The City of Chicago v. Sessions III

Plaintiff: The City of Chicago
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III
Amicus: The California State Legislature, County of Santa Clara, Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, and Immigration Law Scholars, Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, Illinois Business Immigration Coalition, Erie Neighborhood House, National Immigrant Justice Center and Cook County
Case Number: 1:2017cv05720
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/16/2017:Mailed notice(wp, )
October 13, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/13/2017:Mailed notice(wp, )
September 15, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/15/2017:Mailed notice(wp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Chicago v. Sessions III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Chicago
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: Matthew Charles Crowl
Represented By: Bridget Fahey
Represented By: Jamie S Gorelick
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Molly Jennings
Represented By: Harnaik Singh Kahlon
Represented By: Laura A Kleinman
Represented By: David W. Ogden
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Represented By: Ari J Savitzky
Represented By: Edward N Siskel
Represented By: Andrew W Worseck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Buckingham
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: The California State Legislature
Represented By: George P. Apostolides
Represented By: John C. Gekas
Represented By: David Meir Zionts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: John Matthew Fitzgerald
Represented By: Brian C Haussmann
Represented By: Kavita Kandala Narayan
Represented By: Caesar A. Tabet
Represented By: Laura Susan Trice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, and Immigration Law Scholars
Represented By: Jamison Michael Isaac Davies
Represented By: Edward Francis Malone
Represented By: Harry Sandick
Represented By: Michael D Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders
Represented By: Chirag Gopal Badlani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Illinois Business Immigration Coalition
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Dufau
Represented By: Chad Ian Golder
Represented By: John J. Hamill, Jr.
Represented By: Molly K. Priedeman
Represented By: Kenneth L. Schmetterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Erie Neighborhood House
Represented By: Kelly Ann Petrocelli
Represented By: David B. Sudzus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Immigrant Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Cook County
Represented By: Justin Adam Benson
Represented By: Jillian Rebecca Dent
Represented By: David Henry Hoffman
Represented By: Neil Gerard Nandi
Represented By: Lindsay Nicole Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?