Zurbriggen et al v. Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thor Zurbriggen, Dena Catan, Christina H. Endicott, Veronica Vera, Soad Hamdan, Monte E. Dunard, LuJuan Preston, Sandra Stuart, Julie F. Kresko, Kimberly Johnson, Dora A. Brown Branch, Carla J. Patterson, Haley Johnson, Kathy L. Runkle, Christina Nyakas, Deanna Jones, Julie Ann Snow, Timothy Terry, Darlene Graham, Timothy R. Akers, Juliette Onody, Min Li, Constance Germond McCord, Nadia Ouladbrik, Pamela Gradei, Patricia Behnke, Joseph Arcate, Doug Crumrine, Robert Johnson, Barbara Bell, Suzanne Thierry, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Kimberly Wooten, Laura Urquhart, Lisa Joy, Lynnette Chester, Kimberly A. Sutherland, Joseph Catan, Judith J. Drake, Vickie Isaac, Sheryl Kelly, Stephen Weigel, Julie Burke, Bernadette Cassidy, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Demetria Anderson, Darryl Kure, Bobbi Gordon, Keith Maginn, Edward J. Burke, Deborah A. Brasier and Randall Szczepaniak
Defendant: Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc., American Airlines Group Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. and American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv05648
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 158 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The status hearing scheduled for 8/8/19 is stricken and reset for 10/15/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (air, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 157 RESPONSE by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. to appendix #154 : Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Citera, Francis)
June 20, 2019 Filing 156 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon the parties' agreed telephonic request, the status hearing is reset from 7/11/19 to 8/8/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 155 RESPONSE by Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. to appendix #154 (Supplemental Memorandum to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs in Appendices S-Z) (Robertson, Mark)
June 4, 2019 Filing 154 APPENDIX sealed document,,, #98 Appendices S through Z to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Weltman, Stewart)
April 29, 2019 Filing 153 REPLY by American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. to Response,,,, #149 , memorandum in support of motion, #147 / Defendant American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc., and Envoy Air Inc.'s Reply in Support of Supplemental Memorandum to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs in Appendices A-M (Robertson, Mark)
April 9, 2019 Filing 152 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On its own motion, the Court resets the status hearing presently scheduled for 4/11/19 at 9:00 a.m. is reset to 7/11/19 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant American Airlines' motion for protective order #103 , motion to dismiss #107 , motion to quash #117 , and motion for in camera review #120 remain under advisement. Mailed notice (air, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #107 by American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. (Defendant American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc., and Envoy Air Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs in Appendices N-R) (Robertson, Mark)
March 27, 2019 Filing 150 Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition Company, Inc.s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Appendices N-R to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. (Citera, Francis)
March 20, 2019 Filing 149 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor Zurbriggen, Julie Ann Snow, Nadia Ouladbrik, Kimberly A. Sutherland, Robert Johnson, Randall Szczepaniak, Kimberly Wooten, Darlene Graham, Darryl Kure, Pamela Gradei, Joseph Arcate, Bernadette Cassidy, Suzanne Thierry, Monte E. Dunard to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #107 , memorandum in support of motion, #147 Plaintiffs' Opposition to American Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs in Appendices A-M (McLawhorn, Todd)
February 27, 2019 Filing 148 APPENDIX sealed document,,, #98 Appendices N through R to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (McLawhorn, Todd)
February 22, 2019 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM by American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #107 (Defendant American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc., and Envoy Air Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs in Appendices A-M) (Robertson, Mark)
February 22, 2019 Filing 146 ANSWER to amended complaint by Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc.(Citera, Francis)
February 13, 2019 Filing 145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On its own motion, the Court resets the status hearing presently scheduled for 2/14/19 to 4/11/19 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant American Airlines' motion for protective order #103 , motion to dismiss #107 , motion to quash #117 , and motion for in camera review #120 remain under advisement. Mailed notice (air, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 144 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The motion to withdraw as counsel #142 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Attorney Nada Djordjevic's appearance as counsel shall be terminated. Mailed notice (is, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Motion by Nada Djordjevic for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney,,, #142 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 2/13/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Djordjevic, Nada)
February 5, 2019 Filing 142 MOTION by Attorney Nada Djordjevic to withdraw as attorney for Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Laura Urquhart, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor Zurbriggen. No party information provided (Djordjevic, Nada)
January 23, 2019 Filing 141 REPLY by Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #107 / Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc., and Envoy Air Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Robertson, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE by Larry S. Kaplan of Change of Address Firm Name only (Kaplan, Larry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 139 APPENDIX sealed document,,, #98 Appendices L and M to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (McLawhorn, Todd)
January 4, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE by Matthew J. Obiala of Change of Address (Firm name and email address only) (Obiala, Matthew)
December 26, 2018 Filing 137 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor Zurbriggen to motion to quash #117 Plaintiffs' Surreply in Opposition to Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Quash (McLawhorn, Todd)
December 26, 2018 Filing 136 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a surreply #134 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Plaintiffs are directed to file their surreply in opposition to defendant American's motion to quash as a separate entry on the docket. No further briefing on this motion will be accepted by the Court. Mailed notice (air, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE of Motion by Todd Lawrence McLawhorn for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,,, #134 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (McLawhorn, Todd)
December 21, 2018 Filing 134 MOTION by Plaintiffs Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor ZurbriggenPlaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Surreply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McLawhorn, Todd)
December 20, 2018 Filing 133 RESPONSE by Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor Zurbriggenin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. / Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc., and Envoy #107 Plaintiffs' Opposition to American Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (McLawhorn, Todd)
December 20, 2018 Filing 132 REPLY by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. to motion to quash #117 / Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Non-Party Subpoenas to Dr. Andrew Scheman and Intertek (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Johnson, #2 Declaration of Eric Rothenberg, #3 Exhibit A to the Rothenberg Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to the Rothenberg Declaration)(Robertson, Mark)
December 19, 2018 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on October 16, 2018 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 33199. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2019. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
December 17, 2018 Filing 130 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon review of defendant American's response to the sealing of the second amended complaint #129 , the plaintiffs' motion for leave to file their second amended class action complaint under seal #99 is denied. Accordingly, defendant Twin Hill's motion for leave to file its answer and affirmative defenses to the second amended complaint under seal #110 is denied as well. The Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the plaintiffs' second amended class action complaint #98 and defendant Twin Hill's answer and affirmative defenses to that complaint #112 . Mailed notice (air, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 129 RESPONSE by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. / Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Response to the Sealing of the Second Amended Complaint #99 (Robertson, Mark)
December 13, 2018 Filing 128 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file appendices to plaintiffs' second amended class action complaint #122 is granted. The stipulation at ECF 122-1 is entered as an order of the Court, but is modified, however, to require that for any Appendices filed on or before January 22, 2019 (rather than January 11, 2019, as originally stated in paragraph 7 of the stipulation), Defendants shall have until February 22, 2019 to respond. Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s reply to its motion to quash #117 is due by 12/20/18. Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s motion requesting in camera review #120 is taken under advisement along with the motion to quash. Mailed notice (air, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 127 RESPONSE by Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor Zurbriggenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc. to quash (Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Non-Party Subpoenas to Dr. Andrew Scheman and Intertek) #117 Plaintiffs' Opposition to American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Dr. Scheman and Intertek (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stewart M. Weltman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(McLawhorn, Todd)
December 11, 2018 Filing 126 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The joint motion for extension of time #124 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Plaintiffs' response to the American Defendants' motion to dismiss is now due on 12/20/18. The American Defendants' reply is now due on 1/23/19. Mailed notice (air, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE of Motion by Todd Lawrence McLawhorn for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,,,, #124 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (McLawhorn, Todd)
December 10, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION by Plaintiffs Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor Zurbriggen for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #107 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond and Reply to Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc., and Envoy Air Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (McLawhorn, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE of Motion by Todd Lawrence McLawhorn for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,,, #122 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (McLawhorn, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Filing 122 MOTION by Plaintiffs Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor ZurbriggenPlaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Appendices to Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McLawhorn, Todd)
December 5, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Motion by Mark W. Robertson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #120 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Robertson, Mark)
December 5, 2018 Filing 120 MOTION by Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc. Requesting in Camera Review in Connection With Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Non-Party Subpoenas to Dr. Andrew Scheman and Intertek (Robertson, Mark)
December 5, 2018 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM by American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc. in support of motion to quash #117 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susannah K. Howard in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Howard, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Howard, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Howard, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Howard)(Robertson, Mark)
December 5, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE of Motion by Mark W. Robertson for presentment of motion to quash #117 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Robertson, Mark)
December 5, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION by Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc. to quash (Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Non-Party Subpoenas to Dr. Andrew Scheman and Intertek) (Robertson, Mark)
December 4, 2018 Filing 116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant American Airlines Inc.'s unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the sealing of the second amended complaint #114 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Americans response is now due on 12/14/18. Mailed notice (air, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Motion by Mark W. Robertson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #114 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/6/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Robertson, Mark)
December 3, 2018 Filing 114 MOTION by Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to seal #110 / Unopposed Motion (Robertson, Mark)
November 30, 2018 Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant Twin Hill's motion for leave to file its answer and affirmative defenses to the second amended complaint under seal #110 is taken under advisement. No appearance on the motion is required. Twin Hill's answer and affirmative defenses to the second amended complaint #112 will remain under seal until further order of this Court. The Court will address Twin Hills motion after Defendant American Airlines files its response to the sealing of the complaint and the Court rules on the sealing of the complaint. Mailed notice (air, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 112 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to the Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. - Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Second Amended Complaint (Doc# 101) (Citera, Francis) Modified on 12/18/2018 (kp, ).
November 29, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion to seal #110 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/5/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Citera, Francis)
November 29, 2018 Filing 110 MOTION by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. to seal Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Second Amended Complaint (Citera, Francis)
November 21, 2018 Filing 109 RESPONSE by Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor Zurbriggenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. for protective order #103 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant American Airlines, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McLawhorn, Todd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM by American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #107 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit B to the Memorandum in Support)(Robertson, Mark)
November 15, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc. / Defendants American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc., PSA Airlines, Inc., and Envoy Air Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Robertson, Mark)
November 14, 2018 Filing 106 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion for protective order #103 is taken under advisement. Plaintiffs' response is due by 11/21/18. No reply is required at this time. Defendant Twin Hills oral motion for additional time to respond to the consolidated complaint is granted to 11/29/18. American Airlines' obligation to respond to discovery requests is deferred until further order. American's response to the sealing of the complaint is extended to 12/7/18. Mailed notice (air, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM by American Airlines, Inc. in support of motion for protective order #103 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susannah K. Howard in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Howard Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Howard Declaration)(Robertson, Mark)
November 8, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Motion by Mark W. Robertson for presentment of motion for protective order #103 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/14/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Robertson, Mark)
November 8, 2018 Filing 103 MOTION by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. for protective order (Robertson, Mark)
October 16, 2018 Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion hearing held. For reasons stated on the record, plaintiffs' motion for leave to file second amended class action complaint under seal #99 is denied without prejudice. Defendants are required to respond to the motion as directed in open Court by 11/30/18. The first amended complaint will remain under seal pending further order. Cases 18 CV 2303 and 18 CV 5808, which have been consolidated with this case, are dismissed. Defendants' oral motion for additional time to respond to the consolidated complaint is granted. Defendants' responses to the consolidated amended complaint are due by 11/15/18; if responses are by motion, memoranda in support of up to 30 pages may be filed; Plaintiffs' response brief, limited to 30 pages, due by 12/13/18; Reply brief, limited to 20 pages, due by 1/11/19. A status hearing is set for 2/14/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 101 Second AMENDED complaint by Deanna Jones, Carrie Bean, Sandra Stuart, Timothy R. Akers, Dena Catan, Christina Nyakas, Thor Zurbriggen, Vickie Isaac, Lisa Joy, Dora A. Brown Branch, Christina H. Endicott, Veronica Vera, Scott J. Austin, Constance Germond McCord, Patricia Behnke, Julie Burke, Haley Johnson, Sheryl Kelly, Carla J. Patterson, Demetria Anderson, Edward J. Burke, Soad Hamdan, Juliette Onody, Bobbi Gordon, Keith Maginn, Stephen Weigel, Joseph Catan, Julie F. Kresko, Lynnette Chester, Timothy Terry, Judith J. Drake, Kathy L. Runkle, Doug Crumrine, Min Li, Barbara Bell, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Deborah A. Brasier, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston against All Defendants Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (public-record version) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McLawhorn, Todd)
October 4, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE of Motion by Todd Lawrence McLawhorn for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,,, #99 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 10/16/2018 at 09:00 AM. (McLawhorn, Todd)
October 4, 2018 Filing 99 MOTION by Plaintiffs Timothy R. Akers, Demetria Anderson, Scott J. Austin, Carrie Bean, Patricia Behnke, Barbara Bell, Deborah A. Brasier, Dora A. Brown Branch, Edward J. Burke, Julie Burke, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Judith J. Drake, Christina H. Endicott, Constance Germond McCord, Bobbi Gordon, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Deanna Jones, Lisa Joy, Sheryl Kelly, Julie F. Kresko, Min Li, Keith Maginn, Christina Nyakas, Juliette Onody, Carla J. Patterson, LuJuan Preston, Kathy L. Runkle, Sandra Stuart, Timothy Terry, Veronica Vera, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Stephen Weigel, Thor ZurbriggenPlaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Second Amended Class Action Complaint (McLawhorn, Todd)
October 4, 2018 Filing 98 SECOND AMENDED Class action Complaint by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen, Juliette Onody, Constance Germond McCord, Timothy R. Akers, Julie Burke, Patricia Behnke, Edward J. Burke, Stephen Weigel, Dora A. Brown Branch, Soad Hamdan, Vickie Isaac, Demetria Anderson, Keith Maginn, Judith J. Drake, Desiree Webber-van Boxtel, Christina Nyakas, Christina H. Endicott, Sheryl Kelly, Scott J. Austin, Min Li, Carla J. Patterson, Bobbi Gordon, Carrie Bean, Lisa Joy, Kathy L. Runkle, Veronica Vera, Julie F. Kresko, Sandra Stuart, Deanna Jones, Deborah A. Brasier Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McLawhorn, Todd) Modified on 12/18/2018 (kp, ).
September 11, 2018 Filing 97 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's joint motion to reassign on relatedness grounds #94 is granted. Case Number 18 CV 5808 is to be reassigned to Judge Tharp's calendar pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 on relatedness grounds. Plaintiffs to file a consolidated amended complaint on this docket, at which time case numbers 18 CV 2303 and 18 CV 5808 will be terminated. Defendants' responses to the consolidated amended complaint are due by 11/1/18. If a response to the complaint by motion is filed, the motion need not be noticed for presentment and the following briefing schedule will apply: Plaintiffs' response brief due 11/29/18; Reply brief due by 12/20/18. The Court will rule by CM/ECF order. Mailed notice (air, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 9/4/2018:For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion & Order, Defendant American Airlines' motion to dismiss #35 is granted. The dismissal, however, is without prejudice; plaintiffs have leave to re-plead their claims to address the issues set forth in the opinion if they are able. Any amended complaint is due no later than October 4, 2018. Defendant Twin Hill's motion to dismiss and motion to strike #30 are denied. Mailed notice(air, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Motion by Todd Lawrence McLawhorn for presentment of motion to reassign case, #94 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 9/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. (McLawhorn, Todd)
August 31, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen to reassign case Joint Motion to Reassign on Relatedness Grounds Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McLawhorn, Todd)
August 9, 2018 Filing 93 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen to supplement #88 , supplement, #90 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Supplemental Briefing on Substantial Certainty (Weltman, Stewart)
August 9, 2018 Filing 92 RESPONSE by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. to supplement #89 / Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief (Robertson, Mark)
August 9, 2018 Filing 91 RESPONSE by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. to supplement #89 - Defendant Twin Hill's Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding the Substantial Certainty Test (Citera, Francis)
August 2, 2018 Filing 90 SUPPLEMENT to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #35 , text entry,,,,, #82 / Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Robertson, Mark)
August 2, 2018 Filing 89 SUPPLEMENT to text entry,,,,, #82 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding the Substantial Certainty Test (Weltman, Stewart)
August 2, 2018 Filing 88 SUPPLEMENT to text entry,,,,, #82 , memorandum in support of motion #43 - Defendant's Supplemental Brief in Support of Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Rule 12(F) Motion to Strike Class Allegations (Citera, Francis)
July 24, 2018 Filing 87 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen by Charles Jacob Gower (Gower, Charles)
July 24, 2018 Filing 86 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice by Charles Jacob Gower, Korey A. Nelson, and Warren T. Burns [83, 84, 85] are granted. Mailed notice (air, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14729406. (Nelson, Korey)
July 23, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14729304. (Burns, Warren)
July 23, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14728827. (Gower, Charles)
July 19, 2018 Filing 82 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The parties are directed to submit supplemental briefing in connection with the defendants' motions to dismiss #30 , #35 . Specifically, the Court seeks briefing on the relevance, if any, of the "limits" placed on the definition of substantial certainty in occupational-injury cases in the Third Restatement of Torts. The Restatement provides: The applications of the substantial-certainty test should be limited to situations in which the defendant has knowledge to a substantial certainty that the conduct will bring about harm to a particular victim, or to someone within a small class of potential victims within a localized area. Restatement (Third) Torts: Physical & Emotional Harm 1 cmt. e (2010). The parties are directed to submit briefs on this issue, limited to 10 pages, on August 2, 2018. Plaintiff may file a consolidated response of no more than 10 pages to the briefs of the defendants; the defendants may file separate responses limited to 5 pages each, or a joint response of up to 10 pages. Response briefs are due August 9, 2018. The parties should not address any other issue in their supplemental briefs. This briefing schedule will not be extended.Mailed notice (clw, )
May 30, 2018 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 15, 2018 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 30887. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2018. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
May 15, 2018 Filing 80 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. The parties' respective motions to seal #69 #76 are granted. Plaintiffs' motion to de-designate documents #70 #71 is denied without prejudice. Mailed notice (air, )
May 4, 2018 Filing 79 RESPONSE by American Airlines, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order Requiring Defendant American Ai #70 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor ZurbriggenPlaintiffs' Motion For An Order Requiring Defendant American Airlines, Inc. #71 (Robertson, Mark)
May 4, 2018 Filing 78 SEALED RESPONSE by American Airlines, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order Requiring Defendant American Ai #70 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor ZurbriggenPlaintiffs' Motion For An Order Requiring Defendant American Airlines, Inc. #71 (Robertson, Mark)
May 4, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Motion by Mark W. Robertson for presentment of motion for leave to file, #76 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Robertson, Mark)
May 4, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. for leave to file Under Seal American Airlines, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Requiring Defendant American Airlines, Inc. to De-Designate Documents Produced as Confidential (Robertson, Mark)
May 2, 2018 Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon the parties' agreed telephonic request, the status hearing and Plaintiffs' motions #69 #71 are reset for 5/15/18 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
April 25, 2018 Filing 74 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Airlines, Inc. by Matthew J. Obiala (Obiala, Matthew)
April 25, 2018 Filing 73 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:In light of plaintiffs' recent filings, the Court orders as follows. Defendant American Airlines is directed to file a response to plaintiffs' motion to de-designate documents by 5/4/18. No reply will be permitted absent further order of the Court. Plaintiffs' motions #69 , #71 , which are noticed for presentment on 5/9/18, are reset for 5/11/18 at 9:00 a.m. The status hearing set for 5/9/18 is reset for 5/11/18 at 9:00 a.m. as well. Mailed notice (air, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Motion by Stewart M. Weltman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #71 , motion to seal, #69 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 5/9/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Weltman, Stewart)
April 24, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor ZurbriggenPlaintiffs' Motion For An Order Requiring Defendant American Airlines, Inc. To De-Designate Documents Produced As Confidential (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8)(Weltman, Stewart)
April 24, 2018 Filing 70 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order Requiring Defendant American Airlines, Inc. To De-Designate Documents Produced As Confidential (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Weltman, Stewart)
April 24, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen to seal Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order Requiring Defendant American Airlines, Inc. To De-Designate Documents Produced As Confidential (Weltman, Stewart)
March 13, 2018 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 5/9/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
March 1, 2018 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s unopposed motion to modify status hearing date #65 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The status hearing set for 3/14/18 is reset to 3/13/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
February 28, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Motion by Mark W. Robertson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #65 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/8/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Robertson, Mark)
February 28, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. to Modify the Status Hearing Date from March 14 to March 13, 2018 (Unopposed) (Robertson, Mark)
February 28, 2018 Filing 64 AGREED Confidentiality Order. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 2/28/2018. Mailed notice(air, )
February 28, 2018 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The parties' joint motion for entry of agreed confidentiality order #61 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Enter Order. Mailed notice (air, )
February 26, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Motion by Mark W. Robertson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #61 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/1/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Robertson, Mark)
February 26, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.For Entry Of Agreed Confidentiality Order (Joint Motion) (Robertson, Mark)
February 13, 2018 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant Twin Hill's motion to modify status hearing date #58 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The status hearing scheduled for 3/7/18 is reset to 3/14/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (sxw, )
February 12, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #58 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 2/20/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Citera, Francis)
February 12, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc.to modify the Status Hearing Date (Unopposed) (Citera, Francis)
January 26, 2018 Filing 57 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen to reply #51 Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply In Further Opposition To Defendant Twin Hill's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weltman, Stewart)
January 26, 2018 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file Surreply #53 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The Surreply should be filed as a separate entry on the docket. No further briefing will be permitted absent further order. Mailed notice (air, )
January 26, 2018 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the joint stipulation of dismissal without prejudice filed by Plaintiff Laura Urquhart and the defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #52 , Plaintiff Urquhart is dismissed from this suit. Mailed notice (air, )
January 25, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Stewart M. Weltman for presentment of motion for leave to file, #53 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 2/1/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Weltman, Stewart)
January 25, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen for leave to file Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Sur-Reply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weltman, Stewart)
January 25, 2018 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation Of Dismissal Of Plaintiff Laura Urquhart (Weltman, Stewart)
January 19, 2018 Filing 51 REPLY by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. to motion to dismiss #30 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Citera, Francis)
January 19, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY by American Airlines, Inc. to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Pursuant to 12(b)(6) #35 (Robertson, Mark)
January 16, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE by Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. of Service of Mandatory Discovery Responses (Citera, Francis)
January 16, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Robertson, Mark)
January 16, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen. (McLawhorn, Todd)
January 10, 2018 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on November 30, 2017 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 29436. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626.

< Redaction Request due 1/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2018. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
December 22, 2017 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Laura Urquhart, Thor Zurbriggenin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Pursuant to 12(b)(6) #35 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Weltman, Stewart)
December 22, 2017 Filing 44 RESPONSE by Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Laura Urquhart, Thor Zurbriggenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. to dismiss - Defendants Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint and Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike Class Allegations #30 Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition Company, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint And Rule 12(f) Motion To Strike Class Allegations (Weltman, Stewart)
November 30, 2017 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM by Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #30 (Citera, Francis)
November 30, 2017 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status and motion hearing held. Defendant Twin Hills motion for leave to file its memorandum of law in excess of fifteen pages instanter #32 is granted. Plaintiffs may file a response of equal length; reply brief limited to 15 pages. Defendants' motions to dismiss #30 #35 are taken under advisement. The parties agreed proposed briefing schedule is adopted. Plaintiffs' responses to the motions to dismiss are due by 12/22/17; replies are due by 1/19/18. Once the motions are fully briefed, the court will rule via CM/ECF notice and set future dates as appropriate. Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program rules apply, but upon the parties' agreed request, and in view of the potential breadth of discovery in this case, the initial discovery schedule is extended. Written responses to the mandatory initial discovery are due by 1/16/18. The deadline for ESI submissions is extended to 2/26/18. Status hearing set for 3/7/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
November 28, 2017 Filing 41 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Laura Urquhart, Thor Zurbriggen (Weltman, Stewart)
November 28, 2017 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Barbara Bell, Dena Catan, Joseph Catan, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Haley Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston, Timothy Terry, Laura Urquhart, Thor Zurbriggen by Nada Djordjevic (Djordjevic, Nada)
November 21, 2017 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon the defendant Twin Hill's agreed telephonic request, the notice of presentment date for Defendants' motions to dismiss #30 #35 and Defendant Twin Hill's motion for leave to file excess pages #32 are reset for 11/30/17 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
November 17, 2017 Filing 38 ANSWER to amended complaint (Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Answer to the First Amended Complaint) by American Airlines, Inc.(Robertson, Mark)
November 17, 2017 Filing 37 Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s NOTICE of Motion by Mark W. Robertson for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #35 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/22/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Robertson, Mark)
November 17, 2017 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by American Airlines, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #35 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robertson, Mark)
November 17, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Pursuant to 12(b)(6) (Robertson, Mark)
November 17, 2017 Filing 34 ANSWER to amended complaint - Twin Hill Acquisition Company, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint by Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc.(Citera, Francis)
November 17, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #32 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/22/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Citera, Francis)
November 17, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. for leave to file excess pages - Defendants Motion Instanter for Leave to File Its Memorandum of Law In Excess of Fifteen Pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Citera, Francis)
November 17, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion to dismiss #30 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/22/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Citera, Francis)
November 17, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. to dismiss - Defendants Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint and Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike Class Allegations (Citera, Francis)
October 17, 2017 Filing 29 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. (Citera, Francis)
October 13, 2017 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Airlines, Inc. by Susannah K. Howard (Howard, Susannah)
October 13, 2017 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Airlines, Inc. by Mark W. Robertson (Robertson, Mark)
October 13, 2017 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Attorneys Robertson and Howard's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #24 , #25 are granted. No appearance on the motions is required. Mailed notice (air, )
October 12, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13675920. (Howard, Susannah)
October 12, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13675903. (Robertson, Mark)
October 11, 2017 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. and American Airlines, Inc.'s unopposed motions for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #17 , #20 are granted. No appearance on the motions is required. Both defendants' responsive pleadings are due by 11/17/17. The initial status conference is reset to 11/30/17 at 9:00 a.m. The initial status report is due no later than 11/28/17. Mailed notice (air, )
October 6, 2017 Filing 22 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Airlines, Inc. (Kaplan, Larry)
October 6, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Larry S. Kaplan for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #20 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 10/11/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Kaplan, Larry)
October 6, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint (Kaplan, Larry)
October 6, 2017 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Airlines, Inc. by Larry S. Kaplan (Kaplan, Larry)
October 6, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #17 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 10/11/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Citera, Francis)
October 6, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint, #14 (Unopposed) (Citera, Francis)
October 3, 2017 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The initial status conference set for 10/12/17 is reset for 11/2/17 at 9:00 a.m. and the initial status report is now due on 10/26/17. Mailed notice (air, )
October 2, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Catan, Laura Urquhart, Lynnette Chester, Dena Catan, Haley Johnson, Timothy Terry, Thor Zurbriggen, Doug Crumrine, Barbara Bell, Kimberly Johnson, LuJuan Preston as to American Airlines, Inc. on 9/29/2017, answer due 10/20/2017. (Weltman, Stewart)
September 28, 2017 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant American Airlines, Inc. (pg, )
September 28, 2017 Filing 14 First AMENDED complaint by Dena Catan, Thor Zurbriggen, Haley Johnson, Joseph Catan, Timothy Terry, LuJuan Preston, Barbara Bell, Lynnette Chester, Doug Crumrine, Kimberly Johnson, Laura Urquhart against All Defendants (McLawhorn, Todd)
August 24, 2017 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #11 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 9/29/17. The initial status conference set for 9/7/17 is reset for 10/12/17 at 9:00 a.m. and the initial status report is now due on 10/5/17. Mailed notice (air, )
August 23, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Francis A Citera for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/29/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Citera, Francis)
August 23, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 - Unopposed (Citera, Francis)
August 21, 2017 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. by Caitlyn E Haller (Haller, Caitlyn)
August 21, 2017 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. by Francis A Citera (Citera, Francis)
August 16, 2017 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 9/7/17 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 9/1/17. Mailed notice (air, )
August 16, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thor Zurbriggen, Dena Catan as to Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. on 8/9/2017, answer due 8/30/2017. (Chang, Michael)
August 3, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ags, )
August 3, 2017 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc. (pg, )
August 2, 2017 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (meg, )
August 2, 2017 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dena Catan, Thor Zurbriggen by Michael Matthew Chang (Chang, Michael)
August 2, 2017 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dena Catan, Thor Zurbriggen by Stewart M. Weltman (Weltman, Stewart)
August 2, 2017 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dena Catan, Thor Zurbriggen by Todd Lawrence McLawhorn (McLawhorn, Todd)
August 2, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McLawhorn, Todd)
August 2, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Thor Zurbriggen, Dena Catan; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13440109.(McLawhorn, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurbriggen et al v. Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thor Zurbriggen
Represented By: Michael Matthew Chang
Represented By: Stewart M. Weltman
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Korey Arthur Nelson
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Catan
Represented By: Michael Matthew Chang
Represented By: Stewart M. Weltman
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina H. Endicott
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Vera
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soad Hamdan
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte E. Dunard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LuJuan Preston
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Stuart
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie F. Kresko
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Johnson
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora A. Brown Branch
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla J. Patterson
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Johnson
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy L. Runkle
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Nyakas
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Jones
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ann Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Terry
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy R. Akers
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliette Onody
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Min Li
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Germond McCord
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Ouladbrik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Gradei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Behnke
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Arcate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Crumrine
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Bell
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Thierry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Webber-van Boxtel
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Urquhart
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Joy
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnette Chester
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Catan
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith J. Drake
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Isaac
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Kelly
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Weigel
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Burke
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott J. Austin
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Bean
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetria Anderson
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Kure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi Gordon
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Maginn
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Burke
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Brasier
Represented By: Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Szczepaniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc.
Represented By: Francis A Citera
Represented By: Caitlyn E Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy Air Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSA Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W. Robertson
Represented By: Susannah K. Howard
Represented By: Larry S. Kaplan
Represented By: Matthew J. Obiala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?