Arrington v. City of Chicago, Illinois et al
Plaintiff: |
Juanita Arrington |
Defendant: |
City of Chicago, Illinois and Dean W Ewing |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv05345 |
Filed: |
July 20, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Cook |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas M. Durkin |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 25, 2023 |
Filing
344
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants Plaintiffs' motions to disallow costs. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/25/2023. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
|
April 27, 2023 |
Filing
324
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies Plaintiffs' motions for a new trial 308 . Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/27/2023. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
|
August 23, 2022 |
Filing
298
MOTION by Defendant Dean W Ewing for judgment as a matter of law (Barnett, Shawn)
|
August 15, 2022 |
Filing
291
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying order and previously stated on the record, Plaintiff Arrington's motion in limine #29 is denied, and Plaintiffs' joint motion for judgment as a matter of law as to joint enterprise 280 282 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/15/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
|
August 1, 2022 |
Filing
280
MOTION by Plaintiff Juanita Arrington for judgment as a matter of law as to joint enterprise (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Montgomery, James)
|
June 10, 2022 |
Filing
255
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court resolves the instant motions as follows: Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. R. 201 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 278 (Ca se no. 17-cv-4839). Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. R. 199 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 276 (Case no. 17-cv-4839). Defendants' motion to bar certain expert opinions is granted in part and deni ed in part. R. 220 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 299 (Case no. 17-cv-4839). Plaintiffs' motion to bar expert opinions is granted in part and denied in part. R. 230 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 309 (Case no. 17-cv-4839). Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/10/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
|
August 14, 2018 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendant City of Chicago's motion to bifurcate and stay discovery on plaintiff's Monell claims is granted. 44 Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/14/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
|
January 30, 2018 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the City's motion to dismiss 15 , is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/30/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?