra, Magaly Segarra, Jose Segura, Margarita Segura, Michael Seidler, Denise Serna, Betzabel Serrano Nieves, Shakari Pendleton, Lyubka Shishmanova, Bukurie Shyti, Margarita Sierra De Custodio, Blanca Silva, Ramon Silva-Atiencia, Kenyon Simpson, Spas Sirakov, Ewa Siwik, Wladyslawa Skrzynrarz, Henry Slevey, Cecile Smith, Danny Smith, Darnell Smith, Gregory Smith, Larissa Smith, Maurice Smith, Prestonie Smith, Maria Sobier, Rosa Sol, Rafael Sola, Lucyna Solinska, Doris Solsol, Amber Somerville, Nicole Sossouki, Edgar Soto, Sasha Soto, Wilfredo Soto Ortiz, Tasha Spearman, Stanislaw Pawlus, Adam Stankiewicz, Edna Staples, Melissa Stevenson, Portia Steve
October 6, 2017 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: A status hearing is set for 10/12/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for all parties must be present. Mailed notice (air, )
October 5, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Francisco E. Connell for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #14 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 10/12/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Connell, Francisco)
October 5, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Connell, Francisco)
October 5, 2017 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc. by David J. Tecson (Tecson, David)
October 5, 2017 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc. by Daniel Joseph Fumagalli (Fumagalli, Daniel)
October 5, 2017 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc. by Ryan A Haas (Haas, Ryan)
October 5, 2017 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc. by Ryan A Haas (Haas, Ryan) "FILED on the incorrect docket. (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.). Modified on 10/5/2017 (aee, ).
October 5, 2017 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mark Rathke by Francisco E. Connell (Connell, Francisco)
October 5, 2017 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Teresa Kaminska, Scrub, Inc. by Francisco E. Connell (Connell, Francisco)
September 20, 2017 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 10/26/17 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 10/19/17. Mailed notice (air, )
September 19, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hassan Abdi as to All Defendants. (Brown, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2017 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Teresa Kaminska, Mark Rathke, Scrub, Inc. (jp, )
July 18, 2017 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Hassan Abdi, Fernando Acono, Julia Acosta, Nancy Acosta, Juan Acupina, Ada Resendez, Imelda Adame, Antonio Adan, Mawuli Agblewonou, Angel Aguilar, Mirella Aguilar, Rosa Aguilera, Miguel Aguiniga-Gonzalez, Akrour Ajamila, Deneen Akins, Abdul Al Juboory, Abeba Alemu, Ricardo Alicea, Antonio Allen, Frederick Allen, Latricia Allen, Victoria Almaguer, Oliva Almaraz, Karen Alvarado, Maria Alvarez, Marta Alvarez Martinez, Anais Rocha, Brenda Anderson, Kyle Anderson, Dora Andrade, Angel Rios, Jorge Angeles, Bernardo Trujillo Antia, Annex Anyanwu, Petko Apostolov, April Rodgers, Janina Archacka, Irma Arriaga, Marta Arroyo, Antionetta Artis, Milena Asenova, Like Asfaw, Mariana Atanasova, Aubert Relucio, Cassandra Austin, Eden Avila, Eloisa Avila, Maria Ayala, Emiliette Ayi, Gelacio Bahena, William Baker, Teresa Ballesteros, James Baltimore, Daniel Barajas, Edgar Barajas, Tewodros Baraki, William Barcenas, Orissa Barksdale, Jovan Barnes-Cooper, Christopher Barrientos, Edgar Barrios, Vasyl Bartko, Omar Bassam, Bob Bassett, Beatriz Perez, Eyerusalem Bekele, Eyob Belachew, Karonda Bell, Josue Beltran, Julian Benitez Caez, Gary Benjamin, Sarah Bennett, Eric Benson, Ahreem Bentley, Freddie Berrios, Marian Bess, Maria Betancourt, Marva Billingslea, Sisson Billy, Will Binns, Tiara Bishop, Armando Blanco, John Bolden, Maria Bonete, Zofia Borodziuk, Gavin Bovan, Alina Bozecka, Spencer Brandt, Preston Braxton, Brenda Rios, Agustina Briones Yuman, Lydia Brito Cartagena, Noel Brock, Sindia Broeker, Antjuan Brown, Charnese Brown, Damion Brown, Derrick Brown, Mildred Brown, Angel Bruno, Helena Brzezinska, Juan Buckner, Ruth Bueno De Sanchez, Kobi Burks, Bogusia Buss, Rhonda Butler, Theoda Bynum, Dorota Cabala, Maria Cabrales, Jessica Cabrera, Veronica Cabrera, Benita Cabrera-Orduna, Darrell Cain, Eusebio Calderon, Jesus Calderon, Jamayri Calderon Fuentes, Callie Perry, Santia Camacho-Ortiz, Miguel Campbell, Lidia Cartagena, Ebony Carter, Marina Carvajal, Javier Casas, Zunilda Castillo, Catalina Castillo De Jimen ez, Lucy Castillo Florentino, Maria Castrejon, Antonio Castro, Catalina Quiros, Sharon Cathey, Ernestina Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Chandler Patterson, Charles Randle, Chatara Robinson, Nancy Chavez, Rosa Chiqui, Elzbieta Ciesielska, Ramiro Cieza, Angel Cifuentes, Maria Cifuentes, James Clark, Thomeesha Cobbs, Murdennia Coleman, Olicia Collins, Tolanda Collins, Adilia Colon, Alcides Comas, Cruz Contreras, Isidoro Contreras, Lolita Cooper, Miosha Cooper, Luis Coral, Maribel Corrales-Nunez, Eledet Cortes, Emeterio Cortes, Ruperto Cortes, Miguel Cortez, Dwight Crayton, Roberta Crosby, Leonard Crowder, Bradford Crowell, Andrea Crumb, Mariana Cruz, Javier Cubillo, Camille Cummings, Anprzej Cwanek, Dajon Phillips, Daniel Ramirez, Geneva Daniels, Mansah Darku, Aretha Davis, Charles Davis, Darrell Davis, Hugo De La Paz, Julio De Los Santos, Dulce Maria Yerbes De Ramirez, Silvina De Sales, Maria Del Carmen Mayen-Yantuche, Sonia Delgado, Vanessa Delgado, Christine Dell, Andrea Dent, Destiny Pendleton, Diane Petty, Alinson Diaz, Cesar Diaz, Joe Diaz, Simeon Diaz, Armando Diaz Roman, Kussai Dkhan, Viaceslavas Donecas, Krystyna Dopart, Nicole D Dorsey, April Dudley, Ramon Duenas, Dulce Rodriguez, Sandrica Dupart, Demetruise Dye, Warren Edwards, Edwin Perez - Morales, Maria Elena Paniagua De Cortez, Elidate Peroltade, Elidet C Peralta De Cortes, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Andre Elrod, Natalie Emery, Deborah English, Tanya Eskilson, Marsha Eskridge, Jesse Espinosa, Oscar Espinosa, Javier Espinoza, Zina Essa, Ethien Rivera, Beverly F ranzen, Rosa Maria Falcon, Annette Faulkner, Gustavo Fernandes, Remedios Fernandez De Pilar, Hector Figuereo, Jesus Garcia Figueroa, Maria Flores, Raymond Flores, Rosa Flores, Florije Purballari, Judy Flynn, Tierra Foreman, Charles Foster, Antoni Frackowiak, Ashawna Franklin, Janice Fredericks-Williams, Angela Freeman, Darnell Gaither, Jaime Galarza, Hilderto Gallardo, Victor Galvez, Maria Garay, Nicole Garay, Blanca Garcia, Ingrid Garcia, Jose J. Garcia, Matthew Garcia, Moises Garcia, Norma Garcia, Sindy Garcia, Stanley Garmon, Maricela Garro, Rozalia Gazek, Yared Gebregziabher, Gemoueto Petuei, Genowefa Potkaj, Kristina Georgieva, Gerry Pointer Sr., Henok Gezahne, Yad Ghalley, Jennifer Ghanayem, Cuba Gibson, Deshunn Gilmore, Lashuna Gilmore, Ronald Gilmore, Luz Giron De Reyes, Daut Gjoshi, Deborah Glasper, Dawid Gniecki, Julio Godoy Sandoval, Angel Goldman, Angel Gomez, Antonio Gomez, Myrta Gomez, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Lissette Gonzalez, Maria Abril Gonzalez, James Gordon, Vickie Gould, Kazimierz Grabowski, Martell Graham, Charlene Granderson, Myeisha Grant, Jasmine Greer, Robert Groce, Nepton Guerra Montalvo, Guillermina Guillen, Bridgette Gunn, Marek Gurga, Eric Gutierrez, Ana Guzman, Kemal Haile, Ana Hall, Idella Hamilton, Shannon Hammond, Tamara Hampton, Charlita Hardy, Chantel Hargrove, Donetta Harris, Dyan Fisher Harris, Jerry Harris, Marsha Harris, Mortaza Hassanzoda, Sharon Hatch, Delores Hawkins, Mark Hawkins, Tracie Hawkins, Scottie Hayes, Tu Hei, Marcia Hemphill, Diane Henderson, Jezebel Hernandez, Lucia Hernandez, Nicholas Hernandez, Serafin Hernandez, Jose Hernandez-Velez, Alicia Herrera, Natalee Herrera, Dionne Herron, Alicia Hill, Palomina Hinton, Lyndell Hodges, Lyubov Horban, Michael Houston, Jackie Howard, Wanita Hoyle, Natalia Hryciuk, Vone Hudson, Tanika Humphries, Belinda Iglesia, Lucia Irazoquea, Erica Irizarry, Ilia Isallari, Jadwiga Pucilowska, Anne Marie James, Gregory James, Jasmine James, James Redmond, Teresa Javier, Jazzmine Robinson, Jasmine Jenkins, Keyshon Jenkins, Tunoka Jett, Olivia Jimenez, Teodoro Jimenez, Maria Jimenez-Hernandez, John Pender, Ernestine Johnson, Passionate Johnson, Brianna Jones, Carla Jones, Laura Jones, Samantha Jones, Teshina Jones, Kierra Jones Stinson, Modene Jordan, Phillip Jordan, Jorge Perez, Jorge Robles, Jose Pena, Jose Resendez, Jovan Powell, Jozef Pindel, Romulo Jubinal, Augusto Jurado, Sylva Kalonji Paguy, Maria Kaminska, Miroslawa Kaminska, Kandanise Ramseur, Marie Kaoty, Gracia Kapinga Arina, Piotr Katanowski, Rifa Khosaba, Cosme Kiki, Roger King, Dwayne Knighten, Maria Knych, Krystyna Kosiba, Dominic Kotey, Janina Kramarz, Joanna Kramarz, Krystyna Prasol, Micheal Landa, Latricia Price, Lawrence Patterson, Brittany Lee, Kim Lee, Lemuel Rodriguez, Jessica Leo Naut, Jose Luis Leon, Juan Carlos Leon, Leonya Pickel, James Lewis, Tonsha Lewis, Laura Lillio, Tracy Lin, Angelica Lindt, Lisa Posey, Tyeisha Little, Nora Llarena, Jose Loarte Fernandez, Krysta Loggins, Francine Lomax, Hector Lopez, Juana Lopez, Yomaira Lopez, Maribel Lopez Delgado, Inocencio Lorenzo, Ma Lourdes Diaz, Monique Love, Theresa Love, Steven Loyd, Jhonathan Lozada Sanchez, Victor Lozano-Ascencio, Luz Lucero-Vargas, Lucia Parra, Solinska Lucyna, Ludmila Prangova, Luicelia Raices, Luz Mary Ramirez, Luz Ramos, Angelica M.R., Mercedes Machado, Marek Maciej, Yolanda Madulara, Grazyna Magiera, Leszek Magiera, Ruby Malave, Jose P. Maldonado, Ruby Malibe, Concepcion Malinek, Jan Malinowski, Laymond Malone, Maricela Manrra, Shaher Mansur, Manuel Perez, Victor Marchan, Margarita Pina Jose De Abreau, Leonardo Marin, Segundo Marinas-Araujo, Marisol Reyes, Carrie Marks, Guadalupe Marquez-Valdivia, Randy Martin, Alba L. Martinez, Elvira Martinez, Jorge Martinez, Jose C. Martinez, Leonardo Martinez, Noe Martinez, Malachie Massamba, Malachie Massamba Baku, Maureen Reed, Zdzislaw Mazurkiewicz, Rogatien Mboboshi, Clarence Mcclinton, Dorothy Mcswine, Kwaniqua Mcthay, Rick Meaders, Pedro M. Medina, Rebeca Medina, Robert Medina, San Martin Medina, Alhdie Mhmede, Viridiana Milanes Arias, Dana M. Miller, Maranda Mitchell, Halyna Miz, Vasyl Miz, Kathleen Mondie, Monica Perez Alamillo, Luz Montero, Alexander Morales, Martha Morales, Nicholas Morales, Silvina Morales De Salez, Lyubou Morban, Eloina Moreno, Roberto Moreno, Aisha Morgan, Sylvia Morris, Ethelene Morrison, Danelle Moss, Alisha Motley, Stainslaw Mroz, Marian Nabieu, Stella Namuwanga, Naomi Perez, Emma Narvaez, Cristina Naut, Genoveva Naut Gonzalez, Ernestina Naut-Gonzalez, Nautica Purifoy - Ratliff, Nidia Perez, Manuel Nieves-Gollena, Nnennaya Nkumeh, Jaree Noel, James Nolan, Shavon Nunez, Luz M. O'hara, Michalina Olech, Stanislaw Olech, Henryka Oleksky, Czeslan Oleszewskik, Olympia Plasencia, Omar Robles, Jerzy Omylak, Betsy Oquendo, Oralia Gerogorio Quezada, Doris Orozco-Collins, Enrique Ortega, Reynaldo Ortiola, Elaine Ortiz Albino, Olga Ortiz-Albino, Javier Ortiz-Martinez, Edgar Osorio, Domitila Ovalle, Aaron Overstreet, Jasper Owens, Janette Padilla, Jessie Padilla, Victoria Padilla, Delia Paez, Pellump Purballari, Elda Duarte Quiroga, Jan Rado, Maria Rado, Krishna Rai, Jose Ramon Bernal, Robert Robinson, Roberto Reyes, Angelica Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Jorge L. Rodriguez, Martha Rodriguez, Norma Rodriguez, Nydia Rodriguez, Yajaira Rodriguez Ortiz, Maria Rodriguez-Soto, Veronica Rojas, Sofia Veronica Rojas Gutierrez, Antonio Romano, Rosa Roncal, Lyle Ropel, Diana Rosa, Jacarri Rose, Danielle Rowe, Gacek Rozalia, Miroslaw Rozylo, Mildred Rueda, Julian Rumbo, Fausat Salami, Araceli Salazar, Anthony Salazar-Carranza, Marcelina Salgado, Mariana Salgado DeMiranda, Emilio Salinas, Nofissa Samar, Slimane Samar, Hector Sanabria, Jose Sanchez, Mercedes Sanchez, Miguel Sanchez, Sabas Sanchez, Sergio Sanchez, Virginia Sanchez, Maria Sanchez DeMarin, Shona Sanderson, Desiderio Santiago, Nilsson Roman Santiago, Edward Sarfo, Oscar Sauceda, Chresha Sawyer, Aretha Scott, Dushawn Scott, Shakari Pendleton, Margarita Sierra De Custodio, Stanislaw Pawlus, Cheryl Straughter, Tadeusz Strojny, Shemonah Stubbs, Czeslaw Sweder, Teresa Sweder, Maria Sycz, Syed Qadri, Stanislaw Szulim, Rodolfo Tamayo, Ronald Tate, Robert Terry, Mose Terry, Jr, Donna Thadison, Thelma Ponciano, Debbie Thompson, Michelle Thompson, Tiatisha Reed, Pamela Tillman, Gloria Tito, Rosa Tito, Eduardo Toledo, Tony Retana, Torrence Perry, Angel Torres, Madeline Torres, Carlos Torres-Lazarini, Arthur Townes, Jara Tramble, Scott Trice, Matthew J Trigo, Tai Truong, Edward Turner, Jerell Turner, Alexander Twarowska, Jolanta Twarowska, Roberto Ugaz, Dobrin Valev, Icela Vallejo, Guillermo Varela, L
July 12, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
July 12, 2017 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (cc, )
July 11, 2017 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2017 Filing 2 PAYMENT regarding #1 of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13364133. (Brown, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hassan Abdi; Jury Demand. (Brown, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdi et al v. Scrub, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Jordan
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eusebio Calderon
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Barajas
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Cortez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nnennaya Nkumeh
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Rios
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theoda Bynum
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Groce
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Garay
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katiyana Walls
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Espinosa
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Morales
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Retana
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasyl Miz
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Abdi
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portia Stevenson
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Sola
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Atanasova
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Greer
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jatesha Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamayri Calderon Fuentes
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dobrin Valev
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Bonete
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Leon
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Czeslan Oleszewskik
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Butler
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasyl Bartko
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica M.R.
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Diaz Roman
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Villagomez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florije Purballari
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge L. Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adilia Colon
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaher Mansur
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zdzislaw Mazurkiewicz
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martell Graham
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliva Almaraz
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eledet Cortes
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zu Wang
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grazyna Magiera
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kobi Burks
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eyob Belachew
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anprzej Cwanek
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Perez - Morales
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiatisha Reed
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Lucero-Vargas
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Elrod
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwaniqua Mcthay
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Vargas
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callie Perry
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucyna Solinska
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Duenas
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazzmine Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerell Turner
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bogusia Buss
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonda Wright
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akrour Ajamila
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Llarena
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Soto Ortiz
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Kaoty
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Terry
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Alvarez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole D Dorsey
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hawkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marek Maciej
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyubou Morban
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruperto Cortes
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Cubillo
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilia Isallari
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Like Asfaw
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndell Hodges
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eyerusalem Bekele
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Marks
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustina Briones Yuman
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Paez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hernandez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Alicea
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santia Camacho-Ortiz
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Acosta
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Almaguer
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Houston
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genoveva Naut Gonzalez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vone Hudson
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Woodridge-Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottie Hayes
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomeesha Cobbs
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tunoka Jett
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Cieza
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dulce Maria Yerbes De Ramirez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Acupina
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catarino Vega
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Warren
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Hawkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly F ranzen
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Resendez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Tillman
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlita Hardy
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oralia Gerogorio Quezada
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Morales
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Salazar-Carranza
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Rojas
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leszek Magiera
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ma Lourdes Diaz
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alhdie Mhmede
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segundo Marinas-Araujo
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orissa Barksdale
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betzabel Serrano Nieves
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rifa Khosaba
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidoro Contreras
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Stevenson
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nepton Guerra Montalvo
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nydia Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zofia Borodziuk
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Thompson
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Willingham
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rozalia Gazek
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory James
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethelene Morrison
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concepcion Malinek
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorota Cabala
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Brock
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Sanchez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latricia Allen
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myeisha Grant
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yared Gebregziabher
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Pointer Sr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Cain
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alanda Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Mondie
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aretha Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilderto Gallardo
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milena Asenova
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Rosa
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Garcia Figueroa
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Padilla
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestina Naut-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elidate Peroltade
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domitila Ovalle
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sobier
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Jenkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edjar Vega
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Figuereo
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Cruz
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Benjamin
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Crumb
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentine Whittaker
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Hryciuk
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augusto Jurado
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marek Gurga
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lolita Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Knych
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sycz
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetruise Dye
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nkeyah Weathersby
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Marin
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jadwiga Pucilowska
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Flores
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gacek Rozalia
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Landa
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Fredericks-Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Hampton
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Lucero Vargas
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgetta Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Torres
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Pena
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Morris
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloisa Avila
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Staples
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pender
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Turner
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pellump Purballari
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Austin
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanita Hoyle
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Garay
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Aguilera
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kazimierz Grabowski
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Henderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Wdzieczny
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah English
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose J. Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvina Morales De Salez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiderio Santiago
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josette White
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Resendez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Irazoquea
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Ortiz-Albino
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Espinoza
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Stankiewicz
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marva Billingslea
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palomina Hinton
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Love
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luicelia Raices
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Flynn
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracia Kapinga Arina
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maranda Mitchell
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebeca Medina
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolanta Twarowska
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose C. Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaree Noel
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricela Garro
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Barajas
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Stolowska
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Seda
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogatien Mboboshi
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel Hargrove
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Cifuentes
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloina Moreno
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonya Pickel
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Benitez Caez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Reed
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Vasquez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Gaither
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chresha Sawyer
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spas Sirakov
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Sanchez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Vega
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerzy Omylak
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tranra Zubeva
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Weglarz
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Garmon
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solinska Lucyna
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Corrales-Nunez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Qadri
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Smith
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icela Vallejo
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Thompson
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystyna Dopart
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Ortega
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Andrade
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Fernandes
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dantonette Wallace
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Sanchez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Posey
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena Watts
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Cummings
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Represented By: Angel Petrov Bakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Ballesteros
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?